Red Hat, Inc. v. Elecs. & Telecommn'cs Research Inst.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2019-00467

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 5, 2019 at 10:49 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Red Hat, Inc. Red Hat, Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Elecs. & Telecommn'cs Research Inst., Patent Owner
Technology Center 2100
Institution Decision Date 7/10/2019
Related Patent Application Number 10005604
Related Patent Number 6718436
Status Institution Denied
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: None Refund Approval
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Refund Request
    Petitioner's Request for Refund
      LREF
      Legal Document 3001 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
      Exhibit 3001
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/10/2019, Entered: None Decision Denying Institution
        Trial Instituted Document
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Power of Attorney
          Petitioners' Power of Attorney
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: None Notice
            Petitioners' Updated Mandatory Notices
              LREF
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None Preliminary Response
              Patent Owner's Preliminary Response to Petition for Inter Partes Review
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                Notice of Accord Filing Date
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None Notice
                  Updated Mandatory Notice
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                    Owner's Power of Attorney
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
                      Owner's Initial Mandatory Notices
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1026 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                        USP 5822142 (Hicken)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1025 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                          USP 6839827 (Beardsley)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1024 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                            USP 6173362 (Yoda)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1023 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                              USP 5897661 (Baranovsky)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1018 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                The Unix and X Command Compendium
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1009 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  USP 6574705 (Peloquin)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1007 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    USP 6542962 (Kodama)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1006 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      EP Pub 0 482 853 (Williams)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1005 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        USP 6405284 (Bridge)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1004 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Curriculum Vitae of Brian A. Berg
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1003 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Declaration of Brian A. Berg
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1002 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              File History for USP 6718436
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1001 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                U.S. Patent 6,718,436
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None petition
                                                  Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                    Petitioner SMC's POA
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                      Petitioner Red Hat's POA
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                        Petitioner HPE's POA
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                          Petitioner Hitachi's POA
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                            Petitioner Dell's POA
                                                              LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?