A.R. v. JUUL Labs, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-06285
District Judge Mary M. Rowland, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 18, 2019 at 4:43 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A.R., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Adam Neiman +1 312 458 1000 +Ac Act Acttive dneiman@rblaw.net
v.
JUUL Labs, Inc. JUUL Labs, Inc., Defendant
Office Chicago
Filed 9/20/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $75000
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Cook
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CUMMINGS,MIDP
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 set/reset hearingsCourt Filing
    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing is set for 12/17/19 at 9:00 a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP)
      NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pj, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Complaint
        COMPLAINT filed by Arman R Rodriguez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16257601. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Neiman, David)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  case assigned
          CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey I. Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) Modified on 9/20/2019 (ng, ).
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 7 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?