USA, et al v. Lua-Madrigal
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00004-SRB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul V Rood +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7450 Paul.Rood@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 8/12/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-02929
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1)and 841(b)(1)(A)(viii) Possession With Intent to Distribute
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 952A=CI.F
Offense Level 4
21952(a) 960(a)and 960(b)(1)(H) Importation of a Controlled Substance
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 952A=CI.F
Offense Level 4
21952(a) 960(a)and 960(b)(1)(H) Importation of a Controlled Substance
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (90) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 86 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002 OrderCourt Filing
PAYMENT voucher by Judge Susan R. Bolton as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal for CJA atty David M Ochoa (DMT)
    LREF
    Blank 85 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal Samuel Lua-Madrigal (1) count(s) 2. Dismissed on government's oral motion at sentencing , sentencing for Samuel Lua-Madrigal (1) count(s) 1. Custody of BOP for term of ONE HUNDRED TWENTY (120) MOS, with credit for time served, followed by supervised release for term of FIVE (5) YRS S/A:$100 , remanded to custody of USM Case ; ordered by Judge Susan R. Bolton. [cc:usm, prob, pts, cnsl, immigration, order book, finance] (DMT)
      LREF
      Blank 84 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
      ( FILED: 8/16/02) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton . Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick . finding the motion for downward departure [70-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal moot. ; sentencing held as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal, Per stipulation of counsel, Court grants a downward departure see jgm and commitment [84-2] (DMT)
        LREF
        Blank 83 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 Plea Agreement
        PLEA agreement filed as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
          LREF
          Blank 82 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Other Notice
          NOTICE re letter for court's consideration at sentencing by dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal as to dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
            LREF
            Blank 81 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue sentencing of 7/8/02 [80-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal sentencing reset for 3:30 8/12/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc:usm, prob, pts, cnsl] (DMT)
              LREF
              Blank 80 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002, Terminated: 7/8/2002 Motion to Continue
              MOTION to continue sentencing of 7/8/02 [80-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                LREF
                Blank 79 Filed: 7/1/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Sentencing Memorandum
                SENTENCING memorandum filed as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 78 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton. Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick. Oral motion by dft to continue sentencing is granted ; sentencing reset for 1:30 7/8/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [78-2] (CMM)
                    LREF
                    Blank 77 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Order
                    MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing reset from 6/24/02 to 9:30 6/25/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc:usm, prob, pts, cnsl] [77-2] (DMT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 76 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue sentencing of 6/3/02 [75-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal sentencing reset for 1:00 6/24/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc:usm, prob, pts, cnsl] (DMT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 75 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002, Terminated: 6/5/2002 Motion to Continue
                        MOTION to continue sentencing of 6/3/02 [75-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 74 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/28/2002 Sentencing Memorandum
                          SENTENCING memorandum filed as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                            LREF
                            Blank 73 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE by pla to dfts' objections to presentence report as to dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 72 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 5/1/2002 Response to Motion
                              RESPONSE by pla to motion to continue sentencing of 5/6/02 [69-1]by Samuel Lua-Madrigal as to dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 71 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: 4/30/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue sentencing of 5/6/02 [69-1]by Samuel Lua-Madrigal sentencing reset for 1:30 6/3/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc:usm, prob, cnsl] (DMT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 70 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Motion for Departure
                                  MOTION for downward departure [70-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (part of objection 70-1) (DMT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 70 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                    OBJECTION by Samuel Lua-Madrigal to pre-sentence report as to dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal . (DMT)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 69 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002, Terminated: 4/30/2002 Motion to Continue
                                      MOTION to continue sentencing of 5/6/02 [69-1]by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 68 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue sentencing [67-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal sentencing reset for 1:30 5/6/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal (CMM)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 67 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002, Terminated: 4/19/2002 Motion to Continue
                                          MOTION to continue sentencing [67-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (CMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 66 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton sentencing reset for 3:30 4/29/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal at request of probation officer [cc: usm, prob, pts, cnsl, interpreter] (DMT)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 65 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              ( FILED: 1/9/02) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton . Ct Rptr: Gary Moll . Samuel Lua-Madrigal, in custody (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; plea hrg held ; remaining counts to be dismissed at sentencing; trial vacated ; sentencing set for 2:00 3/25/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , plea agreement lodged as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal [65-4] (DMT)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 64 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: 1/2/2002 Order
