Unified Patents Inc. v. Bradium Technologies LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2018-00952

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2019 at 1:17 AM EDT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Unified Patents Inc., Petitioner
v.
No Logo Bradium Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2400
Institution Decision Date 12/20/2018
Related Patent Application Number 14547148
Related Patent Number 9253239
Status Trial Instituted
  Entries (149) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 2060 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
Patent Owner's Trial Demonstratives
    LREF
    Legal Document 1031 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
    Petitioner's Demonstratives
      LREF
      Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
      Petitioner's Updated Exhibit List
        LREF
        Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
        Patent Owner's Updated Exhibit List
          LREF
          Legal Document 56 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
          Order - 37 C.F.R. 42.5(a)
            LREF
            Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Motion
            Corrected Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Patent Owner's Motion to Amend
              LREF
              Legal Document 54 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Motion
              Unopposed Motion to Withdraw Patent Owner's Contingent Motion to Amend
                LREF
                Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Motion
                Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to Seal
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None other
                  Petitioner's Sur-Reply to Patent Owner's Reply to Petitioner's Opposition to Patent Owner's Contingent Motion to Amend
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Order
                    Order - Trial Hearing
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                      Petitioner's Request for Oral Argument
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/20/2019, Entered: None Oral Hearing Request
                        Patent Owner's Request for Oral Argument
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: None reply
                          PATENT OWNER BRADIUM TECHNOLOGY¿¿¿S REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO AMEND
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Notice
                            Notice of Joint Stipulation to Modify Due Dates 3-4
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2059 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Second Declaration of Dr. Peggy Agouris In Support of Bradium's Motion to Amend
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None reply
                                Bradium Technologies Sur-Reply [PUBLIC VERSION]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None reply
                                  Patent Owner Bradium Technology's Reply to Opposition to Motion to Amend
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1030 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    JPEG JFIF
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1029 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      ITU CCIT T.81
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1028 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        U.S. 6,496,189 (Yaron)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1027 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Second Declaration of Christopher Wilson
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Petitioner's Updated Exhibit List
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None Opposition
                                              Petitioner's Opposition to the Motion to Amend
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 7/1/2019, Entered: None reply
                                                Petitioner's Reply
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None other
                                                  Petitioner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2058 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Unified Patents, Case List for Bradium Patent Owners (downloaded April 1, 2019)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2057 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      ¿¿¿Summary of Findings: Search Results Using Unified Patents Portal,¿¿¿ prepared by J. Sprague (Public Version)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2056 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Declaration of Jessika Sprague in Support of Patent Owner Response (Public Version)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 2055 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Declaration of Dr. Agouris in Support of Contingent Motion to Amend
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 2054 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Declaration of Dr. Agouris in Support of Patent Owner Response
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 2053 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Application No. 15/457,816, Oct. 4, 2018 Final Rejection
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 2052 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Application No. 15/457,816, Oct. 4, 2017 Non-Final Rejection, IDS, List of References
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 2051 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  June 17, 1996 FlashPix Format and Architecture White Paper
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 2050 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Dec. 8, 2016 J. Lasker Letter to M. Shanahan
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 2049 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Exhibits to Notarized Affidavit of Christopher Butler
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 2048 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Notarized Affidavit of Christopher Butler, Internet Archive, dated November 27, 2018
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 2047 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          Wilson Deposition Ex. 2040: U.S. Patent Publication No. 2002/0014979
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 2046 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Wilson Deposition Ex. 2039: U.S. Patent Publication No. 2012/0095682
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 2045 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Wilson Deposition Ex. 2038 (Excerpted)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 2044 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Transcript of Deposition of Christopher K. Wilson (March 8, 2019)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 2040 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Unified Patents Webpage (October 9, 2018)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 2039 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    ¿¿¿Hacking the Patent System"
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 39 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                      Patent Owner Contingent Motion to Amend Pursuant to 37 C.F.R. Section 42.121
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 4/1/2019, Entered: None response
                                                                                        Patent Owner's Response Pursuant to 37 C.F.R. ¿¿42.120 (Public Version)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                          Notice of Joint Stipulation to Modify Due Dates 1-4
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/7/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                            Summary of Conference Concerning Proposed Motion to Amend
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                              Patent Owner's Notice of Deposition of Christopher K. Wilson
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                PETITIONER'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL PATENT OWNER'S SUR-REPLY ON REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Institution Decision
                                                                                                    Decision Granting Institution of Inter Partes Review
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None reply
                                                                                                      Patent Owner, Bradium Technologies, LLC's Sur-Reply to Petitioner's Preliminary Response Pursuant to 37 C.F.R. 42.108c - Public Version
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                        Patent Owner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                                                                          Conduct of the Proceedings
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                            PETITIONER'S REPLY TO PATENT OWNER'S PRELIMINARY RESPONSE ON RPI (REDACTED)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                              MOTION TO SEAL
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Conduct of the Proceedings 37 C.F.R. sec. 42.5(a)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                  PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Objection
                                                                                                                    PETITIONER'S NOTICE OF OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2038 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                      Unified's Real-Party-in-Interest PTAB Panel Decisions
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2037 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                        Declaration of M. Shanahan
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2036 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                          "Summary of Findings: Search Results Using Unified Patents Portal" - REDACTED
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2035 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Declaration of L. Quan - REDACTED
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2034 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Bradium v. Iancu, No. 17-2579, USPTO Director's Opp. to Appellant's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief, Dkt. No. 74 (Filed Sept. 4, 2018)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2033 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                NPE Zones Deter bad NPE conduct
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2032 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Microsoft v. Bradium, IPR2016-01897, Paper 17 (Institution Decision) dated April 5, 2017
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2031 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Microsoft v. Bradium, IPR2016-01897, Paper 2 (Petition) dated Sept. 30, 2016
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2030 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      How Much does IPR Cost
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2029 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                        IPRs, Balancing Effectiveness vs Cost, RPX
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2028 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                          Orthogonality, Wikipedia Website
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2027 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            Bradium Technologies LLC's Disclaimer of Claims 1-19, 21-25
