STATE OF CALIFORNIA et al v. ELAINE L. CHAO et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-02826-KBJ
District Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2021 at 4:44 PM EST (1.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

City of Los Angeles City of Los Angeles, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Los Angeles City Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J Bostrom +1 213 978 8068 +1 213 978 8214 michael.bostrom@lacity.org
City of New York City of New York, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by mass.gov Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Megan Marie Herzog +1 617 963 2674 megan.herzog@mass.gov
No Logo Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Pennsylvania Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael John Fischer +1 215 560 2402 mfischer@attorneygeneral.gov
No Logo Commonwealth of Virginia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
District of Columbia District of Columbia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David S. Hoffmann +1 202 449 9889 david.hoffmann@dc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo People of the State of Michigan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Michigan Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Neil David Gordon +1 571 373 7540 gordonn1@michigan.gov
No Logo State of California, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kavita Paul Lesser +1 213 897 2603 +1 213 897 2802 kavita.lesser@doj.ca.gov
Space Margaret Elaine Meckenstock +1 415 703 5894 +1 415 703 5480 Elaine.Meckenstock@doj.ca.gov
Space Gary E Tavetian +1 213 897 2639 +1 213 897 2802 Gary.Tavetian@doj.ca.gov
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
Space David A Zonana +1 415 703 5823 david.zonana@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department of State Hospitals

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica Barclay-Strobel +1 213 269 6635 Jessica.BarclayStrobel@doj.ca.gov
Space Meredith Jane Hankins +1 213 269 6177 meredith.hankins@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of Colorado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Colorado Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Olson, Solicitor General eric.olson@coag.gov
No Logo State of Connecticut, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of Delaware, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of Hawaii, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of Illinois, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Illinois

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Elliott James +1 312 814 0660 jjames@atg.state.il.us
No Logo State of Maine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laura Elizabeth Jensen +1 207 626 8868 laura.jensen@maine.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of Maryland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Peoples Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roberta Rose James roberta.james@maryland.gov
No Logo State of Minnesota, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Nathaniel Surdo +1 651 757 1061 Peter.Surdo@ag.state.mn.us
No Logo State of Nevada, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo STATE OF NEW JERSEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Arthur Love +1 609 376 2762 aaron.love@law.njoag.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State Of New Mexico, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of New York, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gavin Geraghty McCabe, Deputy Attorney General +1 212 416 6007 gavin.mccabe@ag.ny.gov
No Logo STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of Oregon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Andrew Garrahan +1 503 947 4593 paul.garrahan@doj.state.or.us
No Logo State of Rhode Island, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of Vermont, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Vermont

