Securities and Exchange Commission v. Telegram Group Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-09439-PKC
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 1, 2021 at 3:03 PM ST (4.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Peter Berger +1 212 596 9000 +1 212 596 9090 bergerm@SEC.GOV
Space Alison Rose Levine +1 212 336 5549 levineali@sec.gov
Space Kevin Patrick McGrath +1 212 336 1100 +1 212 336 1322 mcgrathk@sec.gov
Space Ladan Fazlollahi Stewart +1 212 336 0153 +1 212 336 7477 stewartla@sec.gov
Space Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro +1 212 336 9145 tenreiroj@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Telegram Group Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
Space Scott D. Musoff , +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 smusoff@skadden.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander C Drylewski +1 212 735 3000 +1 917 777 2129 alexander.drylewski@skadden.com
Space George Abraham Zimmerman +1 212 735 2047 +1 212 735 2000 gzimmerm@skadden.com
No Logo Ton Issuer Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander C Drylewski +1 212 735 3000 +1 917 777 2129 alexander.drylewski@skadden.com
Space Christopher Peter Malloy +1 212 735 7500 +1 917 777 2583 Christopher.malloy@skadden.com
Space Scott D. Musoff , +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 smusoff@skadden.com
Space George Abraham Zimmerman +1 212 735 2047 +1 212 735 2000 gzimmerm@skadden.com
No Logo Chamber of Digital Commerce, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lilya Tessler +1 212 839 5849 +1 212 839 5599 ltessler@sidley.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/11/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 77 Securities Fraud
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (270) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
            OPINION AND ORDER re: [229] LETTER: In its opposition to the preliminary injunction, Telegram raised no objection to the form of the injunction and never cited the Morrison case. Telegram's application is DENIED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/1/2020) (jwh)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 letterCourt Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Securities and Exchange Commission dated March 31, 2020 re: Telegram's Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 letterCourt Filing
                    LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated March 31, 2020 re: In Support of Our March 27, 2020 Letter (ECF 229) and in Response to the SECs Letter (ECF 230). Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc...(Drylewski, Alexander)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 letterCourt Filing
                        ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Securities and Exchange Commission dated March 30, 2020 re: Telegram's Request to Modify Injunction. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [108].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 letterCourt Filing
                            LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Securities and Exchange Commission dated March 30, 2020 re: Telegram's Request to Modify Injunction. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated March 27, 2020 re: Clarification of March 24, 2020 Order. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc...(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File
                                    Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for [228] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank  transmission of notice of appeal and docket sheet to USCA
                                        Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: [228] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (tp)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Judgment - consent
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: 3/24/2020 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal
                                            NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL from [227] Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19218012. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Proposed Judgment
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: 3/24/2020 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                OPINION AND ORDER re: [3] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order: Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction, (Doc. 3), is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/24/2020) (jwh)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Securities and Exchange Commission dated March 9, 2020 re: Defendants' March 6, 2020 Letter. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated March 6, 2020 re: March 3, 2020 Decision of the California Court of Appeal, Second Division. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc...(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020 Notice of change of address
                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by George Abraham Zimmerman on behalf of Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. New Address: Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, One Manhattan West, New York, New York, 10001-8602,..(Zimmerman, George)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/23/2020, Entered: None USCA Order
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alison R. Levine dated February 26, 2020 re: Filing of Additional Exhibits for the Public Record. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PX15 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (2) Exhibit PX37 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (3) Exhibit PX59 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (4) Exhibit PX91 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (5) Exhibit PX146 to [123] Stewart Decl., # (6) Exhibit 3 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (7) Exhibit 4 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (8) Exhibit 5 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (9) Exhibit 6 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (10) Exhibit 7 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (11) Exhibit 8 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (12) Exhibit 9 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (13) Exhibit 10 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (14) Exhibit 11 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (15) Exhibit 12 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (16) Exhibit 13 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (17) Exhibit 14 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (18) Exhibit 15 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (19) Exhibit 16 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (20) Exhibit G to [124] McGrath Decl., # (21) Exhibit M to [124] McGrath Decl., # (22) Exhibit N to [124] McGrath Decl.)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [36].(Levine, Alison)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: 2/26/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alison R. Levine dated February 26, 2020 re: Filing of Additional Exhibits for the Public Record. