USA, et al v. Cervantes-Aguinaga
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00005-EHC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Edward Koehler +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7450 joe.koehler@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Yuma
Terminated 1/28/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-02914
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326B.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and enhanced by (b)(2) Re-entry after deportation
Count 1s
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and (b)(2) - Re-Entry After Deportation
Count 1s
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a) and (b)(2) - Re-Entry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (137) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 121 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Mail Returned
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Pedro Cervantes-Aguinaga. Reason for return: no longer in custody left 10-22-04. Document number 120. address update has not been submitted research conducted (ESH, )
    LREF
    Blank 120 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Mandate of 9th Circuit
    Mandate of 9th Circuit (certified copy) affirming the decision of the District Court, re Appeal Case Number: 04-10509 as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re [110] Notice of Appeal (REW, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Appeal Record Returned
      Original Record received from 9CCA re [110-1]; 1 volume clerk's record; 4 transcripts (#71, 116, 117, 118) in one expando and one folder of other documents (REW)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
        Clerk's record on appeal transmitted to 9th Circuit as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [110-1]; 1 volume clerk's record; 4 transcripts (#71, 116, 117, 118) in one expando and one folder of other documents (REW)
          LREF
          Blank 119 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/12/2004 USCA Mandate
          CERTIFIED COPY of 9CCA Mandate as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; appellant's motion for voluntary dismissal of 04-10550 as duplicative of 04-10509 granted; 04-10550 dismissed, re: 04-10550 [113-1] (cc: EHC/pts/prob/USM/USAO/dfns) (REW)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Certificate of Record
            Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9th Circuit as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re [110-1] (REW)
              LREF
              Blank 118 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Transcript -Appeal
              Transcript of Final Disposition; by Court Reporter: Candy Potter; held on date(s): 9/20/04 as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, (REW)
                LREF
                Blank 117 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Transcript -Appeal
                Transcript of Evidentiary Hearing; by Court Reporter: Candy Potter; held on date(s): 8/26/04 as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, (REW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 116 Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Transcript -Appeal
                  Transcript of Admit/Deny Hearing; by Court Reporter: Candy Potter; held on date(s): 8/6/04 as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, (REW)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 10/27/2004, Entered: 11/1/2004 Certificate of Record
                    Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9th Circuit as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re [113-1] (REW)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 USCA Case Number
                      Notification by 9th Circuit of appellate docket number 04-10550 re [113-1] as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (REW)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004 USCA Case Number
                        Notification by 9th Circuit of appellate docket number 04-10509 re [110-1] as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (REW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 115 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                          NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Joseph Edward Koehler appears and terminating attorney Ondre Jackson Williams for USA (REW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 114 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Time Schedule Order
                            ORDER for 9th Circuit Time Schedule as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re [113-1] (REW)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Notice of Appeal - Notification Form
                              APPEAL PACKET forwarded to all parties and 9th Circuit re: [113-1] (REW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 113 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Notice of Appeal
                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga from District Court order (#109) revoking supervised release (cc: 9CCA/EHC/pts/BAS/USAO/dfns/dft) (appeal filed by dft as pro se; dft has appointed counsel) (REW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 112 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                  Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; ordering transcripts for hearings of 8/6/04, 8/26/04 and 9/20/04 (REW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 111 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Time Schedule Order
                                    ORDER for 9th Circuit Time Schedule as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re [110-1] (REW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Notice of Appeal - Notification Form
                                      APPEAL PACKET forwarded to all parties and 9th Circuit re: [110-1] (REW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 110 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Notice of Appeal
                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga from District Court order (#109) revoking supervised release (cc: 9CCA/EHC/pts/BAS/USAO/dfns and 1 copy for dft) (REW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 109 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll sentencing for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (1) count(s) 1s. Custody BOP for term of 30 MONTHS; upon release placed on supervised release for term of 36 MONTHS; S/A in amount of $100.00. SUPERVISED RELEASE REVOKED 9/22/04: Custody BOP for term of 24 MONTHS; no further term of supervised release is imposed. (CMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 108 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            MINUTES: Final disposition hearing held on supervised release as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter Interpreter: Sporrer - Spanish. Dft sentenced, see order [108-2] (CMM)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 107 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Exhibit
