RANI HUBLOU v. 8X8, INC. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV356348

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 8:45 PM ST (1.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HUBLOU, RANI, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Callahan & Blaine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jerome Callahan +1 714 241 4444 +1 714 241 4445 djc@callahan-law.com
v.
No Logo 8x8, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Verma, Vikram, Defendant
Unknown Role, 8x8, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cambium Networks Corp
Case Type Wrongful Termination Unlimited (36)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Removal to Federal Court
    Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Restored to court's control
      Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
      to complaint, Atty Weber
        Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
        to complaint, Atty Weber
          Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
          PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
            Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
              Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 263 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?