ERLICHMAN v. TESLA INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-04315-PD
District Judge Paul S. Diamond, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 23, 2019 at 12:12 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANDREA ERLICHMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEPHEN D. SILVERMAN +1 267 468 7621 ssilverman@lemonlaw.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAVIN O'NEIL RICCI CEDRONE & DISIPIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space LELAND I. KELLNER +1 215 627 0303 +1 215 627 2551 lkellner@lavin-law.com
Office Philadelphia
Filed 9/9/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Montgomery
Terminated 10/22/2019
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,ARBITRATION
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 Order Dismissing Case - 41(b)
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/22/2019. 10/22/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019, Terminated: 10/22/2019 ///Stipulation of Dismissal
    STIPULATION of Dismissal and Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. P. 41 by ANDREA ERLICHMAN. (SILVERMAN, STEPHEN)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019, Terminated: 10/22/2019 Affidavit of Service
      AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon TESLA, INC. by Certified Mail on 09/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (SILVERMAN, STEPHEN) Modified on 10/10/2019 (tjd).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019, Terminated: 10/22/2019 Order
        STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 10/4/2019. 10/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Complaint
          COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE against TESLA INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 203908.), filed by ANDREA ERLICHMAN. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)
            LREF
            Blank  Summons issued
            1 Summons Issued as to TESLA INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 9/20/2019 (amas)
              LREF
              Blank  Jury Demand
              DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANDREA ERLICHMAN. (amas)
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 32 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?