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2026 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              Declaration of C. Coulson
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2025 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                Unified Patents Adds AIA Reviews to Anti-'Troll' Arsenal
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2024 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  Unified Patents (January 1, 2014)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2023 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    Email from Unified Patents to Michael Zachary re "Unified reaches 100 challenges," dated Nov. 15, 2017
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2022 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Unified has challenged almost all of 2017's most prolific NPE's
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2021 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Unified Patents Challenges Clouding IP Patent Seeks to Push Patent Trolls Out of Cloud Storage
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2020 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          The Gloves are Off Unified Patents Inc. Unveils Its NPE Deterrent Strategy
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2019 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            New Venture Enters Patent Fray
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2018 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                              Unified Patents, backed by Google, takes fight to patent trolls
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2017 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                Bradium Technologies and Microsoft Settle Lawsuit
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2016 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                  Bradium v. Microsoft, Complaint filed January 9, 2015
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 2015 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                    Docket Navigator or Unified Patents dated June 17, 2015
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 2014 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                      Bradium Technologies LLC webpage
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2011 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                        Protected Zones, Excerpt of United Patents Website
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2010 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                          Hacking the Patent System A guide to Alternative Patent Licensing for Innovators
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2007 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                            Join, Unified Patents
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2006 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                              Join, Unified Patents
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2005 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                Team, Unified Patents
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 2004 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                  Deposition Transcript of Kevin Jakel - REDACTED
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                                                                                    Patent Owner's Preliminary Response - Public Version
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      UNOPPOSED MOTION TO SEAL
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                        Granting Patent Owners Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael N. Zachary 37 C.F.R. sec 42.10
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Decision on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          DECISION Petitioner's Unopposed Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                            Patent Owner's Updated Mandatory Notices Regarding Real Parties-in-Interest and Additional Back-up Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                              Patent Owner's Updated Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1026 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                Redline showing changes of modified Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1025 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Modified Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Notice of Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Patent Owner's Notice of Deposition of Kevin Jakel
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Order Conduct of Proceeding
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Conduct of the Proceeding
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 2003 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration of Michael N. Zachary In Support of Patent Owner's Pro Hac Vice Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2002 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Acceptance of POA Listing Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2001 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Public Pair - Customer Number and address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Patent Owner's Exhibit List
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Patent Owner's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Michael N. Zachary
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion to Modify Due Date for Patent Owner's Preliminary Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Petitioner's Updated Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Patent Owner's Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Patent Owner's Mandatory Notices
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Corrected Notice of Filing Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Accord Filing Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1024 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex1024 - Copy of Michalson Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1023 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MacAddict (1997) Part 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1023 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MacAddict (1997) Part 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1023 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MacAddict (1997) Part 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1023 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MacAddict (1997) Part 4
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1023 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MacAddict (1997) Part 5
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1023 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MacAddict (1997) Part 6
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1022 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Garland et al, Implementing Distributed Server Groups for the World Wide Web, Carnegie Mellon
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1021 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                U.S. Patent 6,401,113 (Lazaridis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1020 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  U.S. Patent 6,119,179 (Whitridge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1019 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Provisional Applications of 239 Patent
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1018 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      U.S. Patent 6,317,137 (Rosasco)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1017 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration of Sylvia Hall-Ellis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1016 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          International Publication WO 98/15920 (Austreng)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1015 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Provisional App. 60/109,077 (Loomans Provisional)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1014 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              U.S. Patent 6,728,960 (Loomans)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1013 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                File History, 239 Patent, Part 1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1013 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  File History, 239 Patent, Part 2
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1013 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    File History, 239 Patent, Part 3
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1012 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      U.S. Patent 7,908,343 (the 343 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1011 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        First Amended Complaint, Bradium Technologies, LLC v. Microsoft Corp., 15-cv-00031-RGA (filed March 14, 2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1010 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Cover page of Reddy et al. (Ex. 1004) from Linda Hall Library
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1009 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cover page and authenticating declaration of Reddy et al. (Ex. 1004) from British Library
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1008 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Printout of Google Scholar citations to Reddy et al. (Ex. 1004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1007 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Printout of IEEE Explore citations to Reddy et al. (Ex. 1004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1006 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  EP1070290 to Cecil V. Hornbacker, III
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration of Christopher Wilson
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Wilson Declaration Appendices A-D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Wilson Declaration Appendices E-F
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Wilson Declaration Appendices G-N
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Christopher Wilson CV
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1005 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Wilson Declaration Appendices O-MM
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1004 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reddy et al., TerraVision II: Visualizing Massive Terrain Databases in VRML, IEEE Computer Graphics and Applications March/April 1999, at 30-38
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1003 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PCT Publication WO 99/41675 to Cecil V. Hornbacker, III (Hornbacker)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1002 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    U.S. Patent 8,924, 506 B2 to Levanon et al. (the 506 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1001 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      U.S. Patent 9,253,239 B2 to Levanon et al. (the 239 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Petition, Unified Patents Inc. v. Bradium, IPR2018-00952
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Power of Attorney, Unified Patents v. Bradium, IPR2018-00952
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?