USA, et al v. Magana-Ramos
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00008-JAT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Michael Restaino +1 602 514 7756 +1 602 514 7450 Gary.Restaino@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 7/8/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-00410
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846 Conspiracy to Possess with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) and 2 Possession with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine; Aid and Abet
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) and 2 Possession with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine; Aid and Abet
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (166) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order/Judgment Revoking Supervised ReleaseCourt Filing
ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) Custody of BOP for a term of 11 MONTHS to run consecutively to the prison term imposed in CR005-1351-TUC-JAT. No term of Supervised Release to follow.. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/9/06. (MAP, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James A Teilborg :Final Disposition Hearing re Petition on Supervised Release as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas (04) held on 2/6/2006. (Court Reporter David German.) (TLB )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James A Teilborg :Admit/Deny Hearing Petition on Supervised Release as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas (04) held on 10/19/2005. Final Disposition Hearing set for 2/6/2006 at 02:00 PM before Judge James A Teilborg. (Court Reporter David German.) (TLB)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Mail Returned
        Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Florentino Machuca-Diaz. Reason for return: left 6-29-01. Research shows inmate discharged from BOP. No forwarding information is available. Document number 166. (RDS)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [165] Motion to Continue as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) admit/deny hearing to 10/19/05 @ 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on September 13th, 2005. (KCS)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Copy Mailed
            Copy of document number 166, mailed to Florentino Machuca-Diaz on this date. (EAT, )
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 9/16/2005 Motion to Continue
              First MOTION to Continue Admit and Deny Hearing by Eribey Gomez-Rosas. (Iniguez, Hermilio)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
                Supervised release Warrant Returned Executed on 08-19-05 in case as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas. (DNH, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                  ORDER OF DETENTION as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas Signed by Judge Morton Sitver on 8/26/05. (PKD)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Morton Sitver :Detention Hearing as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas submitted on 8/26/2005. Defendant detained pending disposition. Preliminary Hearing as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas waived. Defendant held to anwer before USDC. SPANISH INTERPRETER NEEDED as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4). Admit/Deny Hearing set for 9/14/2005 01:30 PM before Judge James A Teilborg. (Recorded on CourtSmart) (SMA)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 CJA 20 Appointment
                      CJA 20 as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas: Appointment of Attorney Hermilio Iniguez for Eribey Gomez-Rosas. (LCF)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David K Duncan :Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas held on 8/19/2005. Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas held on 8/19/2005. Appointing Hermilio Iniguez for Eribey Gomez-Rosas with Appointment Type: CJA., Appearance entered by Hermilio Iniguez for Eribey Gomez-Rosas on behalf of defendant., SPANISH as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) SPANISH Detention /Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 8/26/2005 03:30 PM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. (Court Reporter courtsmart.) (PKD, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Arrest
                          Arrest of Eribey Gomez-Rosas on Violation of Supervised Release Violation Petition. (PKD, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY substitution: Gary Michael Restaino, Gary Michael Restaino appearing for USA. Attorney Jeffrey A Myer terminated. (Restaino, Gary)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas, Added attorney Hermilio Iniguez for Eribey Gomez-Rosas. Attorney Richard L Juarez terminated in case as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas. . Signed by Judge James A. Teilborg on 8/3/05. (CMM, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 157 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                PETITION TO REVOKE supervised release as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; . (SRB)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 156 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Other Notice
                                  NOTICE of related cases by USPP Phoenix as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas, this action and 4:05-05115M-1. copy to cds' (DMT)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Warrant Issued
                                    VIOLATION OF SUPERVISED RELEASE WARRANT issued for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; (SRB)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 155 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas for CJA atty Loyd C Tate (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 154 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                        PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas for CJA atty Richard L Juarez (DMT)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 153 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Other Notice
                                          NOTICE re return mail as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz, unclaimed not in custody at CADC-Florence (CMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 152 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002 USCA Mandate
                                            CERTIFIED COPY of 9CCA Mandate as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz dismissing the appeal for failure to prosecute, re: 01-10395 [85-1] (cc: JAT/pts/prob/USM/USAO/dfns) (REW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 147 Filed: 4/29/2002, Entered: 4/29/2002, Terminated: 3/12/2003 Order of 9th Circuit