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PX15 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (2) Exhibit PX42 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (3) Exhibit PX50 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (4) Exhibit PX56 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (5) Exhibit PX59 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (6) Exhibit PX91 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (7) Exhibit PX103 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (8) Exhibit PX104 to [122] Stewart Decl., # (9) Exhibit PX146 to [123] Stewart Decl., # (10) Exhibit Emergency Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to John Hyman [43], # (11) Exhibit Ex. 1 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (12) Exhibit Ex. 2 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (13) Exhibit Ex. 3 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (14) Exhibit Ex. 4 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (15) Exhibit Ex. 5 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (16) Exhibit Ex. 6 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (17) Exhibit Ex. 8 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (18) Exhibit Ex. 9 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (19) Exhibit Ex. 10 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (20) Exhibit Ex. 11 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (21) Exhibit Ex. 12 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (22) Exhibit Ex. 13 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (23) Exhibit Ex. 14 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (24) Exhibit Ex. 15 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (25) Exhibit Ex. 16 to [43] Letters Rogatory, # (26) Exhibit Ex. G to [124] McGrath Decl., # (27) Exhibit Ex. M to [124] McGrath Decl., # (28) Exhibit Ex. N to [124] McGrath Decl.).(Levine, Alison)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Affidavit in Support
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Fedor Skuratov in Support re: [204] Order on Motion for Leave to File Document,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by TON Community Foundation..(Joffe, Dimitry)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                          ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 24, 2020 re: [158] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 4, 2020. . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2 to the Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-2), # (2) Exhibit 10 to the Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-10), # (3) Exhibit 3 to the Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-3), # (4) Exhibit N to the McGrath Declaration (ECF No. 83-14), # (5) Exhibits A-G to Exhibit 1 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-1), # (6) Exhibit 15 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-15), # (7) Exhibit 25 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-25), # (8) Exhibit 34 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-29), # (9) Exhibit 58 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-49), # (10) Exhibit 115 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 188-22))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Malloy, Christopher)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                            LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 24, 2020 re: [158] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 4, 2020. . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Modified Appendix A, # (2) Exhibit 2 to the Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-2), # (3) Exhibit 10 to the Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-10), # (4) Exhibit 3 to the Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-3), # (5) Exhibit 8 to the Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-8), # (6) Exhibit N to the McGrath Declaration (ECF No. 83-14), # (7) Exhibits A-G to Exhibit 1 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-1), # (8) Exhibit 15 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-15), # (9) Exhibit 25 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-25), # (10) Exhibit 34 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-29), # (11) Exhibit 58 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-49)).(Malloy, Christopher)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [142] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Investor B..(Murphy, Patrick)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re: [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material). . Document filed by Investor I..(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re: [148] MOTION to Seal Document . . Document filed by Investor X..(Yu, Victor)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [157] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Investor E, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [157].(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [157] MOTION to Seal . (Redacted). Document filed by Investor E. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A).(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                        ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [152] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Investor Z, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [152].(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [152] MOTION to Seal . (Redacted). Document filed by Investor Z..(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re: [105] MOTION to Seal Document . . Document filed by Investor F..(Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Oral Argument
                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Oral Argument held on 2/19/2020 re: Preliminary Injunction and Summary Judgment. Appearing for plaintiff, Jorge Tenreiro, Kevin McGrath, Alison Levine and Ladan Stewart. Appearing for defendants, Alexander Drylewski, Scott Musoff, Christopher Malloy and Tania Charmani. Upon consent of the parties, the injunction in Roman numeral I. of the October 21, 2019 Stipulation and Consent Order, (Doc. 23), is extended pending determination of the motion for a preliminary injunction and other appropriate relief. Oral argument heard. Decision reserved. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION in Support re: [207] MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Investor F, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed Redactions to Exhibit B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [207].(Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                  DECLARATION in Support re: [207] MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Investor F. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Proposed Redactions to Exhibit B *Filed Under Seal*).(Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [207] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Investor F..(Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Motion to seal