                                                MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 9:30 1/9/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [64-2] (DMT)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue trial date of 12/4/01 [61-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial reset for 9:00 2/5/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay interest of justice started [cc:usm, pts, cnsl, interpreter] (DMT)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    ( FILED: 11/19/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton . Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick . ; status hrg held granting motion to continue trial date of 12/4/01 [61-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal, crs ; trial reset for 9:00 2/5/02 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [62-3] (DMT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001, Terminated: 11/19/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                      MOTION to continue trial date of 12/4/01 [61-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton status conference set for 4:00 11/19/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton appointing counsel for Samuel Lua-Madrigal David M Ochoa [cc:prob, pts, cnsl] (DMT)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue trial of 11/6/01 [56-1] by Samuel Lua Madrigal ; trial set for 9:00 12/4/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay interest of justice started [cc:usm, cnsl, P Trujillo AFPD] (DMT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 10/22/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                              ( FILED: 10/22/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue trial of 11/6/01 [56-1] by Samuel Lua Madrigal ; status hrg held, dft Lua-Madrigal not present, Counsel Kaufman not present for dft, trial reset for 9:00 12/4/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , ORD withdrawing attorney Shaun C Kaufman for Samuel Lua-Madriga (due to illness) ; unsel shall be appointed [57-3] (DMT)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001, Terminated: 10/25/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                MOTION to continue trial of 11/6/01 [56-1] by Samuel Lua Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton status conference hearing set for 4:00 10/22/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc:cnsl] (DMT)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                    NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Paul V Rood appears and terminating attorney Troy Darius Lozar for USA (DMT)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue trial of 10/9/01 [51-1] by USA as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial reset for 9:00 11/6/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay interest of justice started [cc: usm, pts, cnsl, interpreter] (DMT)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        ( FILED: 9/18/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick dft not present nor is dft's counsel; status hrg held ;granting government's motion to continue trial [51-1], trial reset for 9:00 11/6/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [52-2] (DMT) Modified on 09/21/2001
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001, Terminated: 9/20/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                          MOTION to continue trial of 10/9/01 [51-1] by USA as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton status conference hearing set for 4:00 9/17/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc: cnsl] (DMT)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [43-1], [43-2] [48-1], granting motion to continue trial of 9/4/01 [46-1] by USA as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 9/17/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial reset for 9:00 10/9/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: usm/pts/usa/cnsl/interp (former emp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                MOTION to continue trial by gov as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal [48-1] (former emp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  ( FILED: 8/20/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: KMyrick ; status hrg held as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; the Court advises it is in receipt of FAX from Dan Wright advising the Court counsel Shaun Kaufman is in the hospital; gov advises a motion to continue the trial will be filed (ncc) [47-2] (former emp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                    MOTION to continue trial of 9/4/01 [46-1] by USA as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for special appearance of attorney Shaun C Kaufman of Peak Law Office 18 E Fountain Colorado Springs, CO 80903 719-385-0884[44-1] [cc:cnsl, prob, pts] (DMT)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001, Terminated: 8/14/2001 Motion to Appear
                                                                                        MOTION for special appearance of attorney Shaun C Kaufman of Peak Law Office 18 E Fountain Colorado Springs, CO 80903 719-385-0884[44-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001, Terminated: 8/22/2001 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                          MOTION for extension of time to file pretrial motions [43-1] , and to continue trial of 8/7/01 [43-2] by USA as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton status conference set for 4:00 8/20/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc:cnsl] (DMT)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [40-1], granting motion to continue trial of 8/7/01 [40-2] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; pretrial motions ddl set for 8/13/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial reset for 9:00 9/4/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay interest of justice started [cc:usm, pts, cnsl, interpreter] (DMT)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001, Terminated: 8/6/2001 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                                MOTION for extension of time to file pretrial motions [40-1] , and to continue trial of 8/7/01 [40-2] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ( FILED: 7/23/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick ; status hrg held [39-2] (DMT)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton status conference set for 4:00 7/23/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc: cnsl] (DMT)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue trial and status hrg of 6/18/01 [36-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (part of response 36-1) ; trial reset for 9:00 8/7/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; status hrg of 6/18/01 is vacated , excludable delay interest of justice started [cc: usm, prob, pts, cnsl, interpreter] (DMT)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001, Terminated: 6/18/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                        MOTION to continue trial and status hrg of 6/18/01 [36-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (part of response 36-1) (DMT)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001, Terminated: 6/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                          RESPONSE by dft to order on scheduling and status conference as to dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton status hearing set for 4:00 6/18/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc usatty,, dft] (DMT)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              PAYMENT voucher by Judge Susan R. Bolton as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal for CJA Jay R Cairns (final payment) (LAD)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance of attorney for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , Shaun C Kaufman (LAD)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: 5/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [31-1], granting motion to continue trial of 6/5/01 [31-2] by USA as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; pretrial motions ddl set for 6/1/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial reset for 9:00 7/3/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay interest of justice started [cc: pts, cnsl] (DMT)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001, Terminated: 5/18/2001 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                                                    STIPULATED MOTION by parties for extension of time to file pretrial motions [31-1] , and to continue trial of 6/5/01 [31-2] by USA as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton status hearing set for 4:00 5/21/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc: cnsl] (DMT)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [23-1], granting motion to continue trial of 3/7/01 [23-2] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; pretrial motions ddl set for 5/7/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial reset for 9:00 6/5/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay interest of justice started , ; status hrg of 4/16/01 vacated [cc: usm, prob, pts, cnsl, interpreter] (DMT)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001 Stipulation