                                              Copy of 9th Circuit Order as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz; appellant shall have one final opportunity to provide the required declaration; within 21 days appellant shall file with this court a declaration or notarized statement attesting to the date on which the notice of appeal was deposited in the institution's internal mail system and whether first-class postage was prepaid, or otherwise show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dimsissed for lack of jurisdiction; failure to comply with this order within the time allowed may result in the dismissal of this appeal for failure to prosecute, re: 01-10395 [85-1] (cc: judge) (REW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 145 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Order
                                                MINUTE ORDER ; pretrial conference vacated ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 10:00 4/15/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [145-2] (CMM)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [143-1] ; trial reset for 9:00 4/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002, Terminated: 4/2/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                    MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [143-1] (REW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg pretrial conference set for 10:00 4/15/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Judge James A. Teilborg ; motions in limine shall be due 5 business days prior to the final pretrial conference; responses to motions in limine shall be due 3 business days prior to the final pretrial conference; 3 business days prior to trial the parties shall jointly file a description of the case to be read to the jury; each party shall file a proposed set of voir dire questions; the parties shall submit a joint list of jury instructions; the parties shall submit a joint list of witnesses; if a jury questionnaire is to be used, submit jury questionnaire; 1 business day prior to trial the parties shall submit marked exhibits and exhibit lists for use at trial.... (LAD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                        ( FILED: 3/21/02) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David German status hrg held as to Eribey Gomez- Rosas ; the motion for disclosure re confidential informant by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [139-1] is pending; the government is preparing its response; trial reset for 9:00 4/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before James A. Teilborg ; no time is excluded from the 4/2/02 trial date to 4/23/02; defense counsel is directed to file a written motion and order to continue trial; motion and order to continue to follow [141-4] (LAD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 3/21/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas all stipulated motions to continue and request for change of plea must be received 2 business days prior to the status conference; the Clerk of Court shall mail copies of this order to all counsel of record (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002 Order of 9th Circuit
                                                            Copy of 9th Circuit Order as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz; within 21 days appellant shall file with this court a declaration or notarized statement attesting to the date on which the notice of appeal was deposited in the institution's internal mail system and whether first-class postage was prepaid, or otherwise show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction; counsel Ochoa shall assist appellant in the preparation and filing of the declaration; failure to comply with this order within the time allowed may result in the dismissal of this appeal for failure to prosecute, re: 01-10395 [85-1] (cc: judge) (REW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Motion to Reveal ID of Informant
                                                              MOTION for disclosure re confidential informant [139-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-2] ; trial reset for 9:00 4/2/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 3/1/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (REW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002, Terminated: 1/31/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                  MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-1] , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-2] (REW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    ( FILED: 1/24/02) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David German status hrg held ; dft requests an additional continuance of trial to allow additional time for dft to resolve a legal matter in another jurisdiction; trial reset for 9:00 4/2/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Judge James A. Teilborg , excludable delay interest of justice started ; written motion and order to continue trial to be filed by defense counsel [135-5] (LAD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 1/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Order of 9th Circuit
                                                                        Copy of 9th Circuit Order as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz; appellant shall have one final opportunity to provide the declaration pursuant to the court order of 8/13/01; within 21 days appellant shall file the declaration; counsel Ochoa shall assist appellant in the preparation and filing of the declaration; counsel Ochoa's motion to withdraw will be addressed upon resolution of the jurisdictional issue, re: 01-10395 [85-1] (cc: judge) (REW) Modified on 11/27/2001
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [130-1]; granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [130-2] ; trial reset for 9:00 2/5/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 1/4/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (REW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            (FILED: 11/20/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David German .; status hearing held as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas; trial reset for 2/5/02 at 9:00 am; defense counsel to file written motion to continue trial for court's signature; no additional continuances will be granted in this matter; ; status hrg held [131-2] (REW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001, Terminated: 11/27/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                              MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [130-1] , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [130-2] (REW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 11/20/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-2] ; trial reset for 9:00 12/4/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 11/9/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (REW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                    ( FILED: 10/24/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: not present; status conference