In re Tether and Bitfinex Crypto Asset Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-09236-KPF
District Judge Katherine Polk Failla, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 11, 2021 at 2:47 PM ST (4.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aaron Leibowitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Michael Delich +1 929 457 0057 jdelich@rochefreedman.com
Space Devin Freedman +1 305 357 3861 vel@rochefreedman.com
No Logo Benjamin Leibowitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Michael Delich +1 929 457 0057 jdelich@rochefreedman.com
Space Devin Freedman +1 305 357 3861 vel@rochefreedman.com
No Logo David Leibowitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by rochefreedman.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Michael Delich +1 929 457 0057 jdelich@rochefreedman.com
Space Devin Freedman +1 305 357 3861 vel@rochefreedman.com
No Logo Jason Leibowitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Michael Delich +1 929 457 0057 jdelich@rochefreedman.com
Space Devin Freedman +1 305 357 3861 vel@rochefreedman.com
No Logo Pinchas Goldshtein, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Michael Delich +1 929 457 0057 jdelich@rochefreedman.com
Space Devin Freedman +1 305 357 3861 vel@rochefreedman.com
v.
No Logo BFXNA Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFXWW Inc., Defendant
No Logo Crypto Capital Corp., Defendant
No Logo DigFinex Inc., Defendant
No Logo Giancarlo Devasini, Defendant
No Logo Global Trade Solutions AG, Defendant
No Logo iFinex Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ludovicus Jan van der Velde, Defendant
No Logo Philip G. Potter, Defendant
No Logo Reginald Fowler, Defendant
No Logo Tether Holdings Limited, Defendant
No Logo Tether International Limited, Defendant
No Logo Tether Limited, Defendant
No Logo Tether Operations Limited, Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/6/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $9999000
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause Section 7 U.S.C. § 6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (211) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: 1/27/2021 Notice of Filing Transcript
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/22/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF.(McGuirk, Kelly)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: 1/27/2021 transcriptCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/22/2020 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/1/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2021.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF.(McGuirk, Kelly)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 173 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 Notice of change of address
      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jim Walden on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. New Address: Walden Macht & Haran LLP, 250 Vesey Street, 27th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10281, (212) 335-2030..(Walden, Jim)
        LREF
        Legal Document 172 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER: By Order dated December 28, 2020, the Court provisionally granted the motion to withdraw filed by counsel for Defendant Reginald Fowler, contingent on counsels' submission of Mr. Fowler's outstanding reply brief in further support of his motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #169). Mr. Fowler's reply brief in further support of his motion to dismiss was filed on January 19, 2021. Accordingly, this Order confirms that the condition required to fully grant the motion to withdraw has been met and the motion is fully granted. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/20/2021) (jwh)
          LREF
          Legal Document 171 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: 1/19/2021 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [148] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Reginald Fowler..(Hefter, Michael)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021 Notice of change of address
            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Matthew G. Lindenbaum on behalf of Poloniex, LLC. New Address: Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough LLP, One Financial Center, Suite 3500, Boston, Massachusetts, United States 02111, 617-217-4700..(Lindenbaum, Matthew)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 169 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
              ORDER granting [159] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court is in receipt of the motion to withdraw filed by counsel for Defendant Reginald Fowler on December 11, 2020 (Dkt. #159), and counsel;s supplemental ex parte letter submitted to the Court on December 23, 2020. The Court has carefully reviewed the submissions and has heard from the parties regarding the pending motion to withdraw at a December 22, 2020 conference. Given: (i) counsel's work in this case to date with the contemporaneous knowledge they had when performing that work, and (ii) the timing of the motion to withdraw in the midst of the briefing schedule for Mr. Fowler's motion to dismiss, the Court provisionally grants the motion to withdraw, contingent on counsel's submission of Mr. Fowler's outstanding reply brief in further support of his motion to dismiss. Mr. Fowler's reply brief shall be due on or by January 19, 2021. Attorney Michael C. Hefter and Samuel Rackear terminated. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/28/2020) (nb)
                LREF
                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 1/19/2021. (nb)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Motion Hearing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2020 re: [159] MOTION for Michael C. Hefter and Samuel Rackear to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Reginald Fowler: Attorneys Caitlin Joan Halligan, Mitchell D. Nobel, and Kyle William Roche representing Plaintiffs present. Attorneys Michael Hefter and Samuel Rackear representing Defendant Reginald Fowler present. Attorneys Jim Walden and Stephanie Tsay Levick representing iFinex Defendants present. Attorney Charles Dean Cording representing Defendant Philip G. Potter present. Attorney Abby Faith Rudzin representing Defendant Bittrex, Inc., present. Mr. Hefter shall submit his ex parte letter to the Court by tomorrow, December 23, 2020. The Court defers ruling on the motion to withdraw pending review of the forthcoming ex parte submission. (Court Reporter Kelly Surina) (tn)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Motion Hearing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2020 re: [159] MOTION for Michael C. Hefter and Samuel Rackear to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Reginald Fowler: Attorneys Caitlin Joan Halligan, Mitchell D. Nobel, and Kyle William Roche representing Plaintiffs present. Attorneys Michael Hefter and Samuel Rackear representing Defendant Reginald Fowler present. Attorneys Jim Walden and Stephanie Tsay Levick representing iFinex Defendants present. Attorney Charles Dean Cording representing Defendant Philip G. Potter present. Attorney Abby Faith Rudzin representing Defendant Bittrex, Inc., present. Mr. Hefter shall submit his ex parte letter to the Court by tomorrow, December 23, 2020. The Court defers ruling on the motion to withdraw pending review of the forthcoming ex parte submission. (Court Reporter Kelly Surina) (tn)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 168 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: 12/21/2020 Response to motionCourt Filing
                      LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Caitlin Halligan, Kyle Roche and Todd Schneider dated December 21, 2020 re: [167] LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated December 17, 2020. . Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Halligan, Caitlin)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Notice - other
                        NOTICE WITH LISTEN-ONLY PUBLIC AUDIO ACCESS DIAL-IN re: [163] Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference: The conference scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 10:00 a.m. will be held via video conference with public remote access as follows: (888) 363-4749, access code 5123533. Instructions for video participants will be sent separately. ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 167 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Motion for Oral ArgumentCourt Filing
