BELANI v. TESLA, INC.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-18151-CCC-MF
Magistrate Judge Claire C. Cecchi, presiding

Tags
Last Updated March 17, 2020 at 5:15 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DEEPAK BELANI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by timothyabeel.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy J. Abeel, Jr. +1 484 800 8432 +1 484 840 8896 tim@timothyabeel.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAVIN O'NEIL RICCI CEDRONE & DISIPIO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Wozny +1 215 627 0303 +1 215 627 2551 mwozny@lavin-law.com
Office Newark
Filed 9/20/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Middlesex
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case L-005787-19[Superior Court of New Jersey, Middlesex County]
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Order of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal (aty)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Letter
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty)
          Corporate Disclosure Statement by TESLA, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(WOZNY, MICHAEL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 notice of removal
            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TESLA, INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Middlesex County, case number L-005787-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9977277), filed by TESLA, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Certificate of Service, # (3) Exhibit A)(WOZNY, MICHAEL)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
              Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, )
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 53 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?