held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas; granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-2]; trial continued to 12/4/01 at 9:00 am; time to file pretrial motions extended to 11/9/01; order signed by court this date ; status hrg held [127-2] (REW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001, Terminated: 10/25/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                      MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-1] , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-2] (REW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                                        JUDGMENT and commitment returned executed upon Carlos Valles-Garcia; dft to FCI-SAF, Safford AZ on 10/4/01 (REW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 118 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 10/24/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 124 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos for CJA atty Mary Kathryn Wisdom (REW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos for CJA atty Baltazar Iniguez (REW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Receipt
                                                                                                        RETURNED MAIL addressed to dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos, re: judgment (#98); marked "Return to Sender, left 9/14/01, unclaimed/not in custody" (REW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Receipt
                                                                                                          LETTER by dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos, requesting copies (copies sent by CD) (REW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial [111-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [111-2] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; trial reset for 9:00 11/6/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 10/5/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (REW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                              PLEA agreement filed as to Carlos Valles-Garcia (REW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                (FILED 9/18/01) JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Carlos Valles-Garcia Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) 2. Dismissed. , sentencing for Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) 1. Sentenced to the custody of BOP for a term of 57 months with credit for time served to be followed by supervised release for a period of 5 years; S/A $100 ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ( FILED: 9/12/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky ; sentencing held as to Carlos Valles-Garcia see judgment for sentence [113-2] (REW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001, Terminated: 9/18/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                    MOTION to continue trial [111-1] by ERibey Gomez-Rosas , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions [111-2] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Certificate of Record
                                                                                                                      Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9th Circuit as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz re [85-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        CJA Form 24 copy 3 authorization voucher for payment of Transcript by Florentino Machuca-Diaz ; ordered by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis (REW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 8/28/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer - SPANISH motions hearing held; granting motion for appointment of cnsl [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas for the reasons as stated on the record; Loyd C Tate shall be relieved of responsibility as counse for dft upon appointment of new counsel from the CJA panel; denying motion to dismiss (all counts charged) due to ineffective assistance of counsel by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (as pro se; #45772-008, CCA, PO Box Florence AZ 85232) [105-1]; dft states on the record he is willing to waive his speedy trial rights and have the 9/25/01 trial date continued to allow new counsel time to prepare for trial; new counsel may file a written motion to continue trial and order for the Court's consideration; LATER IT IS ORDERED appointing Richard Juarez to represent dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas; terminating attorney Loyd C Tate for Eribey Gomez-Rosas and substituting attorney Richard L Juarez [109-2] (LAD)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Transcript -Appeal
                                                                                                                            Court Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings for the following date(s): 3/23/01 ; re: plea hearing as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz (taped proceedings) (REW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Transcript -Appeal
                                                                                                                              Court Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings for the following date(s): 2/28/01 ; re: plea hearing as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz (taped proceedings) (REW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Transcript -Appeal
                                                                                                                                Court Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings for the following date(s): 2/26/01 ; re: plea hearing as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz (taped proceedings) (REW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER re motion for appointment of cnsl [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas and dft pro se pretrial motion to dismsis due to ineffective assistance of counsel; hearings reset for 3:30 8/28/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [104-1] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Order of 9th Circuit