                          LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated December 17, 2020. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde..(Walden, Jim)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 166 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [146] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice on behalf of the Exchange Defendants. . Document filed by Bittrex, Inc...(Rudzin, Abby)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [144] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Philip G. Potter..(Cording, Charles)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 164 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: 12/17/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [142] MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde..(Walden, Jim)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 163 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: 12/16/2020 Order on Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [162] Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED. The videoconference scheduled for December 17, 2020 is hereby ADJOURNED to December 22, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. Instructions for accessing the videoconference will be distributed in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED.( Telephone Conference set for 12/22/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/16/20) (yv)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 162 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020, Terminated: 12/16/2020 Motion to Adjourn ConferenceCourt Filing
                                    LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference set for December 17, 2020 in connection with our Motion to Withdraw as Counsel addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael C. Hefter dated December 15, 2020. Document filed by Reginald Fowler..(Hefter, Michael)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 161 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020 Notice of appearance
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell D. Nobel on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Nobel, Mitchell)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 160 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER, The Court is in receipt of the motion to withdraw filed by counsel for Defendant Reginald Fowler on December 11, 2020. (Dkt. #159). The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a videoconference to address this matter on December 17, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. Information for accessing the conference will be distributed in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/14/20) (yv)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020, Terminated: 12/28/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                          MOTION for Michael C. Hefter and Samuel Rackear to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Reginald Fowler..(Hefter, Michael)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 158 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                            ORDER granting [157] LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [148] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael C. Hefter dated December 2, 2020. Document filed by Reginald Fowler. Application GRANTED. So ordered. (Replies due by 12/17/2020). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/2/2020) (rjm)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020, Terminated: 12/2/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [148] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael C. Hefter dated December 2, 2020. Document filed by Reginald Fowler..(Hefter, Michael)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 156 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [155] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Replies due by 12/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/19/2020) (rro)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 155 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020, Terminated: 11/19/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/replyCourt Filing
                                                  LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Further Support of Their Motions to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated November 18, 2020. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde..(Walden, Jim)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 154 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [144] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint., [148] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint., [142] MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint., [146] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice on behalf of the Exchange Defendants. . Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Halligan, Caitlin)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 153 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting [152] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/29/2020) (rro)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 152 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020, Terminated: 10/29/2020 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Response to Motions to Dismiss addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle W. Roche, Caitlin Halligan and Todd M. Schneider dated October 28, 2020. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 151 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR THE PRODUCTION AND EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...This confidentiality agreement does not bind the Court or any of its personnel. The Court can modify this stipulation at any time. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the terms and conditions of this agreement only for the pendency of this litigation. Any party wishing to make redacted or sealed submissions shall comply with Rule 6(A) of this Court's Individual Rules of Civil Procedure. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 10/27/2020) (rro)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 150 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020 Proposed Protective Order
                                                            PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 149 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [148] MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Reginald Fowler..(Hefter, Michael)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 148 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Reginald Fowler..(Hefter, Michael)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 147 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [146] MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice on behalf of the Exchange Defendants. . Document filed by Bittrex, Inc...(Rudzin, Abby)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 146 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Prejudice on behalf of the Exchange Defendants. Document filed by Bittrex, Inc...(Rudzin, Abby)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [144] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Philip G. Potter..(Cording, Charles)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 144 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Philip G. Potter..(Cording, Charles)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 143 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [142] MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde..(Walden, Jim)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 142 Filed: 9/3/2020, Entered: 9/3/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde..(Walden, Jim)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting [140] Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Court is in receipt of a request from a subset of Defendants (the "Tether Defendants") for leave to file briefs with excess pages in support of their anticipated motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #140). The Tether Defendants shall file a brief not to exceed 40 pages in support of their motion to dismiss, Plaintiffs may file a brief not to exceed 40 pages in opposition, and the Tether Defendants may file a brief not to exceed 25 pages in reply. The Court expects the parties to comply with the style and formatting requirements established by the Local Rules and Individual Rules of this Court, and the parties are not to engage in practices like changing margin or font sizes to squeeze additional text into the brief. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/19/2020) (rro)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 140 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020, Terminated: 8/19/2020 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated 08/18/2020. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde..(Walden, Jim)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 139 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020 Order on Motion for conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER: denying [135] Letter Motion for Conference. The Court is in receipt of Defendants' letter motions for a pre-motion conference (Dkt. #135-136), as well as Plaintiffs' letters in response (Dkt. #137-138). Defendants' application for a pre-motion conference is DENIED. The Court also denies Defendants Bittrex and Poloniex's request to file a motion for summary judgment because the Court does not believe summary judgment is appropriate at this early stage of litigation. The parties shall adhere to the briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motions to dismiss established by the July 7, 2020 Stipulation and Order (Dkt. #130): Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss and supporting papers on or before September 3, 2020; Plaintiffs shall their opposition papers on or before November 5, 2020; and Defendants shall file any reply papers on or before December 3, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/14/2020) (ama)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/3/2020. Responses due by 11/5/2020 Replies due by 12/3/2020. (ama)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 138 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: 8/12/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle W. Roche, Caitlin Halligan and Todd M. Schneider dated August 12, 2020 re: Response to Phillip G. Potter's Pre-Motion Letter, Dkt. 136. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Halligan, Caitlin)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 137 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: 8/12/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle W. Roche, Caitlin Halligan and Todd M. Schneider dated August 12, 2020 re: Response to Bittrex's and Poloniex's Letter Motion for Conference, Dkt. 135. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Correspondence between Bittrex, Poloniex, and Plaintiffs).(Halligan, Caitlin)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 136 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: 8/7/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Charles D. Cording dated August 7, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Philip G. Potter..(Cording, Charles)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 135 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: 8/7/2020, Terminated: 8/14/2020 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                            LETTER MOTION for Conference (Pre-Motion Conference) addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Counsel for Defendants dated August 7, 2020. Document filed by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order on Confidentiality).(Rudzin, Abby)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/3/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [133] Motion for William K. Pao to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 8/3/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020, Terminated: 8/3/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                MOTION for William K. Pao to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20945778. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William K. Pao, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing - California, # (3) Text of Proposed Order).(Pao, William)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [133] MOTION for William K. Pao to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20945778. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [131] Motion for Matthew G. Lindenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 131. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/16/2020) (js)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [131] MOTION for Matthew G. Lindenbaum, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20684275. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                        MOTION for Matthew G. Lindenbaum, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20684275. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Poloniex, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Matthew Lindenbaum, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Certificates of Good Standing).(Lindenbaum, Matthew)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document 130 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the parties, and SO ORDERED by the Court, that: 1. The current deadline of July 6, 2020, for Defendants Poloniex Inc. and Bittrex Inc. to answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint is extended as set forth herein. 2. Any pre-motion letter for an initial response to the Consolidated Amended Complaint required by Rule 4.A of the Court's Individual Rules of Practice shall be filed on or before August 7, 2020, and any responsive correspondence from Plaintiffs shall be filed within three business days thereafter. 3. All motions or other responses to the Consolidated Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before September 3, 2020, or by such other date as ordered by the Court after consideration of Defendants' pre-motion letters. 4. Plaintiffs will file any opposition papers to any motion on or before November 5, 2020; and 5. Defendants will file any reply papers on or before December 3, 2020. SO ORDERED. Bittrex, Inc. answer due 9/3/2020; Poloniex, LLC answer due 9/3/2020. (Motions due by 9/3/2020., Responses due by 11/5/2020. Replies due by 12/3/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/7/2020) (rjm)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: 7/7/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lauri Lindholm, Jr on behalf of Poloniex, LLC..(Lindholm, Robert)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Abby F. Rudzin dated July 6, 2020 re: proposed schedule for defendants' responses to the amended complaint. Document filed by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - [Proposed] Order).(Rudzin, Abby)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Aquila Holdings, Inc. for Bittrex, Inc.. Document filed by Bittrex, Inc...(Hollon, Gregory)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [125] Motion for Gregory Jude Hollon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 125. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/25/2020) (rj)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: 6/24/2020, Terminated: 6/25/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Gregory Jude Hollon to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee receipt number ANYSDC-20383809. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF GREGORY J. HOLLON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (2) Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing).(Hollon, Gregory)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [125] MOTION for Gregory Jude Hollon to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee receipt number ANYSDC-20383809. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: 6/23/2020, Terminated: 6/23/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PRO HAC VICE MOTION - MOTION for Gregory Jude Hollon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20383809. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bittrex, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF GREGORY J. HOLLON IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (2) Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing).(Hollon, Gregory) Modified on 6/23/2020 (ad).
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [124] MOTION for Gregory Jude Hollon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20383809. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the affidavit is not notarized;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (ad)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abby Faith Rudzin on behalf of Bittrex, Inc...(Rudzin, Abby)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 122 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Claire Martirosian on behalf of Bittrex, Inc...(Martirosian, Claire)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Spencer Wittmann-Todd on behalf of Bittrex, Inc...(Wittmann-Todd, Charles)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tim Brenden Fitzgerald on behalf of Bittrex, Inc...(Fitzgerald, Tim)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Poloniex, LLC served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren. Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz; Jason Leibowitz; Aaron Leibowitz; Matthew Script; Pinchas Goldshtein..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Bittrex, Inc. served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren. Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz; Jason Leibowitz; Aaron Leibowitz; Matthew Script; Pinchas Goldshtein..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles Dean Cording on behalf of Philip G. Potter..(Cording, Charles)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: 6/8/2020 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bittrex, Inc., Poloniex, LLC..(pne)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Poloniex, LLC and Bittrex, Inc., re: [114] Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint,,,,, against BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Bittrex, Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Poloniex, LLC, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Aaron Leibowitz, Matthew Script, Pinchas Goldshtein. Related document: [1] Complaint,,,,,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Granted Motion for Leave to File Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint).(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: 6/5/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting [112] Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/5/2020) (rro) Modified on 6/9/2020 (rro).
