IN RE: Juul Labs, Inc., Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, Case No. MDL No. 2913

Tags
Last Updated September 25, 2019 at 2:19 AM DT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Liaison Counsel for Plaintiff(s), Plaintiff
v.
JUUL Labs, Inc. JUUL Labs, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liaison Counsel for Defendants"
Litigation Type Products Liability
MDL Status Pending
Staff Attorney Ninomiya
Next CTO Number 1
Date Received
Date Ordered
Citation
# Actions
# XYZ
# Districts
# 1407 Transfers
Transferee District/Judge N/A
Master Docket Number N/A
Flag SET_FOR_HEARING
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument
NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (8 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, [23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Brendan Radke on behalf of Defendants Pax Labs, Inc., PAX LABS, INC., Pax Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX Labs, Inc., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., Pax Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., PAX Labs Inc (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/3:19-cv-05813, CAN/4:19-cv-05733, FLM/6:19-cv-01671, ILS/3:19-cv-00903, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905, INS/1:19-cv-03543, LAE/2:19-cv-12628, NJ/2:19-cv-16915, NJ/2:19-cv-17904, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, NJ/3:19-cv-17005, NYS/7:19-cv-08301, OHS/1:19-cv-00773 (Radke, Brendan)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX Labs Inc, PAX Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/3:19-cv-05813, CAN/4:19-cv-05733, FLM/6:19-cv-01671, ILS/3:19-cv-00903, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905, INS/1:19-cv-03543, LAE/2:19-cv-12628, NJ/2:19-cv-16915, NJ/2:19-cv-17904, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, NJ/3:19-cv-17005, NYS/7:19-cv-08301, OHS/1:19-cv-00773 (Radke, Brendan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of appearance
      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Brendan Radke on behalf of Defendants Pax Labs, Inc., PAX LABS, INC., Pax Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., Pax Labs, Inc., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., PAX Labs, Inc., PAX LABS, INC., PAX LABS, INC., Pax Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., PAX Labs Inc (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/3:19-cv-05813, CAN/4:19-cv-05733, FLM/6:19-cv-01671, ILS/3:19-cv-00903, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905, INS/1:19-cv-03543, LAE/2:19-cv-12628, NJ/2:19-cv-16915, NJ/2:19-cv-17904, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, NJ/3:19-cv-17005, NYS/7:19-cv-08301, OHS/1:19-cv-00773 (Radke, Brendan)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice Of Related Action
        NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 2 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Seth R. Lesser, Counsel for: Gaspare Valentino and Nicholas Moore -- ) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B) (Lesser, Seth)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Cade Beauparlant. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, MA/1:19-cv-11755 (Gottlieb, Mark)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Response Interested Party
            INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff Cade Beauparlant (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, MA/1:19-cv-11755 (Gottlieb, Mark)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Withdrawal of Filing
              WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. ([88] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Interested Parties Cade Beauparlant, Cade Beauparlant FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ILN/1:19-cv-05557 (Gottlieb, Mark)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Withdrawal of Filing
                WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. [129] FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. (Klafter, Jeffrey)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                  NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 2 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Seth R. Lesser, Counsel for: Gaspere Valentino and Nicholas Moore -- New Jersey District Court (3:19-cv-18159), New York Western District Court (6:19-cv-06706) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B) (Klafter, Jeffrey)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of Major Deficiency
                    NOTICE OF MAJOR DEFICIENCY -- (re: pldg. (6 in CAN/3:19-cv-05224, [127] in MDL No. 2913) ) The referenced pleading has been found DEFICIENT. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/24/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALM/3:19-cv-00656, ALN/5:19-cv-01313, ALN/7:19-cv-00779, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/3:19-cv-04424, CAN/3:19-cv-05174, CAN/3:19-cv-05224, CAN/3:19-cv-05813, CAN/3:19-cv-05838, CAN/4:19-cv-05286, CAN/4:19-cv-05733, CT/3:19-cv-01443, FLM/6:19-cv-01671, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, FLS/0:19-cv-62347, ILN/1:19-cv-05557, ILN/1:19-cv-05664, ILN/1:19-cv-06277, ILS/3:19-cv-00903, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905, INS/1:19-cv-03543, KS/2:19-cv-02564, LAE/2:19-cv-12628, LAM/3:19-cv-00600, MA/1:19-cv-11755, MA/3:19-cv-11967, MOE/4:19-cv-02446, MOW/2:19-cv-04172, MOW/4:19-cv-00674, MSN/3:19-cv-00180, NJ/1:19-cv-17826, NJ/2:19-cv-16915, NJ/2:19-cv-17904, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, NJ/3:19-cv-17005, NYS/7:18-cv-05758, NYS/7:19-cv-08301, OHS/1:19-cv-00773, WIE/2:19-cv-01372, WVS/2:19-cv-00591 (TLL)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                      INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs G. S., Sarah Shepherd (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05224 (Abrams, Rachel) Modified on 9/24/2019 (TLL).(EDITED EVENT TYPE)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of Major Deficiency
                        NOTICE OF MAJOR DEFICIENCY -- (re: pldg. (2 in FLS/0:19-cv-62347, 2 in ILN/1:19-cv-06277, [120] in MDL No. 2913, 2 in WIE/2:19-cv-01372), ([124] in MDL No. 2913, 3 in NJ/1:19-cv-17826), ([123] in MDL No. 2913, 2 in NJ/1:19-cv-17826) ) The referenced pleading has been found DEFICIENT. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 9/24/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALM/3:19-cv-00656, ALN/5:19-cv-01313, ALN/7:19-cv-00779, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/3:19-cv-04424, CAN/3:19-cv-05174, CAN/3:19-cv-05224, CAN/3:19-cv-05813, CAN/3:19-cv-05838, CAN/4:19-cv-05286, CAN/4:19-cv-05733, CT/3:19-cv-01443, FLM/6:19-cv-01671, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, FLS/0:19-cv-62347, ILN/1:19-cv-05557, ILN/1:19-cv-05664, ILN/1:19-cv-06277, ILS/3:19-cv-00903, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905, INS/1:19-cv-03543, KS/2:19-cv-02564, LAE/2:19-cv-12628, LAM/3:19-cv-00600, MA/1:19-cv-11755, MA/3:19-cv-11967, MOE/4:19-cv-02446, MOW/2:19-cv-04172, MOW/4:19-cv-00674, MSN/3:19-cv-00180, NJ/1:19-cv-17826, NJ/2:19-cv-16915, NJ/2:19-cv-17904, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, NJ/3:19-cv-17005, NYS/7:18-cv-05758, NYS/7:19-cv-08301, OHS/1:19-cv-00773, WIE/2:19-cv-01372, WVS/2:19-cv-00591 (TLL)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Sabita J. Soneji on behalf of Plaintiffs Tyler Krauel, Savannah Smith (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05838 (Soneji, Sabita)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Response Interested Party
