Richard J. Tornetta v. Elon Musk
State Civil Lawsuit Delaware Court of Chancery, Case No. 2018-0408-JRS
Vice Chancellor Judge Joseph R. Slights III, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 18, 2019 at 1:38 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tornetta, Richard J., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Buss, Brad W, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cafepress.com, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
Officer/Director, Advance Auto Parts Inc
Officer/Director, Cavium Networks
Officer/Director, Aecom Technology Corp
Officer/Director, Ramtron International Corp
Officer/Director, TuSimple Holdings Inc.
Marvell Technology, Inc. Officer/Director, Marvell Technology, Inc.
Denholm, Robyn M. Denholm, Robyn M., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
Sun Microsystems, Inc. Officer/Director, Sun Microsystems, Inc.
Juniper Networks, Inc. Officer/Director, Juniper Networks, Inc.
Officer/Director, Echelon Corp
Ehrenpreis, Ira Matthew Ehrenpreis, Ira Matthew, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ehrenpreis, Ira"
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
No Logo Gracias, Antonio J., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Director, Tesla, Inc.
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
Jurvetson, Stephen T. Jurvetson, Stephen T., Defendant
Officially listed as "Jurvetson, Steve"
Officer/Director, Athenahealth, Inc.
Officer/Director, Draper Associates, LP
Officer/Director, Draper Associates, Inc.
Officer/Director, Draper Timothy C
Officer/Director, Fisher John H N
Officer/Director, Enernoc, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Neophotonics Corp
SolarCity Corporation Officer/Director, SolarCity Corporation
Murdoch, James R. Murdoch, James R., Defendant
Officially listed as "Murdoch, James"
News Corporation Officer/Director, News Corporation
Officer/Director, Sotheby's Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, New Newscorp LLC
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Elon"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Musk, Kimbal J. Musk, Kimbal J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Kimbal"
Officer/Director, Big Green
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc. Officer/Director, Chipotle Mexican Grill, Inc.
No Logo Rice, Linda Johnson, Defendant
Officer/Director, Bausch & Lomb, Inc.
Officer/Director, Omnicom Group Inc.
Officer/Director, Kimberly Clark Corp
Officer/Director, Dial Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Grubhub Seamless Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Officer/Director, Tesla, Inc.
Officer/Director, Enova International, Inc.
No Logo New Castle County, Sheriff, Sheriff
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Nominal Defendant
  Entries (160) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 160 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: 9/14/2021 Response
Aaron Greenspan's Response to Defendants' Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment (with Certificate of Service)
    Legal Document 159 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: 9/14/2021 Order
    Granted with Modifications (Proposed Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time)
      Legal Document 158 Filed: 9/14/2021, Entered: 9/14/2021 Letter
      Letter from Garrett B. Moritz to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III regarding non-opposition to Non-Party Aaron Greenspan's request for an extension of time to file his opposition today, September 14, 2021
        Legal Document 157 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: 9/13/2021 Response
        Defendants' Response to Aaron Greenspan's Motion for Enlargement of Time (with Certificate of Service)
          Legal Document 156 Filed: 9/13/2021, Entered: 9/13/2021 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Document
          Aaron Greenspan's Motion for Enlargement of Time (with Certificate of Service)
            Legal Document 155 Filed: 9/10/2021, Entered: 9/10/2021 Letter
            Letter from Garrett B. Moritz to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III in Response to Letter filed by Counsel for Non-Party Aaron Greenspan regarding Defendants' Motion for Confidential Treatment
              Legal Document 154 Filed: 9/9/2021, Entered: 9/9/2021 Letter
              Letter from Julia B. Klein (DE 5198) to the Honorable Joseph R. Slights III Regarding Defendants' Motion for Confidential Treatment
                Legal Document 153 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: 8/31/2021 Motion
                Defendants' Motion for Continued Confidential Treatment (with Certificate of Service)
                Blank 152 Filed: 8/17/2021, Entered: 8/17/2021 Notice of Service
                Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Confidential Expert Rebuttal Report of Brian D. Dunn; (ii) Confidential Expert Rebuttal Report of Andrew P. Restaino; (iii) Confidential Expert Rebuttal Report of Brent Goldfarb; and (iv) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                  Blank 151 Filed: 8/16/2021, Entered: 8/16/2021 Notice of Service
                  Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) the Rebuttal Report of Professor Kevin J. Murphy and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                    Legal Document 150 Filed: 8/6/2021, Entered: 8/6/2021 Order
                    Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Defendants’ Motion for Enlargement of Time)
                      Legal Document 149 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: 8/5/2021 Motion
                      Defendants’ Motion for Enlargement of Time (with Certificate of Service)
                      Legal Document 148 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: 8/4/2021 Notice
                      Plaintiff's Notice of Non-Opposition to Aaron Greenspan's Notice of Challenge to Confidential Treatment (with Certificate of Service)
                        Legal Document 147 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: 8/3/2021
                        Notice of Challenge by Aaron Greenspan to Confidential Treatment (with Certificate of Service)
                          Legal Document 146 Filed: 8/3/2021, Entered: 8/3/2021 Entry of Appearance
                          Entry of Appearance of Julia B. Klein of Klein LLC on Behalf of Aaron Greenspan (with Certificate of Service)
                            Blank 145 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: 7/23/2021 Notice of Service
