Sony Corporation v. One-E-Way, Inc
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2016-01638

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2019 at 12:21 AM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sony Corporation, Petitioner
v.
No Logo One-e-way, Inc., Patent Owner
Technology Center 2600
Institution Decision Date 2/22/2017
Related Patent Application Number 13775754
Related Patent Number 9282396
Status Terminated
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 3001 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
Exhibit 3001
    LREF
    Legal Document 42 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Termination - Settlement After Institution
    Termination - Settlement After Institution
      LREF
      Legal Document 41 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
      Petitioner Updated Exhibit List
        LREF
        Legal Document 40 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Motion
        Joint Request to File Agreement as Confidential
          LREF
          Legal Document 39 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Motion
          Joint Motion to Terminate
            LREF
            Legal Document 38 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Hearing Transcript
            Hearing Transcript
              LREF
              Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Notice
              Patent Owner's Supplemental Updated Mandatory Notice Adding Backup Counsel
                LREF
                Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                One-E-Way, Inc.'s Updated Exhibit List
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None other
                  Petitioner's Updated Mandatory Notice
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Order
                    Decision Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Motion
                      Unopposed Motion for Payson LeMeilleur to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Patent Owner
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2002 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Declaration of Payson LeMeilleur in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Patent Owner
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/20/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                          Patent Owner's Supplemental Power of Attorney
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/12/2017, Entered: None Order
                            Order - Oral Hearing
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                              Petitioner's Request for Oral Argument
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 28 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                                Patent Owner's Request for Oral Argument
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/25/2017, Entered: None reply
                                  Petitioner's Reply in Support of Petition
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2001 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    U.S. Patent No. 1687510
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None response
                                      Patent Owner Response
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                        PATENT OWNER¿¿¿S SUPPLEMENTAL UPDATED MANDATORY NOTICE ADDING BACKUP COUNSEL
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None other
                                          Certificate of Service for Patent Owner's Supplemental Power of Attorney
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                            Notice of Deposition of John Moring
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                              Patent Owner's Supplemental Power of Attorney
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                Order on Motion to WIthdraw
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None other
                                                  Stipulation to Modify Due Dates 1, 2, and 3
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/7/2017, Entered: None other
                                                    Motion to Withdraw
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                      Patent Owner's Mandatory Notices
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                        Order - Conduct of the Proceeding - 37 CFR 42.5
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                          Power of Attorney for Patent Owner
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                            Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None other
                                                              Petitioner's ADR Statement
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                Scheduling Order
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/22/2017, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                  Trial Instituted Document
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None reply
                                                                    Petitioner's Reply to Patent Owner's Preliminary Response to Petition
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                                      Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/25/2016, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                        Patent Owner Preliminary Response to Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Notice
                                                                          Petitioner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
                                                                            One-E-Way's Mandatory Notices Pursuant to 37 C.F.R. sec. 42.8(a)(2)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/25/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                              Notice of Accord Filing Date
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1013 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Ex 1013 - Order No. 12 from Inv. No. 337-TA-943 (July 24, 2015)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1012 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Ex 1012 - Declaration of J. Moring
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1011 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Ex 1011 - Comparison of the 2013 application as-filed with the 2008 app.
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1010 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Ex 1010 - Comparison of the 294 patent with the as-filed 2003 app
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1009 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Ex 1009 - Comparison of figures from the 2003 and 2001 applications
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1008 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          Ex 1008 - Comparison of the 2003 application as-filed with the 2001 App
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 1007 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Ex 1007 - Excerpts from file history of U.S. App. No. 12/144,729
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1006 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Ex 1006 - US 7412294
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1005 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Ex 1005 - File History of U.S. App. No. 10/648,012 [Part 1 of 2]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1005 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Ex 1005 - File History of U.S. App. No. 10/648,012 [Part 2 of 2]
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1004 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Ex 1004 - U.S. Publication No. 2003/0118196
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1003 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Ex 1003 - File History of U.S. App. No. 10/027,391
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1002 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        Ex 1002 - File History of US App. No. 13/775,754 [Part 1 of 2]
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1002 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Ex 1002 - File History of US App. No. 13/775,754 [Part 2 of 2]
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1001 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                            Ex 1001 - US 9282396
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                              Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                Petition for Inter Partes Review of US Patent No. 9,282,396
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?