Bhalla v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19036959

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bhalla, Neeraj, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kaufman, Scott, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered (2 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 11 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
      Compliance Hearing 07/28/2020 03:00 PM D- 517
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
          Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None ?
            Hearing Vacated: Initial Case Management Conference 02/11/2020 03:00 PM D- 517
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None ?
              Compliance Hearing 05/26/2020 03:00 PM D- 517 (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385) (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                  Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None ?
                    Initial Case Management Conference 02/11/2020 03:00 PM D- 517 (2 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                      Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Neeraj Bhalla (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (7 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 29 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?