James Riley v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV356346

Tags
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 8:57 PM ST (2.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Riley, James B, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Heaven Bound Clothing Company, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Kelly mikekelly@heavenboundclothing.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Case Type Auto Unlimited (22)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
    Legal Document 22 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Request Dismissal
    Request for Dismissal
      Legal Document 21 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order After Hearing - POS
      GRANTED- Hrg 02/18/2020; 9AM;Dept 9- re:Pro Hac Vice of Curt B. Miner
        Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Motion-Dismiss
        03/19/2020, 9AM, D6, Atty Tseng
          Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
          03/19/2020, 9AM, D6, Atty Tseng
            Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Proof Of Service-
            Proof of Service OF DEFENDANT TESLA, INC.'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
              CHANCELLOR W. TSENG, 03/19/2020, 9AM, D6, Atty Tseng
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration
                DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. MCDEVIT IN SUPPORT OF CURTIS B. MINER S PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                  Envelope #: 03985260 - The date listed on the Motion to Dismiss Action is incorrect. The correct date is 03/19/2020.
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
                    For ORder Shortening Time and Specially Setting Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order: Ex ParteCourt Filing
                      Granting Def's application for an OST on Motion to Dismiss and hearing is set for 03/19.20 @9am in D6 by Judge Folan
                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                        Notice: Entry of Order GRANTING DEFENDANT TESLA, INC.'S STIPULATED EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME AND SPECIALLY SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO STAY
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                            Case Management Statement - Unlimited
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                              Case Management Statement
                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
                                $150 jury fees paid for plt, Riley, by atty McDevitt
                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Application: Pro Hac Vice Renewal
                                  Verified Application of Curt B. Miner for admission to state bar of california pro hac vice
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Application
                                    for admission of attorney curt b. miner pro hac vice
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                      to complaint, atty Adams-Hess
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                        Proof of Service of Summons
                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?