USA, et al v. Guzman-Soto
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00007-SMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Spears Bradley +1 662 234 3351 susan.bradley@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Yuma
Terminated 4/25/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-02881
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 952=MI.F
Offense Level 4
21952(a) and 960(a) - Importation of Marijuana
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=MD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) - Possession of Marijuana with Intent to Distribute
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=MD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) - Possession of Marijuana with Intent to Distribute
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 27 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto by Judge Stephen M. McNamee (KMG)
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/9/2001 Plea Agreement
    PLEA agreement filed as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto (former emp)
      LREF
      Blank 26 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto Fabiola Guzman-Soto (1) count(s) 2. Dismissed on Govt Motion at Sentencing , Sentencing for Fabiola Guzman-Soto (1) count(s) 1. Custody of BOP for a term of TIME SERVED, followed by supervised release for THREE (3) YRS; S/A: $100 , Case closed ; ordered by Judge Stephen M. McNamee (KMG)
        LREF
        Blank 24 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        (FILED: 4/30/01) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee Ct Rptr: V. Reger Interpreter: Louis Velasco ; sentencing held/Fabiola Guzman-Soto . Crt sustains gov's obj to a 2-level adjustment for dft's minor role and, therefore, IT IS ORDERED that the presentence report be amended to reflect this change. FURTHER granting an additional 4-level downward departure due to a confluence of factors which include dft's health and aberrant behavior. [24-2] (former emp)
          LREF
          Blank 23 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Order
          MINUTE ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar; IT IS ORDERED resetting the sentencing from April 16, 2001 to Wednesday, April 25, 2001 at 2:30 p.m. for Fabiola Guzman-Soto before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee IN HEARING ROOM #2, 1ST FLOOR. (cc: AUSA, Defense Counsel, PROB, PTS, MP) [23-3] (ALL)
            LREF
            Blank 22 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
            OBJECTION by Fabiola Guzman-Soto to pre-sentence report. (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
              OBJECTION by USA to pre-sentence report re Fabiola Guzman-Soto. (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 2/8/2001, Entered: 2/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee accepting Fabiola Guzman-Soto's plea of guilty; plea agreement will be referred to PO for rpt and recommendation re: order [20-1] (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                  PAYMENT voucher by Judge Stephen M. McNamee as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto for CJA atty Jon M Sands (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 17 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto (former emp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee and consent of Fabiola Guzman-Soto for referral to Magistrate Judge for change of plea. (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        ( FILED: 1/25/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: Gloria Segien ; plea hrg held , Fabiola Guzman-Soto (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , plea agreement lodged as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto , ; sentencing set for 11:00 4/16/01 for Fabiola Guzman-Soto [16-5] (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 8:30 1/24/01 for Fabiola Guzman-Soto , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [15-3] (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            PAYMENT voucher by Judge Stephen M. McNamee as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto for CJA atty Jon M Sands (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                              (FILED: 1/12/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer dft Fabiola Guzman-Soto arraigned; Attorney present; , , Fabiola Guzman-Soto (1) count(s) 1, 2 enters a plea of not guilty , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Fabiola Guzman-Soto ; trial set for 9:00 2/6/01 for Fabiola Guzman-Soto [13-4] (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Fabiola Guzman-Soto before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Indictment
                                  INDICTMENT by USA attorney Susan S Bradley. Counts filed against Fabiola Guzman-Soto (1) count(s) 1, 2 (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER appointing Jon Sands counsel for Fabiola Guzman-Soto by Mag Judge Morton Sitver re: order [10-1] [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                      CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Fabiola Guzman-Soto [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 8 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        ( FILED: 12/21/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Mathis Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer appointing counsel for Fabiola Guzman-Soto Jon M Sands and terminating attorney James Franklin Metcalf for Fabiola Guzman-Soto [8-2] [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Ct Rptr: 00-251 (2345-3260) Spanish Interpreter: Kathy Schaben; preliminary hearing held, probable cause found and dft Fabiola Guzman-Soto held to answer before USDC; appointment of counsel set for 12/21/00 at 11:00 before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [cc: All Counsel] [9-1] re: minute entry [9-1] [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (SMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                            ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto re: detention order [6-1] [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                              CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Fabiola Guzman-Soto [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                ( FILED: 12/5/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben dft Fabiola Guzman-Soto appears with counsel James Franklin Metcalf; dft detained; [4-2] [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER of temporary detention as to dft Guzman-Soto signed by Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin re: order [3-1] [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    ( FILED: 12/4/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Jay R. Irwin Interpreter: Kathy Schaben first appearance of Fabiola Guzman-Soto ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft present w/out cnsl; detention hrg is set for 12/5/00 at 1:30 p.m.; prelim hrg is set for 12/14/00 at 1:30 p.m.; SPANISH for Fabiola Guzman-Soto. [2-3] [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT filed as to Fabiola Guzman-Soto [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 Arrest
                                                        DEFENDANT Fabiola Guzman-Soto arrested. Fabiola Guzman-Soto (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -2881 ] (PHR)
                                                          LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?