District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Trump v. Vance, Jr. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-08694-VM
District Judge Victor Marrero, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 28, 2020 at 11:38 AM DT (11.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Consovoy McCarthy PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 4923 will@consovoymccarthy.com
Space Patrick Strawbridge +1 617 951 2830 patrick@consovoymccarthy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alan S. Futerfas Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan S. Futerfas +1 212 684 8400 +1 212 684 5259 asfuterfas@futerfaslaw.com
v.
Vance, Jr., Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., Cyrus R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Cyrus R. Vance, Jr."
Mazars USA, LLP Mazars USA, LLP, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 9/19/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 950 - Other Statutes: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County XX Out of State
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 63 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [62] MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Cyrus R. Vance, Jr...(Shinerock, Solomon)
    LREF
    Legal Document 62 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Motion to Dismiss
    MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Cyrus R. Vance, Jr...(Shinerock, Solomon)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Notice of appearance
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Joan Halligan on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr...(Halligan, Caitlin)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Notice of appearance
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan Wolfe Allison on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr...(Allison, Ryan)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Notice of appearance
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Coon on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr...(Coon, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/1/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER: By order dated July 16, 2020, the Court endorsed the parties' proposed schedule for the filing of a second amended complaint and an answer or further motion practice. (See Dkt. No. 53.) The parties are hereby ordered to file all further submissions by 12:00 p.m. on the corresponding date set forth in the July 16, 2020 order. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/28/2020) (js)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: None USCA Order - Other
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 Amended Complaint
                      SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [27] Amended Complaint against Mazars USA, LLP, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr..Document filed by Donald J. Trump. Related document: [27] Amended Complaint..(Consovoy, William)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: 7/21/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [55] Motion for Sarah Ann Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/21/2020) (rj)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Stay
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: 7/20/2020, Terminated: 7/21/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                              MOTION for Sarah Ann Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20758143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cyrus R. Vance, Jr...(Walsh, Sarah)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [55] MOTION for Sarah Ann Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20758143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [55] MOTION for Sarah Ann Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20758143. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 USCA Mandate
                                          JUDGMENT OF THE U.S. SUPREME COURT (Certified Copy) as to [37] Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Donald J. Trump. USCA Case Number 19-3204.ON WRIT OF CERTIORARI to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit. THIS CAUSE came on to be heard on the transcript of the record from the above court and was argued by counsel. ON CONSIDERATION WHEREOF, it is ordered, and adjudged by this Court that the judgment of the above court is affirmed, and the case is remanded to the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit for further proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 07/17/2020..(nd)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Endorsed Letter
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [52] Status Report filed by Donald J. Trump. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to proceed in accordance with the jointly proposed schedule set forth above. So Ordered. ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/27/2020., Responses due by 8/10/2020, Replies due by 8/14/2020.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/16/2020) (js) Modified on 7/17/2020 (js).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Telephone Conference held on 7/16/2020. William Consovoy and Marc Lee Mukasey present for the plaintiff, President Donald J. Trump. Carey Dunne and Christopher Conroy present for defendant Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., in his official capacity as District Attorney of the County of New York. Thomas R. Manisero and Jerry D. Bernstein present for defendant Mazars USA, LLP. Court reporter present. (sm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020 Status report
                                                      STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Donald J. Trump..(Consovoy, William)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Conference
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Order