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020, Terminated: 6/5/2020 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File the Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthew Script..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Kyle William Roche to RE-FILE Document No. [111] Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request was not be processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                                                                                                                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Kyle William Roche to RE-FILE re: Document No. [110] Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; Amended must be on the PDF; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected (Poloniex, LLC was not selected); due to deficient filing on the due date, Court's leave must be granted. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 111 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: 6/3/2020 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Poloniex, LLC and Bittrex, Inc., re: [110] Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Matthrew Script..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 110 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: 6/3/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending [1] Complaint,,,,, against BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Aaron Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein. Related document: [1] Complaint,,,,,. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1).(Roche, Kyle) Modified on 6/4/2020 (jgo).
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Add Party for Pleading
                                                                                                                                                            ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Poloniex, LLC, Bittrex, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to [110] Amended Complaint,,.Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Aaron Leibowitz, Matthrew Script, Pinchas Goldshtein. Related document: [110] Amended Complaint,,..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 109 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: 5/14/2020 Case Management PlanCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: Leibowitz, et al. v. iFinex, Inc., et al., No. 19 Civ. 9236 is designated as the lead action for the consolidated actions. All pleadings and filings related to the consolidated actions shall be made in that docket and shall bear the caption "In re Tether and Bitfinex Crypto If a case arises out of the same subject matter as the Action, whether brought as a class action or however styled, and is filed in or transferred to this Court, the Court will direct the clerk to file a copy of this Order in the separate file for that case; consolidate that case with the Action for pretrial purposes by transferring that case to the docket for the Action; and close the docket for that case. Asset Litigation" (the "Action"). If the Action is certified as a class action, or as otherwise appropriate, the Court may award reasonable attorney's fees and costs pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(h). Nothing in this Order limits, restricts, or infringes upon the Court's plenary authority regarding whether and to what extent to award fees and costs in the Action, and at which rates. This Order and its terms shall not constitute a waiver by any party of any claims in or defenses to the Action or any consolidated case and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/14/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 108 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Caitlin Halligan dated May 11, 2020 re: Proposed Case Management Order. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1).(Halligan, Caitlin)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 107 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: 5/8/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' proposed case management order and accompanying letter (Dkt. #103), as well as Defendants' letter raising certain objections to Plaintiff's proposed case management order (Dkt. #106). The Court understands from Defendants' letter that the parties disagree on two portions of the proposed order: (i) Defendants object to language in Paragraph Three, Subsection J of the proposed order, stating that interim lead counsel would have the sole authority, until further action of the Court, to conduct trial on behalf of Plaintiffs and putative class members; and (ii) Defendants object to Paragraphs Four through Eighteen of the proposed order, addressing the reasonable fees and expenses that might be reimbursed "[i]f the Action is certified as a class action, or as otherwise appropriate." The Court addresses each disagreement in turn. First, interim class counsel for Plaintiffs are directed to conform the language appearing in Paragraph Three, Subsection J of the proposed order to comport better with the authority conveyed to interim class counsel pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g)(3). Specifically, a further order of the Court certifying a class would be required for interim class counsel to represent putative class members at trial. Second, the Court declines to provide an advisory opinion as to what would constitute reasonable attorneys' fees or costs, should circumstances arise in which Plaintiffs became entitled to recover such fees and costs. Interim class counsel is, of course, welcome to create internal guidance concerning how it will bill its time and costs in this matter. But such guidance will not be adopted by the Court in a vacuum, much less at this very early stage in the proceedings. Paragraph Four of the proposed case management order adequately describes the possibility of an award of attorneys' fees and costs and is acceptable to the Court. Paragraphs Five through Eighteen are not acceptable. The parties are ORDERED to conform the proposed case management order with the directives provided in this Order and file a revised proposed case management order for further review. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/7/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 106 Filed: 5/6/2020, Entered: 5/6/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated May 6, 2020 re: Response to Plaintiffs Letter to the Court (Dkt. No. 103) and Proposed Case Management Order (Dkt. No. 103-1). Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc...(Walden, James)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: 4/30/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [104] Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/30/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 104 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: 4/30/2020, Terminated: 4/30/2020 Motion for Leave to file documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiffs proposed Case Management Order and corresponding letter to the Court (Dkt. No. 103) addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated 04.30.2020. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc...(Walden, James)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 103 Filed: 4/29/2020, Entered: 4/29/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Caitlin Halligan dated April 29, 2020 re: Proposed Case Management Order. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6).(Halligan, Caitlin)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 102 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER granting [101] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the parties, and SO ORDERED by the Court, that: Plaintiffs shall file their Consolidated Amended Complaint by June 3, 2020. Defendants will file any Motion to Dismiss within 60 days after the filing of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs will file any opposition papers within 60 days after the filing of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants will file any reply papers within 30 days after the filing of Plaintiffs' opposition papers. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 4/8/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020, Terminated: 4/9/2020 motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Consolidated Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Caitlin Halligan dated April 8, 2020. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Halligan, Caitlin)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2020. (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [6] Motion for Devin (Velvel) Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 6.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/6/2020) (rro) Modified on 3/9/2020 (rro).