Nabong v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19035815

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Nabong , Sylvia, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cowie, Paul, Attorney
No Logo Vecchi, Jill, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None ?
Order for Consolidation Filed (5 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None ?
    Order Order of Case Management Number One Filed (3 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None ?
      Tentative Case Management Order (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None ?
          Notice of Related Case(s) Filed (4 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 24 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Conf Continuance 01/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 19
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                  Joint Case Management Statement Filed (10 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                    Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed (4 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                      Case Management Conf Continuance 12/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 19 (1 Page)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                        Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 23 date: 12/10/2019 time: 03:00 PM
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Granted (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None ?
                              Application Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Filed for Tesla, Inc. , Tesla Motors, Inc. (9 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                                Notice of Related Case(s) Filed (4 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  Order re Case Management Filed (6 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                    Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      Motion Granted (3 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc. (10 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Case Management Conference 12/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 23 (2 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Complex Determination Hearing 11/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 23
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      Complaint - Other Employment Filed (30 Pages)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        Complex Designation Requested
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Sylvia Nabong (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 114 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?