                                                          ORDER. The following additional dial-in and access code will be available to parties who wish to listen to the conference scheduled in this matter for July 16, 2020, at 10:00 a.m.: 888-363-4749, access code 7185839. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Victor Marrero) (Text Only Order) (sm)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Joseph Larkin on behalf of Mazars USA, LLP..(Larkin, Peter)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Rose Gelozin on behalf of Mazars USA, LLP..(Gelozin, Rebecca)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas R. Manisero on behalf of Mazars USA, LLP..(Manisero, Thomas)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julieta Veronica Lozano on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr...(Lozano, Julieta)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER: In accordance with the July 9, 2020 decision of the United States Supreme Court, See Trump v. Vance, No. 19-635, slip op. at 21-22 (July 9, 2020), and the July 10, 2020 Mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit remanding the case to this Court (See Dkt. No. 46), the parties are hereby ordered to jointly inform the Court by the morning of July 15, 2020 whether further proceedings will be necessary in light of the dispositions by the Courts above. The parties' joint submission should outline potential areas for further argument. A telephone conference to discuss the parties' positions on further proceedings, and a proposed schedule for further briefing, if necessary, is hereby scheduled for July 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The parties are directed to use the dial-in number 1-888-363-4749 and access code 8392198. So Ordered. (Telephone Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 7/10/2020) (js)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 USCA Mandate
                                                                            MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to [37] Corrected Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald J. Trump. USCA Case Number 19-3204. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the district court's order denying the President's request for a preliminary injunction is AFFIRMED, the district court's judgment dismissing the complaint on the ground of Younger abstention is VACATED, and the case is REMANDED to the district court for further proceedings consistent with this Court's opinion. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/10/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Opinion).(nd)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
                                                                              Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: [46] USCA Mandate,,..(nd)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
                                                                                Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re: [46] USCA Mandate,,..(nd)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Raj K. Patel dated 7/9/20 re: I am lettting the Court know that I am searching the dockets of No. 1:19-cv-08694-VM to see if President Trump's taxes show relationships to Emory University, Inc., University of Notre Dame Law School, the State of Indiana or Federal Government because I had my patterns stolen by President Trump and because I hope to find supportive materials for my issues in Doe v. The Trump Corp., No. 20-cv-1706(2nd Cir.___) Appendix A etc.(sc)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                                                    Appeal Record Sent to SCUS (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for [44] Appeal Remark USCA Case Number 19-3204; SCUS Case Number 19-0635, were transmitted to the Supreme Court of the United States. (tp) Modified on 2/20/2020 (tp).
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/20/2020 Appeal Remark
                                                                                      Supreme Court Record Request as to [37] Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Donald J. Trump, [36] Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald J. Trump. USCA Case Number 19-3204; SCUS Case Number 19-0635. (tp)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Remark
                                                                                        2ND AMICUS CURIAE BRIEFING OF ANDREW CLARK IN FAVOR OF DONALD TRUMP.Documentfiled by Andrew Clark, a non-party. (Attachments: # (1) Envelope) (sc)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from William S. Consovoy, Carey R. Dunne, Jerry D. Bernstein dated 11/8/2019 re: response to Court's order from 11/5/2019. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/8/2019) (rro)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER re: [40] USCA Order: In accordance with the November 4, 2019 decision of the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in this matter, see Trump v. Vance., No. 19-3204, slip op. at 34 n.19 (2d "Cir. Nov. 4, 2019), the parties are hereby ordered to inform the Court by November 8, 2019 whether further proceedings, before this Court will be necessary in light of the Second Circuit's disposition. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the case for the purposes of enforcement in the event that following entry of a final judgment, any party to which such judgment is directed refuses to comply. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/5/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019, Terminated: 7/10/2020 USCA order
                                                                                              USCA OPINION (Certified) as to [37] Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Donald J. Trump USCA Case Number 19-3204. President Donald J. Trump filed suit in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York seeking declaratory and injunctive relief to restrain the District Attorney of New York County from enforcing a grand jury subpoena served on Mazars USA LLP, a third-party custodian of the President's financial records. The district court (Marrero, J.) abstained from exercising jurisdiction and dismissed the Presidents complaint pursuant to Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971), but also ruled in the alternative that the President is not entitled to injunctive relief. On appeal, the President argues that abstention is not the course that should be taken here, and he asserts a temporary absolute presidential immunity that would forbid the grand jury from seeking his financial records in service of an investigation into conduct that predated his presidency. We agree that Younger abstention does not apply to the circumstances of this case. We hold, however, that any presidential immunity from state criminal process does not extend to investigative steps like the grand jury subpoena at issue here. We accordingly AFFIRM the district court's decision on the immunity question, which we construe as an order denying a preliminary injunction, VACATE the judgment of the district court dismissing the complaint on the ground of Younger abstention, and REMAND for further proceedings consistent with this opinion.. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 11/04/2019. (nd) Modified on 11/4/2019 (nd).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