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 99 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HERE BY STIPULATED AND AGREED among the parties that: The parties agree to the following schedule: a. Plaintiffs have requested up to 60 days to file their Consolidated Amended Complaint. Defendants do not object. As such, within 60 days after the issuance of this order, Plaintiffs will file their Consolidated Amended Complaint. b. Defendants will file any Motion to Dismiss within 60 days after the filing of Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint. c. Plaintiffs will file any opposition papers within 60 days after the filing of Defendants; Motion to Dismiss. d. Defendants will file any reply papers within 30 days after the filing of Plaintiffs' opposition papers. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/5/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 98 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: 3/5/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Caitlin Halligan dated March 5, 2020 re: proposed schedule for the filing of a consolidated amended complaint and the briefing of any subsequent motion to dismiss. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Halligan, Caitlin)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/27/2020 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ORAL ARGUMENT held on 2/24/2020 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2020..(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 95 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Rackear on behalf of Reginald Fowler..(Rackear, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Telephone Hearing held on 2/27/2020 re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel filed by Eric Young, Adam Kurtz, David Crystal, (78 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Joseph Ebanks: For the reasons set forth on the record, the Leibowitz Plaintiffs' motion to appoint Lead Counsel is GRANTED, and the Young and Faubus Plaintiffs' motions are denied. (Court Reporter Pamela Utter) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Veronica Maria Wayner on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde..(Wayner, Veronica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Joseph Chirlin on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde..(Chirlin, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 2/27/2020 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Oral Argument
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katherine Polk Failla: Oral Argument held on 2/24/2020 re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel filed by Eric Young, Adam Kurtz, David Crystal, (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel filed by Joseph Ebanks: Attorneys Kyle William Roche, Todd Michael Schneider, Matthew Sinclair Weiler, Caitlin Joan Halligan and Joseph Michael Delich representing the Leibowitz Plaintiffs present. Attorneys Karen M. Lerner, John D. Ridce, David E. Kovel and Anthony Epifanio Maneiro representing the Young Plaintiffs present. Attorney Gregory Bradley Link representing Plaintiff Faubus present. Attorneys Brian E. Cochran and Samuel Howard Rudman representing Plaintiff Ebanks present. Attorneys Jim Walden, Veronica Wayner and Daniel Chirlin representing iFinex Defendants present. The Court defers ruling on motions at this time. The next conference, to be held telephonically, is scheduled for 2/27/2020 at 4:00 p.m. At the appointed time, the parties are directed to call the conference system at (888) 363-4749, and enter access code 6624801. Please note that the conference line will not be available until the scheduled time (4:00 p.m.). (Court Reporter Khris Sellin) Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 92 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz..(Kim, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: 2/19/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [90] Motion for Matthew S. Weiler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 90. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/19/2020) (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020, Terminated: 2/19/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Matthew S. Weiler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Matthew S. Weiler, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Weiler Affidavit, # (3) Text of Proposed Order).(Weiler, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [90] MOTION for Matthew S. Weiler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Pro Hac Filing Fee $200 Receipt No. ANYSDC-18834285 The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 89 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Whitney Boardman on behalf of Joseph Ebanks..(Boardman, Erin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for oral argument concerning the pending motions to appoint interim lead class counsel on February 24, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 2/24/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re: [58] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2).(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (82) Motion for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-09236-KPF. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 82 of Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., 19 Civ. 9236 (KPF). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 2/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Kyle William Roche to RE-FILE Document [78] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Use the event type Response to Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 85 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [69] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz..(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re: (78 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel., (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. . Document filed by David Crystal, Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF.(Kovel, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re: [78] MOTION to Appoint Counsel . [24] MOTION to Appoint Counsel in 1:20-cv-00169. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks..(Cochran, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020, Terminated: 2/11/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MOTION for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brian E. Cochran, # (2) Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order).(Cochran, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [82] AMENDED MOTION for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020, Terminated: 2/5/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18701890. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks, Joseph Ebanks. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Brian E. Cochran, # (2) Exhibit A - Certificates of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order).(Cochran, Brian) Modified on 2/5/2020 (aea).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [81] MOTION for Brian E. Cochran to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18701890. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from SUPREME COURT OF CALIFORNIA; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: On January 17, 2020, the Court ordered that all counsel seeking to be heard regarding the appointment of lead interim counsel to file their papers on or before January 27, 2020. The Court recognizes that certain counsel had filed motions to be appointed lead interim counsel prior to January 27, 2020, giving other counsel the opportunity to file opposition papers to those pending motions on January 27, 2020. In the interest of allowing interested counsel an equal opportunity to oppose motions to be appointed lead interim counsel, the Court will permit counsel to file papers opposing lead interim counsel motions that were filed on January 27, 2020. Such opposition papers shall be filed on or before February 7, 2020. ( Responses due by 2/7/2020) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/28/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. Plaintiff Bryan Faubus's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel. Document filed by Bryan Faubus. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(Linkh, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. [72] Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020, Terminated: 1/27/2020 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Roche, Kyle) Modified on 2/11/2020 (ldi).