USA, et al v. Alcazar-Huerta
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00002-SMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Spears Bradley +1 662 234 3351 susan.bradley@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Yuma
Terminated 4/2/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-02861
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and enhanced by (b)(2) RE-ENTRY AFTER DEPORTATION
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and enhanced by (b)(2) RE-ENTRY AFTER DEPORTATION
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001 Judgment Returned Executed
JUDGMENT and commitment returned executed upon Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta 5/2/01 location of FCI-SAF, Safford, AZ started. (former emp)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
    STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta by Judge Stephen M. McNamee cc: pb/smm (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta sentencing for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta (1) count(s) 1. Committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for THIRTY STREE (33) MOS with CREDIT for TIME SERVED; SUPERVISED RELEASE for THREE (3) YRS; SA:$100 , Case closed ; ordered by Judge Stephen M. McNamee cc: pb/smm (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Plea Agreement
        PLEA agreement filed as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 4/4/01) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee Ct Rptr: DLee Interpreter: Louis Velasco granting oral motion for 3 level downwad departure by USA as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta [0-0], granting oral motion for further downward departure due to overstatement of the dft's criminal history by Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta [0-0] ; sentencing held for Luis F Alcazar-Huerta ; see judgment and commitment for full text [cc: pb/pts/usa/cnsl] [21-2] (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Motion for Departure
            ORAL MOTION for 3 level downwad departure by USA as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta [0-0] (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Motion for Departure
              ORAL MOTION for further departure by Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta [0-0] (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee: at the request of the US Probation Officer sentencing reset for 11:30 4/2/01 for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta; recommends the court accept the plea agreement and the dft's plea of guilty to the indictment (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    ( FILED: 2/20/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver: Interpreter: Sary Tavrytsky Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , plea agreement lodged as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta , ; sentencing set for 1:30 3/12/01 for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta , presentence investigation ordered ; remanded to the US Marshal [cc: usm/pb/pts/usa/cnsl/intrp/smm] [18-5] (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee and consent of Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta for referral to Magistrate Judge Morton Sitver for change of plea. (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        PAYMENT voucher by Judge Stephen M. McNamee as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta for CJA atty Robert James McWhirter (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Order
                          MINUTE ORDER , ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 9:30 2/13/01 for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta cc: ausa/fpd [15-3] (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            PAYMENT voucher by Judge Stephen M. McNamee as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta for CJA atty Robert James McWhirter (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              ( FILED: 1/11/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer dft Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta arraigned; not guilty to all counts of the indictment entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta ; trial set for 9:00 3/6/01 for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta [cc: pts/usa/cnsl/intrp] [13-3] (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Indictment
                                  INDICTMENT by USA attorney Susan S Bradley. Counts filed against Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta (1) count(s) 1 (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER appointing counsel Robert McWhirter for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta by Mag Judge Morton Sitver re: order [10-1] [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                      ( FILED: 12/21/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer appointing counsel for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta Robert James McWhirter and terminating attorney James Franklin Metcalf for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta [9-2] [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin granting motion to extend time to indict is filed by dft Alcazar-Huerta [7-1] excludable delay XT started on the 31st day after arrest for a total of 30 days in which the govenment may present the case to the grand jury [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 7 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000, Terminated: 12/14/2000 Motion to Extend Time
                                          MOTION to extend time to indict is filed by dft Alcazar-Huerta [7-1] [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben; dft Alcazar-Huerta present w/cnsl; prelim hrg held and dft held to answer before the District Court; cas transferred to Phoenix; appointment of cnsl hrg is set for 12/21/00 at 11a.m. before Mag Judge Mathis [6-1] re: minute entry [6-1] [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                              ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta re: detention order [5-1] [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                ( FILED: 12/5/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben dft Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta appears with counsel James Franklin Metcalf; dft detained; prelim hrg is set for 12/14/00 at 1:30 p.m. before this Court [4-2] [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/2/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER of temporary detention as to dft Alcazar-Huerta by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin re: order [3-1] [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/2/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    ( FILED: 12/2/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben first appearance of Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta ; informed of rights, charges, etc. dft present w/out cnsl; detention hrg is set for 12/5/00 at 1:30 p.m. SPANISH for Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta. [2-3] [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/2/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT filed as to Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Arrest
                                                        DEFENDANT Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta arrested. Luis Fernando Alcazar-Huerta (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -2861 ] (PHR)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?