USA, et al v. Magana-Ramos
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00008-JAT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Michael Restaino +1 602 514 7756 +1 602 514 7450 Gary.Restaino@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 7/8/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-00410
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846 Conspiracy to Possess with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) and 2 Possession with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine; Aid and Abet
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) and 2 Possession with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine; Aid and Abet
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (77) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Copy Mailed
Copy of document number 166, mailed to Florentino Machuca-Diaz on this date. (EAT, )
    LREF
    Blank 145 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Order
    MINUTE ORDER ; pretrial conference vacated ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 10:00 4/15/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [145-2] (CMM)
      LREF
      Blank 144 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [143-1] ; trial reset for 9:00 4/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
        LREF
        Blank 142 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg pretrial conference set for 10:00 4/15/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Judge James A. Teilborg ; motions in limine shall be due 5 business days prior to the final pretrial conference; responses to motions in limine shall be due 3 business days prior to the final pretrial conference; 3 business days prior to trial the parties shall jointly file a description of the case to be read to the jury; each party shall file a proposed set of voir dire questions; the parties shall submit a joint list of jury instructions; the parties shall submit a joint list of witnesses; if a jury questionnaire is to be used, submit jury questionnaire; 1 business day prior to trial the parties shall submit marked exhibits and exhibit lists for use at trial.... (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank 141 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          ( FILED: 3/21/02) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David German status hrg held as to Eribey Gomez- Rosas ; the motion for disclosure re confidential informant by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [139-1] is pending; the government is preparing its response; trial reset for 9:00 4/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before James A. Teilborg ; no time is excluded from the 4/2/02 trial date to 4/23/02; defense counsel is directed to file a written motion and order to continue trial; motion and order to continue to follow [141-4] (LAD)
            LREF
            Blank 140 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 3/21/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas all stipulated motions to continue and request for change of plea must be received 2 business days prior to the status conference; the Clerk of Court shall mail copies of this order to all counsel of record (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
              LREF
              Blank 137 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-2] ; trial reset for 9:00 4/2/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 3/1/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (REW)
                LREF
                Blank 134 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 1/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                  LREF
                  Blank 131 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  (FILED: 11/20/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David German .; status hearing held as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas; trial reset for 2/5/02 at 9:00 am; defense counsel to file written motion to continue trial for court's signature; no additional continuances will be granted in this matter; ; status hrg held [131-2] (REW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 129 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 11/20/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                      LREF
                      Blank 127 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                      ( FILED: 10/24/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: not present; status conference held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas; granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-2]; trial continued to 12/4/01 at 9:00 am; time to file pretrial motions extended to 11/9/01; order signed by court this date ; status hrg held [127-2] (REW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 118 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 10/24/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                          LREF
                          Blank 123 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 122 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 121 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 120 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                CJA Form 21 for expert services of interpreter by Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 124 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                  PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos for CJA atty Mary Kathryn Wisdom (REW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 119 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos for CJA atty Baltazar Iniguez (REW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 117 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Receipt
                                      RETURNED MAIL addressed to dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos, re: judgment (#98); marked "Return to Sender, left 9/14/01, unclaimed/not in custody" (REW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 116 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001 Receipt
                                        LETTER by dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos, requesting copies (copies sent by CD) (REW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 113 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          ( FILED: 9/12/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky ; sentencing held as to Carlos Valles-Garcia see judgment for sentence [113-2] (REW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 104 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Order
                                            MINUTE ORDER re motion for appointment of cnsl [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas and dft pro se pretrial motion to dismsis due to ineffective assistance of counsel; hearings reset for 3:30 8/28/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [104-1] (CMM)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 100 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                              STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 101 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Order
                                                MINUTE ORDER re: motion for appointment of counsel [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; hearing set for 3:00 9/11/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [101-1] (REW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 99 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                  PLEA agreement filed as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos (REW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 98 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    (FILED 8/20/01) JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 2. Dismissed. , sentencing for Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 1. Sentenced to custody of BOP for a term of 57 months with credit for time served to be followed by supervised release for a period of 5 years; S/A $100. ; ordered by Judge James A. Teilborg (REW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 97 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      ( FILED: 8/15/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco ; sentencing held as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos court grants downward departure (see judgment for sentencing) [97-2] (REW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 87 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                        ( FILED: 7/10/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco; status hearing held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas; granting oral motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [0-0] ; status hrg held ; trial reset for 9:00 9/25/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; time excluded pursuant to 18:3161(h); dft counsel shall file written motion to continue trial and order for court's signature wihtin 5 days [87-2] (REW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 82 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion for withdrawal of attorney Mary Kathryn Wisdom by Raymundo Magana-Ramos [80-1] ; terminating attorney Mary Kathryn Wisdom for Raymundo Magana-Ramos appointing counsel for Raymundo Magana-Ramos Baltazar Iniguez (CMM)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 81 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 11:00 7/3/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Judge Teilborg [81-2] (CMM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                              FILED: 6/29/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German - status hearing held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (set as change of plea) - plea negotiations are on-going ; further status hearing set for 2:00 