Red Hat, Inc. v. Elecs. & Telecommn'cs Research Inst.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2019-00465

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 10:49 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Elecs. & Telecommn'cs Research Inst., Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 6/13/2019
Related Patent Application Number 10005604
Related Patent Number 6718436
Status Institution Denied
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None Rehearing Request - in re Petition Institution Decision Denied
Petitioners' Request for Rehearing
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: None Institution Decision
    Trial Instituted Document
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Power of Attorney
      Petitioners' Power of Attorney
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Notice
        Petitioners' Updated Mandatory Notices
          LREF
          Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/4/2019, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
          Order No Reply to Prelim Resp.
            LREF
            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Response
            Patent Owner's Preliminary Response to Petition for Inter Partes Review
              LREF
              Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
              Notice of Accord Filing Date
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Notice
                Updated Mandatory Notice
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                  Owner Power of Attorney
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
                    Owner's Initial Mandatory Notices
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1027 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Email from US Copyright Catalog
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1022 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Declaration of Christopher Butler
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1021 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Declaration of Paul Vallis
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1020 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Complaint filed in Sequoia Technology v. Hewlett Packard Enterprise Company
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1019 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                              How HP-UX Works - Concepts for the System Administrator (HP-UX Manual), Part 2 of 2
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1019 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                How HP-UX Works - Concepts for the System Administrator (HP-UX Manual), Part 1 of 2
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1018 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  The Unix and X Command Compendium
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1017 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Poniatowski Exhibit RH-1017
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1016 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Poniatowski Exhibit RH-1016
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1015 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Poniatowski Exhibit RH-1015
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1014 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Poniatowski Exhibit RH-1014
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1013 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Poniatowski Exhibit RH-1013
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1012 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Poniatowski Exhibit RH-1012
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1011 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Declaration of Marty Poniatowski
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1010 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  USP 6185666 (Murray)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1009 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    USP 6574705 (Peloquin)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1008 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Poniatowski - HP-UX System Administration Handbook, Part 2 of 2
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1008 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Poniatowski - HP-UX System Administration Handbook, Part 1 of 2
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1007 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          USP 6542962 (Kodama)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1004 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Curriculum Vitae of Brian A. Berg
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1003 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Declaration of Brian A. Berg
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1002 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                File History for USP 6718436
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1001 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  U.S. Patent 6,718,436
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None petition
                                                                    Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                      Petitioner SMC's POA
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                        Petitioner Red Hat's POA
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                          Petitioner HPE's POA
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                            Petitioner Hitachi's POA
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                              Petitioner Dell's POA
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?