                            Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Plaintiff’s Rebuttal Expert Witness Disclosure; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                              Blank 144 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: 7/23/2021
                              Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) the Individual Defendants' Rebuttal Expert Designations and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                Blank 143 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: 7/6/2021 Letter
                                Letter dated July 6, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel rescheduling oral argument on the parties' motions for summary judgment from January 13, 2022 to January 6, 2022, at 9:15 a.m., in Wilmington
                                  Blank 142 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: 6/24/2021 Notice of Service
                                  Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) the Report of Professor Kevin J. Murphy; (ii) the Expert Report of Jonathan F. Foster; (iii) the Expert Report of Paul A. Gompers; and (iv) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                    Blank 141 Filed: 6/24/2021, Entered: 6/24/2021 Notice of Service
                                    Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Opening Expert Report of Brian D. Dunn; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                      Blank 140 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: 6/21/2021 Notice of Lodging
                                      Plaintiff's Second Notice of Lodging of Deposition Transcripts (with Certificate of Service)
                                        Blank 139 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: 6/7/2021
                                        Notice of Service of (i) Individual Defendants’ Expert Designations and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                          Blank 138 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: 5/26/2021 Notice
                                          Notice of Change of Address of Andrews & Springer LLC, effective June 1, 2021 (with Certificate of Service)
                                            Blank 137 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                            Defendants’ Amended Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta on June 8, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Eastern (with Certificate of Service)
                                              Blank 136 Filed: 5/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                              Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Deposition of Defendant Ira Ehrenpreis on May 26, 2021 at 1pm Eastern (with Certificate of Service)
                                                Blank 135 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Notice of Lodging
                                                Plaintiff's Notice of Lodging of Deposition Transcripts (with Certificate of Service)
                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Objections to Discovery
                                                  Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendants’ and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.’s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Fifth Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Defendants’ and Nominal Defendant Tesla Inc.’s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Fourth Request for Production Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                    Blank 133 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
                                                    Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, with certificate of service
                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None
                                                    Granted (Carleton, Jackie L.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                      Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents)
                                                        Legal Document 130 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Official Transcript (Addl Fees Apply)
                                                        5-3-2021 Telephonic Oral Argument Re Plaintiff's Motion To Compel And The Court's Ruling
                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                          Carleton, Jackie L.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                            Letter from Gregory V. Varallo, Esq. to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III attaching [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents
                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 5/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
                                                              Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, with certificate of service
                                                              Blank 126 Filed: 5/6/2021, Entered: None
                                                              Granted (Friedman, Jeremy S.: [Proposed] Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta)
                                                                Legal Document 125 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Public Version
                                                                Public [redacted] version of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of His Motion to Compel the Production of Documents
                                                                  Blank 124 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  Friedman, Jeremy S.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                    Blank 123 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                    Defendants’ Notice of Deposition of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta on May 19, 2021 (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                      Blank 122 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Judicial Action Form
                                                                      Judicial Action Form-Telephonic Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel held 05.03.2021. VC Slights. Jeanne Cahill, Court Reporter. Motion granted in part, denied in part. See Transcript.
