RPX Corporation v. IYM Technologies LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2017-01888

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 10:39 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RPX Corporation, Petitioner
v.
No Logo Iym Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2800
Institution Decision Date 3/8/2018
Related Patent Application Number 10907814
Related Patent Number 7448012
Status Final Written Decision
  Entries (89) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 36 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of appeal
PATENT OWNER'S NOTICE OF APPEAL
    LREF
    Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/6/2019, Entered: None Termination Decision Document
    Termination Decision Document
      LREF
      Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Hearing Transcript
      Hearing Transcript
        LREF
        Legal Document 2024 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
        Patent Owner's Demonstrative Exhibits
          LREF
          Legal Document 1029 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
          Petitioners' Demonstrative Exhibits
            LREF
            Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Notice
            Petitioners' Notice of Filing Demonstrative Exhibits
              LREF
              Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None other
              PATENT OWNER'S UPDATED EXHIBIT LIST
                LREF
                Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                Order - 37 C.F.R. 42.5(a)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                  Petitioners' Updated Power of Attorney
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Notice
                    Petitioners' Updated Mandatory Notices
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Order
                      Order granting Oral Argument
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None other
                        PATENT OWNER'S SUR-REPLY
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                          PATENT OWNER'S REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                            Petitioners' Request for Oral Hearing
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                              Order - Conduct of the Proceedings
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1028 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Doenhardt et al., "Algorithmic Aspects of One-Dimensional Layout Compaction"
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1027 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Transcript of Deposition of Joseph B. Bernstein, M.D. (Aug. 22, 2018)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None reply
                                    Petitioners' Reply to Patent Owner's Response
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                      Notice of Deposition of Dr. Joseph Bernstein
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                                        Granting Petitioner's Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Mr. Bryan S. Conley 37 C.F.R. § 42.10(c)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1026 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Declaration of Bryan S. Conley in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                            Petitioners' Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bryan S. Conley
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Order
                                              Granting Patent Owner's Motions for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Mr. Charles Wizenfeld 37 C.F.R. sec. 42.10(c)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2023 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                DECLARATION OF CHARLES WIZENFELD IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2022 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Ex 2022 (Wizenfeld Bio)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                    MOTION FOR CHARLES WIZENFELD TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF PATENT OWNER IYM TECHNOLOGIES LLC
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2021 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      EX2021 Collins Dict of Math - objective function + optimum
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2020 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        EX2020 Nagel Exhibit 4
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 2019 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          EX2019 Nagel Exhibit 9
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 2018 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            EX2018 Nagel Exhibit 8
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2017 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              EX2017 Concise OED (2004) - enforce
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 2016 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                EX2016 IYM responsive claim construction brief
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2015 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  EX2015 Claim Construction Order
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 2014 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    EX2014 US Provisional 60-603758
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2013 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      EX2013 Nagel Deposition Transcript
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2012 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        EX2012 Bernstein Declaration with Appendix A
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None response
                                                                          PATENT OWNER'S RESPONSE
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Decision on Motion
                                                                            DECISION Granting Petitioner's Motion to Submit Supplemental Information
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                              NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF LAURENCE W. NAGEL
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1025 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Declaration of Gerard P. Grenier
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/13/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                  Petitioners' Motion to Submit Supplemental Information
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                    PATENT OWNER¿¿¿S UPDATED MANDATORY NOTICES
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                        PATENT OWNER'S OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE SUBMITTED WITH PETITION
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                          Scheduling Order
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/8/2018, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                            Decision Granting Institution of Inter Partes Review
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 2011 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Exhibit 2011 - US Patent No. 5,825,660
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 2010 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Exhibit 2010 - US Patent No. 5,559,718
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 2009 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Exhibit 2009 - Cote file history - search notes
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 2008 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Exhibit 2008 - UPWS Searchable Index East Main Menu
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 2007 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Exhibit 2007 - US Quick Reference Guide for East and West
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 2006 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        Exhibit 2006 - MPEP 1948
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 2005 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Exhibit 2005 - MPEP E8R5 904
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 2004 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                            Exhibit 2004 - MPEP E8R5 719.05
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 2003 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                              Exhibit 2003 - McGraw-Hill Dictionary of Math Excerpts
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 2002 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Exhibit 2002 - 1996 IEEE Standard Dictionary Excerpts
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2001 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Exhibit 2001 - US Patent No. 6,978,438
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                    PATENT OWNER'S PRELIMINARY RESPONSE
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                                                                                      Order - Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                        Petitioners' Corrected Exhibit List
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                          Notice of Accord Filing Date
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
                                                                                                                            PATENT OWNER'S MANDATORY NOTICES PURSUANT TO 37 C.F.R. 42.8
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/17/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                              PATENT OWNER'S POWER OF ATTORNEY PURSUANT TO 37 C.F.R. 42.10(B)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1024 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                Exhibit 1024 - Information Disclosure Sheet and Allan from prosecution of application leading to US7698676
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1023 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 1023 - McGraw-Hill Dictionary of Scientific and Technical Terms, 988 (6th ed. 2002)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1022 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 1022 - Information Disclosure Sheet and Allan from prosecution of application leading to US7346865
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1021 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 1021 - Information Disclosure Sheet and Allan from prosecution of application leading to US7134102
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1020 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 1020 - Pre-2004 IEEE Publications Citing Allan (Ex. 1015)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1019 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                          Exhibit 1019 - Nagel, A Unified Circuit Model for Bipolar Transistors Including Quasi-Saturation Effects, 1985
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1018 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 1018 - Excerpts of File History of U.S. Patent 6,745,372 (Cote)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1017 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              Exhibit 1017 - IYM v. AMD, Case No. 16-cv-00649, Dkt No. 71 (Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief) (Jun. 22, 2017 D. Del.)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1016 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                Exhibit 1016 - File History of U.S. Patent No. 7,448,012
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1015 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 1015 - An Yield Improvement Technique for IC Layout Using Local Design Rules, 1992 (Allan)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1014 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 1014 - Weste and Eshragian, Principles of CMOS VLSI Design - A Systems Perspective, 1993
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1013 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 1013 - Rabaey, Digital Integrated Circuits - A Design Perspective, 1996
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1012 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 1012 - Tsividis, Operation and Modeling of the MOS Transistor, 1987
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1011 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit 1011 - Mead and Conway, Introduction to VLSI Systems, 1980
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1010 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 1010 - US Patent 5,519,628 (Russell)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1009 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit 1009 - US Patent 7,194,725 (Lukanc)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1008 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                Exhibit 1008 - U.S. Pub. No. 2003/0061583 (Malhotra)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1007 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit 1007 - U.S. Patent No. 6,249,904 (Cobb)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1006 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                    Exhibit 1006 - U.S. Patent No. 7,523,429 (Kroyan)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1005 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibit 1005 - U.S. Patent No. 5,663,891 (Bamji)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1004 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit 1004 - U.S. Patent No. 6,745,372 (Cote)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1003 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          Exhibit 1003 - CV of Laurence W. Nagel, Ph.D
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1002 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                            Exhibit 1002 - Declaration of Laurence W. Nagel, Ph.D.
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1001 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibit 1001 - U.S. Patent No. 7,448,012
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                                                                  Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?