                                                                                                                                    Copy of 9th Circuit Order as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz; within 21 days counsel Ochoa shall file a written statement explaining why the dft rather than counsel filed the notice of appeal; if counsel wishes to withdraw, counsel must, within 21 days file a motion in this court; within 21 days, appellant shall file with this court a declaration or statment attesting to the date on which the notice of appeal was deposited in the institution's mail system or otherwise show cause in writing why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction, re: 01-10395 [85-1] (cc: judge) (REW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 100 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to dismiss (all counts charged) due to ineffective assistance of counsel by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (as pro se; #45772-008, CCA, PO Box 6300, Florence AZ 85232) [105-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 102 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          CJA Form 24 copy 3 authorization voucher for payment of Transcript by Florentino Machuca-Diaz ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER re: motion for appointment of counsel [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; hearing set for 3:00 9/11/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [101-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                                                                              MOTION for appointment of cnsl [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 99 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                PLEA agreement filed as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos (REW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 98 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  (FILED 8/20/01) JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 2. Dismissed. , sentencing for Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 1. Sentenced to custody of BOP for a term of 57 months with credit for time served to be followed by supervised release for a period of 5 years; S/A $100. ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 97 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 8/15/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco ; sentencing held as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos court grants downward departure (see judgment for sentencing) [97-2] (REW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001 Transcript -Appeal
                                                                                                                                                      Court Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings for the following date(s): 6/4/01 ; re: sentencing as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz; CtRptr: David German (REW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                        Notification by 9th Circuit of appellate docket number 01-10395 re [85-1] as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz (REW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 94 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                          RETURNED MAIL addressed to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz, re: order (#93); marked "Return to Sender, left 6/29/01, unclaimed/not in custody" (REW)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 93 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [88-1]; trial reset for 9/25/01 at 9:00 am pretrial conference set for 3:00 9/11/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (REW)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 92 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Carlos Valles-Garcia ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 91 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Carlos Valles-Garcia ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 90 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Florentino Machuca-Diaz as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz; ordering transcripts for hearings of 2/26/01, 2/28/01, 3/23/01 and 6/4/01 (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 89 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                                    RETURNED MAIL addressed to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz; re: appeal packet, marked: "Return to Sender, left 6/29/01, unclaimed/not in custody" (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 88 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001, Terminated: 7/17/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [88-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ( FILED: 7/10/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco; status hearing held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas; granting oral motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [0-0] ; status hrg held ; trial reset for 9:00 9/25/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; time excluded pursuant to 18:3161(h); dft counsel shall file written motion to continue trial and order for court's signature wihtin 5 days [87-2] (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 86 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Time Schedule Order
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER for 9th Circuit Time Schedule as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz re [85-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                            ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [0-0] (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 84 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/6/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; trial vacated ; sentencing set for 2:30 9/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia , plea agreement lodged as to Carlos Valles-Garcia [84-4] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion for withdrawal of attorney Mary Kathryn Wisdom by Raymundo Magana-Ramos [80-1] ; terminating attorney Mary Kathryn Wisdom for Raymundo Magana-Ramos appointing counsel for Raymundo Magana-Ramos Baltazar Iniguez (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 11:00 7/3/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Judge Teilborg [81-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 83 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED: 6/29/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German - status hearing held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (set as change of plea) - plea negotiations are on-going ; further status hearing set for 2:00 7/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas; plea hrg vacated; trial reset for 2:00 7/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [83-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz from District Court judgment, re: conviction and sentence (cc: 9CCA/JAT/BAS/pts/USAO/dfns/dft) (appeal filed by dft as pro se; dft has appointed counsel) (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001, Terminated: 7/2/2001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for withdrawal of attorney Mary Kathryn Wisdom by Raymundo Magana-Ramos [80-1] (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz for CJA atty David M Ochoa (final payment) (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 6/28/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Judge James A. Teilborg (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz by Judge James A. Teilborg (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 76 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) 2. Dismissed on gov mtn at sentencing , sentencing for Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) 1. Committed to BOP for FIFTY-SEVEN (57) MOS w/credit for time served; followed by supervised release for FIVE (5) YRS; S/A: $100 ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg; Crt recommends dft be placed in institution in Phoenix or Southwestern US (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PLEA agreement filed as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 6/7/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco/Spanish ; sentencing held as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz; Crt grants 3-level and 2-level downward departure [cc: cnsl/prob/pts] [74-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial [71-1] by Carlos Valles-Garcia, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [71-2] by Carlos Valles-Garcia ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 6/8/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia; trial reset for 9:00 7/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; status hrg vacated , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial [70-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; trial reset for 9:00 7/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER - court advised that dft Carlos Valles-Garcia does not wish to enter a change of plea ; plea hrg vacated , counsel to file motion to continue the 6/5/01 trial date [69-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001, Terminated: 5/30/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to continue trial [71-1] by Carlos Valles-Garcia , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions [71-2] by Carlos Valles-Garcia (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001, Terminated: 5/30/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to continue trial [70-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILED: 5/23/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Van Duzer - finding the motion for funds to hire psychologist [42-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos moot. Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; trial vacated ; plea hrg held ; status hrg vacated ; sentencing set for 2:30 8/13/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos , plea agreement lodged as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos [68-4] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SENTENCING Memorandum filed by Florentino Machuca-Diaz (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 4:00 5/24/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Judge Teilborg [66-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 2:00 5/22/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos before Judge Teilborg [65-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 5/22/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER ; settlement conference held before Judge Anderson as to all dfts all counsel and interpreter Van Duzer present. [63-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 62 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SENTENCING CONFERENCE Memorandum filed by USA as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia and Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing reset for 2:30 6/4/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz [61-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                The Court has ORDERED that the above captioned matter is reassigned to Judge James A. Teilborg for all further proceedings. Any scheduled hearing, conference, or trial in this action remains as scheduled and will be placed on the calendar of Judge James A. Teilborg . All further pleadings and papers filed in this action should bear the complete case number and judge's initials, as shown above. (cc: all counsel) [60-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 59 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue trial [57-1] by dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia, and Gomez-Rosas ; trial reset for 9:00 6/5/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001, Terminated: 4/6/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to continue trial [57-1] by dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia, and Gomez-Rosas (CMM) Modified on 04/06/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee denying motion to continue trial [50-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILED: 4/5/01) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee Ct Rptr: David Lee ; status hrg held as to dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia and Gomez-Rosas , ; settlement conference set for 11:00 4/24/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson [58-4] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILED: 3/27/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: Van Duzer - finding the motion to suppress statement [36-1] by Florentino Machuca-Diaz moot. Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , plea agreement lodged as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz , ; trial vacated ; plea hrg held ; status hrg vacated ; sentencing set for 11:30 6/4/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz [54-4] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion for mental examination (re competency to stand trial) [46-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos excludable delay competency examination started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee pretrial status hearing set for 4:00 3/28/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Florentino Machuca-Diaz, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 1:30 3/23/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [51-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001, Terminated: 3/29/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to continue trial [50-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILED: 3/2/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky ; plea hrg held as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz the court does not accept dft's plea of guilty, parties may try and draft a new plea agreement [49-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee and consent of Florentino Machuca-Diaz for referral to Magistrate Judge for change of plea. (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 2/28/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: LVelasco ; possible chg of plea hearing reset for 10:00 2/28/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz [cc: interp/smm/vam] [47-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001, Terminated: 3/23/2001 Motion for Exam
