Microsoft Corporation v. Bradium Technologies, LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2017-01616

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2019 at 1:08 AM EDT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Petitioner
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
v.
No Logo Bradium Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2400
Related Patent Application Number 14970526
Related Patent Number 9641644
Status Terminated
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Refund Approval
Notice of Redund
    LREF
    Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Refund Request
    Petitioner's Request for Refund
      LREF
      Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Termination Decision Document
      Termination Decision Document
        LREF
        Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None other
        Joint Request to File Settlement Agreement as Business Confidential Information
          LREF
          Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None other
          Joint Motion to Terminate the Proceeding
            LREF
            Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
            Conduct of the Proceeding 37 C.F.R. sec 42.5
              LREF
              Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
              Patent Owner's Power of Attorney
                LREF
                Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
                Patent Owner's Mandatory Notice
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                  Notice of Accord Filing Date
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1042 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Ex1042 - TerraServer Interface
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1041 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Ex1041 - TerraServer Scale
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1040 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Ex1040 - TerraServer Image Loading and Cutting Process
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1039 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Ex1039 - TerraServer Site Story
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1038 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Ex1038 - TerraServer Image Loading and Cutting Process
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1037 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Ex1037 - Microsoft, Partners Announce Microsoft TerraServer
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1036 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Ex1036 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1035 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Ex1035 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Terraserver ACM SIGMOD Record. Vol. 29. No. 2. ACM, 2000
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1034 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Ex1034 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer (1998)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1033 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Ex1033 - Microsoft TerraServer
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1032 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Ex1032 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer A Spatial Data Warehouse
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1031 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Ex1031 - Intel Microprocessor Quick Reference Guide
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1030 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Ex1030 - Barclay, Microsoft TerraServer
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1026 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Ex1026 - May 10, 2017 Letter
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1025 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Ex1025 - US7561156
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1024 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Ex1024 - US20080294332A1
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1023 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Ex1023 - Wolford, FXT1_ 3dfx Texture Compression
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1022 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Ex1022 - The Universal Grid System
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1021 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Ex1021 - Bradium Provisional 60258465
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1020 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Ex1020 - Fujitsu Technical Reference Guide
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1019 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Ex1019 - Isaac Levanon Deposition Transcript - with errata sheet
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1018 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Ex1018 - Peggy Agouris Deposition Transcript - with errata sheet
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1015 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Ex1015 - Isaac Levanon -LinkedIn
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1014 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  Ex1014 - Visualization System for SRIs Digital Earth Proposal, dated April 16, 1999
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1013 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Ex1013 - US8924506 B2 (the 506 Patent)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1012 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Ex1012 - US7908343 B2 (the 343 Patent)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1011 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Ex1011 - Fuller - The MAGIC Project
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1010 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          Ex1010 - Cover page of Reddy (Ex1004) from Linda Hall Library
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1009 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Ex1009 - Cover page and auth declaration of Reddy (Ex1004) from British Library
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1008 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Ex1008 - Printout of Google Scholar citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1007 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Ex1007 - Printout of IEEE Explore citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1006 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Ex1006 - EP1070290B1
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1005 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Ex1005 - Michalson Declaration (Appendices A-S)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1005 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Ex1005 - Michalson Declaration (Appendices T-NN)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1004 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Ex1004 - Reddy TerraVision IEEE 1999
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1003 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          Ex1003 - WO9941675A1 (Hornbacker)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 1002 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Ex1002 - US9253239 B2 (the 239 Patent)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1001 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Ex1001 - US9641644 B2 (the 644 Patent)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                  Power of Attorney
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?