USA, et al v. Escobedo-Lopez
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00001-ROS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Yuma
Terminated 8/27/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-02812
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Count 1s
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Count 1s
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and enhanced by (b)(2) Reentry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 53 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 Plea Agreement
PLEA agreement filed as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 52 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez sentencing for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (1) count(s) 1s. Committed to BOP for FIFTY-SEVEN (57) MOS w/credit for time served; followed by supervised release for THREE (3) YRS; S/A: $100 Crt recommends dft be placed in institution in CA or southwest US, Case closed ; ordered by Judge Roslyn O. Silver (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 51 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      ( FILED: 8/30/01) MINUTES: before Judge Roslyn O. Silver Ct Rptr: Gary Moll ; sentencing held as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez; downward departure granted purs to 5K2.0 [51-2] (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 50 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting motion to continue sentencing [49-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez sentencing set for 3:00 8/27/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp) Modified on 08/23/2001
          LREF
          Blank 49 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001, Terminated: 7/13/2001 Motion to Continue
          MOTION to continue sentencing [49-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp) Modified on 08/23/2001
            LREF
            Blank 48 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver accepting Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez' plea of guilty; plea agreement will be referred to PO for rpt and recommendation re: [48-1] (former emp) Modified on 08/23/2001
              LREF
              Blank 47 Filed: 6/26/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 46 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                ( FILED: 6/26/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson Ct Rptr: Vicki Reger Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (1) count(s) 1s enters a plea of guilty , ; plea hrg held ; trial vacated ; sentencing set for 2:00 8/13/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez , before Judge Roslyn O. Silver PSI expedited; ORD dft remanded to USM, plea agreement lodged as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez [46-5] (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 45 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver and consent of Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez for referral to Magistrate Judge for change of plea. (former emp) Modified on 06/26/2001
                    LREF
                    Blank 44 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Jury Instructions
                    JURY instructions by pla as to dft Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 43 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      ( FILED: 6/19/01) MINUTES: before Judge Roslyn O. Silver Ct Rptr: Gary Moll ; pretrial conference held , ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 10:30 6/20/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson [43-4] (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 42 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER ; pretrial conference reset for 10:00 6/19/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez , before Judge Roslyn O. Silver [42-3] (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 41 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER on req of gov cnsl; final pretrial conference reset for 1:30 6/19/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez , before Judge Roslyn O. Silver [41-3] (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 40 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting motion to continue trial (1st req) [37-1] Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez; trial reset to 7/3/01 at 8:30 AM excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 39 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              ( FILED: 5/23/01) MINUTES: before Judge Roslyn O. Silver Ct Rptr: Gary Moll granting motion to continue trial (1st req) [37-1] Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; pretrial conference held ; trial set for 8:30 7/3/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez mtns in limine, jury instructions/questionnaires due 6/7/01; objs due 6/21/01 [cc: ausa/fpd] [39-2] (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 38 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                ( FILED: 5/17/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson dft Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez arraigned on superseding indictment; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , trial set for 5/29/01 at 9:00 AM [38-3] (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 37 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001, Terminated: 5/22/2001 Motion to Continue
                                  MOTION to continue trial (1st req) [37-1] Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 36 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 5/16/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 35 Filed: 5/8/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 Indictment
                                      SUPERSEDING Indictment filed against Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (1) count(s) 1s (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 34 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        ( FILED: 5/1/01) MINUTES: before Judge Roslyn O. Silver Ct Rptr: Gary Moll granting motion to continue trial [0-0] by USA, Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; status hrg held ; trial set for 8:30 5/29/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez , excludable delay int of justice started , ;final pretrial conference set for 2:30 5/18/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez [34-4] (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Motion to Continue
                                          JOINT ORAL MOTION to continue trial [0-0] by USA, Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: 4/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver case set for trial 5/15/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 1:30 4/30/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver granting motion to continue trial (2nd req) [31-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; trial set for 8:30 5/15/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez , excludable delay int of justice started , ; 3/22/01 status hrg vacated (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 31 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001, Terminated: 3/23/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                MOTION to continue trial (2nd req) [31-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver case set for trial 4/3/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 1:30 3/22/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Roslyn O. Silver that Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez shall provide complete rolled inked fingerprint samples requested by counsel for the United States [26-1] by USA as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (KMG)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Other Notice