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicholas F Persampieri +1 802 828 6902 nick.persampieri@vermont.gov
No Logo State Of Washington, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40111-OLY)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Emily Crystal Nelson +1 360 586 4607 emily.nelson@atg.wa.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov
No Logo State of Wisconsin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by California Department Of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Andrew Wiener +1 415 703 5969 jonathan.wiener@doj.ca.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Wisconsin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Lynn Vandermeuse +1 608 266 7741 vandermeusejl@doj.state.wi.us
v.
Chao, Elaine L. Chao, Elaine L., Defendant
Officially listed as "ELAINE L. CHAO"
Officer/Director, Dole Food Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, PROTECTIVE LIFE CORP
News Corporation Officer/Director, News Corporation
Officer/Director, New Newscorp LLC
Officer/Director, Virginia Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ingersoll-Rand plc
Officer/Director, Kroger Co
Officer/Director, Tortoise Acquisition Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
No Logo JAMES C. OWENS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
National Highway Traffic Safety Administration National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "UNITED STATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Transportation United States Department of Transportation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 9/20/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 0706 Judicial Review of Agency Actions
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-C
  Entries (79) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 11/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 7/1/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/22/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/11/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Withdraw
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Intervenor Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: None LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Intervenor Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Intervene
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Transfer Case
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER setting briefing schedule regarding Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiffs' opposition shall be served on or before 11/14/2019; Defendants' reply shall be served on or before 11/27/2019; and briefs shall be filed as a batch within three (3) business days of the service of the last reply brief authorized by this Minute Order, but in any event no later than the Final Filing Deadline of 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/21/2019. (jag)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Certified Index of Record by ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Carlisle, Benjamin)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Intervene
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Michael James Bostrom on behalf of CITY OF LOS ANGELES (Bostrom, Michael) (Main Document 30 replaced on 10/18/2019) (zjf).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Elliott James on behalf of STATE OF ILLINOIS (James, Jason)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Elizabeth Jensen on behalf of STATE OF MAINE (Jensen, Laura)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Service by ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Carlisle, Benjamin)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Intent to File Motion to Dismiss and Joint Proposed Schedule by ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (Carlisle, Benjamin)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Order on motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting [22] Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 10/15/2019. (jag)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Eric R. Olson on behalf of STATE OF COLORADO (Olson, Eric)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Lynn Vandermeuse on behalf of STATE OF WISCONSIN (Vandermeuse, Jennifer) (Main Document 24 replaced on 10/10/2019) (znmw).
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Hoffmann on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Hoffmann, David)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019, Terminated: 10/15/2019 motion to amend/correct
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct [1] Complaint,,, For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, CITY OF NEW YORK, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF COLORADO, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MAINE, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WISCONSIN (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint, # (2) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Amend and Supplement Complaint, # (3) Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended and Supplemented Complaint, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Redline Version of Amended and Supplemented Complaint)(Hankins, Meredith)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Robert Carlisle on behalf of All Defendants (Carlisle, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Neil David Gordon on behalf of PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN (Gordon, Neil) (Main Document 20 replaced on 10/9/2019) (zjf).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Roberta Rose James on behalf of STATE OF MARYLAND (James, Roberta)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas F. Persampieri on behalf of STATE OF VERMONT (Persampieri, Nicholas) (Main Document 18 replaced on 10/4/2019) (zjf).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Andrew Garrahan on behalf of STATE OF OREGON (Garrahan, Paul) (Main Document 17 replaced on 10/3/2019) (zjf).
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael John Fischer on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA (Fischer, Michael)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Kavita Paul Lesser on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Lesser, Kavita) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/3/2019) (znmw).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Jane Hankins on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Hankins, Meredith) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/3/2019) (znmw).
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Gavin G. McCabe on behalf of STATE OF NEW YORK (McCabe, Gavin)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Nathaniel Surdo on behalf of STATE OF MINNESOTA (Surdo, Peter)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Elaine Meckenstock on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Meckenstock, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO APA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for batching motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/24/2019. (lckbj1)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to ELAINE L. CHAO, NATIONAL HIGHWAY TRAFFIC SAFETY ADMINISTRATION, JAMES C. OWENS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zeg)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur Love on behalf of STATE OF NEW JERSEY (Love, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Edward Tavetian on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Tavetian, Gary) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/24/2019) (zjf).
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                  Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zeg)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Crystal Nelson on behalf of STATE OF WASHINGTON (Nelson, Emily)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Barclay-Strobel on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Barclay-Strobel, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Marie Herzog on behalf of COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Herzog, Megan)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by David Alexander Zonana on behalf of STATE OF CALIFORNIA (Zonana, David)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                            CIVIL COVER SHEET by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF MAINE, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF HAWAII re [1] Complaint,,, filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF MAINE, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF HAWAII. Related document: [1] Complaint,,, filed by CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF MAINE, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF OREGON, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF DELAWARE, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF MINNESOTA, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NEW YORK, STATE OF NEW JERSEY, STATE OF HAWAII, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND. (Attachments: # (1) Summons Summons- Elaine L. Chao, # (2) Summons Summons- DDC USAO, # (3) Summons Summons- NHTSA, # (4) Summons Summons- James C. Owens, # (5) Summons Summons- US AG, # (6) Summons Summons- USDOT)(Wiener, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6389538) filed by STATE OF NEW JERSEY, COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, STATE OF MAINE, CITY OF NEW YORK, STATE OF VERMONT, STATE OF COLORADO, COMMONWEALTH OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, STATE OF NEW YORK, PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF MICHIGAN, CITY OF LOS ANGELES, STATE OF ILLINOIS, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, STATE OF MINNESOTA, STATE OF NEW MEXICO, STATE OF OREGON, STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA, COMMONWEALTH OF MASSACHUSETTS, STATE OF MARYLAND, STATE OF DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, STATE OF WISCONSIN, STATE OF NEVADA, STATE OF HAWAII. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wiener, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?