USA, et al v. Carrillo-Lopez
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00003-SRB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Jennis Settel +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7450 lisa.settel@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Yuma
Terminated 4/9/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-02908
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and enhanced by (b)(2) - Re-entry After Deportation
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and enhanced by (b)(2) - Re-entry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 23 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Jose Carrillo-Lopez by Judge Susan R. Bolton (LAD)
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Plea Agreement
    PLEA agreement filed as to Jose Carrillo-Lopez (LAD)
      LREF
      Blank 22 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Jose Carrillo-Lopez sentencing for Jose Carrillo-Lopez (1) count(s) 1. Dft is committed to BOP for 57 mos on count 1, with credit for time served; upon release, dft placed on supervised release for 3 years on count 1; S/A $100.00 ; Case closed ; ordered by Judge Susan R. Bolton (LAD)
        LREF
        Blank 21 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        ( FILED: 4/9/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim R Myrick Interpreter: Louis Velasco - SPANISH ; sentencing held ; granting oral motion for downward departure due to 5K2.0 by USA as to Jose Carillo-Lopez [0-0] [21-2] (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Motion for Departure
          ORAL MOTION for downward departure due to 5K2.0 by USA as to Jose Carillo-Lopez [0-0] (LAD)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Memorandum
            Sentencing Memorandum filed by Jose Carrillo-Lopez (LAD)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue sentencing (set for 3/19/01) by Jose Carrillo-Lopez [18-1] sentencing reset for 3:00 4/9/01 for Jose Carrillo-Lopez , before Judge Susan R. Bolton (LAD)
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001, Terminated: 3/6/2001 Motion to Continue
                MOTION to continue sentencing (set for 3/19/01) by Jose Carrillo-Lopez [18-1] (1st request) (LAD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  MINUTE ORDER sentencing reset for 2:00 3/19/01 for Jose Carrillo-Lopez , before Judge Susan R. Bolton [17-3] (LAD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    PAYMENT voucher by Judge Susan R. Bolton as to Jose Carrillo-Lopez for CJA atty Jay R Cairns (LAD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      ( FILED: 1/22/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer - SPANISH Jose Carrillo-Lopez (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , plea agreement lodged as to Jose Carrillo-Lopez , presentence investigation ordered , ; trial vacated ; plea hrg held ; sentencing set for 3:00 3/12/01 for Jose Carrillo-Lopez , before Judge Susan R. Bolton ; dft remanded to custody of US Marshal [15-6] (LAD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 14 Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 1:30 1/22/01 for Jose Carrillo-Lopez , before Judge Susan R. Bolton [14-3] (LAD)
                          LREF
                          Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          ( FILED: 1/12/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer - SPANISH dft Jose Carrillo-Lopez arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Jose Carrillo- Lopez; trial set for 9:00 3/6/01 for Jose Carrillo-Lopez , before Judge Susan R. Bolton [cc: all counsel] [13-4] (LAD)
                            LREF
                            Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                            NOTICE issued; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Jose Carrillo-Lopez before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (LAD)
                              LREF
                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Indictment
                              INDICTMENT by USA attorney Lisa E Jennis. Counts filed against Jose Carrillo-Lopez (1) count(s) 1 (LAD)
                                LREF
                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER appointing Jon Sands counsel for Jose Carrillo-Lopez by Mag Judge Morton Sitver re: order [10-1] [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  ( FILED: 12/22/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Ct Rptr: S00-200; Spanish Interpreter: Gloria Segien appointing counsel for Jose Carrillo-Lopez Jon M Sands and terminating attorney Jay Randall Cairns for Jose Carrillo-Lopez [cc: Inter, MS] [9-2] [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin granting motion to Extend Time to Indict [7-1] excludable delay interest of justice started [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000, Terminated: 12/19/2000 Motion to Extend Time
                                      MOTION to Extend Time to Indict[7-1] by Jose Carrillo-Lopez [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        ( FILED: 12/12/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Ct Rptr: 00-254 & 00-255: Spanish Interpreter: Kathy Schaben prelimianry hearing held, probable cause found, dft held to answer before USDC; appointment of counsel hearing set for 12/22/00 at 11:00 before Mag Judge Morton Sitver as to Jose Carillo-Lopez [cc: All Counsel] [6-2] [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                          ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Jose Carrillo-Lopez re: detention order [5-1] [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            ( FILED: 12/12/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Ct Rptr: 00-247 & 00-248 Spanish Interpreter: Kathy Schaben dft Jose Carrillo-Lopez appears with counsel Jay Randall Cairns , detention hearing held, dft detained as a flight risk; preliminary hearing set for 12/19/00 at 1:30 before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to dft Jose Carrillo-Lopez [cc: All Counsel] [4-3] [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM) Modified on 12/29/2000
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                              ORDER of temporary detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Jose Carrillo-Lopez re: detention order [3-1] [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/10/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                ( FILED: 12/10/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Ct Rptr: 00-242 (2154-3077) Interpreter: Kathy Schaben Bond set to SPANISH for Jose Carrillo-Lopez. , first appearance of Jose Carrillo-Lopez ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , detention hearing set for 12/12/00 at 1:30 before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin [cc: All Counsel] [2-4] [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/10/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT filed as to Jose Carrillo-Lopez [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/9/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Arrest
                                                    DEFENDANT Jose Carrillo-Lopez arrested. Jose Carrillo-Lopez (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -2908 ] (SMM)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 43 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?