                            INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff J.G. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Schedule of Actions, # (3) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/1:19-cv-17826 (Galpern, Michael)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                              NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913), ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Michael A. Galpern on behalf of Plaintiff J.G. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/1:19-cv-17826 (Galpern, Michael) ADDED MDL LINK Modified on 9/24/2019 (RH).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Michael A. Galpern on behalf of Plaintiff J.G. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/1:19-cv-17826 (Galpern, Michael)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.([115] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Erin K Dickinson on behalf of Plaintiffs Kyle Ardelean, Kadin Bowling, Sirenidy Perez, Tiffany Marie Teubert, Justin Bower, Ryan Kohler, Charlie McNamara, Bryce Moore, Cora Johnson, Joshua Kelley, Jasmine Rosenblatt (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Parties Represented, # (2) Schedule of Actions, # (3) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLS/0:19-cv-62347, ILN/1:19-cv-06277, WIE/2:19-cv-01372 (Dickinson, Erin) Modified on 9/23/2019 (TLL).(EDITED EVENT TYPE)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Response Interested Party
                                    INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Kyle Ardelean, Kadin Bowling, Carter Matthew Bumbalough, Sirenidy Perez, Tiffany Marie Teubert, Justin Bower, Ryan Kohler, Charlie McNamara, Bryce Moore, Cora Johnson, Joshua Kelley, Jasmine Rosenblatt (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Judicial Caseload, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLS/0:19-cv-62347, ILN/1:19-cv-06277, WIE/2:19-cv-01372 (Dickinson, Erin)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                      NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (3 in LAE/2:19-cv-12628, [111] in MDL No. 2913), ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by James R Dugan, II on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Douglas D'Amico (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, LAE/2:19-cv-12628 (Dugan, James) ADDED MDL LINK Modified on 9/23/2019 (RH).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019 Notice of appearance
                                        SEE CORRECTED PLDG. [121] IN MDL NO. 2913NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([115] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Erin K Dickinson on behalf of Plaintiffs Kyle Ardelean, Kadin Bowling, Carter Matthew Bumbalough, Sirenidy Perez, Tiffany Marie Teubert, Justin Bower, Ryan Kohler, Charlie McNamara, Bryce Moore, Cora Johnson, Joshua Kelley, Jasmine Rosenblatt (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Parties Represented, # (2) Schedule of Actions, # (3) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLS/0:19-cv-62347, ILN/1:19-cv-06277, WIE/2:19-cv-01372 (Dickinson, Erin) Modified on 9/23/2019 (TLL).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                          NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913), ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Suzanne C. Jones on behalf of Defendants Circle K Stores, Inc, Christa Dennard (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Agument) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527 (Jones, Suzanne) EDITED EVENT TITLE AND ADDED MDL LINK Modified on 9/23/2019 (RH).
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([112] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Plaintiffs Tyler Krauel, Savannah Smith -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05838 (Soneji, Sabita)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 3 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Erin K. Dickinson, Counsel for: Plaintiffs Cora Johnson, Jasmine Rosenblatt, Joshua Kelley, Ryan Kohler, Justin Bower, Charlie McNamara, Bryce Moore, Carter Matthew Bumbalough, Kadin Bowling, Kyle Ardelean, Sirenidy Perez, Tiffany Marie Teubert -- Wisconsin Eastern District Court (2:19-cv-01372), Illinois Northern District Court (1:19-cv-06277), Florida Southern District Court (0:19-cv-62347) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Complaint FLSD 0:19-62347, # (4) Complaint ILND 1:19-06277, # (5) Complaint WIED 2:19-01372) (Dickinson, Erin)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([113] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Derek W Loeser on behalf of Plaintiffs Christine Langlois, Andrea Saldana, Lisa Yore (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, MA/3:19-cv-11967 (Loeser, Derek)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Derek W. Loeser, Counsel for: Plaintiffs Christine Langlois on behalf of her minor child, E.L.; Lisa Yore, on behalf of her minor child, B.Y.; Andrea Saldana, on behalf of her minor children, La.S. and Le.S. -- Massachusetts District Court (3:19-cv-11967) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Complaint D Mass 3:19-11967) (Loeser, Derek)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Sabita J. Soneji, Counsel for: Plaintiffs Savannah Smith & Tyler Krauel -- California Northern District Court (3:19-cv-05838) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Complaint 3:19-cv-05838) (Soneji, Sabita)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                      INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff Frank Douglas D'Amico (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service, # (2) Schedule of Actions, # (3) Oral Argument Statement) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, LAE/2:19-cv-12628 (Dugan, James)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([105] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by James R Dugan, II on behalf of Plaintiff Frank Douglas D'Amico (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, LAE/2:19-cv-12628 (Dugan, James)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                          NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (2 in CAN/3:19-cv-05813, [108] in MDL No. 2913), ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Mark P. Robinson, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Conor Corkery, Tom Haddad, Thomas Joseph, William Kirk (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05813 (Robinson, Mark)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                            INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Conor Corkery, Tom Haddad, Thomas Joseph, William Kirk (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05813 (Robinson, Mark)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([105] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Plaintiff Frank Douglas D'Amico -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, LAE/2:19-cv-12628 (Dugan, James)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([103] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Mark P. Robinson, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Conor Corkery, Tom Haddad, Thomas Joseph, William Kirk (Attachments: # (1) Other Attachment A Additional Parties Represented, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05813 (Robinson, Mark)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney James R. Dugan, II, Counsel for: Plaintiff Frank D. D'Amico -- Louisiana Eastern District Court (2:19-cv-12628) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Complaint LAE-2:19-12628) (Dugan, James)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. (7 in ILS/3:19-cv-00904, 7 in ILS/3:19-cv-00905, [101] in MDL No. 2913), (8 in ILS/3:19-cv-00904, 8 in ILS/3:19-cv-00905, [102] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Plaintiffs Austin Sidlo, Darran Tempel -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905 (Hoerman, Tor)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                      NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Mark P. Robinson, Jr., Counsel for: Plaintiffs Conor Corkery, Tom Haddad, Thomas Joseph and William Kirk -- California Northern District Court (3:19-cv-05813) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Complaint Complaint - CAND 3:19-cv-05813) (Robinson, Mark)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                                        INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Austin Sidlo, Darran Tempel (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905 (Hoerman, Tor)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Tor A. Hoerman on behalf of Plaintiffs Austin Sidlo, Darran Tempel (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905 (Hoerman, Tor)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                                            INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Robert McCulloch, Isaac Gant (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CT/3:19-cv-01443, KS/2:19-cv-02564 (Kraft, Kristine) Modified on 9/18/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENTS)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([98] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Kristine K. Kraft on behalf of Plaintiff Isaac Gant (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, KS/2:19-cv-02564 (Kraft, Kristine) Modified on 9/17/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Kristine K. Kraft, Counsel for: Plaintiff Isaac Gant -- Kansas District Court (2:19-cv-02564) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Complaint KS 19-cv-02564) (Kraft, Kristine) Modified on 9/17/2019 (TLL).