                                                                                                Transmission of USCA Opinion to the District Judge re: [40] USCA Opinion. (nd)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 9/25/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 9/25/2019 before Judge Victor Marrero. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 7/10/2020 Corrected Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                      EMERGENCY CORRECTED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: [36] Notice of Appeal, [35] Order,. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 7/10/2020 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - NO ORDER SELECTED FOR APPEAL - EMERGENCY NOTICE OF APPEAL. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17724879. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Consovoy, William) Modified on 10/7/2019 (tp).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          DECISION AND ORDER: For the reasons described above, it is hereby ORDERED that the amended complaint of plaintiff Donald J. Trump (Dkt. No. 27) is DISMISSED pursuant to the decision of the United States Supreme Court in Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/7/2019) (tro)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  USCA Case Number
                                                                                                            USCA Case Number 19-3204 from the U.S.C.A. - 2nd Circ. assigned to [37] Emergency Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Donald J. Trump. (nd)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                                                                                              Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for [37] Emergency Corrected Notice of Appeal filed by Donald J. Trump were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                                                                                                Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: [37] Corrected Notice of Appeal. (nd)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Appeal Fee Paid via Pay.gov
                                                                                                                  Appeal Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for [37] Corrected Notice of Appeal. Filing fee $ 505.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-17724879, paid on 10/07/2019. (nd)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT APPEAL. Notice to attorney Consovoy, William to RE-FILE Document No. [36] Notice of Appeal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the order/judgment being appealed was not selected. Re-file the appeal using the event type Corrected Notice of Appeal found under the event list Appeal Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - select the correct order/judgment being appealed. (tp)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from William S. Consovoy dated 10/4/2019 re: President's pending motion. ENDORSEMENT: With the filing of the letter above in the public docket of this action, the Court has closed the record of this proceeding. The parties are directed to refrain from mailing any further submissions. Any other papers filed will not be endorsed. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/4/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Carey R. Dunne, Christopher Conroy, Solomon B. Shinerock, James H. Graham and Allen Vickey dated 10/3/2019 re: We write to respond briefly to the "Statement of Interest" filed by the United States Department of Justice ("DOJ") in this litigation late yesterday afternoon. We reiterate our position that this matter should be dismissed pursuant to the settled law mandating abstention. Further, for all the reasons articulated in our brief (Dkt. 16: at 11-19), Plaintiff's motion for injunctive relief should be denied, including on the ultimate merits, which turn on the law and have been, at this point, fully briefed and argued. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by defendant. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 10/3/2019) CC: all counsel of record (via email)(js)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion re: [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Statement of Interest. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua E. Gardner on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Gardner, Joshua)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Geoffrey S. Berman dated 9/30/2019 re: In accordance with the Court's order of September 25, 2019 (ECF No. 25), we write respectfully to inform the Court that the United States of America will file a submission by the close of business on Wednesday, October 2, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the Government. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/30/2019) (js)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: 9/26/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Carey R. Dunne, William Consovoy, Jerry D. Bernstein dated 9/26/2019 re: Pursuant to the Court's order of September 25, 2019 (Dkt. #25), and without prejudice to any right asserted by any party, we write to inform the Court that the parties have reached a temporary arrangement, and as further specified in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by the parties. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/26/2019) (rjm)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against Mazars USA, LLP, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr..Document filed by Donald J. Trump. Related document: [1] Complaint.(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Jerry D. Bernstein dated 9/24/19 re: advising the Court of Mazars USA's position as to Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order and a preliminary injunction. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter into the public record of this action the letter above submitted to the Court by Defendant Mazars USA. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/25/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that the stay of enforcement of and compliance with the subpoena issued to Mazars USA, LLP, which is scheduled to expire today, September 25, 2019 at 1:00 p.m. (see Dkt. No. 4), shall be extended to tomorrow, September 26, 2019 at 5:00 p.m. It is further ORDERED that the parties in this action shall meet and confer regarding their respective concerns, and inform the Court, through the submission of a joint letter by tomorrow, September 26, 2019 at 4:00 p.m., whether they have agreed upon a process for proceeding in the interim period between expiration of the current stay and the issuance of the Court's decision. Finally, it is ORDERED that the request of the United States (Dkt. No. 24) for additional time to determine whether to participate in this action is GRANTED. The United States shall have until close of business on Monday, September 30, 2019, to inform the Court and the parties whether it intends to participate in this action. If the United States determines that it will participate, it shall have until close of business on Wednesday, October 2, 2019, to file a submission. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/25/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor Marrero: Oral Argument held on 9/25/2019. William Consovoy, Marc Mukasey, Alan Futerfas, and Cameron Norris present for the plaintiff, President Donald J. Trump. Carey Dunne, Solomon Shinerock, Christopher Conroy, Allen Vickey, and James Graham present for defendant Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., in his official as District Attorney of the County of New York. Inbal Paz Garrity, Jerry Bernstein, Nicholas Tambone, and Michael Mullman present for defendant Mazars USA, LLP. Court reporter present. The Court heard oral arguments from the parties. (al)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney William Consovoy to RE-FILE Document No. [21] Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct. The PDF must be titled to correspond with the event type being used. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re: [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Statement of the United States. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Oestericher, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Stuart Oestericher on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Oestericher, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint against Mazars USA, LLP, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr..Document filed by Donald J. Trump. Related document: [1] Complaint.(Consovoy, William) Modified on 9/25/2019 (jgo).
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nicholas Robert Tambone on behalf of Mazars USA, LLP. (Tambone, Nicholas)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Inbal Paz Garrity on behalf of Mazars USA, LLP. (Garrity, Inbal)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jerry D. Bernstein on behalf of Mazars USA, LLP. (Bernstein, Jerry)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Solomon B. Shinerock in Opposition re: [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction .. Document filed by Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Shinerock, Solomon)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.. (Shinerock, Solomon)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Vance dated 2019.09.23 re: 19 Civ. 8694. Document filed by Cyrus R. Vance, Jr..(Shinerock, Solomon)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [12] Motion for Christopher Raymond Conroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/23/2019) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carey R. Dunne on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.. (Dunne, Carey)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019, Terminated: 9/23/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Christopher Raymond Conroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17643369. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Cyrus R. Vance, Jr..(Conroy, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Henry Graham on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.. (Graham, James)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [12] MOTION for Christopher Raymond Conroy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17643369. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [6] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . . Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Amended Memorandum of Law)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Allen James Vickey on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.. (Vickey, Allen)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: It is hereby ordered that the oral argument scheduled for September 25, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. shall be held in Courtroom 23B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. (Oral Argument set for 9/25/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 23B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Victor Marrero.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/20/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Solomon B Shinerock on behalf of Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.. (Shinerock, Solomon)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019, Terminated: 10/7/2019 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR - MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Document filed by Donald J. Trump. Return Date set for 9/25/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Memo of Law)(Futerfas, Alan) Modified on 12/5/2019 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [3] Motion for William S. Consovoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/20/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Victor Marrero from Christopher Conroy dated [undated] re: the parties have agreed to the following schedule subject to the Court's approval. ENDORSEMENT: Request GRANTED. The briefing schedule and hearing on the motion for injunctive relief in this action shall be as set forth above. (Mazars USA, LLP answer due 9/23/2019; Cyrus R. Vance, Jr. answer due 9/23/2019.) (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 9/19/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019, Terminated: 9/20/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for William S. Consovoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17626124. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald J. Trump. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (VA), # (3) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC), # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Consovoy, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pc) (jgo).
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against Mazars USA, LLP, Cyrus R. Vance, Jr.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401244444)Document filed by Donald J. Trump.(pc) (jgo).
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 9/25/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Victor Marrero. (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [3] MOTION for William S. Consovoy to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17626124. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 447 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?