Microsoft Corporation v. BRADIUM TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2016-01897

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2019 at 12:59 AM EDT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Petitioner
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
v.
No Logo Bradium Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2400
Institution Decision Date 4/5/2017
Related Patent Application Number 14547148
Related Patent Number 9253239
Status Terminated
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Refund Approval
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Refund Request
    Petitioner's Request for Refund
      LREF
      Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Termination Decision Document
      Termination Decision Document
        LREF
        Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None other
        Joint Request to File Settlement Agreement as Business Confidential Information
          LREF
          Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None other
          Joint Motion to Terminate the Proceeding
            LREF
            Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/23/2017, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
            Order Granting Petitioner Request to Withdraw Motion for Additional Discovery
              LREF
              Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Motion
              Petitioner's Motion to Withdraw Motion for Additional Discovery
                LREF
                Legal Document 2014 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                Ex. 2014 - Declaration of Dr. Peggy Agouris
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None response
                  Patent Owner's Response
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Patent Owner's Second Exhibit List
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1046 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Ex1046 - Correspondence E. Day and C. Coulson
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1045 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Ex1045 - 3DVU Delaware corporate records
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1044 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Ex1044 - Supreme Court Decision and Translation
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1043 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Ex1043 - Magistrates Court Decision with Translation
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1041 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Ex1041 - International Legal Cooperation
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1040 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Ex1040 - Text of Hague Convention
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1039 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Ex1039 - 2017-07-11 ltr to Yonatan Lavi fr Matt Bernstein
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1038 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Ex1038 - 2017-03-12 Email C. Coulson to E. Day
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1037 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Ex1037 - 2017-02-27 Email E. Day to C. Coulson
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1036 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Ex1036 - Correspondence Y. Lavi and E. Day_Redacted
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1035 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Ex1035 - 2017-02-09 Letter from C. Coulson to C. Ng
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1034 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Ex1034 - Yonatan Lavi Declaration - with Exhibits A-F
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1033 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Ex1033 - Coulson emails to Lavi
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1032 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Ex1032 - Substitute statement
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1031 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Ex1031 - Isaac Levanon Deposition Transcript
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1030 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Ex1030 - Declaration of Isaac Levanon (Isaac Decl.) - Public Version
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1029 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Ex1029 - TerraServer Interface
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1028 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Ex1028 - TerraServer Scale
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1027 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Ex1027 - TerraServer Image Loading and Cutting Process
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1026 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Ex1026 - TerraServer Site Story
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1025 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Ex1025 - TerraServer Image Loading and Cutting Process
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1024 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Ex1024 - Microsoft, Partners Announce Microsoft TerraServer
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1023 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  Ex1023 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1022 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Ex1022 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Terraserver ACM SIGMOD Record. Vol. 29. No. 2. ACM, 2000
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1021 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Ex1021 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer (1998)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1020 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Ex1020 - Microsoft TerraServer
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1019 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          Ex1019 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer A Spatial Data Warehouse
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Petitioner's Updated Exhibit List
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Motion
                                                                              Petitioner's Motion for Authorization for Additional Discovery
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER and AUTHORIZING MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL DISCOVERY
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                  Petitioner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                    Patent Owner's Objections to Petitioner's Evidence
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/19/2017, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                      Petitioner's Objections to Patent Owner's Evidence
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Scheduling Order
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                          Trial Instituted Document
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                            Petitioner's Updated Power of Attorney
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                              Petitioner's Updated Notice of Counsel
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                Petitioner's Updated Notice of Counsel
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF EVANS S. DAY
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Pro Hac Vice Admission of Bernstein
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/9/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                      Pro Hac Vice Admission of Zachary
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 2013 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        Ex. 2013
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 2012 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Ex. 2012
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 2011 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                            Ex. 2011
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 2010 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                              Ex. 2010
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 2009 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Ex. 2009
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2008 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Ex. 2008
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2007 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                    Ex. 2007
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2006 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                      Ex. 2006
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2005 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                        Ex. 2005
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2004 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Ex. 2004
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2003 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Ex. 2003
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2002 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Ex. 2002
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2001 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                Ex. 2001
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Patent Owner Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None response
                                                                                                                                    Patent Owner Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1018 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      Ex1018 Day Affidavit ISO Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1017 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                        Ex1017 Bernstein Affidavit ISO Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                          Petitioner's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Evan S. Day
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                            Petitioner's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Matthew C. Bernstein
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None other
                                                                                                                                              Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Michael Zachary
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                Patent Owner's Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
                                                                                                                                                  Patent Owner's Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Accord Filing Date
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1016 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Ex1016 - WO1998015920A1 (Austreng)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1015 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Ex1015 - Provisional App 60109077 (Loomans Provisional)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1014 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Ex1014 - US6728960 (Loomans)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1013 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            Ex1013 - File History of the 239 Patent PART ONE
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1013 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              Ex1013 - File History of the 239 Patent PART TWO
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1012 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                Ex1012 - US7908343 (the 343 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1011 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  Ex1011 - First Amended Complaint 2016-03-14
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1010 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                    Ex1010 - Cover page of Reddy (Ex1004) from Linda Hall Library
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1009 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                      Ex1009 - Cover page and declaration of Reddy (Ex1004) from British Library
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1008 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                        Ex1008 - Printout of Google Scholar citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1007 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          Ex1007 - Printout of IEEE Explore citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1006 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                            Ex1006 - EP1070290B1
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1005 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Ex1005 - Michalson Declaration - Appendices O-MM
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1005 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                Ex1005 - Michalson Declaration - Appendices A-N
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1004 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex1004 - Reddy TerraVision IEEE 1999
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1003 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex1003 - WO9941675A1 (Hornbacker)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1002 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex1002 - US8924506 B2 (the 506 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1001 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                        EX1001 - US9253239 B2 (the 239 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                                                                          Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                            Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?