ASKELADDEN L.L.C. v. N5 Technologies, LLC

Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2017-00083
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 10:31 PM EDT (5.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo ASKELADDEN L.L.C., Petitioner
v.
No Logo N5 Technologies, LLC, Patent Owner
Attributes
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 4/24/2017
Related Patent Application Number 10782224
Related Patent Number 7197297
Status Final Written Decision
Timeline
  Entries (63) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Final Decision
Final Written Decision
LREF
Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Hearing Transcript
Hearing Transcript
LREF
Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: None Notice
Petitioner's Updated Mandatory Notices
LREF
Legal Document 1017 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
Petitioner's Demonstrative Exhibits
LREF
Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
Petitioner's Updated Exhibit List
LREF
Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Notice
Petitioner's Notice of Demonstrative Exhibits
LREF
Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/2/2018, Entered: None reply
Petitioner's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Exclude Evidence
LREF
Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/26/2017, Entered: None Opposition
Patent Owner's Opposition to Motion to Exclude Evidence
LREF
Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Order
ORDER Trial Hearing 37 C.F.R. sec 42.70
LREF
Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
Petitioner's Request for Oral Argument
LREF
Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Motion
Petitioner's Motion to Exclude Evidence
LREF
Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
Patent Owner's Request for Oral Argument
LREF
Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None reply
Petitioner's Reply to Patent Owner's Response
LREF
Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Objection
Petitioner's Objections to Patent Owner's Evidence
LREF
Legal Document 2015 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20080295159
LREF
Legal Document 2014 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20070143230
LREF
Legal Document 2013 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20070027775
LREF
Legal Document 2012 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20060031368
LREF
Legal Document 2011 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20060020799
LREF
Legal Document 2010 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20060005033
LREF
Legal Document 2009 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20060002556
LREF
Legal Document 2008 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20050283444
LREF
Legal Document 2007 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20050135294
LREF
Legal Document 2006 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20050086535
LREF
Legal Document 2005 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20040224667
LREF
Legal Document 2004 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20040209677
LREF
Legal Document 2003 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
US20030236981
LREF
Legal Document 2002 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
Zatkovich Deposition Transcript
LREF
Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
Patent Owner's Exhibit List
LREF
Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None Response
Patent Owner's Response To Petition For Inter Parties Review Of Claims 1-11 Of U.S. Pat. No. 7,197,297
LREF
Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/22/2017, Entered: None other
Stipulation of Extension of Time to File Patent Owner's Response
LREF
Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
N5 Technologies, LLC's Amended Mandatory Notices
LREF
Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/21/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
N5 Technologies, LLC's Amended Power of Attorney
LREF
Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Order
Decision - Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Brian S. Seal - 37 CFR 42.10
LREF
Legal Document 2001 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
Declaration Of Brian S. Seal In Support Of Patent Owner's Unopposed Motion For Pro Hac Admission Pursuant To 37 C.F.R. ¿¿ 42.10(c)
LREF
Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
Patent Owner's Exhibit List
LREF
Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None other
Patent Owner's Unopposed Motion For Pro Hac Vice Admission Pursuant To 37 C.F.R. ¿¿ 42.10(c)
LREF
Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
Patent Owner's Amended Notice Of Deposition Of Ivan Zatkovich
LREF
Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
Patent Owner's Notice Of Deposition Of Ivan Zatkovich
LREF
Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Order
Scheduling Order
LREF
Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Institution Decision
Trial Instituted Document
LREF
Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/28/2017, Entered: None Response
Patent Owner Preliminary Response
LREF
Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
N5 Technologies, LLC Power Of Attorney
LREF
Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
N5 Technologies, LLC Mandatory Notices Pursuant TO 37 C.F.R. 42.8(a)(2)
LREF
Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/28/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
Notice of Accord Filing Date
LREF
Legal Document 1016 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
Multimedia Messaging Service
LREF
Legal Document 1015 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
MMS-Building on the success of SMS
LREF
Legal Document 1014 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
Active Directory Services Interface
LREF
Legal Document 1013 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
RFC2251-Lightweight Directory Access Protocolv3
LREF
Legal Document 1012 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
ETSI TS 100 901 V7_4_0
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 1011 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
MEMORANDUM OPINION re Order issued on August-16-2013
LREF
Legal Document 1010 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
US 5719918 Serbetciouglu
LREF
Legal Document 1009 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
US6813507 Gress
LREF
Legal Document 1008 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
US20030065738 Yang
LREF
Legal Document 1007 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
Herman Chung-Hwa Rao et al.
LREF
Legal Document 1006 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
US6907408 Angel
LREF
Legal Document 1005 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
US20020086706 Chen
LREF
Legal Document 1004 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
10782224 File History
LREF
Legal Document 1003 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
CV Ivan Zatkovich - Fin bnk 16
LREF
Legal Document 1002 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
Declaration of Zatkovich
LREF
Legal Document 1001 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
US 7197297
LREF
Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
Power of Attorney
LREF
Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None petition
PETITION FOR INTER PARTES REVIEW
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 0 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?