(PARTY TYPE ADDED)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([96] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Kristine K. Kraft on behalf of Plaintiff Robert McCulloch (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CT/3:19-cv-01443 (Kraft, Kristine) Modified on 9/17/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENTS)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Kristine K. Kraft, Counsel for: Plaintiff Robert McCulloch -- Connecticut District Court (3:19-cv-01443) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Complaint CT 19-cv-01443) (Kraft, Kristine) Modified on 9/17/2019 (TLL).(PARTY TYPE ADDED) Modified on 9/17/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENTS) (Attachment 3 replaced on 9/18/2019) (TLL).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([84] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Scott A. Powell on behalf of Plaintiff A. H. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/3:19-cv-00656 (Powell, Scott)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 3 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Austin Schwing, Counsel for: Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. -- New York Southern District Court (7:19-cv-08301), New Jersey District Court (1:19-cv-17826), Ohio Southern District Court (1:19-cv-00773) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C) (Schwing, Austin) (Attachment 4 replaced on 9/17/2019) (TLL). Modified on 9/17/2019 (TLL).(PARTY TYPE ADDED)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                                                          INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs MORGAN COLELLA, Sebastian Oberhauser (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05733, NJ/2:19-cv-17904 (Longer, Fred)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([89] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Fred S Longer on behalf of Plaintiffs MORGAN COLELLA, Sebastian Oberhauser (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05733, NJ/2:19-cv-17904 (Longer, Fred)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([89] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Plaintiff Sebastian Oberhauser -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05733 (Longer, Fred)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Errata
                                                                                                ERRATA - to ([89] in MDL No. 2913) - Filed by Plaintiff Sebastian Oberhauser (Attachments: # (1) Errata) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05733 (Longer, Fred)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 9/16/2019, Entered: 9/16/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 2 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Frederick S Longer, Counsel for: Plaintiff Morgan Colella, Plaintiff Sebastian Oberhauser -- New Jersey District Court (2:19-cv-17904), California Northern District Court (4:19-cv-05733) (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service, # (2) Exhibit Complaint DNJ 2:19-cv-17904, # (3) Exhibit Complaint NDCA 4:19-cv-05733) (Longer, Fred) Modified on 9/16/2019 (TLL).(MODIFIED OFFICE NUMBER)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                                                                    INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Cade Beauparlant, Matthew Murphy, Marianne Savage (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service, # (2) Other Corp disclosure) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, MA/1:19-cv-11755 (Gottlieb, Mark) Modified on 9/16/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Mark A. Gottlieb on behalf of Plaintiffs Cade Beauparlant, Matthew Murphy, Marianne Savage (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, MA/1:19-cv-11755 (Gottlieb, Mark) Modified on 9/16/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENTS)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([78] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Roger C. Denton on behalf of Plaintiffs Tyler Cobb, Jordan Heitmann (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, MOE/4:19-cv-02446 (Denton, Roger) Modified on 9/13/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENTS)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Notice of Related Action (From District Court)
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION (FROM DISTRICT COURT - LAM) -- 1 Action(s) -- JPML has identified the following action(s) for potential inclusion in the proposed MDL: Louisiana Middle District Court (3:19-cv-00600) (Attachments: # (1) Complaint LAM 3:19-00600) (TLL)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Scott A. Powell, Counsel for: Plaintiff A.H., by and through his mother and next friend, Kelly Hamby -- Alabama Middle District Court (3:19-cv-00656) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Complaint) (Powell, Scott)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ([81] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Plaintiff Samuel Pippen -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/6:19-cv-01671 (McWilliams, Neil)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                                                                                INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff Samuel Pippen (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/6:19-cv-01671 (McWilliams, Neil)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp for Samuel Pippen. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/6:19-cv-01671 (McWilliams, Neil)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([43] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Neil E McWilliams, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Samuel Pippen (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/6:19-cv-01671 (McWilliams, Neil)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([78] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Plaintiffs Tyler Cobb, Jordan Heitmann -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, MOE/4:19-cv-02446 (Denton, Roger)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019 Notice of Potential Tag-Along