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for mental examination (re competency to stand trial) [46-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 4:00 2/26/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [45-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for funds to hire psychologist [42-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by pla USA to motion to suppress statement [36-1] by florentino Machuca-Diaz (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue trial [37-1] by Florentino Machuca-Diaz ; trial reset for 9:00 4/3/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Florentino Machuca-Diaz, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA , Jeffrey A Myer; terminating attorney Ann Birmingham Scheel for USA (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED MOTION to continue trial [37-1] by Florentino Machuca-Diaz (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001, Terminated: 1/25/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to continue trial [37-1] by Florentino Machuca-Diaz (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 1/17/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to suppress statement [36-1] by Florentino Machuca-Diaz (CMM) Modified on 03/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILED: 1/16/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Van Duzer dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney Jeffrey Williams for Mary Wisdom present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; trial set for 9:00 2/6/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos [cc: pts,usa,atty,interp,kr [35-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILED: 1/16/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Van Duzer dft Carlos Valles-Garcia arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney Jeffrey Williams present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia ; trial set for 9:00 2/6/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia [cc: pts,usa,atty,interp,kr [34-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILED: 1/16/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Van Duzer dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney David Ochoa present; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz ; trial set for 9:00 2/6/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz [cc: pts,usa,atty,interp,kr [33-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILED: 1/16/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Van Duzer dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney Loyd Tate present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; trial set for 9:00 2/6/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [cc: pts,usa,atty,interp,al [32-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Other NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos, dft Carlos Valles-Garcia, dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz, dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas that conflict does not exist as to US Magistrate Judge Virginia A Mathis (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT by USA attorney Ann Birmingham Scheel. Counts filed against Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 1, 2, Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) 1, 2, Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) 1, 2, Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) count(s) 1, 2 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas appointing Loyd C. Tate to represent the dft; ordered by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz appointing David M. Ochoa to represent the defendant; ordered by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Carlos Valles-Garcia appointing Jeffrey A. Williams to represent the defendant, terminating ; ordered by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos appointing attorney Mary Wisdom to represent the defendant; ordered by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas, dft held to answere before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM [17-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz and was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [16-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived and dft Carlos Valles-Garcia was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [15-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re: preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived and dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [14-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas re: detention order [13-1] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M 00-180 Interpreter: Louis Velasco first appearance of Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas appears with counsel Loyd C Tate , SPANISH for Eribey Gomez-Rosas; detention submitted, dft continued detained pending trial; status hearing regarding prelim hearing set 12/14/00 at 10:00 a.m. before Mag Judge Mathis; dft waives time limit of prelim hearing [11-4] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz re: detention order [10-1] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Florentino Machuca-Diaz [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M 00-180 Interpreter: Louis Velasco first appearance of Florentino Machuca-Diaz ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , 1 first appearance of Florentino Machuca-Diaz ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz appears with counsel David M Ochoa , SPANISH for Florentino Machuca-Diaz; detention submitted, dft contiuned detained pending trial; status hearing regarding prelim hearing set 12/14/00 at 10:00 a.m. before Mag Judge Mathis; dft waives time limit for prelim hearing [8-5] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Carlos Valles-Garcia re: detention order [7-1] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Carlos Valles-Garcia [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M 00-180 Interpreter: Louis Velasco first appearance of Carlos Valles-Garcia ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Carlos Valles-Garcia appears with counsel Jeffrey Allen Williams , SPANISH for Carlos Valles-Garcia; detention was submitted, dft continued detained pending trial; status hearing regarding prelim hearing set 12/14/00 at 10:00 a.m. before Mag Judge Mathis [5-4] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos re: detention order [4-1] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Raymundo Magana-Ramos [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M 00-180 Interpreter: Louis Velasco first appearance of Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos appears with counsel Mary Kathryn Wisdom , SPANISH for Raymundo Magana-Ramos; detention hearing submitted, dft continued detained pending trial; status hearing regarding prelim hearing set 12/14/00 at 10:00 a.m. before Mag Judge Mathis; dft waives any time limits for prelim hearing [2-4] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia, Florentino Machuca-Diaz, Eribey Gomez-Rosas [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DEFENDANT Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia, Florentino Machuca-Diaz, Eribey Gomez-Rosas arrested. Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) cmp, Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) cmp, Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) cmp, Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?