Himstreet v. Cook, et al. (Apple Inc.)
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV355213

Tags
Last Updated October 5, 2021 at 2:22 AM EDT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo HILL, STEVEN, Plaintiff
No Logo HIMSTREET, TIM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Mehdi Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Azra Z. Mehdi +1 415 293 8093 +1 415 293 8001 azram@themehdifirm.com
v.
No Logo Bell, James A., Defendant
Officer/Director, Cavanaughs Hospitality Corp
Officer/Director, GSC Holdings Corp.
Officer/Director, CDW Corp
Officer/Director, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Apple, Inc. Officer/Director, Apple, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dow Holdings Inc.
Officer/Director, BOEING CO
Officer/Director, Dow Chemical Co /de/
Officer/Director, VH Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, DowDuPont Inc.
No Logo Cook, Timothy D., Defendant
Apple, Inc. Officer/Director, Apple, Inc.
Nike, Inc. Officer/Director, Nike, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James N Kramer +1 415 778 4700

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melinda Haag +1 628 432 5110 +1 202 204 7383 mhaag@paulweiss.com
Space Alexander K Talarides +1 415 773 5700 +1 415 773 5759 atalarides@orrick.com
No Logo Federighi, Craig, Defendant
Officer/Director, Ariba Inc.
Apple, Inc. Officer/Director, Apple, Inc.
No Logo Gore, Albert A., Defendant
Officially listed as "GORE, ALBERT"
Apple, Inc. Officer/Director, Apple, Inc.
No Logo IGER, ROBERT A, Defendant
No Logo Jung, Andrea, Defendant
Avon Products, Inc. Officer/Director, Avon Products, Inc.
General Electric Company Officer/Director, General Electric Company
Apple, Inc. Officer/Director, Apple, Inc.
Wayfair Inc. Officer/Director, Wayfair Inc.
No Logo Levinson, Arthur D., Defendant
Google, Inc. Officer/Director, Google, Inc.
Apple, Inc. Officer/Director, Apple, Inc.
Genentech, Inc. Officer/Director, Genentech, Inc.
No Logo MAESTRI, LUCA, Defendant
No Logo SUGAR, RONALD D, Defendant
No Logo WAGNER, SUSAN L, Defendant
Apple, Inc. Apple, Inc., Nominal Defendant
No Logo Superior Court of California, Notice

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Superior Court of CA, County of Santa Clara +1 831 454 2400
Case Type Securities Litigation Unlimited (28)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Notice
CMC reset from 11/18/21 to 2/17/22
    Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Order
    Order Granting PHV Application Daniella Quitt HRG 1/28/21 - signed/SRK.
      Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
        Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Notice
        CMC reset from 1/28/21 to 11/18/21
          Legal Document 36 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
          Stipulation & Order Extending Stay of Action - signed/SRK.
            Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: None Notice
            Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Melinda Haag
              Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: None Notice: Appearance
                Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Application-Pro Hac Vice
                DANIELLA QUITT HRG 1/28/21
                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Declaration
                  DECLARATION OF ROBERT V. PRONGAY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF STEVEN HILL???S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DANIELLA QUITT
                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Notice
                    [HRG 1/28/21] PLAINTIFF STEVEN HILL'S NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION AND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DANIELLA QUITT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES THEREON
                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                      PROOF OF SERVICE
                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Order
                          Order on Motion to Seal HRG 12/17/20 - signed/SRK.
                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Notice
                            CMC reset from 11/19/20 to 1/28/21
                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                              Stipulation & Order Consolidating Cases and Continuing CMC - signed/SRK.
                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Non-Opposition
                                Response to Motion to Seal
                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: None Notice-Related Cases
                                  20CV369387
                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                    Proof of Service by Electronic Mail
                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                                      Declaration of Alexander K. Talarides in support of Nominal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Seal Portions of Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint
                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Memorandum Points & Authorities
                                        Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Nominal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Seal Portions of Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint
                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/27/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing (no fee)
                                          Nominal Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Seal Portions of Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint HRG 12/17/20
                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                            CMC reset from 11/13/20 to 11/19/20
                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                              REDACTED
                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None (FILED UNDER SEAL)
                                                Complaint - ORDER TO SEAL ISSUED 12/17/20.
                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 8/13/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                  Stipulation & Order Extending Stay of Action - signed/BCW
                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                    Continuing CMC from 7/17/20 to 11/13/20 - signed/BCW
                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                      Extending Stay of Action and Continuing CMC - signed/BCW
                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Notice
                                                        CMC reset from 4/17/20 to 7/17/20
                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                          Order & Notice of Reassignment to D1, the Hon. Brian C. Walsh presiding; CMC reset to 4/17/20 at 10am in D1 - signed/BCW
                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Civil Lawsuit Notice
                                                            1st CMC set for 1/10/20 at 10am in D5; assigned to Hon. Thomas E. Kuhnle for all purposes
                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Order: Deeming Case Complex
                                                              Order Deeming Case Complex and Staying Discovery and Responsive Pleading Deadline - signed/TEK
                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                Staying Action - signed/TEK
                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/1/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                  CMC reset from 1/10/20 to 4/17/20
                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                    Notice of Appearance of Melinda Haag
                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                      Notice of Appearance of James N. Kramer
                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                        Notice of Appearance of Alexander K. Talarides
                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
                                                                          Proof of Service
                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                            Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                                                              Complaint
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                                                                Summons

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?