Microsoft Corporation v. Bradium Technologies LLC
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Patent Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. IPR2017-01818

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 6, 2019 at 1:36 AM EDT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Petitioner
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.
v.
No Logo Bradium Technologies LLC, Patent Owner
Technology Center 2400
Related Patent Application Number 15281037
Related Patent Number 9641645
Status Terminated
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/21/2017, Entered: None Refund Approval
Notice of Refund
    LREF
    Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Refund Request
    Petitioner's Request for Refund
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Termination Decision Document
      Termination Decision Document
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None other
        Joint Request to File Settlement Agreement as Business Confidential Information
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/19/2017, Entered: None other
          Joint Motion to Dismiss Petition
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
            Patent Owner's Power of Attorney
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/10/2017, Entered: None Mandatory Notice
              Patent Owner's Mandatory Notice
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing Date Accorded to Petition
                Notice of Accord Filing Date
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1073 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                  Ex. 1073 - Bing Tile Maps
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 1072 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                    Ex. 1072 - Excerpt of Initial Claim Chart 343 Patent
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 1071 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                      Ex. 1071 - Provisional Application 60258489
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 1070 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                        Ex. 1070 - Provisional Application 60258488
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 1069 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                          Ex. 1069 - Provisional Application 60258468
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1068 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                            Ex. 1068 - Provisional Application 60258467
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1067 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                              Ex. 1067 - Provisional Application 60258466
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1066 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                Ex. 1066 - Provisional Application 60258465
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1065 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                  Ex. 1065 - US4972319 (Delorme)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1064 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                    Ex. 1064 - Balena
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1063 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                      Ex. 1063 - nsDiskModule.h
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 1062 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                        Ex. 1062 - nsMemModule.h
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 1061 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                          Ex. 1061 - nsCacheManager.h
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 1060 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                            Ex. 1060 - Stanek
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1059 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                              Ex. 1059 - Giguere
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1058 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                Ex. 1058 - Boling
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1057 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                  Ex. 1057 - Kleiman
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1056 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                    Ex. 1056 - Cohen
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1055 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                      Ex. 1055 - Silberschatz
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1054 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                        Ex. 1054 - Brown
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 1053 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                          Ex. 1053 - Musciano
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 1052 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                            Ex. 1052 - Cisco Aironet 340 Series Brochure
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 1051 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                              Ex. 1051 - RangeLAN2 PC Card (WinCE Handhelds)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 1050 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                Ex. 1050 - Thinkpad X PR
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 1049 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                  Ex. 1049 - Apple Airport Products - Tech Overview
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1048 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                    Ex. 1048 - Apple Airport Fact Sheet (1999)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1047 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                      Ex. 1047 - Apple iBook Feature Pages
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 1046 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                        Ex. 1046 - Lohr (NYT)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 1045 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                          Ex. 1045 - MSFT Dictionary
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 1044 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                            Ex. 1044 - Killelea
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1043 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                              Ex. 1043 - Shammas
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 1042 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                Ex. 1042 - TerraServer Interface
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 1041 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                  Ex. 1041 - TerraServer Scale
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1040 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                    Ex. 1040 - TerraServer Image Loading and Cutting Process
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 1039 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                      Ex. 1039 - TerraServer Site Story
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 1038 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                        Ex. 1038 - TerraServer Image Loading and Cutting Process
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1037 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                          Ex. 1037 - Microsoft, Partners Announce Microsoft TerraServer
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 1036 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                            Ex. 1036 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 1035 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                              Ex. 1035 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Terraserver ACM SIGMOD Record. Vol. 29. No. 2. ACM, 2000
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 1034 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                Ex. 1034 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer (1998)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1033 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                  Ex. 1033 - Microsoft TerraServer
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1032 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                    Ex. 1032 - Barclay, Tom, et al. Microsoft TerraServer A Spatial Data Warehouse
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 1031 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                      Ex. 1031 - Intel Microprocessor Quick Reference Guide
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 1030 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                        Ex. 1030 - Barclay, Microsoft TerraServer
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 1026 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                          Ex. 1026 - May 10, 2017 Letter
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 1025 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                            Ex. 1025 - US7561156
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1024 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                              Ex. 1024 - US20080294332A1
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1023 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                Ex. 1023 - Wolford, FXT1_ 3dfx Texture Compression
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1022 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Ex. 1022 - The Universal Grid System
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1021 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                    Ex. 1021 - Bradium Provisional 60258465
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1020 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                      Ex. 1020 - Fujitsu Technical Reference Guide
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1019 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                        Ex. 1019 - Isaac Levanon Deposition Transcript - with errata sheet
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1018 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                          Ex. 1018 - Peggy Agouris Deposition Transcript - with errata sheet
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1016 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                            Ex. 1016 - 645 File History
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1015 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                              Ex. 1015 - Isaac Levanon -LinkedIn
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1014 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                Ex. 1014 - Visualization System for SRIs Digital Earth Proposal, dated April 16, 1999
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1013 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                  Ex. 1013 - US8924506 B2 (the 506 Patent)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1012 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                    Ex. 1012 - US7908343 B2 (the 343 Patent)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1011 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                      Ex. 1011 - Fuller - The MAGIC Project
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1010 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                        Ex. 1010 - Cover page of Reddy (Ex1004) from Linda Hall Library
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1009 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                          Ex. 1009 - Cover page and auth declaration of Reddy (Ex1004) from British Library
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1008 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                            Ex. 1008 - Printout of Google Scholar citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1007 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                              Ex. 1007 - Printout of IEEE Explore citations to Reddy (Ex1004)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1006 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                Ex. 1006 - US7324228 (Chiarabini)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1005 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                  Ex. 1005 - 645 Michalson Declaration (Appendices A-S)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1005 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                    Ex. 1005 - 645 Michalson Declaration (Appendices T-NN)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1004 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                      Ex. 1004 - Reddy TerraVision IEEE 1999
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1003 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                        Ex. 1003 - US5956039 (Woods)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1002 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                          Ex. 1002 - US9253239 B2 (the 239 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1001 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            Ex. 1001 - US9641645B2 (the 645 Patent)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None petition
                                                                                                                                                              Petition for Inter Partes Review
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                Power of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?