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philippe Zuard Selendy on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Selendy, Philippe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Joan Halligan on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Halligan, Caitlin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re: (58 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel., (24 in 1:20-cv-00169-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Kirby McInerney LLP and the Radice Law Firm as Interim Lead Counsel., (69 in 1:19-cv-09236-KPF) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by David Crystal, Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF(Lerner, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 74 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Maria Ginzburg on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Ginzburg, Maria)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Riggs Dunlap on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Dunlap, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks. Related Document Number: [69]. (Rudman, Samuel) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 71 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [69] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. . Document filed by Joseph Ebanks. (Rudman, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman in Support re: [69] MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel.. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Firm Resume)(Rudman, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 69 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020, Terminated: 2/27/2020 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks.(Rudman, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karen M. Lerner on behalf of David Crystal, Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. (Lerner, Karen)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting (61) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:19-cv-09236-KPF; granting (27) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 1:20-cv-00169-KPF. The Court is in receipt of the parties' January 16, 2020 joint motion in Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236, Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169, Faubus v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 211, seeking to consolidate the matters. The Court is also in receipt of a letter dated January 24, 2020, filed in Ebanks v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 453, requesting that the Court consolidate that matter with Leibowitz, Young, and Faubus as well. The parties' motions are GRANTED. The following actions are hereby consolidated: a. Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236; b. Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169; c. Faubus v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 211; d. Ebanks v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 453. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/24/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-09236-KPF, 1:20-cv-00169-KPF, 1:20-cv-00211-KPF, 1:20-cv-00453-KPF (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE CANCELING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The initial pretrial conference currently scheduled for February 7, 2020 is adjourned sine die. ***No PDF is attached to this entry. (tn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the parties' joint motion in the above-captioned cases, seeking to consolidate the matters, set a briefing schedule for motions to appoint interim lead counsel, and adjourn the current deadline for Defendants in Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236 to file a motion to dismiss. The Court will address the parties' motion to consolidate after it receives Plaintiffs letter in Ebanks v. iFinex, Inc., 20 Civ. 453, letter regarding the same. All counsel seeking to be heard regarding the pending motions to appoint lead interim counsel shall file their papers on or before January 27, 2020. No later than seven days after the appointment of interim lead counsel, counsel for Defendants and interim lead counsel for Plaintiffs shall submit a proposed scheduling order setting forth deadlines for the filing of a consolidated amended complaint and any anticipated motion to dismiss. The briefing schedule concerning an anticipated motion to dismiss in Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236 is hereby ADJOURNED sine die. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/17/2020) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: 1/17/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Samuel H. Rudman dated January 17, 2020 re: Consolidation and Motions for Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Joseph Ebanks.(Rudman, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amos Emory Friedland on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Friedland, Amos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward John Normand on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Normand, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Colin Cyrulnik on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Cyrulnik, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020, Terminated: 1/27/2020 Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-cv-00169; 20-cv-00211 addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle W. Roche dated January 16, 2020. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Constantine Philip Economides on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Economides, Constantine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Court recently received Young v. iFinex, Inc., No. 20 Civ. 169, as a case related to a previously assigned case, Leibowitz v. iFinex, Inc., No. 19 Civ. 9236. The parties in both cases are hereby ORDERED to provide the Court with a letter brief, not to exceed five pages in length, stating their positions regarding whether the two cases should be consolidated. These letter briefs shall be filed on or before January 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 1/13/2020) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020, Terminated: 2/27/2020 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion to Appoint Roche Freedman LLP and Schneider Wallace Cottrell Konecky LLP as Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kyle W. Roche, # (2) Exhibit 1 to Roche Declaration, # (3) Declaration of Jason H Kim, # (4) Exhibit 1 to Kim Declaration)(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [56] Letter re: intent to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Reginald Fowler. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/20/2019) (rj)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael C. Hefter dated December 20, 2019 re: intent to file a motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Document filed by Reginald Fowler.(Hefter, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [54] Letter filed by Tether Limited, Giancarlo Devasini, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendants Ludovicus Jan van der Velde, Giancarlo Devasini, and Tether Limited shall file their motions to dismiss pursuant to the same schedule established in the Court's Order of December 3, 2019. (Dkt. #43). (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/17/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated 12/17/2019 re: Pre-Motion Letter for Permission to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde.(Walden, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Beal on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Beal, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sunjina Kaur Ahuja on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Ahuja, Sunjina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Jason Lee on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Lee, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Tsay Levick on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Levick, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Arthur Cohen on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Cohen, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Walden on behalf of Giancarlo Devasini, Tether Limited, Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Walden, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: [46] Letter filed by Reginald Fowler. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. In light of Plaintiffs' and Defendant Fowler's agreement, the certificate of default entered against Defendant Fowler is hereby VACATED. (Dkt. # 44). Defendant Fowler is ORDERED to instruct the Court on or before December 20, 2019, whether he intends to file a motion to dismiss or answer Plaintiffs' complaint. If Defendant Fowler intends to move to dismiss the complaint, the Court will permit Defendant Fowler to proceed under the same briefing schedule already set for certain other defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/06/2019) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Michael C. Hefter dated December 6, 2019 re: the Certificate of Default and placing Defendant Reginald Fowler on the same briefing schedule as the Corporate Defendants set forth in the Courts Scheduling Order [43]. Document filed by Reginald Fowler.