                                                                        Blank 121 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Exhibits
                                                                        Exhibits A – N to Plaintiff’s Reply in Support of His Motion to Compel the Production of Documents [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                          Blank 120 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Reply
                                                                          Plaintiff's Reply in Support of His Motion to Compel the Production of Documents, with certificate of service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                            Blank 119 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
                                                                            Notice of Service of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Amended Responses and Objections to Interrogatory No. 9 in Plaintiff's Fourth Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., with Certificate of Service
                                                                              Blank 118 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                              Joinder of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents, and Certificate of Service
                                                                                Blank 117 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion to Compel
                                                                                Defendants’ Response in Opposition to Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                  Blank 116 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
                                                                                  Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Verification of Elon Musk to Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Fourth Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., (ii) Verification of Steve Jurveston to Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Fourth Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                    Blank 115 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                    Granted (Meyer, Daniel E.: [Proposed] Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice as Counsel to Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta)
                                                                                      Blank 114 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                      Granted (Oster, Spencer: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta)
                                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                        Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel E. Meyer as Counsel to Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta, with certificate of service
                                                                                          Blank 112 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service
                                                                                          Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Plaintiff’s Fifth Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Plaintiff’s Fourth Request for Production Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                            Blank 111 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                            Oster, Spencer: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                              Blank 110 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Letter dated April 14, 2021, from VC Slights to counsel scheduling a telephonic argument for May 3, 2021, at 3:00 p.m. concerning Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents
                                                                                                Blank 109 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel)
                                                                                                  Blank 108 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                    Legal Document 107 Filed: 4/10/2021, Entered: None Public Version
                                                                                                    Public [redacted] version of Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel the Production of Documents, with certificate of service
                                                                                                      Legal Document 106 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Depositions of Linda Johnson Rice, Kenneth Moore, Jonathan Chang, Gabrielle Toledano, Ira Ehrenpreis, and Elon Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Notice of Service of Objections to Discovery
                                                                                                        Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendants’ and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.’s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Fourth Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Defendants’ and Nominal Defendant Tesla Inc.’s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Requests for Admission Directed to Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                          Blank 104 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Motion to Compel the Production of Documents, with certificate of service [FILED UNDER SEAL]
                                                                                                            Blank 103 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Granted (van Kwawegen, Jeroen: [Proposed] Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice as counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta)
                                                                                                              Blank 102 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Motion for Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jeroen van Kwawegen of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP as counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta, with certificate of service
                                                                                                                Blank 101 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Amended Notice of Depositions of Martin Viecha, James Murdoch, Deepak Ahuja, Robyn Denholm, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad Buss, Phuong Phillips, Kimbal Musk, Antonio Gracias, Jon Burg, Kenneth Moore, Todd Maron, Ira Ehrenpreis, and Tom Brown (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Remote Depositions)
                                                                                                                    Blank 99 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Remote Depositions
                                                                                                                      Blank 98 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Plaintiff’s First Requests for Admission Directed to Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Plaintiff’s Fourth Set of Interrogatories Directed to Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                        Blank 97 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: None Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                        Entry of Appearance of Gregory V. Varallo of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP as counsel on behalf of Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta, with certificate of service
                                                                                                                          Blank 96 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Verification of Elon Musk to Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Third Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., (ii) Verification of Steve Jurveston to Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Third Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                            Blank 95 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendants’ and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.’s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Third Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Defendants’ and Nominal Defendant Tesla Inc.’s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Third Request for Production Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                              Blank 94 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Class Certification)
                                                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Class Certification
                                                                                                                                  Blank 92 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Notice of Depositions of Phuong Phillips, Kimbal Musk, Robyn Denholm, Deepak Ahuja, Kenneth Moore, Brad Buss, Martin Viecha, James Murdoch, Antonio Gracias, Linda Johnson Rice, Ira Ehrenpreis, Jonathan Chang, Gabrielle Toledano, Todd Maron, and Elon Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                    Blank 91 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Plaintiff’s Responses and Objections to the Individual Defendants’ First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Plaintiff’s Third Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Plaintiff’s Third Request for Production Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 11/11/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Individual Defendants’ First Set of Interrogatories Directed to Plaintiff Richard J. Tornetta and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Granted (Second Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Case Schedule)
                                                                                                                                            Blank 87 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Second Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Case Schedule
                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                              Granted (Stipulation and Proposed Order Pursuant to Delaware Rule of Evidence 510, on behalf of the parties)
                                                                                                                                                Blank 85 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and Proposed Order Pursuant to Delaware Rule of Evidence 510, on behalf of the parties
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 84 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Notice and Certificate of Service of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk’s (i) Individual Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s First Set of Interrogatories; (ii) Individual Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Second Set of Interrogatories; (iii) Verifications Pursuant to 10 Del. C. § 3927; and (iv) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Notice of Service
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service to Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc's (1) Amended Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and (2) Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to all Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 82 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP (with Affidavit of Service)
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Notice of Deposition of Tom Brown of Compensia, Inc. on October 23, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. Pacific (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 80 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to PJT Partners Inc.
