Ooma, Inc. v. Deep Green Wireless LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2017-01541

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 10:37 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ooma, Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Deep Green Wireless LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 12/18/2017
Related Patent Application Number 10962388
Related Patent Number RE42714
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 44 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of appeal
Notice of Appeal
    LREF
    Legal Document 43 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of appeal
    PATENT OWNER'S NOTICE OF APPEAL
      LREF
      Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Termination Decision Document
      Termination Decision Document
        LREF
        Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Hearing Transcript
        Hearing Transcript
          LREF
          Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Objection
          PATENT OWNER'S OBJECTIONS TO PETITIONER'S DEMONSTRATIVE EXHIBITS
            LREF
            Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Order
            ORDER Trial Hearing 37 C.F.R. § 42.70
              LREF
              Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None reply
              PATENT OWNER'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO EXCLUDE
                LREF
                Legal Document 37 Filed: 7/23/2018, Entered: None Opposition
                Petitioner's Response to Motion to Exclude
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Motion
                  PATENT OWNER'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 35 Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                    PATENT OWNER'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                      Request for Oral Argument
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Notice
                        Petitioner's Response to Patent Owner's Identification of Arguments Allegedly Exceeding the Proper Scope of Reply
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Notice
                          PATENT OWNER'S IDENTIFICATION OF ARGUMENTS EXCEEDING THE PROPER SCOPE OF REPLY UNDER 37 C.F.R. 42.23
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3002 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Exhibit 3002
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 31 Filed: 6/25/2018, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                              Conduct of the Proceeding 37 C.F.R. § 42.5
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1014 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Depostion of Zavadsky
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1013 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Reply Declaration of Bims
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None reply
                                    Petitioners Reply
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None response
                                      PATENT OWNER'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Granting Joint Motion to Limit the Petition
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 3001 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Exhibit 3001
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                            Joint Notice of Agreement
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                              Joint Motion to Limit
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                Conduct of the Proceeding 37 C.F.R. sec. 42.5
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                  Joint Notice of Stipulation
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                    Order Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                      Update Notice of Deposition of Zavadsky
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                        Notice of Deposition of Zavadsky
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                          PATENT OWNER'S UPDATED MANDATORY NOTICES
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                            Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                              Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                Petitioner's Objections to Evidence
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2006 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  EX 2006 - Excerpts from RFC793, TCP (Sept 1981)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 2005 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    EX 2005 Excerpts from NEWTONS 13th Ed. 1998
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2004 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Ex 2004 - DECLARATION OF DR. VYACHESLAV ZAVADSKY
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2003 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        EX 2003 2-15-18 - Bims - Deposition Transcript
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                          PATENT OWNER¿¿¿S RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR INTER PARTES REVIEW OF U.S. PATENT NO. RE42,714
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                            NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF HARRY BIMS UNDER 37 C.F.R. 42.53
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                                              Order - re Petitioner's Request for Authorization to File Motion to Submit Supplemental Information
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1012 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Ex 1012 - Decl of Jonathan Froemel
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1011 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Ex 1011 - Decl of Jeffrey Morgan
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                    Motion for App Pro Hac Vice - Froemel
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                      Motion for App Pro Hac Vice - Morgan
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                        Petitioner's Objections to Evidence
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Scheduling Order
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Order - Pro Hac Vice Admission of Charles Wizenfeld
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                              Trial Instituted Document
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/19/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                                PATENT OWNER'S PRELIMINARY RESPONSE TO PETITION FOR INTER PARTES REVIEW OF U.S. PATENT NO. RE42,714
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/24/2017, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                  MOTION FOR CHARLES WIZENFELD TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PATENT OWNER DEEP GREEN WIRELESS LLC
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 2002 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Wizenfeld Biography
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 2001 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      DECLARATION OF CHARLES WIZENFELD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
                                                                                                        PATENT OWNER'S MANDATORY NOTICES PURSUANT TO 37 C.F.R. 42.8
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                          PATENT OWNER'S POWER OF ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO 37 C.F.R. 42.10(B)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                            Notice of Accord Filing Date
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1010 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                              Summons
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1009 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Declaration of Dr. Harry V. Bims - BIMS
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1008 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                  EP0785637A2 - Arai
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1007 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                    EP0789470A2 - IBM
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1006 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                      US 6452923 - Gerszberg (AT&T)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1005 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                        US 6721306 - Farris
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1004 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                          US 6600734 - Gernert
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1003 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Patent Owner's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions in Deep Green Wireless LLC v. Ooma, Inc.
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1002 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                              File Wrapper of US RE42714 and Relatives
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1001 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                US Patent No. RE42714
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                  POA
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                    Petition for IPR of US RE42714
                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?