Iridium Development Inc. v. Residence 72 LLC
State Civil Lawsuit Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County, Case No. 653117/2017

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Iridium Development Inc., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Residence 72 LLC, Defendant
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI): Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018
    ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: 9/25/2018
      NOTICE OF REFERRAL TO ADR
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018
        RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: 9/24/2018
          PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018
            AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE: OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: 3/1/2018
              NOTICE OF PENDENCY *Corrected*
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017
                AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: 9/18/2017
                  ANSWER: AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: 8/14/2017
                    ANSWER: CORRECTED ANSWER
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: 8/11/2017
                      ANSWER: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS OF RESIDENCE 72 LLC
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017
                        STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: 6/15/2017
                          AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/7/2017, Entered: 6/7/2017
                            SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 15 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?