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Sard Verbinnen & Co., LLC, with Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Subpoena
                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Space Exploration Technologies Corp. (with Affidavit of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendants’ and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.’s Responses and Objections to Plaintiff’s Second Request for Production Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Granted (Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Case Schedule)
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Case Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Plaintiff's Second Request for Production Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendant Elon Musk's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendants Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk's Individual Responses and Objections to Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 4, 8, and 11-39 From Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Verifications Pursuant to 10 Del. C. § 3927 to Responses to Interrogatories; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service of Tesla, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Interrogatory Nos. 2, 3, 4, 8, and 11-36 from Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendants' and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Amended Responses and Objections to Interrogatory Nos. 5 and 9 From Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; (ii) Verifications Pursuant to 10 Del. C. § 3927 to Responses to Interrogatories; and (iii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Granted (Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Case Schedule)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Case Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Radford Valuation Services (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Case Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Innisfree M&A Incorporated, with Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendants' and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Interrogatory Nos. 1, 5, 6, 7, 9, 10, 11, 13 and 26 from Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation and Order Governing the Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information, approved by Vice Chancellor Slights on December 16, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing The Production and Exchange of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 61 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                PUBLIC VERSION of Director Defendants' Answer to the Verified Stockholder Class Action and Derivative Complaint (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 60 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer of Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Director Defendants' Answer to the Verified Stockholder Class Action and Derivative Complaint [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Expert Discovery)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Expert Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Semler Brossy Consulting Group, LLC (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service of Nominal Defendant's Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc., and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (Ritholtz, Jeffrey A.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Granted (Lavely, Vanessa A.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Granted (Gruenstein, Benjamin: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 51 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Granted (Slifkin, Daniel: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Granted (Chesler, Evan R.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Substitution of Counsel for Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Director Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Institutional Shareholder Services, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Withdraw Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz as Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Director Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Substitution of Counsel for Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice and Certificate of Service of (i) Defendants' Responses and Objections to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ritholtz, Jeffrey A.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Lavely, Vanessa A.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 41 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Gruenstein, Benjamin: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Slifkin, Daniel: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Chesler, Evan R.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson and Kimbal Musk (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 38 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Compensia, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum to Glass, Lewis & Co. LLC (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 36 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice and Certificate of Service to (i) Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.; and (ii) this Notice and Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice and Certificate of Service for Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents Directed to All Defendants and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Defendants' Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint and Permitting Confidential Filing of Answer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Defendants' Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Verified Complaint and Permitting Confidential Filing of Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opinion issued by Vice Chancellor Slights on September 20, 2019 on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 6/10/2019, Entered: 6/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Garrett B. Moritz to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III in Response to Plaintiff's June 4, 2019 Letter and Further Addressing Plaintiff's Submission at the Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: 6/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Peter B. Andrews in Response to Defendants' June 3, 2019 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 6/3/2019, Entered: 6/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Garrett B. Moritz to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III Addressing Plaintiff's Submission at the Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  5-9-2019 ORAL ARGUMENT RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Oral Argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss before Vice Chancellor Slights on 5.9.2019. Decision reserved. See transcript.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Granted (Yavitz, Noah B.: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson, Kimbal Musk and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 25 Filed: 5/8/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted (Savitt, William: [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson, Kimbal Musk and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 24 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Yavitz, Noah B.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson, Kimbal Musk and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Savitt, William: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson, Kimbal Musk and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Granted (Tejtel, David F.E.: [Proposed] Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Plaintiff)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Tejtel, David F.E.: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PUBLIC VERSION Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order Further Amending Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Garrett B. Moritz to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III enclosing courtesy copies of Defendants' Opening Brief in Further Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: 12/14/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and [Proposed] Scheduling Order Further Amending Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated November 27, 2018 from VC Slights to counsel scheduling oral argument on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for May 9, 2019, at 9:15 a.m., in Dover
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              [PUBLIC VERSION] Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to The Honorable Joseph R. Slights III from Craig J. Springer enclosing courtesy copies of Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: 11/1/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [CONFIDENTIAL FILING]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: 9/7/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PUBLIC VERSION Defendants' Opening Brief in support of their Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: 8/30/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Granted ([Proposed] Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Confidential Treatment [Defendant's Opening Brief in Support of their Motion to Dismiss the Verified Stockholder Class Action and Derivative Complaint, along with certain exhibits and supporting papers accompanying the Opening Brief, may be filed as confidential filings and any related Answering and Reply Briefs (along with their exhibits and supporting papers) may also be filed as confidential filings])
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: 8/29/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for Confidential Treatment filed on behalf of Defendants (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: 8/27/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order Governing Defendants' Deadlines to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: 8/24/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation and [Proposed] Amended Scheduling Order Governing Defendants' Deadlines to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Granted (Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Defendants' Deadlines to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Governing Defendants' Deadlines to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: 6/29/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Entry of Appearance of David E. Ross, Garrett B. Moritz and Benjamin Z. Grossberg of Ross Aronstam & Moritz LLP on behalf of Defendants Elon Musk, Robyn M. Denholm, Antonio J. Gracias, James Murdoch, Linda Johnson Rice, Brad W. Buss, Ira Ehrenpreis, Steve Jurvetson, Kimbal Musk, and Nominal Defendant Tesla, Inc. (with Certificate of Service)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: 6/7/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PUBLIC Version of Verified Stockholder Class Action And Derivative Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: 6/5/2018
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Verified Stockholder Class Action and Derivative Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duties (CONFIDENTIAL FILING)

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 1,933 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?