Libby Reams et al v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV355119

Tags
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 8:47 PM ST (2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo McCarthy, Stacey, Plaintiff
No Logo Reams, Libby, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson, Robert W.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thompson, Robert W. +1 650 513 6111
No Logo Speckman, Jon, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren O. Miller
Case Type Product Liability Unlimited (24)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Separate Statement
Pltfs' Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents
    Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Declaration
    Declaration of Donald H. Slavik in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel
      Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None notice of motion
        Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
        ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF STACEY MCCARTHY atty Ramia
          Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Answer/Response (No Fee)
          ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF LIBBY REAMS atty Ramia
            Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Declaration
            Declaration of Donald H. Slavik in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel
              Legal Document 57 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Separate Statement
              Pltfs' Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                Legal Document 56 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POSCourt Filing
                on Plt's Motion for Leave to File FAC is GRANTED by Judge Barrett
                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                  Case Management Statement
                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                    Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Damages
                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                      There was never a Motion to Compel Set in either case numbers
                        Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                        Further Responses from Tesla Re: Requests for Production 3-30-21 9am dept.19
                          Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                          ENV#5493550 / Exhibits: Caption/cover page required
                            Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                            Declaration of Donald H. Slavik in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel
                              Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Separate Statement
                              Plt's Separate Statement in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                FAC
                                  Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Order
                                    Nunc Pro Tunc Order Correcting Typographical Error in Order Re: Motion to Consolidate
                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Motion-Leave
                                        to File FAC. Hearing 12/15/2020, Atty Thompson
                                          Legal Document 43 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                          Case Management Statement
                                            Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                              Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection LetterCourt Filing
                                              DO NOT USE THIS ORDER per Judge Barrett
                                                Legal Document 40 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Order: Submitted MatterCourt Filing
                                                on Motion to Consolidate w/ Case 19cv358560 is GRANTED by Judge Barrett
                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                  re Protective Order
                                                    Legal Document 38 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                      Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Disassociation Of Counsel
                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Response/Reply
                                                        IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE WITH SANTA CLARA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT CASE NO 19CV358560 FOR ALL PURPOSE
                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                          RE: Motion for Leave - $60 filing fee required.
                                                            Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                            Opposition
                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                              Declaration
                                                                Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Objections
                                                                Plaintiffs Oppositions to Defendants Motion to Consolidate
                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                                                  Declaration of RWT in Support of Plaintiffs Oppsition to Defendants Motion to Consolidate
                                                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                    #04657190 Proposed Order- There is no Motion for Leave on Calendar for this case. If this is for a past motion, the hearings do not reflect that. If this is for a future motion, please do not submit til after the hearing.
                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                                                      re: amended motion to consolidate, atty Galvin, 8/11/2020 9am D21
                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Motion-Consolidate
                                                                        w/ Case 19cv358560; Hrg 8/11/20, 9AM. D21; Atty Miller
                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Motion-Consolidate
                                                                          **Filed into the wrong case by clerks office; Should be filed in related case 19cv358560; Duplicate motion filed in related case**
                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service-Mail
                                                                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                              Reams Case Management Statement
                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                Case Management Statement
                                                                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
                                                                                  New Firm Name Dentons Bingham Greenebaum LLP (Pro Hac Vice Attys Patrick A. Elward and Jessica L. Meek)
                                                                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Notice-Related Cases
                                                                                    19CV358560
                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                                                                                        ENV#3823391 / Advanced Jury Fee: Previously paid for on 10/21/19.
                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                          case MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                                                                                            Libby Reams v. Tesla, Inc. Case Management Statement
                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Minute Order
                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                  of Non-Opposition to Pro Hac Vice Application and Declaration of Robert W. Thompson
                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                    $150 ADVANCE JURY FEE DEPOSITED FOR: DEF (ATTY: Miller)
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                      To complaint; atty: Miller
                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal
                                                                                                        RE: Jessica Laurin Meek Pro Hac Vice // ATTY THOMPSON, 12-10-19, 9AM, D2
                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                          Hrg 12/10/19 - of Robert W. Thompson in Support of Application
                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                            Hrg 12/10/19 - in Support of App. for Admission of J. Meek Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                              Hrg 12/10/19 - of Jessica Laurin Meek in Support of Application
                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal
                                                                                                                RE: Admission of Patrick A Elward Pro Hac Vice // ATTY THOMPSON, 12-10-19, 9AM, D2
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                                                                                                  Hrg 12/10/19 - in Support of App. for Admission of P. Elward Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                    Hrg 12/10/19 - of Robert W, Thompson in Support of Application
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                      Hrg 12/10/19 - of Patrick A Elward in Support of Application
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                                                                                                              $150 PAID

                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?