Yeganeh v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19037433

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Yeganeh, Anamercedes, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc."
No Logo Obolsky, Arthur J., Attorney
No Logo Tanner, Bradley M., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 45 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None ?
Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: None ?
    Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Statement of Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Statement of Anamercedes Yeganeh Filed (7 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
          Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted (3 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Taken Under Submission (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 38 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 12/04/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 36 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Hearing Reset to Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) 08/06/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted (5 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (4 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Case Management Statement of Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Case Management Statement of Anamercedes Yeganeh Filed (7 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 24 (1 Page)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 30 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Hearing Reset to Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) 07/16/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Granted (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Julia Spain Filed for Anamercedes Yeganeh - Proof of Service (4 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 26 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Court File Transfer to Hayward Hall of Justice
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/16/2020 02:00 PM D- 520 (1 Page)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Hearing Reset to Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) 07/16/2020 02:00 PM D- 520 (1 Page)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 07/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 16 (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/14/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 04/14/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Hearing Reset to Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) 04/01/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Petition to Compel Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Defendant's Petition to Compel Arbitration Fil (10 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Case Management Conf Continuance 03/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Case Management Statement of Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Case Management Statement of Anamercedes Yeganeh Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 03/17/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Filed for Defendant (40 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla Motors, Inc. Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                  Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (3 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Initial Case Management Conference 02/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 16 (2 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Anamercedes Yeganeh (2 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?