Robinson v. De Niro et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-09156

Tags
Last Updated April 23, 2021 at 4:11 PM DT (1.8 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Graham Chase Robinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sanford Heisler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy Heisler +1 646 402 5650 +1 646 402 5651 jheisler@sanfordheisler.com
v.
No Logo Canal Productions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Robert De Niro, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/3/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $12000000000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Leave to File Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Letter
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Conference
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Proposed Protective Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Request for Waiver of Service
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert De Niro and Canal Productions, Inc., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Graham Chase Robinson. (Heisler, Jeremy)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Heisler, Jeremy)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Canal Productions, Inc., Robert De Niro. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17707806)Document filed by Graham Chase Robinson.(Heisler, Jeremy)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 57 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?