Betterncourt, Francis et al vs. Tesla Motors MA et al
State Civil Lawsuit Norfolk County Superior Court, Case No. 1982CV01004

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Betterncourt, Francis, Plaintiff
No Logo Betterncourt, Jacqueline, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Tesla Motors MA, Inc. Tesla Motors MA, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors MA"
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 4/2/2021, Entered: None
Docket Note: Per Attorney Netburn, he agreed that the Plffs will have until April 20,2021 to serve their opposition to Defts motion for summary judgment
    Legal Document 24 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
    Rule 9A list of documents filed. (rec'd 3/29/21)
      Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
      Rule 9A notice of filing (rec'd 3/29/21)
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
        Affidavit of compliance with Superior Court Rule 9A (rec'd 3/29/21) Applies To: Netburn, Esq., Peter Craig (Attorney) on behalf of Tesla Inc, Tesla Motors MA (Defendant)
          Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
          Statement of Undisputed Facts (rec'd 3/29/21)
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
            Affidavit of Kendra Williams in support of Tesla's Motion for summary judgment (rec'd 3/29/21)
              Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
              Tesla Motors MA, Tesla Inc's Memorandum in support of its Motion for summary judgment (rec'd 3/29/21)
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
                Defendants Tesla Motors MA, Tesla Inc's Motion for summary judgment, MRCP 56 (9C attached) (rec'd 3/29/21)
                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
                  Attorney appearance On this date Peter Craig Netburn, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Tesla Inc
                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None
                    Attorney appearance On this date Peter Craig Netburn, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Tesla Motors MA
                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: Sent for status review, if notice is not received by 4/30/2021, the complaint and all remaining claims will be dismissed. Judge: Cannone, Hon. Beverly J
                        Blank 14 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None
                        Summons, returned SERVED in hand to Ross DePina (Records) on August 7, 2019 by Process Server (Rec'd 11/1/2019) Applies To: Tesla Inc (Defendant)
                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Court Filing
                          One Trial case reviewed by Clerk, case to remain in the Superior Court. Judge: Hickey, Mary K
                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019
                            Attorney appearance On this date Brian James OConnor, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Tesla Inc
                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019
                              Attorney appearance On this date Brian James OConnor, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Defendant Tesla Motors MA
                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019
                                Received from Defendants Tesla Motors MA and Tesla Inc: Answer with claim for trial by jury; (rec'd 8/29/19)
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                  Notice of 93A complaint sent to Attorney General
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                    Endorsement on Motion to appoint special process server (#3.0): ALLOWED (Miller, J)
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                      Francis Betterncourt, Jacqueline Betterncourt's MOTION for appointment of Special Process Server. Constable Services Inc of Cambridge, MA
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                        Demand for jury trial entered.
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                          Civil action cover sheet filed.
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                            Original civil complaint filed.
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                              Case assigned to: DCM Track A - Average was added on 08/06/2019 (sent to attorney)
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                                Attorney appearance On this date Michael F Bettencourt, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Jacqueline Betterncourt
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019
                                                  Attorney appearance On this date Michael F Bettencourt, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Francis Betterncourt

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 164 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?