USA v. Parnas
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cr-00725-JPO-1

Tags
Last Updated September 22, 2021 at 12:22 AM DT (3.6 days ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebekah Allen Donaleski +1 212 637 2423 +1 212 637 2443 Rebekah.Donaleski@usdoj.gov
Space Nicolas Tyler Landsman-Roos +1 212 637 2421 nicolas.roos@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Lev Parnas, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Lev Parnas (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/9/2019
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
181001.F STATEMENTS OR ENTRIES GENERALLY (FALSE STATEMENTS)
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
181519.F DESTRUCTION, ALTERATION OR FALSIFICATION OF RECORDS IN FEDERAL INVESTIGATIONS (FALSIFICATIONS OF RECORDS)
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (157) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None Proposed Jury Instructions
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 9/22/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Request to Charge
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None In Limine
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 9/21/2021, Entered: None Proposed Examination of Jurors
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/16/2021, Entered: None Transcript
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/7/2021, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/2/2021, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Letter
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/26/2021, Entered: None Indictment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/11/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 8/4/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/6/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/9/2021, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Order to Continue - Interest of Justice
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/28/2021, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 1/18/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/10/2021, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: None Suppress
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: None Hearing
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/21/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/30/2020, Entered: None Letter Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/4/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Letter Motion
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 140 Filed: 10/30/2020, Entered: 10/30/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy dated October 30, 2020 re: Allowing Lev Parnas to Leave his Home to Vote . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/8/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin re: Conference held on 10/8/20 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2021. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/29/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin re: Conference held on 9/29/20 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2021. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 131 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: 10/8/2020 Order
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Telephonic Pretrial Conference as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin held on 10/8/2020. Defendant Lev Parnas present with attorney Joseph Bondy and Stephanie Schuman; defendant Igor Fruman not present, attorney Todd Blanche present; defendant David Correia not present, attorney William Harrington present; defendant Andrey Kukushkin not present, attorney Gerald Lefcourt and Faith Friedman present. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Landsman Roos and Douglas Zolkind present. Court Reporter present. Motions due by 12/1/2020, responses by 12/23/2020 and replies by 1/15/2021. Jury trial set for March 1, 2021 at 9:30 am. Next conference scheduled for 11/30/2020. Time is excluded to 3/1/2021. Bail continued as to each defendant. (See transcript for complete details.) (Motions due by 12/1/2020. Responses due by 12/23/2020. Replies due by 1/15/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/1/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (lnl)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                              NOTICE: A TELEPHONIC PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 8, 2020, AT 12:00 PM. COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO CALL 888-557-8511 AT THE SCHEDULED TIME. THE ACCESS CODE IS 9300838. MEMBERS OF THE PRESS AND THE PUBLIC MAY ACCESS THE CONFERENCE VIA THE SAME NUMBER BUT ARE DIRECTED TO PLACE THEIR PHONES ON MUTE. (bh)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 130 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                LETTER by Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gerald B. Lefcourt on behalf of all defendants dated September 25, 2020 re: Response to Government's Letter re: Modification of Motion and Trial Schedule (Lefcourt, Gerald)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSAs Donaleski, Roos, and Zolkind dated September 25, 2020 re: Response to Defense Adjournment Request Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 125 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gerald B. Lefcourt on behalf of all defendants dated September 23, 2020 re: Modification of motion and trial schedule . Document filed by Andrey Kukushkin as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. (Lefcourt, Gerald)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSAs Donaleski, Roos, and Zolkind dated September 23, 2020 re: Defendants' Arraignment and Exclusion of Time Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 121 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 indictment