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION between Samuel Lua-Madrigal, USA to extend time for filing of pretrial motions and to continue trial (stipulation handled on 4/3/01 by order 28-1) (DMT)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton status hearing set for 3:30 4/16/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc: cnsl] (DMT)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [23-1], granting motion to continue trial of 3/7/01 [23-2] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; pretrial motions ddl set for 4/3/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial reset for 9:00 5/1/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay interest of justice started [cc:usm, prob, pts, cnsl, interpreter] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                NOTICE by dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal of service on pla of their motion to extend time for filing pretrial motions,and to continue trial (DMT)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of intent to use dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal's statements by pla (DMT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001, Terminated: 3/14/2001 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for extension of time to file pretrial motions [23-1] , to continue trial of 3/7/01 [23-2] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for admission pro hac vice by attorney Geoffry MacLaren Yaryan of 72-960 Fred Waring Dr Palm Desert, CA 92260 760-779-9666 [21-1] for and by Samuel Lua-Madrigal terminating attorney Jeanette Elizabeth Alvarado for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , tlabels [cc:cnsl] (DMT) Modified on 02/26/2001
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2001 Motion to Appear
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for admission pro hac vice by attorney Geoffry MacLaren Yaryan of 72-960 Fred Waring Dr Palm Desert, CA 92260 760-779-9666 [21-1] for and by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT) Modified on 02/23/2001
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to preserve automobile and secret compartment [19-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal. [cc: usm, cnsl] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [17-1], granting motion to continue trial of 3/5/01 (first request) [17-2] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; pretrial motions ddl set for 3/7/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial reset for 9:00 4/3/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , excludable delay interest of justice started [cc: usm, pts, cnsl, interpreter] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001, Terminated: 2/14/2001 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for extension of time to file pretrial motions [17-1] , to continue trial of 3/5/01 (first request) [17-2] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 2/16/2001, Terminated: 2/16/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to preserve automobile and secret compartment [19-1] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ( FILED: 1/25/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson ; hearing held, appointment of Jeanette Alvarado reaffirmed as counsel of record for dft , dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal arraigned; Not Guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 2/8/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; trial set for 9:00 3/6/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [cc: usm, pts, cnsl, LOA, cd] [16-4] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 1/19/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson dft's counsel not present; arraignment hearing reset for 10:00 1/24/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson , ; hearing re: counsel set for 10:00 1/24/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , [cc: usm, pts, cnsl, LOA] [15-5] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of 12/20/00 preliminary hrg before Magistrate Judge Jay Irwin by Court Reporter: A/V Tronics Inc as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal for the following date(s): 12/20/00 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of detention hrg before Magistrate Judge Jay Irwin by Court Reporter: A/V Tronics Inc as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal for the following date(s): 12/12/00 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 1/11/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver granting oral motion to continue arraignment of 1/10/01 [0-0] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; arraignment hearing reset for 10:00 1/17/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson , excludable delay interest of started [cc: pts, cnsl] [12-4] (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                            ORAL MOTION to continue arraignment of 1/10/01 [0-0] by Samuel Lua-Madrigal (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Samuel Lua-Madrigal before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT by USA attorney Troy Darius Lozar. Counts filed against Samuel Lua-Madrigal (1) count(s) 1, 2 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Jeanette Alvarado as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 12/29/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Status hearing regarding determination of counsel held. Jeanette Alvarado will continue as appointed counsel for Samuel Lua-Madrigal [9-1] re: minute entry [9-1] [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ( FILED: 12/22/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Sitver Interpreter: none appointing counsel for Samuel Lua-Madrigal Jeanette Elizabeth Alvarado and terminating attorney Jay Randall Cairns for Samuel Lua-Madrigal; determination of cnsl hrg is set for 12/28/00 at 11am before this Court [7-2] [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                        CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Samuel Lua-Madrigal [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/20/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: none needed; dft Lau-Madrigal present w/cnsl; dft transferred to Phoenix, appointment of cnsl hrg is set for 12/22/00 at 11am before Mag Judge Sitver; prelim hrg held and dft held to answer before the District Court [5-1] re: minute entry [5-1] [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                            CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Samuel Lua-Madrigal [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal re: detention order [3-1] [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 12/12/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: none needed first appearance of Samuel Lua-Madrigal ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Samuel Lua-Madrigal appears with counsel Jay Randall Cairns; dft detained; prelim hrg is set for 12/20/00 at 10 am before this Court [2-3] [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed as to Samuel Lua-Madrigal [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/27/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                    DEFENDANT Samuel Lua-Madrigal arrested. Samuel Lua-Madrigal (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -2929 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?