                                              EXHIBITS list of USA as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (LCF)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 106 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                ( FILED: 8/27/04) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer/Spanish. ; Evidentiary hearing held; Court tinds that he has violated the conditions of his supervised release with respect to committing those convictions; final disposition hearing set for 2:00 9/20/04 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga before Judge Carroll [106-2] (LCF)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: 8/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll final disposition hearing set for 9:00 8/26/04 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (LAD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    ( FILED: 8/9/04) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Candy Potter Interpreter: Cristina Sporrer, spanish. re: supervised release violation [94-1] ; held admit/deny hearing, dft denies allegations A&B ; evidentiary hearing set for 1:00 8/13/04 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [cc: prob, cnsl] [104-2] (DMT)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTE ORDER ; admit/deny hearing reset for 1:30 8/6/04 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga before Judge Carroll [103-2] (LCF)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004 Order
                                                        MINUTE ORDER Admit/deny hearing is reset for 1:15 7/30/04 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [102-2] (KMG)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER of detention pending further proceedings by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re: detention [100-1] (CMM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 7/13/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                            CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga appointing David M Ochoa (SAT)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/13/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Ondre Jackson Williams appears; substituted for Charles Huellmantel (LCF)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                SUPERVISED RELEASE WARRANT returned executed on 7/6/04 as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                  CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    FILED: 7/9/04) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson. Detention heaing submitted as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, dft continued detained pending further revocation proceedings ; admit/deny hearing set for 9:00 7/16/04 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga before Judge Carroll [96-2] (CMM)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                      ( FILED: 7/8/04) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson . Interpreter: LVelasco: date of arrest 7/6/04 location of custody started ; initial appearance on supervised release violation; no financial affidavit taken; appointing counsel David Ochoa (CJA) for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; status hearing re detention and preliminary revocation hearing set for 7/8/04 at 9:15 before Judge Anderson [cc: usm/pb/usa/cnsl/loa/cja] [95-3] (former emp)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                        PETITION TO REVOKE supervised release as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; petition filed on 7/1/04. (PHR)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Warrant Issued
                                                                          supervised release WARRANT issued for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; ordered by Judge Earl H. Carroll (PHR)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Other Notice
                                                                            NOTICE of returned mail as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re [90-1] - not at CADC-Florence (CMM)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 6/10/2002, Entered: 6/13/2002 Other Notice
                                                                              NOTICE of returned mail to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re [91-1] - not at CADC-Florence (CMM)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 Judgment*
                                                                                JUDGMENT for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re: [90-1] - Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga's motion to vacate sentence pursuant to 28:2255 having been denied, the civil action CV-02-363-PHX-EHC(DKD) is terminated, movant shall take nothing (CMM)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll denying motion to vacate/to set aside sentence [87-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CV-02-363-PHX-EHC(DKD)); the clerk of court shall enter judgment accordingly and shall terminate the civil action opened in connection with this motion (CMM)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002 Other Notice
                                                                                    NOTICE of returned mail as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re Notice of Assignment - dft not at CADC-Florence (CMM)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 Other NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE of assignment re pro se motion to vacate sentence by dft Pedro Salvador - assigned to Judge Carroll and referred to Magistrate Judge Duncan and the Court's legal staff (CMM)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002, Terminated: 5/31/2002 Motion to Vacate(2255)
                                                                                        MOTION to vacate/to set aside sentence [87-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CV-02-363-PHX-EHC(DKD)) (CMM)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          PAYMENT voucher by Judge Earl H. Carroll as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga for CJA atty David M Ochoa (CMM)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 85 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: 2/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            PAYMENT voucher by Judge Earl H. Carroll as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga for CJA atty James Alan Wilson (CMM)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Plea Agreement
                                                                                              PLEA agreement filed as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 83 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga sentencing for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (1) count(s) 1s. Custody BOP for term of 30 MONTHS; upon release placed on supervised release for term of 36 MONTHS; S/A in amount of $100.00 , Case closed ; ordered by Judge Earl H. Carroll (CMM)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 82 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  FILED: 1/29/02) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Isabel Fierros. ; sentencing held as to Pedro Cervantes-Aguinaga [82-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 81 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                    FILED: 1/16/02) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll. Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Velasco - Spanish. ; sentencing reset for 2:30 1/28/02 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [81-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 80 Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                      FILED: 12/27/01) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Velasco - Spanish. Granting motion to continue sentencing [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; resentencing set for 3:30 1/14/02 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [80-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/17/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                        ORAL MOTION to continue sentencing [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll sentencing reset for 8:30 12/17/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 79 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/26/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                            FILED: 11/20/01) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll . Ct Rptr: Juanita Hyatt. Interpreter: Van Duzer - Spanish. ; sentencing reset for 8:30 12/17/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga before Judge Carroll [79-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll re: [76-2], denying motion to withdraw plea by Pedro S Cervantez-Aguinaga [72-1] sentencing set for 8:30 11/19/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; any supplemental matters concerning sentencing be filed by 11/14/01 (CMM)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Van Duzer - Spanish - denying motion to withdraw plea by Pedro S Cervantez-Aguinaga [72-1], granting oral motion to continue sentencing [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; sentencing reset for 8:30 11/19/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [76-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                  ORAL MOTION to continue sentencing [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by pla USA to motion to withdraw plea by Pedro S Cervantez-Aguinaga [72-1], motion to withdraw plea [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: 9/20/2001 Order
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER re motion to withdraw plea by Pedro S Cervantez-Aguinaga [72-1] ; hearing reset for 10:00 10/1/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, re motion to withdraw plea [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; hearing reset for 10:00 10/1/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; sentencing reset for 10:00 10/1/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [74-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CJA Form 24 copy 3 authorization voucher for payment of Transcript by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; ordered by Judge Earl H. Carroll (CMM)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty
                                                                                                                          MOTION to withdraw plea by Pedro S Cervantez-Aguinaga [72-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of plea proceedings by Court Reporter: Bridget Brittan as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga for the following date(s): 5/22/01 (CMM)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll that dft has until 9/17/01 to file an amended motion to withdraw from his plea agreement, the motion will be heard 9/26/01 at 8:30 am; re motion to withdraw plea [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; hearing set for 8:30 9/26/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                                                Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga - change of plea dated 5/22/01 (CMM)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Van Duzer - Spanish: oral motion to withdraw plea [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; hearing set for 2:30 9/17/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; status hrg held ; sentencing set for 8:30 9/26/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [68-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER ; status hearing set for 9:30 8/23/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [67-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll that a hearing having been held, granting dft Pedro Cervantes-Aguinaga's motion to appoint new cousnel and withdrawing James Wilson as counsel fo record withdrawing attorney James Alan Wilson for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga and substituting attorney David M Ochoa (CMM)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        FILED: 8/8/01) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Van Duzer - taking under advisement on 7/30/01 the oral motion to withdraw plea [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; granting oral motion for withdrawal of attorney James Wilson [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; the administrator of the CJA panel shall be contacted to appoint new counsel, separate order will issue setting forth a trial date ; sentencing vacated [66-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                          ORAL MOTION for withdrawal of attorney James Wilson [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga , and to withdraw plea [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM) Modified on 01/11/2002
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            FILED: 7/24/01) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Van Duzer ; sentencing reset for 3:00 7/30/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [64-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; ordered by Judge Earl H. Carroll (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                                                                                                                OBJECTION by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga to pre-sentence report as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga . (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue sentencing [59-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga sentencing reset for 2:30 7/23/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/9/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE re filing of letters (for consideration prior to sentencing) by dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001, Terminated: 7/9/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to continue sentencing [59-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Van Duzer - finding the motion to continue trial [50-1] by Pedro Salvador Certantes-Aguinaga moot., finding the motion in limine re conviction of aggravated felony by dft [49-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga moot., finding the motion to dismiss indictment pursuant to Pacheco-Medina, 212 F3d 1162 (2000) [31-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga moot., finding the motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga moot., finding the motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga moot. Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (1) count(s) 1s enters a plea of guilty , ; trial vacated ; plea hrg held ; pretrial conference vacated ; sentencing set for 11:00 7/9/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga , plea agreement lodged as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [58-4] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 8:30 5/22/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga before Judge Carroll [57-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga to response to motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga to response to motion to dismiss indictment pursuant to Pacheco-Medina, 212 F3d 1162 (2000) [31-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY by dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga to response to motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Van Duzer - denying motion for withdrawal of counsel Jim Wilson [52-1] as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; pretrial motions extended to 4/30/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; trial reset for 9:00 5/22/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga Gvt has no objection to new trial date setting; no excludable delay given [53-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for withdrawal of counsel Jim Wilson [52-1] as to pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga - testimony of Jay Byrum and Miranda hearing dated 3/22/01 (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to continue trial [50-1] by Pedro Salvador Certantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in limine re conviction of aggravated felony by dft [49-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Jury Instructions