                                                                                                                                            (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Lev Parnas (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s, Igor Fruman (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 6s, David Correia (3) count(s) 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s, 7s, Andrey Kukushkin (4) count(s) 4s, 6s. (jm)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 119 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: 9/17/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSAs Donaleski, Roos, and Zolkind dated September 17, 2020 re: Superseding Indictment Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 118 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: 7/24/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT [117] LETTER MOTION To request modification of the terms of Mr. Parna's pretrial release from strict home confinement to a curfew that will allow Mr. Parna's to be out of his home between 7am and 7pm, subject to the limitations set forth...ENDORSEMENT...Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/23/20) (jw)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 117 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: 7/23/2020, Terminated: 7/24/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated July 23, 2020 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release (Unopposed) . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 110 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Lev Parnas (1), Igor Fruman (2), David Correia (3), Andrey Kukushkin (4) granting [109] JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSAs Douglas Zolkind, Nicolas Roos, and Rebekah Donaleski dated April 14, 2020 re: Proposed adjournment of pretrial schedule. ENDORSEMENT: The parties request to adjourn the trial date and pretrial deadlines is granted. Pretrial motions shall be filed by October 5, 2020; responses by November 2, 2020; and replies by November 16, 2020. The parties shall confer and, no later than November 24, 2020, shall file an agreed-upon proposed schedule addressing any remaining pretrial filing and disclosure deadlines. If the parties are unable to agree on a schedule, the parties shall submit a joint letter by the same date addressing the disputed issues and the parties' proposals. A pretrial conference will be held on November 30, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The final pretrial conference will be held on January 19, 2021, at 2:00 p.m. The trial date is hereby adjourned to February 1, 2021. The court hereby excludes time under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), through February 1, 2021, finding that the ends of justice outweigh the interests of the public and the defendants in a speedy trial for the reasons stated in this letter. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 4/15/2020) (ap) Modified on 4/16/2020 (ap).
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin: Motions due by 10/5/2020. Responses due by 11/2/2020. Replies due by 11/16/2020. Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Pretrial Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020, Terminated: 4/15/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSAs Douglas Zolkind, Nicolas Roos, and Rebekah Donaleski dated April 14, 2020 re: Proposed adjournment of pretrial schedule. . Document filed by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. (Zolkind, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 99 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (dn)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 2/3/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin re: Conference held on 2/3/2020 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Raquel Robles, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin re: Conference held on 1/30/2020 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/11/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Pretrial Conference as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin held on 2/3/2020. Defendant Lev Parnas present with attorney Joseph Bondy; defendant Igor Fruman not present, attorney Todd Blanche present; defendant David Correia not present, attorney William Harrington and Jeffrey Marcus present; defendant Andrey Kukushkin not present, attorney Gerald Lefcourt and Faith Friedman present. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Landsman Roos and Douglas Zolkind present. Court Reporter present. Pretrial conference held: Motions due by 5/1/2020, responses by 5/22/2020 and replies by 6/5/2020. Jury trial set for October 5, 2020 at 9:30 am in Courtroom 110 of 40 Foley Square. Next conference scheduled for 7/16/2020 in Courtroom 506 of 40 Foley Square. Time is excluded to 10/5/2020. Bail continued as to each defendant. (See transcript for complete details.) (Motions due by 5/1/2020. Responses due by 5/22/2020. Replies due by 6/5/2020. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 110, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken.) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Pretrial Conference as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin held on 1/30/2020. Defendant Lev Parnas not present, attorney Joseph Bondy present; defendant Igor Fruman not present, attorney Todd Blanche present; defendant David Correia not present, attorney Anne Railton present; defendant Andrey Kukushkin not present, attorney Gerald Lefcourt and Faith Friedman present. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Landsman Roos and Douglas Zolkind present. Court Reporter present. Pretrial conference held: (see transcript) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 89 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        MEMO ENDORSED re: [87] LETTER MOTION Modification of terms of pre-trial release, to allow Lev Parnas to travel with his counsel to sit in the Gallery of the US Senate and Observe the Impeachment Trial of President Donald J. Trump as to Lev Parnas (1)...ENDORSEMENT: On consent of the government, the request for a modification of the terms of pretrial release to allow travel to and from Washington, DC on January 29, 2020, is granted. To the extent that it seeks the removal of the GPS monitoring device, the request is denied. So ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/28/20) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 28, 2020 re: Attaching Correspondence Between Senator Chuck Schumer's Office and Counsel, Regarding Lev Parnas (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 87 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020, Terminated: 1/28/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 28, 2020 re: Modification of terms of pre-trial release, to allow Lev Parnas to travel with his counsel to sit in the Gallery of the US Senate and Observe the Impeachment Trial of President Donald J. Trump . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 86 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin: In advance of the February 3 conference, the Court will hold a conference with counsel for the parties to address Defendant Parnass third request for a modification of the protective order and the issues raised in the parties letters at Docket Numbers 7985. The conference will be held Thursday, January 30, 2020, at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. Defendants may waive their personal appearances for this conference. (Status Conference set for 1/30/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 318, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/28/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 85 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Todd Blanche dated 1/27/2020 re: Defense counsel writes in reply to letters. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Joseph A. Bondy, Stephanie R. Schuman dated 1/24/2020 re: Defense counsel writes in response to request. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER by Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Joseph A. Bondy, Stephanie R. Schuman dated 1/24/2020 re: Defense counsel writes in response to Government's letter opposing request. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 82 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas roos, Douglas Zolkind dated 1/23/2020 re: The Government writes regarding request to modify Protective Order. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Gerald B. Lefcourt dated 1/22/2020 re: Defense counsel writes regarding third request for modification to Protective Order. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken. from Todd Blanche dated 1/22/2020 re: Defense counsel writes regarding third modification of Protective Order. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Joseph A. Bondy dated 1/17/2020 re: Defense counsel writes to request a third modification to Protective Order. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 78 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin: As previously scheduled, a pretrial conference in this case will be held on February 3, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. All Defendants are directed to appear with their counsel. The parties are directed to confer prior to the conference and shall be prepared to address potential trial dates at the conference. (Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 318, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/27/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 77 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 21, 2020 re: 8:23pm Letter Filed by the Government Regarding Lev Parnas's Cellphone Extraction Date (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSAs Donaleski, Roos, and Zolkind dated January 21, 2020 re: Parnas iPhone Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 75 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 21, 2020 re: To Compel the Government to Disclose the Date it First Cracked and Exracted Lev Parnas's iPhone 11 . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from AUSAs Donaleski, Roos, and Zolkind dated January 21, 2020 re: Discovery Update Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 73 Filed: 1/20/2020, Entered: 1/20/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 20, 2020 re: Courtesy Copy of Defendant Lev Parnas' Request for the Recusal of Attorney General William P. Barr, with Exhibits (Attachments: # (1) Letter Request for the Recusal of Attorney General William P. Barr, with Exhibits)(Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [70] Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David Correia (3) GRANTED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/17/2020) (bh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 72 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Lev Parnas (1) granting [71] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 15, 2019 re: Modification of terms of pre-trial release, to allow Lev Parnas to travel with his counsel to the New York Offices of CNN, to tape an interview with Anderson Cooper (unopposed). ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/15/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 71 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020, Terminated: 1/15/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 15, 2019 re: Modification of terms of pre-trial release, to allow Lev Parnas to travel with his counsel to the New York Offices of CNN, to tape an interview with Anderson Cooper (unopposed) . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [70] MOTION for Jeffrey E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 69 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSED granting [68] LETTER MOTION (Date Corrected) Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a Samsung phone, iPad and iPhone, to the US House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump (unopposed). as to Lev Parnas (1)...ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant Lev Parnas may produce the materials referenced herein to the United States House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/13/20) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020, Terminated: 1/13/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy dated January 3, 2020 re: (Date Corrected) Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a Samsung phone, iPad and iPhone, to the US House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump (unopposed). Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Lev Parnas: Notice to Attorney Bondy, Joseph to RE-FILE Document [66] MOTION to Amend/Correct. Date-Corrected LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 11, 2020 re: Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 1/11/2020, Entered: 1/11/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephanie Renee Schuman appearing for Lev Parnas. Appearance Type: Retained. (Schuman, Stephanie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 66 Filed: 1/11/2020, Entered: 1/11/2020, Terminated: 1/11/2020 motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Amend/Correct. Date-Corrected, LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 11, 2020 re: Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a Samsung phone, iPad and iPhone, to the US House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump (unopposed). Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph) Modified on 1/13/2020 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 65 Filed: 1/11/2020, Entered: 1/11/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 11, 2019 re: Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a Samsung phone, an iPad and an iPhone, to the US House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump (unopposed). Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated January 3, 2020 re: Kukushkin Surveillance Motion Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSED granting [58] LETTER MOTION Unopposed Modification of the Protective Order Governing Discovery, to allow production of materials seized from Mr. Parnas's home and the contents of his iPhone 11 to the United States House of Representatives' Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump as to Lev Parnas (1)...ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant Lev Parnas may produce the materials referenced herein to the United States House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/3/20) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Lev Parnas (1). On December 24, 2019, Attorney Edward B. MacMahon, Jr., counsel of record for Defendant Lev Parnas, moved to withdraw from this case. (Dkt. No. 57.) That request is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. MacMahon from the case and close the motion at Docket Number 57. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/3/20) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019, Terminated: 1/3/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 30, 2019 re: Unopposed Modification of the Protective Order Governing Discovery, to allow production of materials seized from Mr. Parnas's home and the contents of his iPhone 11 to the United States House of Representatives' Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: 12/24/2019, Terminated: 1/3/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Edward B. MacMahon, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Attachments: # (1) Affirmation of Counsel)(MacMahon, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 20, 2019 re: Submission of Redacted Exhibits from Bail Review Hearing of December 17, 2019 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SunTrust Banking Records (Redacted), # (2) Exhibit Chase Bank Records (Redacted), # (3) Exhibit E-Mail Correspondence (Redacted), # (4) Exhibit Accountant Letter (Redacted))(Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Joseph A. Bondy dated 12/20/2019 re: Counsel writes regarding redacted items. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant's counsel is directed to file on ECF the exhibits with the proposed redactions. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/20/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Oral Argument proceeding held on 12/17/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas re: Oral Argument held on 12/17/19 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated December 18, 2019 re: Bail Hearing Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Bond Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Bond Hearing as to Lev Parnas held on 12/17/2019. Defendant Lev Parnas present with attorney Joseph Bondy and Stephanie Schuman; AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Roos and Douglas Zolkind present; Court Reporter present. Bail Review Hearing Held: Bail conditions to continue as previously set. Bail Continued. (See transcript for complete details.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 16, 2019 re [41] FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 4, 2019 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release .. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE AS TO LEV PARNAS: THE DECEMBER 17, 2019 BAIL REVIEW HEARING WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 12B OF THE DANIEL PATRICK MOYNIHAN UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK NEW YORK, 10007. (bh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Lev Parnas. A bail review hearing for Defendant Lev Parnas will be held on December 17, 2019, at 12:15 p.m. in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. In anticipation of that hearing, counsel for Defendant Lev Parnas is directed to file a response to the Government's letter dated December 11, 2019, on or before December 16, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/12/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Lev Parnas: Responses due by 12/16/2019. Bond Hearing set for 12/17/2019 at 12:15 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated December 11, 2019 re: Opposition to Parnas Bail Modification Request Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/2/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas re: Conference held on 12/2/19 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 4, 2019 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Pretrial Conference as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin held on 12/2/2019. Defendant Lev Parnas present with attorney Edward MacMahon and Joseph Bondy; defendant Igor Fruman not present, attorney Todd Blanche present; defendant David Correia not present, attorney William Harrington present; defendant Andrey Kukushkin not present, attorney Gerald Lefcourt and Faith Friedman present. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Landsman Roos and Douglas Zolkind present. Court Reporter present. Pretrial conference held: Next conference scheduled for 2/3/2020. Time is excluded to 2/3/2020. Bail continued as to each defendant. (See transcript for complete details.) (jbo) Modified on 12/3/2019 (jw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE: THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 2, 2019 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE JUDGE OETKEN WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 110 OF THE THURGOOD MARSHALL UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 40 FOLEY SQUARE, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10007. (bh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address as to Lev Parnas. New Address: The Law Offices of Joseph A. Bondy, 1776 Broadway, Suite 2000, New York, New York, USA 10019, (212) 219-3572. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Lev Parnas: It is hereby ORDERED that, in light of the writ of attachment, the Clerk of Court shall not release the funds posted by or on behalf of Defendant Parnas in this matter absent further order of this Court.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/13/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/13/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated November 12, 2019 re: Proposed Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Lev Parnas: It is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's bail is modified to include: Surrender firearms and fireann permit to the local authorities, or otherwise directed by Pretrial Services, and provide proof of such. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/7/2019) (lnl) Modified on 11/7/2019 (lnl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/23/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman re: Conference held on 10/23/19 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appearance Bond Entered as to (19-Cr-725-01) Lev Parnas in amount of $1,000,000.00. Agreed conditions of release; $1,000,000 Personal Recognizance Bond; To be cosigned by two financially responsible persons; Secured by $200,000 cash or property; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL; Travel to EDVA and DDC only for legal visits approved by PTS; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Regular pretrial supervision; Home detention; GPS; Defendant to be released on own signature; $200,000 cash to be transferred from EDVA by November 1, 2019; The bond is to be cosigned by Aaron Parnas and Svetlana Parnas by November 1, 2019; Defendant is to provide a signed financial affidavit by 10/25/2019; Defendant is to have no contact with co-defendants outside the presence of counsel; Defendant is to be supervised in the Southern District of Florida. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 10/23/2019 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/31/2019) (dif). (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/31/2019) (dif). (Main Document 22 replaced on 11/6/2019) (bw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Initial Appearance as to (19-Cr-725-01) Lev Parnas held on 10/23/2019. Date of Arrest: 10/9/2019. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski & Nicolas Roos. Defense Counsel: Edward MacMahon & Joseph Bondy (Retained). BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $1,000,000 PRB; 2 FRP; Secured by $200,000 cash/property; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL. Travel to EDVA and DDC only for legal visits approved by PTS; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Regular pretrial supervision; Home detention; GPS; Defendant to be released on own signature. $200,000 in cash to be transferred from EDVA by November 1, 2019. The bond is to be cosigned by Aaron Parnas and Svetlana Parnas by November 1, 2019. Defendant is to provide a signed financial affidavit by 10/25/2019. Defendant is to have no contact with co-defendants outside presence of counsel. Defendant is to be supervised in the Southern District of Florida. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 12/2/2019 at 2 pm. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 12/2/2019. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Lev Parnas from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER as to Lev Parnas (1). Time excluded from 10/23/2019 until 12/2/2019. Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER as to Lev Parnas (1). Time excluded from 10/23/2019 until 12/2/2019. Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Arraignment as to Lev Parnas (1) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 10/23/2019. Plea entered by Lev Parnas (1) Count 1,2,3,4 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph Aaron Bondy appearing for Lev Parnas. Appearance Type: Retained. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward Brian MacMahon, Jr appearing for Lev Parnas. Appearance Type: Retained. (MacMahon, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Douglas Samuel Zolkind appearing for USA. (Zolkind, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin: The arraignment and initial conference as to Defendants Parnas and Fruman is hereby adjourned to Wednesday, October 23, 2019, at 11:30 a.m., and will be held in Courtroom 506 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. The arraignment and initial conference as to Defendants Correia and Kukushkin will take place as previously scheduled on Thursday, October 17, 2019, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/16/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman: Arraignment set for 10/23/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin ( Arraignment set for 10/17/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.)It is hereby ORDERED that all parties shall appear for an arraignment and initial conference on Thursday, October 17, 2019, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/15/2019)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/10/19)(jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Arrest of Lev Parnas in the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney update in case as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. Attorney Rebekah Allen Donaleski,Nicolas Tyler Landsman Roos for USA added. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin ASSIGNED to Judge J. Paul Oetken. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Designated ECF as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 4, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 4. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 248 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?