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Roger C. Denton, counsel for: Plaintiffs Tyler Cobb and Jordan Heitmanns -- Missouri Eastern District Court (4:19-cv-02446) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Action, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Docket Sheet, # (4) Complaint) (Denton, Roger) Modified on 9/12/2019 (TLL).(EDITED EVENT TYPE/PARTY NAMES ADDED)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([72] in MDL No. 2913, 8 in NJ/2:19-cv-16915) Filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW DIVELLO -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/2:19-cv-16915 (Lanier, Kathryn) Modified on 9/11/2019 (TLL).(MDL LINK ADDED)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([71] in MDL No. 2913, 7 in NJ/2:19-cv-16915) Filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW DIVELLO -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/2:19-cv-16915 (Lanier, Kathryn) Modified on 9/11/2019 (TLL).(MDL LINK ADDED)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([70] in MDL No. 2913, 6 in NJ/2:19-cv-16915) Filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW DIVELLO -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/2:19-cv-16915 (Lanier, Kathryn) Modified on 9/11/2019 (TLL).(MDL LINK ADDED)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([63] in MDL No. 2913, [73] in MDL No. 2913, 9 in NJ/3:19-cv-17005) Filed by Plaintiff T.K. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-17005 (London, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2019 (TLL).(MODIFIED EVENT TYPE)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ([63] in MDL No. 2913, 9 in NJ/3:19-cv-17005) Filed by Plaintiff T.K. -- (London, Michael)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Kathryn Rachel Lanier on behalf of Plaintiff MATTHEW DIVELLO (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/2:19-cv-16915 (Lanier, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                                                                                                      INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff MATTHEW DIVELLO (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/2:19-cv-16915 (Lanier, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Kathryn Rachel Lanier on behalf of Plaintiff MATTHEW DIVELLO (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/2:19-cv-16915 (Lanier, Kathryn)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (16 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 8 in CAN/4:19-cv-04424, 16 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 16 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by John C. Massaro on behalf of Defendants Altria Group, Inc., Phillip Morris USA Inc, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALN/5:19-cv-01313, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/6:19-cv-01671, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, ILN/1:19-cv-05664, ILS/3:19-cv-00903, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905, MOW/2:19-cv-04172, MSN/3:19-cv-00180, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, WVS/2:19-cv-00591 (Massaro, John) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES NAMES Modified on 9/10/2019 (RH).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (8 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, [23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by John A. Yanchunis on behalf of Plaintiff Sabrina Zampa (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-02466 (Yanchunis, John)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (8 in ALM/2:19-cv-00505, 16 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 8 in CAN/3:18-cv-02499, 7 in CAN/3:18-cv-06776, 7 in CAN/3:18-cv-06808, 8 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, 8 in CAN/4:19-cv-04424, 16 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 16 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [23] in MDL No. 2913, 8 in NYS/7:18-cv-05758) Filed by Adam Gutride on behalf of Plaintiffs Hasnat Ahmad, Liliana Andrade, L. B., Adam Banner, Tommy Benham, B. C., D. C., M. C., Q. C., Bradley Colgate, Lisa Commitante, C. D., D. D., J. D., Jillian Furey, S. G., M. H., Jennifer Hellman, Austin Hester, Virginia Jose Angullo, Edgar Kalenkevich, David Kugler, Tracie Kugler, Kacie Ann Lagun, David Langan, Jonathan Mardis, David Masessa, Kaytlin McKnight, Ron Minas, Jill Nelson, D. O., Jack Roberts, Amber Royce, D. S., K. S., Anthony Smith, Corey Smith, Laura Staller, A. R. T., T. B. T., W. T., A. U., O. V., Michael Viscomi, S. W., Barbara Yannucci Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913 et al. (Gutride, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913), ([23] in MDL No. 2913), (9 in NJ/3:19-cv-17005) Filed by Michael A. London on behalf of Plaintiffs T.K. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-17005 (London, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (8 in ALM/2:19-cv-00505, 16 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, [23] in MDL No. 2913), ([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Andy D. Birchfield, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Savannah West, Hallie Helms, Brian Bentley Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALN/5:19-cv-01313 (Birchfield, Andy)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Stephen Cady on behalf of Plaintiff Anastasia Quercia Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ILN/1:19-cv-05664 (Cady, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                      INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff T.K. (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Exhibit) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-17005 (London, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED LIAISON COUNSEL)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Michael A. London on behalf of Plaintiff T.K. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-17005 (London, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED LIAISON COUNSEL)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (4 in CAN/3:19-cv-05174, [52] in MDL No. 2913), ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Elizabeth Joan Cabraser on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Beatriz-Alegre (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05174 (Cabraser, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (8 in ALM/2:19-cv-00505, 16 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 8 in CAN/3:18-cv-02499, 7 in CAN/3:18-cv-06776, 7 in CAN/3:18-cv-06808, 8 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, 8 in CAN/4:19-cv-04424, 16 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 16 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [23] in MDL No. 2913, 8 in NYS/7:18-cv-05758), ([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Austin Schwing on behalf of Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913 et al. (Schwing, Austin) DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES Modified on 9/10/2019 (RH).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (7 in CAN/4:19-cv-05286), ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Richard A Freese on behalf of Plaintiff Noah Vermillion Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05286 (Freese, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Response Interested Party
                                                                                                                                                                INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff Noah Vermillion Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05286 (Freese, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: 9/9/2019 Notice of Presentation of Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PRESENTATION OF ORAL ARGUMENT re: pldg. (16 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 16 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548), ([23] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Scott P. Schlesinger on behalf of Plaintiffs Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith, Craig Shapiro, Julie Shapiro (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Schlesinger, Scott) ADDED MDL LINK Modified on 9/10/2019 (RH).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.(4 in CAN/3:19-cv-05174, [52] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Sarah R London on behalf of Plaintiff Maria Beatriz-Alegre (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05174 (London, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. ([54] in MDL No. 2913), ([53] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Plaintiff Noah Vermillion -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05286 (Freese, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913), ([40] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Richard A Freese on behalf of Plaintiff Noah Vermillion Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05286 (Freese, Richard) Modified on 9/6/2019 (TLL).