                                                                                                                                                                            JURY instructions by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA , Charles Huellmantel; terminating attorney Francisco Jose Sanchez Jr for USA (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Velasco -granting oral motion to withdraw pro se motion to dismiss by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga and withdrawing motion to dismiss defendant [17-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, hearing held re motion to dismiss indictment pursuant to Pacheco-Medina, 212 F3d 1162 (2000) [31-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, and motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga and taking under advisement on 3/22/01 the motion to dismiss indictment pursuant to Pacheco-Medina, 212 F3d 1162 (2000) [31-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, taking under advisement on 3/22/01 the motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, taking under advisement on 3/22/01 the motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [46-1] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Motion to Withdraw Document
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL MOTION to withdraw pro se motion to dismiss by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED: 3/23/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: Van Duzer dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 4/5/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; trial set for 9:00 5/15/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [45-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED: 3/21/01) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Velasco ; status hrg held as to Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga , ; trial reset for 9:00 4/17/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; pretrial conference set for 4:00 4/13/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga , excludable delay interest of justice started re motion to dismiss indictment pursuant to Pacheco-Medina, 212 F3d 1162 (2000) [31-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; hearing set for 4:00 3/22/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, re motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; hearing set for 4:00 3/22/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, re motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; hearing set for 4:00 3/22/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, re motion to dismiss defendant [17-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; hearing set for 4:00 3/22/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [44-4] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by pla USA to motion to dismiss indictment pursuant to Pacheco-Medina, 212 F3d 1162 (2000) [31-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by pla USA to motion to dismiss defendant (re collateral attack on deportation) [17-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER - vacating the 3/16/01 motion hearing ; status hearing set for 1:30 3/19/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [41-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              FILED: 3/14/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver at request of counsel for dft ; arraignment hearing reset for 10:00 3/21/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [40-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga appointing (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting the appointment of new counsel and withdrawing Jon Sands as counsel fo record for dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga appointing for dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga attorney James Alan Wilson (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll withdrawing the Assistant Federal Public Defender as counsel for dft Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; a spanish speaking attorney be appointed from the Criminal Justice Act Panel to represent dft; vacating hearing set for 3/16/01 and trial set for 3/27/01 to be reset by separate order; a pretrial conference will be set following appointment of CJA counsel terminating Jon Sands , ; trial vacated (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 3/14/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST SUPERSEDING Indictment filed against Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (1) count(s) 1s (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED: 3/6/01) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Velasco - vacating hearing re motion to dismiss indictment pursuant to Pacheco-Medina, 212 F3d 1162 (2000) [31-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, granting motion for appointment of new cnsl [25-1] by Jon Sands as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga - matter referred for appointment of new counsel to administrator of the Criminal Justice Act Panel; vacating hearing re motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, vacating hearing re motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, vacating hearing re motion to dismiss defendant [17-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga attorney Jon M Sands withdrawn as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; , pending motions to be reset by separate order [cc: cja [34-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to extend time to respond to dft motion to dismiss indictment [27-1] by USA as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga - until 3/1/01 (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT filed and Sealed purs to Rule 17(b) by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to dismiss indictment pursuant to Pacheco-Medina, 212 F3d 1162 (2000) [31-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by pla USA to motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER: re motion for appointment of new cnsl [25-1] by Jon Sands as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; hearing set for 10:30 3/5/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, granting motion for oral argument on motion to appoint new counsel [25-2] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga cc: cnsl for dft [29-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER vacating the 3/14/01 hearing on motion to dismiss defendant [17-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; hearing reset for 2:30 3/16/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, re motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; hearing reset