                                                      NOTICE of confession, admissions and statements purs. to Local Rule 4.11 as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                        MOTION for order for fingerprint exemplars [26-1] by USA as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                          ( FILED: 3/12/01) MINUTES: before Judge Roslyn O. Silver Ct Rptr: Gary Moll mtn hrg held; granting motion to continue trial [0-0] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez, denying motion to dismiss indictment: collateral attack of the deportation based on a "burglary" conviction [21-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez, denying motion to dismiss deportation statute (oral argument req) [20-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez, denying motion to dismiss uniformity clause [18-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; trial set for 8:30 4/3/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez , excludable delay int of justice started [29-3] (former emp)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                            ORAL MOTION to continue trial [0-0] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                                              RESPONSE by pla to motion to dismiss uniformity clause [18-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                RESPONSE by pla to motion to dismiss indictment: collateral attack of the deportation based on a "burglary" conviction [21-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                  RESPONSE by pla to motion to dismiss deportation statute (oral argument req) [20-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 Order
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER re motion to dismiss indictment: collateral attack of the deportation based on a "burglary" conviction [21-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; hearing reset for 1:30 2/27/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez, re motion to dismiss deportation statute (oral argument req) [20-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; hearing reset for 1:30 2/27/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez, re motion to dismiss uniformity clause [18-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; hearing reset for 1:30 2/27/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez [22-2] (former emp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Order
                                                                      MINUTE ORDER oral argument set of dft Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez' Motion to Dismiss: Deportation Statue and Motion to Dismiss Indictment: Collateral Attack of the Deportation Based on a "Burglary" Conviction and Motion to dismiss uniformity clause [18-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; hearing set for 2:00 2/12/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez [19-1] (KMG)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION to dismiss indictment: collateral attack of the deportation based on a "burglary" conviction [21-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                          MOTION to dismiss deportation statute (oral argument req) [20-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                            MOTION to dismiss uniformity clause [18-1] by Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (former emp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                              ( FILED: 1/11/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver dft Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; trial set for 9:00 3/6/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez [17-3] (former emp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  PAYMENT voucher by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez for CJA atty Bruce Yancey (former emp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Indictment
                                                                                    INDICTMENT by USA attorney Timothy C Holtzen. Counts filed against Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (1) count(s) 1 (former emp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER appointing counsel Robert McWhirter for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez by Mag Judge Morton Sitver re: order [13-1] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (former emp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                        ( FILED: 12/21/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis appointing counsel for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez Robert James McWhirter and terminating attorney Bruce Yancey for Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez; a status hearing was set and later vacated at the request of cnsl [12-2] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: status hrg held and dft Escobedo-Lopez is present w/cnsl before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin; dft declined to accept plea offer; case transferred to Phoenix; appt of cnsl is set for 12/21/00 at 11AM before Mag Judge Mathis [11-1] re: minute entry [11-1] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                            ( FILED: 12/12/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Dft Escobedo-Lopez present w/cnsl; status hrg re plea is cont to 12/14/00 at 10AM before this Court [10-1] re: minute entry [10-1] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                              ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: dft Escobedo-Lopez present w/cnsl; prelim hrg held and defendant held to answer before the district court; status hearing re possible plea is set for hrg on 12/12/00 at 1:30 .m. before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin [9-1] re: minute entry [9-1] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin granting motion to extend time to indict filed by defendant Escobedo-Lopez [7-1] excludable delay XT started on the 31st day after arrest for a period of 30 days in which the government may present the case to the grand jury [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000, Terminated: 12/6/2000 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                  MOTION to extend time to indict filed by defendant Escobedo-Lopez [7-1] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ( FILED: 12/6/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Bruce Yancey dft Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez appears with counsel; prelim hrg is cont until 12/7/00 at 1:30 p.m. before this Court [6-2] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez re: detention order [5-1] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 11/28/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ( FILED: 11/28/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin dft Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez appears with counsel Bruce Yancey; dft detained; prelim hrg is set for 12/7/00 at 1:30 p.m before this court [4-2] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin for temporary detention as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ( FILED: 11/24/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: none first appearance of Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez ; informed of rights, charges, etc. detention hrg is set for 11/28/00 at 1:30 p.m before this Court; dft present w/o cnsl; [2-2] [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT filed as to Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/23/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                DEFENDANT Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez arrested. Elizandro Escobedo-Lopez (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -2812 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?