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg.([49] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Richard A Freese on behalf of Plaintiff Noah Vermillion Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05286 (Freese, Richard) Modified on 9/6/2019 (TLL).(EDITED EVENT TYPE)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                            INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff Maria Beatriz-Alegre (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-05174 (London, Sarah) Modified on 9/5/2019 (TLL).(EDITED EVENT TYPE)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Withdrawal of Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              WITHDRAWAL OF FILING re: pldg. ([46] in MDL No. 2913, 2 in NJ/3:19-cv-17005), ([47] in MDL No. 2913, 5 in NJ/3:19-cv-17005), (3 in NJ/3:19-cv-17005) Filed by Plaintiff T.K. FILING WITHDRAWN FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON: Other. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-17005 (London, Michael) Modified on 9/4/2019 (TLL).(ADDED MDL LINK)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: 9/3/2019 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                FILED IN ERRORLETTER re: pldg. ([47] in MDL No. 2913), ([46] in MDL No. 2913) Signed by Michael A. London on behalf of Plaintiff T.K.. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-17005 (London, Michael) Modified on 9/4/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY TYPE) Modified on 9/4/2019 (TLL).
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. [54] in MDL No. 2913)NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913), ([40] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Richard A Freese on behalf of Plaintiff Noah Vermillion (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/4:19-cv-05286 (Freese, Richard) Modified on 9/6/2019 (TLL).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldgs. ([39] in MDL No. 2913), (1 in ILN/1:19-cv-05664), (3 in NJ/3:19-cv-16631) Filed by Plaintiffs Cade Beauparlant, Matthew Murphy, Marianne Savage, Austin Sidlo, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, D.P., J. Y., Barbara Yannucci, P. O., Samuel Pippen, G. S., Sarah Shepherd, Hasnat Ahmad, Liliana Andrade, L. B., Adam Banner, Tommy Benham, B. C., D. C., M. C., Q. C., Bradley Colgate, Lisa Commitante, C. D., D. D., J. D., Jillian Furey, S. G., M. H., Jennifer Hellman, Austin Hester, Virginia Jose Angullo, Edgar Kalenkevich, David Kugler, Tracie Kugler, Kacie Ann Lagun, David Langan, Jonathan Mardis, David Masessa, Kaytlin McKnight, Ron Minas, Jill Nelson, D. O., Jack Roberts, Amber Royce, D. S., K. S., Anthony Smith, Corey Smith, Laura Staller, A. R. T., T. B. T., W. T., A. U., O. V., Michael Viscomi, S. W., Barbara Yannucci -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913 et al. (Gutride, Adam) Modified on 8/30/2019 (dld). ADDED MDL LINK
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                      PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. [51] in MDL No. 2913)RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff T.K. (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-17005 (London, Michael) Modified on 9/4/2019 (TLL). Modified on 9/4/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY TYPE)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                        PLEADING WITHDRAWN (re: pldg. [51] in MDL No. 2913)NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Michael A. London on behalf of Plaintiff T.K. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-17005 (London, Michael) Modified on 9/4/2019 (TLL). Modified on 9/4/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTY TYPE)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: 8/28/2019 Minute Order Closing Briefing (New Litigation)
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER CLOSING BRIEFING re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) Briefing in this matter is now closed. The parties to actions on the motion(s) remain under a duty, pursuant to Panel Rules 6.1(f) and 6.2(d), to notify the Clerk of the Panel promptly of potential tag-along actions, as well as any development that moots the motion or fully disposes of any action on the motion. Parties in any potential tag-along action may file an Interested Party response, but must do so promptly, and in any event, no later than the Thursday prior to the hearing session at which the motion for transfer is to be heard by the Panel.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 8/28/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913 et al. (dld)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION FOR TRANSFER re: pldg. (9 in ALM/2:19-cv-00505, 18 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 9 in CAN/3:18-cv-02499, 8 in CAN/3:18-cv-06776, 8 in CAN/3:18-cv-06808, 10 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, 10 in CAN/4:19-cv-04424, 18 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 18 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [31] in MDL No. 2913, 9 in NYS/7:18-cv-05758), (11 in ALM/2:19-cv-00505, 20 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, [36] in MDL No. 2913), (10 in ALM/2:19-cv-00505, 19 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 10 in CAN/3:18-cv-02499, 9 in CAN/3:18-cv-06776, 9 in CAN/3:18-cv-06808, 11 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, 11 in CAN/4:19-cv-04424, 19 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 19 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [32] in MDL No. 2913, 10 in NYS/7:18-cv-05758), (17 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 9 in CAN/4:19-cv-04424, 17 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 17 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [29] in MDL No. 2913), (9 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, [30] in MDL No. 2913), (20 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 20 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [34] in MDL No. 2913), ([42] in MDL No. 2913), ([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Defendants Juul Labs, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., JUUL Labs Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc, Juul Labs, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., JUUL Labs, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (Schwing, Austin)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 6 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Austin Schwing, Counsel for: Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. -- Indiana Southern District Court (1:19-cv-03543), New Jersey District Court (3:19-cv-17005), California Northern District Court (3:19-cv-05224), Missouri Western District Court (4:19-cv-00674,2:19-cv-04172), Florida Middle District Court (6:19-cv-01671) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F) (Schwing, Austin) (Attachment 8 replaced on 8/28/2019) (SM). Modified on 9/13/2019 (TLL).(PARTY TYPE ADDED)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                INTERESTED PARTY RESPONSE -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff Anastasia Quercia Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ILN/1:19-cv-05664 (Cady, Stephen) Modified on 9/12/2019 (SM). EDITED EVENT TYPE