for 2:30 3/16/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, re motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; hearing reset for 2:30 3/16/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [28-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 3/5/2001 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to extend time to respond to dft motion to dismiss indictment [27-1] by USA as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by pla USA to motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001, Terminated: 2/28/2001 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for appointment of new cnsl [25-1] by Jon Sands as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ,and for oral argument on motion to appoint new counsel [25-2] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll setting pretrial motions for hearing on 3/14/01 at 3:00 pm and trial reset for 3/27/01 at 9:00 am (dates previously set from minute entry dated 2/20/01) excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 2/20/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Velasco - re motion re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga hearing set for 3:00 3/14/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, re motion to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga hearing set for 3:00 3/14/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, re motion to dismiss defendant [17-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga hearing set for 3:00 3/14/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; trial reset for 9:00 3/27/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga - excludable delay to be included by separate written order; pretrial conference held Dft advised the court that he has filed by way of a written letter a request for new counsel, the court having no such letter or motion before it, counsel Jon Sands to file motion for appointment of new counsel on behalf of dft with a request for oral argument and shall remain as counsel or record pending something filed. [23-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by pla USA of intent to use impeachment evidence pursuant to Rule 609(a)(1) as to Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 2/16/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of confession, admissions and statements purs. to Local Rule 4.11 as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/15/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER ; pretrial conference set for 10:00 2/20/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga Date for hearing pretrial motions to be scheduled at pretrial conference [20-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION re Apprendi and requirement unnecessary elements [19-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to suppress statements as involuntary [18-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to dismiss defendant [17-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILED: 2/6/01) MINUTES: before Judge Earl H. Carroll Ct Rptr: Bridget Brittan Interpreter: Van Duzer - granting oral motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga, denying oral motion to continue plea hearing [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; pretrial motions now due 2/12/01 by 5:00 pm for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; plea hrg vacated Trial to proceed as scheduled on 2/27/01 at 9:00 am [cc: prob,pts [16-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORAL MOTION for extension of time to file pretrial motions [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORAL MOTION to continue plea hearing [0-0] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PAYMENT voucher by Judge Earl H. Carroll as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga for CJA atty Jay R Cairns (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 3:00 1/31/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [14-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILED: 1/16/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Van Duzer dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; trial set for 9:00 2/27/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [cc: pts,usa,atty,bh [13-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT by USA attorney Francisco Jose Sanchez Jr. Counts filed against Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (1) count(s) 1 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 12/22/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Ct Rptr: S00-200; Spanish Interpreter: Gloria Segien appointing counsel Jon M Sands for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga and terminating attorney Jay Randall Cairns for Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [cc: Inter, MS] [9-2] [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER appointing Jon Sands counsel for Salvador Cervandes-Aguinaga by Mag Judge Morton Sitver re: order [10-1] [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin granting motion to extend time to indict [7-1] excludable delay interest of justice started [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000, Terminated: 12/20/2000 Motion to Extend Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to extend time to indict [7-1] by Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/20/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ( FILED: 12/20/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Ct Rptr: 00-255 (2874-3688), Spanish Interpreter: Kathy Schaben; status hearing re plea held, dft declined plea offer; status hearing re plea set for 12/22/00 was moved to 12/20/00; appointment of counsel hearing set for 12/22/00 at 11:00 before Mag Judge Morton Sitver [cc: All Counsel] [6-1] re: minute entry [6-1] [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re: detention order [5-1] [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/12/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Ct Rptr: 00-247 (2020-5850); Spanish Interpreter: Kathy Schaben; Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga appears with counsel Jay Randall Cairns , detention hearing held, dft detained as a flight risk; preliminary hearing held, probable cause found, dft held to answer before USDC; status hearing re possible plea set for 12/22/00 at 1:30 before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to dft Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [cc: All Counsel] [4-3] [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of temporary detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga re: detention order [3-1] [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 12/11/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Ct Rptr: 00-245 (3564-4288); Spanish Interpreter: Kathy Schaben Bond set to SPANISH for Pedro Salvador first appearance of Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; detention hearing set for 12/12/00 at 1:30 and preliminary hearing set for 12/26/00 at 1:30 before Mag judge Jay R Irwin as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga; dft temporarily detained [cc: All Counsel] [2-3] [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 12/11/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed as to Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/10/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DEFENDANT Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga arrested. Pedro Salvador Cervantes-Aguinaga (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -2914 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?