7/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas; plea hrg vacated; trial reset for 2:00 7/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [83-2] (CMM)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 6/15/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001, Terminated: 7/2/2001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                MOTION for withdrawal of attorney Mary Kathryn Wisdom by Raymundo Magana-Ramos [80-1] (LAD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 6/28/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Judge James A. Teilborg (LAD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    ( FILED: 6/7/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco/Spanish ; sentencing held as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz; Crt grants 3-level and 2-level downward departure [cc: cnsl/prob/pts] [74-2] (former emp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial [71-1] by Carlos Valles-Garcia, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [71-2] by Carlos Valles-Garcia ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 6/8/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia; trial reset for 9:00 7/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; status hrg vacated , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 72 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial [70-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; trial reset for 9:00 7/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Order
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER - court advised that dft Carlos Valles-Garcia does not wish to enter a change of plea ; plea hrg vacated , counsel to file motion to continue the 6/5/01 trial date [69-2] (CMM)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                            FILED: 5/23/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Van Duzer - finding the motion for funds to hire psychologist [42-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos moot. Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; trial vacated ; plea hrg held ; status hrg vacated ; sentencing set for 2:30 8/13/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos , plea agreement lodged as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos [68-4] (CMM)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 4:00 5/24/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Judge Teilborg [66-2] (CMM)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 2:00 5/22/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos before Judge Teilborg [65-2] (CMM)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 5/22/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER ; settlement conference held before Judge Anderson as to all dfts all counsel and interpreter Van Duzer present. [63-2] (CMM)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                      SENTENCING CONFERENCE Memorandum filed by USA as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia and Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Order
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing reset for 2:30 6/4/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz [61-2] (CMM)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          The Court has ORDERED that the above captioned matter is reassigned to Judge James A. Teilborg for all further proceedings. Any scheduled hearing, conference, or trial in this action remains as scheduled and will be placed on the calendar of Judge James A. Teilborg . All further pleadings and papers filed in this action should bear the complete case number and judge's initials, as shown above. (cc: all counsel) [60-1] (MAP)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue trial [57-1] by dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia, and Gomez-Rosas ; trial reset for 9:00 6/5/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001, Terminated: 4/6/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                              MOTION to continue trial [57-1] by dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia, and Gomez-Rosas (CMM) Modified on 04/06/2001
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee denying motion to continue trial [50-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  FILED: 4/5/01) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee Ct Rptr: David Lee ; status hrg held as to dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia and Gomez-Rosas , ; settlement conference set for 11:00 4/24/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson [58-4] (CMM)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion for mental examination (re competency to stand trial) [46-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos excludable delay competency examination started (CMM)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee pretrial status hearing set for 4:00 3/28/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Florentino Machuca-Diaz, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 1:30 3/23/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [51-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001, Terminated: 3/29/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                          MOTION to continue trial [50-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                            FILED: 3/2/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky ; plea hrg held as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz the court does not accept dft's plea of guilty, parties may try and draft a new plea agreement [49-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ( FILED: 2/28/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: LVelasco ; possible chg of plea hearing reset for 10:00 2/28/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz [cc: interp/smm/vam] [47-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 2/14/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001, Terminated: 3/23/2001 Motion for Exam
                                                                                                                MOTION for mental examination (re competency to stand trial) [46-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 4:00 2/26/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [45-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    MOTION for funds to hire psychologist [42-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue trial [37-1] by Florentino Machuca-Diaz ; trial reset for 9:00 4/3/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Florentino Machuca-Diaz, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA , Jeffrey A Myer; terminating attorney Ann Birmingham Scheel for USA (CMM)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          FILED: 1/16/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Van Duzer dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney Jeffrey Williams for Mary Wisdom present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; trial set for 9:00 2/6/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos [cc: pts,usa,atty,interp,kr [35-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Other NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE re dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos, dft Carlos Valles-Garcia, dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz, dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas that conflict does not exist as to US Magistrate Judge Virginia A Mathis (LAD)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 30 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 29 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 27 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                      INDICTMENT by USA attorney Ann Birmingham Scheel. Counts filed against Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 1, 2, Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) 1, 2, Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) 1, 2, Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) count(s) 1, 2 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos appointing attorney Mary Wisdom to represent the defendant; ordered by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas, dft held to answere before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM [17-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz and was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [16-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived and dft Carlos Valles-Garcia was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [15-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re: preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived and dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [14-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos re: detention order [4-1] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                    CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Raymundo Magana-Ramos [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M 00-180 Interpreter: Louis Velasco first appearance of Raymundo Magana-Ramos ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos appears with counsel Mary Kathryn Wisdom , SPANISH for Raymundo Magana-Ramos; detention hearing submitted, dft continued detained pending trial; status hearing regarding prelim hearing set 12/14/00 at 10:00 a.m. before Mag Judge Mathis; dft waives any time limits for prelim hearing [2-4] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia, Florentino Machuca-Diaz, Eribey Gomez-Rosas [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANT Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia, Florentino Machuca-Diaz, Eribey Gomez-Rosas arrested. Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) cmp, Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) cmp, Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) cmp, Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?