USA, et al v. Sorenson
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00006-EHC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Myer +1 602 514 7500

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Yuma
Terminated 2/25/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-02879
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 952A=MI.F
Offense Level 4
21952(a) and 960(a) Importation of Marijuana
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=MD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) Possession of Marijuana with Intent to Distribute
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=MD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) Possession of Marijuana with Intent to Distribute
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: 12/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
PROBATION Form 35 as to Cathy Soung Sorenson - dft is unconditionally discharged from probation by Judge Earl H. Carroll (KMG)
    LREF
    Blank 23 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 11:00 12/10/01 for Cathy Soung Sorenson , before Judge Earl H. Carroll [23-3] (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 21 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Earl H. Carroll granting motion to continue trial [20-1] by Cathy Soung Sorenson ; trial set for 9:00 12/11/01 for Cathy Soung Sorenson status hearing set for 8:30 11/28/01 for Cathy Soung Sorenson , excludable delay in the interest of justice started (former emp)
        LREF
        Blank 20 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001, Terminated: 11/13/2001 Motion to Continue
        MOTION to continue trial [20-1] by Cathy Soung Sorenson (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 19 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          (FILED: 9/27/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson Interpreter: dft Cathy Soung Sorenson arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney Gerald A Williams present; pretrial motions due 10/11/01 for Cathy Soung Sorenson ; trial set for 9:00 11/13/01 for Cathy Soung Sorenson; dft is continued detained pending trial; dft is granted leave to file a renewed mtn for release if there is a material change in circumstances [19-3] (former emp)
            LREF
            Blank 18 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Warrant Returned Executed
            Failure to appear WARRANT returned executed on 9/23/01 as to Cathy Soung Sorenson (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 17 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
              ( FILED: 9/24/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin dft arrested 9/23/01; initial appearance on failure to appear warrant; arraignment hearing set for 9:00 9/26/01 for Cathy Soung Sorenson , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson [17-3] (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 9/23/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Arrest
                DEFENDANT Cathy Soung Sorenson arrested. (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 16 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  PAYMENT voucher by Judge Earl H. Carroll as to Cathy Soung Sorenson for CJA atty James F Metcalf (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Warrant Issued
                    Failure to appear WARRANT issued for Cathy Soung Sorenson ; ordered by Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 1/12/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Warrant Issued
                      Bench WARRANT issued for Cathy Soung Sorenson by Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 15 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        ( FILED: 1/17/01) AMENDED MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver to reflect correct defense atty for Cathy Soung Sorenson re: minute entry [14-2] [15-1] (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 14 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          ( FILED: 1/11/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver dft not in federal custody and whereabouts unknown; USM adv crt dft released on other charged by CCA; granting oral motion for bench warrant by USA as to Cathy Soung Sorenson ; arraignment to be held on arrest of dft ; arraignment hrg vacated [14-2] (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                            NOTICE of substitution of attorney for USA , Jeffrey A Myer; terminating attorney Susan S Bradley for USA (Reeves) (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Motion for Warrant
                              ORAL MOTION for bench warrant by USA as to Cathy Soung Sorenson (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Cathy Soung Sorenson before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Indictment
                                  INDICTMENT by USA attorney Susan S Bradley. Counts filed against Cathy Soung Sorenson (1) count(s) 1, 2 (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/22/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia a Mathis appointing counsel for Cathy Soung Sorenson, Asst FPD Gerald A Williams [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                      ( FILED: 12/21/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin appointing counsel for Cathy Soung Sorenson Gerald A Williams and terminating attorney James Franklin Metcalf for Cathy Soung Sorenson [9-2] [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: dft Sorenson present w/cnsl before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin; prelim hrg held and dft held to answer before the District Court; case transferred to Phoenix; appointment of cnsl hrg is set for 12/21/00 at 11:00 a.m before Mag Judge Mathis [7-1] re: minute entry [7-1] [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                          ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Cathy Soung Sorenson re: detention order [8-1] [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin ; dft Sorenson present w/ cnsl; dft detained [5-1] re: minute entry [5-1] [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                              CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Cathy Soung Sorenson [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                ( FILED: 12/5/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: none dft Cathy Soung Sorenson appears with counsel James Franklin Metcalf; detention hrg cont to 12/7/00 at 1:30 p.m.; prelim hrg is set for 12/14/00 at 1:30 p.m. before this Court [4-2] [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/3/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin for temporary detention as to Cathy Soung Sorenson [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/3/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    ( FILED: 12/3/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: none first appearance of Cathy Soung Sorenson ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; detention hrg is set for 12/5/00 at 1:30 p.m. before this Court [2-2] [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/3/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT filed as to Cathy Soung Sorenson [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/2/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Arrest
                                                        DEFENDANT Cathy Soung Sorenson arrested. Cathy Soung Sorenson (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -2879 ] (PHR)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?