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([38] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Stephen Cady on behalf of Plaintiff Anastasia Quercia Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ILN/1:19-cv-05664 (Cady, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Richard A. Freese, Counsel for: Plaintiff Noah Vermillion -- California Northern District Court (4:19-cv-05286) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Complaint, # (3) Proof of Service) (Freese, Richard) Modified on 8/28/2019 (SM).EDITED CASE NUMBER
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/26/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019 Supplemental Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- re: pldg(s). (10 in ALM/2:19-cv-00505, 19 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 3 in ALN/5:19-cv-01313, 10 in CAN/3:18-cv-02499, 9 in CAN/3:18-cv-06776, 9 in CAN/3:18-cv-06808, 11 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, 11 in CAN/4:19-cv-04424, 19 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 19 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, 2 in ILN/1:19-cv-05557, 3 in MA/1:19-cv-11755, [32] in MDL No. 2913, 3 in MSN/3:19-cv-00180, 3 in NJ/3:19-cv-16631, 3 in NJ/3:19-cv-16659, 10 in NYS/7:18-cv-05758, 3 in WVS/2:19-cv-00591) -- Filed by Plaintiffs J. Y., Barbara Yannucci, Hasnat Ahmad, Liliana Andrade, L. B., Adam Banner, Tommy Benham, B. C., D. C., M. C., Q. C., Bradley Colgate, Lisa Commitante, C. D., D. D., J. D., Jillian Furey, S. G., M. H., Jennifer Hellman, Austin Hester, Virginia Jose Angullo, Edgar Kalenkevich, David Kugler, Tracie Kugler, Kacie Ann Lagun, David Langan, Jonathan Mardis, David Masessa, Kaytlin McKnight, Ron Minas, Jill Nelson, D. O., Jack Roberts, Amber Royce, D. S., K. S., Anthony Smith, Corey Smith, Laura Staller, A. R. T., T. B. T., W. T., A. U., O. V., Michael Viscomi, S. W., Barbara Yannucci. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALN/5:19-cv-01313, ALN/7:19-cv-00779, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/3:19-cv-05174, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, ILN/1:19-cv-05557, ILN/1:19-cv-05664, ILS/3:19-cv-00903, ILS/3:19-cv-00904, ILS/3:19-cv-00905, MA/1:19-cv-11755, MSN/3:19-cv-00180, NJ/2:19-cv-16915, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, NYS/7:18-cv-05758, WVS/2:19-cv-00591 (Gutride, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Stephen Cady, Counsel for: Plaintiff Anastasia Quercia -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:19-cv-05664) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Complaint ILND 1:19-cv-05664) (Cady, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Supplemental Information
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION -- re: pldg(s). ([26] in MDL No. 2913) -- Filed by Plaintiff Christian Foss. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Order Granting Dismissal) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ILN/1:19-cv-05557 (Cady, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Savannah West, Hallie Helms (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527 (Birchfield, Andy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 4 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Austin Schwing, Counsel for: Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. -- Illinois Southern District Court (3:19-cv-00903,3:19-cv-00904,3:19-cv-00905), New Jersey District Court (2:19-cv-16915) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D) (Schwing, Austin) Modified on 8/22/2019 (TLL).(PARTY TYPE ADDED)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Response to Motion to TransferCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith, Craig Shapiro, Julie Shapiro (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Memorandum Opinion by Judge Grimm, May 15, 2019 in the FDA Action, # (2) Exhibit 2 - JUUL's Notice of Intent to Intervene, # (3) Exhibit 3 - JUUL's Counsel's Notice of Appearance, # (4) Exhibit 4 - JUUL Amicus Brief in the FDA Action, # (5) Exhibit 5 - FDA Ltr. to JUUL April 24, 2018, # (6) Exhibit 6 - FDA Ltr. to JUUL Feb. 6, 2019, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Senator Durbin Ltr. to JUUL Apr. 8, 2019) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Schlesinger, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Notice of Potential Tag-Along
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Sarah R. London, counsel for: Plaintiff -- California Northern District Court (3:19-cv-05174) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Complaint CAN 3:19-cv-05174, # (3) Proof of Service) (London, Sarah) Modified on 8/22/2019 (TLL).(EDITED EVENT TYPE) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/22/2019) (TLL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE IN SUPPORT WITH INTRESTED PARTIES -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiffs Cade Beauparlant, Matthew Murphy, Marianne Savage, Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs, D.P., Christian Foss, J. Y., Liliana Andrade, L. B., Adam Banner, Tommy Benham, B. C., D. C., M. C., Q. C., Bradley Colgate, Lisa Commitante, C. D., D. D., J. D., Jillian Furey, S. G., M. H., Jennifer Hellman, Austin Hester, Virginia Jose Angullo, Edgar Kalenkevich, David Kugler, Tracie Kugler, Kacie Ann Lagun, David Langan, Jonathan Mardis, David Masessa, Kaytlin McKnight, Ron Minas, Jill Nelson, D. O., Jack Roberts, Amber Royce, D. S., K. S., Anthony Smith, Corey Smith, Laura Staller, A. R. T., T. B. T., W. T., A. U., O. V., Michael Viscomi, S. W., Barbara Yannucci (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A - Transcript, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALN/5:19-cv-01313, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, ILN/1:19-cv-05557, MA/1:19-cv-11755, MSN/3:19-cv-00180, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, NYS/7:18-cv-05758, WVS/2:19-cv-00591 (Gutride, Adam) Modified on 9/12/2019 (SM). EDITED EVENT TYPE