(Hefter, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Clerk Certificate of Mailing Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 (ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51) mailed to Ludovicus Jan van der Velde at 27 Lo Wai Tsuen Pui O Lantau, Island, Hong Kong on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 DG 9634 4523, as per [38] Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/3/2019. (smc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Clerk Certificate of Mailing Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 (ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51) mailed to Tether Limited c/o Proxy Secretarial Services Limited, ROOM 803 K. Wah Centre 191 Java Road, North Point, Hong Kong on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 67 6301 2293, as per [39] Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 12/2/2019. (smc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Clerk Certificate of Mailing Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RECEIVED for one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51 mailed to Giancarlo Devasini at 87 Avenue Winston Churchill 06190 Roquebrune-Cap-Martin, France on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 DG 9634 3426, as per [37] Clerk Certificate of Mailing, RECEIVED ON: 11/29/2019. (smc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael C. Hefter on behalf of Reginald Fowler. (Hefter, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Clerk's Certificate of DefaultCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Vacated as per Judge's Order dated 12/06/2019, Doc. # 47 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Reginald Fowler. (km) Modified on 12/6/2019 (ama).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: On November 15, Defendants Tether Holdings Limited, Tether Operations Limited, Tether International Limited, iFinex Inc., BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., and DigFinex Inc. (together, "Corporate Defendants") filed a letter requesting leave to file a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #28). Plaintiffs replied to that letter indicating that they do not oppose the filing of a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #35). The Court ordered Plaintiffs to advise the Court as to whether they would like to amend their complaint, and what steps they contemplated taking regarding defendants that have not yet appeared in this action. (Dkt. #36). On December 2, 2019, Plaintiffs advised the Court that they did not wish to amend their complaint, and that several defendants had just been, or would soon be, served. (Dkt. #40). In an effort to balance the interest of the Defendants that have appeared in progressing the case and filing a motion to dismiss, as well as the potential interest of the Defendants who have yet to appear in joining such a motion to dismiss, the Court will set the following briefing schedule: Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss on or before February 3, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file their opposition papers on or before March 9, 2020, and Defendants shall file their reply papers, if any, on or before March 23, 2020. The Court will keep the initial pretrial conference, currently scheduled for 3:00 p.m. on February 7, 2020, in Courtroom 618 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, on the calendar, in order to address any issues of service remaining at that time. (Motions due by 2/3/2020. Responses due by 3/9/2020 Replies due by 3/23/2020.) (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 12/3/2019) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Joseph M. Delich in Support re: [41] Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Delich, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Delich, Joseph) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle W. Roche dated December 2, 2019 re: ECF No. 36. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz.(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 (ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51) mailed to Tether Limited c/o Proxy Secretarial Services Limited, ROOM 803 K. Wah Centre 191 Java Road, North Point, Hong Kong on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 67 6301 2293, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (smc) Modified on 12/3/2019 (smc).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 (ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51) mailed to Ludovicus Jan van der Velde at 27 Lo Wai Tsuen Pui O Lantau, Island, Hong Kong on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 DG 9634 4523, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (smc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of one copy of the Summons(ECF No. 7) and Complaint (ECF No. 1) with Exhibits 1-51 ECf Nos. 1-1 through 1-51 mailed to Giancarlo Devasini at 87 Avenue Winston Churchill 06190 Roquebrune-Cap-Martin, France on 11/26/2019 by UPS tracking # 1Z 6Y2 F45 DG 9634 3426, to the individual of the foreign state, pursuant to the provisions of FRCP 4(f)2(c)(ii). (smc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [35] Letter, filed by Aaron Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz. ENDORSEMENT: On November 15, Defendants Tether Holdings Limited, Tether Operations Limited, Tether International Limited, iFinex Inc., BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., and DigFinex Inc. (together, "Corporate Defendants") filed a letter requesting leave to file a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #28). Plaintiffs have replied to that letter indicating that they do not oppose the filing of a motion to dismiss. (Dkt. #35). Plaintiffs are directed to notify the Court on or before December 2, 2019: (i) whether they wish to amend their complaint in light of Defendants' pre-motion letter; and (ii) what steps they contemplate taking regarding the individual defendants that have not yet appeared in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Kyle Roche dated 11/20/2019 re: 11/15/2019 Letter from Jim Walden (ECF No. 28). Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz.(Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [30] Motion for Jason H. Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of the Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 30. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) (kv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [31] MOTION for Todd Michael Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 31. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [29] MOTION for Kyle Geoffrey Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 29. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/20/2019) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [31] MOTION for Todd Michael Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18099575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [29] MOTION for Kyle Geoffrey Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-18099312. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [30] MOTION for Jason H Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18099548. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019, Terminated: 11/20/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Todd Michael Schneider to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18099575. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF TODD M. SCHNEIDER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (2) Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing)(Schneider, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019, Terminated: 11/20/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Jason H Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18099548. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF JASON H. KIM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (2) Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing)(Kim, Jason)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019, Terminated: 11/20/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Kyle Geoffrey Bates to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-18099312. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF KYLE G. BATES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (2) Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing)(Bates, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jim Walden dated 11/15/2019 re: Pre-Motion Letter for Permission to File Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc..(Walden, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Reginald Fowler served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. Service was accepted by Reginald Fowler. Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz; David Leibowitz; Jason Leibowitz; Aaron Leibowitz; Pinchas Goldshtein. (Delich, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Philip G. Potter served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz; David Leibowitz; Jason Leibowitz; Aaron Leibowitz; Pinchas Goldshtein. (Delich, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. BFXNA Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; BFXWW Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; DigFinex Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Tether Holdings Limited served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Tether International Limited served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; Tether Operations Limited served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019; iFinex Inc. served on 10/29/2019, answer due 11/19/2019. Service was accepted by Al-Shaddai Ramsarran. Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz; David Leibowitz; Jason Leibowitz; Aaron Leibowitz; Pinchas Goldshtein. (Delich, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [20] Motion for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 20. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/8/2019) (va) Modified on 11/19/2019 (va).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [19] Motion for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 19.(Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/8/2019) (va) Modified on 11/19/2019 (va).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [21] Motion for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket entry 21. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/8/2019) (va) Modified on 11/19/2019 (va).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [21] AMENDED MOTION for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [19] AMENDED MOTION for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [20] AMENDED MOTION for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019, Terminated: 11/8/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED MOTION for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher J. Beal, # (2) Proposed Order)(Beal, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019, Terminated: 11/8/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sunjina K. Ahuja, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ahuja, Sunjina)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019, Terminated: 11/8/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED MOTION for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Jason Lee, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lee, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Order for Initial Pretrial ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 11/4/2019) (rro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Tsay Levick on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Levick, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Arthur Cohen on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Cohen, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Walden on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Walden, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [12] MOTION for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17879923. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [14] MOTION for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17880351. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [13] MOTION for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17880317. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California. We do not except certificates from state bar of California.;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019, Terminated: 11/4/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christopher J. Beal to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17880351. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Christopher J. Beal, # (2) Proposed Order)(Beal, Christopher) Modified on 11/4/2019 (bcu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019, Terminated: 11/4/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sunjina K. Ahuja to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17880317. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Sunjina K. Ahuja, # (2) Proposed Order)(Ahuja, Sunjina) Modified on 11/4/2019 (bcu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019, Terminated: 11/4/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Michael Jason Lee to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17879923. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., DigFinex Inc., Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Jason Lee, # (2) Proposed Order)(Lee, Michael) Modified on 11/4/2019 (bcu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #17) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Tsay Levick on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Levick, Stephanie) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ldi).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #16) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Arthur Cohen on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Cohen, Daniel) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ldi).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #15) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Walden on behalf of BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Walden, James) Modified on 11/4/2019 (ldi).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle William Roche on behalf of Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Roche, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [6] AMENDED MOTION for Devin (Velvel) Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 3/6/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED MOTION for Devin (Velvel) Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected Motion). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Devin (Velvel) Freedman, # (2) Exhibit D.C. Court of Appeal Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Freedman, Devin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 10/7/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Devin Freedman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Exhibit A - DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Freedman, Devin) Modified on 10/7/2019 (aea).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019, Terminated: 10/7/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17729368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (2) Affidavit of Devin Freedman in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # (3) Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Freedman, Devin) Modified on 10/7/2019 (aea).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to IFINEX INC., BFXNA INC., BFXWW INC., TETHER HOLDINGS LIMITED, TETHER OPERATIONS LIMITED, TETHER LIMITED, TETHER INTERNATIONAL LIMITED, DIGFINEX INC., PHILIP G. POTTER, GIANCARLO DEVASINI, LUDOVICUS JAN VAN DER VELDE, REGINALD FOWLER, CRYPTO CAPITAL CORP., and GLOBAL TRADE SOLUTIONS AG, re: [1] Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by Pinchas Goldshtein, Aaron Leibowitz, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz. (Delich, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Delich, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [5] MOTION for Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Florida Supreme Court;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. [4] MOTION for Devin Freedman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17729368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Florida Supreme Court; Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Joseph Michael Delich. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Michael Delich. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde, Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Aaron Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/6/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against BFXNA Inc., BFXWW Inc., Crypto Capital Corp., Giancarlo Devasini, DigFinex Inc., Reginald Fowler, Global Trade Solutions AG, Philip G. Potter, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc., Ludovicus Jan van der Velde. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17724400)Document filed by Benjamin Leibowitz, David Leibowitz, Jason Leibowitz, Aaron Leibowitz, Pinchas Goldshtein. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 28, # (29) Exhibit 29, # (30) Exhibit 30, # (31) Exhibit 31, # (32) Exhibit 32, # (33) Exhibit 33, # (34) Exhibit 34, # (35) Exhibit 35, # (36) Exhibit 36, # (37) Exhibit 37, # (38) Exhibit 38, # (39) Exhibit 39, # (40) Exhibit 40, # (41) Exhibit 41, # (42) Exhibit 42, # (43) Exhibit 43, # (44) Exhibit 44, # (45) Exhibit 45, # (46) Exhibit 46, # (47) Exhibit 47, # (48) Exhibit 48, # (49) Exhibit 49, # (50) Exhibit 50, # (51) Exhibit 51)(Delich, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 342 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?