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff Hasnat Ahmad (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Sidlo - S.D. Ill., # (2) Exhibit B - Tempel - S.D. Ill., # (3) Exhibit C - Kocourek - S.D. Ill.) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALN/5:19-cv-01313, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, ILN/1:19-cv-05557, MA/1:19-cv-11755, MSN/3:19-cv-00180, NJ/3:19-cv-16631, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, NYS/7:18-cv-05758, WVS/2:19-cv-00591 (Zimmerman, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Plaintiff Sabrina Zampa (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-02466 (Yanchunis, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Response to Motion to Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE IN SUPPORT -- (re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) ) Filed by Defendants Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Divello v. Juul Labs - Complaint (D.N.J.), # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Beatriz-Alegre v. Juul -Complaint (N.D. Calif.), # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Foss v. Juul et al. (N.D. Ill.), # (4) Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Kocourek v. Juul, Altria, PM USA - Complaint (S.D. Ill.), # (5) Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Tempel v. Juul, Altria, PM USA - Complaint (S.D. Ill.), # (6) Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Sidlo v. Juul, Altria, PM USA - Complaint (S.D. Ill.), # (7) Exhibit Exhibit 7 - M.D. v. Juul, Altria, PM (N.D. Miss.), # (8) Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Murphy et al. v. Juul (D. Mass.), # (9) Exhibit Exhibit 9 - P.O. v. JUUL et al complaint (D. N.J.), # (10) Exhibit Exhibit 10 - R.E. v. Juul et al (SDWV), # (11) Exhibit Exhibit 11 - S.R. v. Juul Labs - Complaint, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Bentley Complaint - Fed Ct Exh, # (13) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Massaro, John) Modified on 8/21/2019 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: 8/20/2019 Certificate of Service (Amended)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ([25] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALN/5:19-cv-01313, MA/1:19-cv-11755, MSN/3:19-cv-00180, NJ/3:19-cv-16659, WVS/2:19-cv-00591 (Schwing, Austin) Modified on 8/20/2019 (TLL).(DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([24] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Domenic B. Sanginiti on behalf of Plaintiff P. O. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NJ/3:19-cv-16631 (Sanginiti, Domenic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Stephen Cady, Counsel for: Plaintiff Christian Foss -- Illinois Northern District Court (1:19-cv-05557) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Complaint ILND 1:19-cv-05557) (Cady, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: 8/16/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 5 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Austin Schwing, Counsel for: Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. -- New Jersey District Court (3:19-cv-16659), West Virginia Southern District Court (2:19-cv-00591), Alabama Northern District Court (5:19-cv-01313), Massachusetts District Court (1:19-cv-11755), Mississippi Northern District Court (3:19-cv-00180) (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service, # (3) Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E) (Schwing, Austin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: 8/16/2019 Notice Of Related Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED ACTION -- 1 Action(s) -- Filed by attorney Domenic B. Sanginiti, Jr., Counsel for: Plaintiff P.O. -- New Jersey District Court (3:19-cv-16631) (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service, # (2) Complaint NJ 19-16631) (Sanginiti, Domenic) (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/19/2019) (TLL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Hearing OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      HEARING ORDER re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) - SECTION A (DESIGNATED FOR ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 9/26/2019 in Los Angeles, California. Notices of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument due on or before 9/9/2019.Notice of Presentation or Waiver of Oral Argument form (JPML form 9) can be downloaded from our website.Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 8/15/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Courthouse Advisory) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (RH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Amended)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913, 10 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 11 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 11 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [15] in MDL No. 2913) Identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Philip Morris USA Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Massaro, John) Modified on 8/15/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Amended)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913, 9 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 10 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 10 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [14] in MDL No. 2913) Identifying Corporate Parent No. Parent Corp. for Altria Group Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Massaro, John) Modified on 8/15/2019 (TLL).(NO PARENT CORP. ADDED)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (CORRECTED) re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by John C. Massaro on behalf of Defendants Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Massaro, John) Modified on 8/15/2019 (TLL).(REMOVED DUPLICATE PARTIES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Suzanne C. Jones on behalf of Defendants Circle K Stores, Inc, Christa Dennard (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527 (Jones, Suzanne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc. Corporate Parent Circle K Delaware Inc. Corporate Parent Couche-Tard US Inc. for Circle K Stores, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527 (Jones, Suzanne) Modified on 8/14/2019 (TLL).(ADDED CORPORATE PARENT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re: pldg. (7 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 7 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [11] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Plaintiffs Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith, Craig Shapiro, Julie Shapiro -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Schlesinger, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Jason Louis Solotaroff on behalf of Plaintiff D.P. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (Solotaroff, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEE CORRECTED PLEADING [22] IN MDL NO. 2913CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Philip Morris USA Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Massaro, John) Modified on 8/15/2019 (TLL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEE CORRECTED PLEADING [21] IN MDL NO. 2913CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Altria Group, Inc., Altria Group, Inc., Altria Group, Inc.. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Massaro, John) Modified on 8/15/2019 (TLL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEE CORRECTED APPEARANCE PLDG. [20] IN MDL NO. 2913 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by John C. Massaro on behalf of Defendants Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc., Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA Inc. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Massaro, John) Modified on 8/15/2019 (TLL). Modified on 8/15/2019 (TLL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) -- Identifying No Parent Corp. for Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith, Craig Shapiro, Julie Shapiro (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit to Corporate Disclosure Statement) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Schlesinger, Scott) Modified on 8/14/2019 (TLL).(NO PARENT CORP. ADDED)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Scott P. Schlesinger on behalf of Plaintiffs Erin Nessmith, Jared Nessmith, Craig Shapiro, Julie Shapiro (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit List "A", # (2) Exhibit List "B") Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548 (Schlesinger, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Andy D. Birchfield, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs Savannah West, Hallie Helms (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527 (Birchfield, Andy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Adam Gutride on behalf of Plaintiffs Hasnat Ahmad, Liliana Andrade, L. B., Adam Banner, Tommy Benham, B. C., D. C., M. C., Q. C., Bradley Colgate, Lisa Commitante, C. D., D. D., J. D., Jillian Furey, S. G., M. H., Jennifer Hellman, Austin Hester, Virginia Jose Angullo, Edgar Kalenkevich, David Kugler, Tracie Kugler, Kacie Ann Lagun, David Langan, Jonathan Mardis, David Masessa, Ron Minas, Jill Nelson, D. O., Jack Roberts, Amber Royce, D. S., K. S., Anthony Smith, Corey Smith, Laura Staller, A. R. T., T. B. T., W. T., A. U., O. V., Michael Viscomi, S. W., Barbara Yannucci (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (Gutride, Adam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by John A. Yanchunis on behalf of Plaintiff Sabrina Zampa (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:19-cv-02466 (Yanchunis, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/7/2019, Entered: 8/7/2019 Errata
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ERRATA - to (4 in ALM/2:19-cv-00505, 4 in ALM/2:19-cv-00527, 5 in CAN/3:18-cv-02499, 4 in CAN/3:18-cv-06776, 4 in CAN/3:18-cv-06808, 4 in CAN/3:19-cv-02466, 2 in CAN/4:19-cv-04424, 4 in FLM/8:19-cv-00884, 4 in FLS/0:19-cv-61548, [6] in MDL No. 2913, 4 in NYS/7:18-cv-05758) - Filed by Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALN/7:19-cv-00779, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (Schwing, Austin) Modified on 8/7/2019 (TLL).(DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) -- Identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc. for JUUL Labs Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (Schwing, Austin) Modified on 8/7/2019 (TLL).(DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Austin Schwing on behalf of Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Schedule of Actions, # (2) Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, CAN/4:19-cv-04424, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (Schwing, Austin) Modified on 8/7/2019 (TLL).(DELETED DUPLICATE PARTIES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.([1] in MDL No. 2913) Filed by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Hasnat Ahmad Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, CAN/3:18-cv-02499 (Zimmerman, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 Notice of Filing and Publication of Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ([1] in MDL No. 2913) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 8/13/2019. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 8/13/2019. Responses due on or before 8/20/2019. Reply, if any, due on or before 8/27/2019. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/30/2019. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2913, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALN/7:19-cv-00779, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (TLL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/30/2019, Entered: 7/30/2019 MDL Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MDL Number 2913 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ([1] in Pending No. 46) Associated Cases: Pending No. 46, ALM/2:19-cv-00505, ALM/2:19-cv-00527, ALN/7:19-cv-00779, CAN/3:18-cv-02499, CAN/3:18-cv-06776, CAN/3:18-cv-06808, CAN/3:19-cv-02466, FLM/8:19-cv-00884, FLS/0:19-cv-61548, NYS/7:18-cv-05758 (TLL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: 7/29/2019 Motion to Transfer - Initial Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION TO TRANSFER (INITIAL MOTION) with Brief in Support. -- 10 Action(s) -- from Alabama Northern District Court (7:19-cv-00779), Alabama Middle District Court (2:19-cv-00505,2:19-cv-00527), California Northern District Court (3:18-cv-02499,3:18-cv-06776,3:18-cv-06808,3:19-cv-02466), Florida Middle District Court (8:19-cv-00884), Florida Southern District Court (0:19-cv-61548), New York Southern District Court (7:18-cv-05758) - Suggested Transferee Court: N.D. California - Filed by: Defendant JUUL Labs, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Brief IN SUPPORT OF JUUL LABS, INC.S MOTION TO TRANSFER RELATED CASES FOR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO 28 USC ยง 1407, # (2) Exhibit A - HARRISMARTIN AGENDA, # (3) Exhibit B - WEBINAR, # (4) Schedule of Actions, # (5) Oral Argument Statement, # (6) Proof of Service, # (7) Complaint AL 7:19-cv-00779, # (8) Complaint AL 2:19-cv-505, # (9) Complaint AL 2:19-cv-527, # (10) Complaint CA 3:18-cv-2499, # (11) Complaint CA 3:18-cv-06776, # (12) Complaint CA 3:18-cv-0680, # (13) Complaint CA 3:19-cv-02466, # (14) Complaint FL 8:19-cv-00884, # (15) Complaint FL 0:19-cv-61548, # (16) Complaint NY 7:18-cv-05758)(Schwing, Austin) Modified on 7/30/2019 (TLL).(PARTY TYPE ADDED)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?