                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Investor F. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                        LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 18, 2020 re: [135] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020. . Document filed by Investor A..(Carman, Eva)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                          LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 18, 2020 re: [138] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020. . Document filed by Investor H..(Carman, Eva)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER: granting [192] Motion for Leave to File Document; granting [195] Motion for Leave to File Document. In connection with its consideration of the TON Community Foundation's Motions for Leave to File an Amicus Brief and a Correct Amicus Brief, (Docs. 192, 195), the Court orders that the TON Community Foundation submit an affidavit providing more detail on the identity of the TON Community Foundation as well as the provenance of its offered amicus brief. Specifically, the affidavit should contain information related to the following subjects: The place and form of organization of the TON Community Foundation; The identity of the TON Community Foundation's corporate parents, affiliates, and/or subsidiaries (if any) as well as any individual(s) with a controlling stake or ownership share of greater than 10%; and Whether any party or its lawyers or law firm drafted, commented on, or reviewed the offered amicus brief. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/18/2020) (ama)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Robert A. Schwartz dated February 18, 2020 re: SEC v. Telegram Group Inc., et al.. Document filed by Commodity Futures Trading Commission..(Schwartz, Robert)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Brief
                                                                                                                BRIEF re: [195] MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Amicus Brief ., [192] MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief . SEC letter brief in opposition to motion for leave to file amicus brief. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ladan F. Stewart dated February 18, 2020 re: Record Supplement. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K).(Stewart, Ladan)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 MOTION for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 18, 2020. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc...(Malloy, Christopher)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/17/2020, Entered: 2/17/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                      ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Proposed Redactions to Exhibit A to ECF Docket No. 180 re: [196] MOTION to Seal Excerpts of Deposition Transcript (Ex. A to ECF Dkt. No. 180).. Document filed by John Hyman, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [196].(Concannon, Serafina)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/17/2020, Entered: 2/17/2020 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of John Hyman in Support re: [196] MOTION to Seal Excerpts of Deposition Transcript (Ex. A to ECF Dkt. No. 180).. Document filed by John Hyman..(Concannon, Serafina)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/17/2020, Entered: 2/17/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [196] MOTION to Seal Excerpts of Deposition Transcript (Ex. A to ECF Dkt. No. 180). . Document filed by John Hyman..(Concannon, Serafina)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/17/2020, Entered: 2/17/2020 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Excerpts of Deposition Transcript (Ex. A to ECF Dkt. No. 180). Document filed by John Hyman. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Concannon, Serafina)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 2/17/2020, Entered: 2/17/2020, Terminated: 2/18/2020 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Corrected Amicus Brief . Document filed by TON Community Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Corrected Amicus Brief, # (2) Exhibit Corrected Amicus Brief blackline).(Joffe, Dimitry)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated February 14, 2020 re: Response to Plaintiff's February 10, 2020 Letter. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Hyman Deposition, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Durov Deposition, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Parekh Deposition).(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by TON Community Foundation..(Joffe, Dimitry)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020, Terminated: 2/18/2020 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by TON Community Foundation. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief).(Joffe, Dimitry)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dimitry Joffe on behalf of TON Community Foundation..(Joffe, Dimitry)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: 2/14/2020 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin P. McGrath dated February 13, 2020 re: [148] MOTION to Seal Document ., [152] MOTION to Seal ., [135] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020., [142] MOTION to Seal ., [158] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 4, 2020., [139] MOTION to Seal Document ., [105] MOTION to Seal Document ., [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material)., [138] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020., [157] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C).(Levine, Alison)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ***SELECTED PARTIES***LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin P. McGrath dated February 13, 2020 re: [148] MOTION to Seal Document ., [152] MOTION to Seal ., [135] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020., [142] MOTION to Seal ., [158] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 4, 2020., [139] MOTION to Seal Document ., [105] MOTION to Seal Document ., [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material)., [138] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020., [157] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [36].(Levine, Alison)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: [152] MOTION to Seal ., [135] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020., [142] MOTION to Seal ., [139] MOTION to Seal Document ., [105] MOTION to Seal Document ., [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material)., [138] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020., [157] MOTION to Seal ., [148] MOTION to Seal Document ., [158] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 4, 2020. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) SEC Response and Counter-Statement to [75] Defendants' 56.1 Statement, # (2) Exhibit PX1 (Exs. A-G) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (3) Exhibit PX2 (Exs. A-I) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (4) Exhibit PX3 (Exs. A-E) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (5) Exhibit PX4 (Exs.A-E) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (6) Exhibit PX5 & PX5 (Exs. A-B) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (7) Exhibit PX7 (Ex. A) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (8) Exhibit PX8 (Ex. A) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (9) Exhibit PX28 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (10) Exhibit PX30 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (11) Exhibit PX31 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (12) Exhibit PX32 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (13) Exhibit PX33 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (14) Exhibit PX61 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (15) Exhibit PX69 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (16) Exhibit PX70 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (17) Exhibit PX74 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (18) Exhibit PX77 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (19) Exhibit PX101 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (20) Exhibit PX102 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (21) Exhibit PX109 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (22) Exhibit PX115 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (23) Exhibit PX117 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (24) Exhibit PX123 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (25) Exhibit PX136 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (26) Exhibit PX147 to [97] Stewart Declaration, # (27) Exhibit PX152 to [97] Stewart Declaration, # (28) Exhibit PX194 to [97] Stewart Declaration)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 response in opposition to motionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: [148] MOTION to Seal Document ., [152] MOTION to Seal ., [135] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020., [142] MOTION to Seal ., [158] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 4, 2020., [139] MOTION to Seal Document ., [105] MOTION to Seal Document ., [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material)., [138] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020., [157] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit PX2 (Exs. A-I) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (2) Exhibit PX3 (Exs. A-E) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (3) Exhibit PX4 (Exs. A-E) to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (4) Exhibit PX61 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (5) Exhibit PX69 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (6) Exhibit PX70 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (7) Exhibit PX74 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (8) Exhibit PX101 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (9) Exhibit PX102 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (10) Exhibit PX109 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (11) Exhibit PX117 to [81] Stewart Declaration, # (12) Exhibit PX147 to [97] Stewart Declaration, # (13) Exhibit PX152 to [97] Stewart Declaration).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [185] Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to [135] LETTER MOTION to Seal Document: Responses due by 2/13/2020) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/12/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin P. McGrath dated February 12, 2020 re: Extension of time to file omnibus response to motions. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Levine, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 Order on motion to file amicus briefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSED ORDER granting [84] Motion to File Amicus Brief; granting [90] Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: The Motions to File Amicus Briefs submitted by the Chamber of Digital Commerce and the Blockchain Association respectively, (Docs. 84, 90), are granted to the extent that the Court will accept the briefs attached to these applications as filed. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/12/2020) (rj)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [182] Letter filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Provide counter designations and a letter of position by Feb 14. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/11/2020) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated February 11, 2020 re: Response to SEC Letter Dated February 10, 2020. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc...(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated 2/10/2020 re: Record Supplement. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit C, # (2) Exhibit D).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated 2/10/2020 re: Record Supplement. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [36].(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [178] Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 2/12/2020) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/7/2020) (jca)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin P. McGrath dated February 7, 2020 re: Letter seeking permission to file omnibus response to motions by February 12, 2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(Levine, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated February 7, 2020 re: Recent Materials. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc...(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Investor I in Support re: [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material).. Document filed by Investor I. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [108].(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Andrew R. Escobar in Support re: [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material).. Document filed by Investor I. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [108].(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material). . Document filed by Investor I. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [108].(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Office of General Counsel of the United States Commodities Futures Trading Commission is respectfully invited to express its views on the issues presently before the Court in the above-captioned action in which its interests may be implicated. Leave is granted to file a written submission, which may take the form of a letter. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/6/2020) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Because the services for the Hon. Deborah Batts will be held on Monday, February 10, 2020, the start of United States v. Bright, 19 cr 521 (PKC), will be delayed by a day. Baring further delays in the Bright trial, the Court will commence the preliminary injunction hearing in this case on February 19, 2020 at 10 a.m., rather than February 18, 2020 at 11 a.m. If more time is required, the Court will schedule it at the hearing. (Status Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/6/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                              ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73), # (2) Exhibit 8 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-8), # (3) Exhibit 12 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-12), # (4) Exhibit 5 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-5), # (5) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's 56.1 Statement (ECF 95), # (6) Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's 56.1 Counterstatement (ECF 120), # (7) Exhibit 15 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-15), # (8) Exhibit 43 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-37), # (9) Exhibit 142 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-4), # (10) Exhibits to Exhibit 1 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (11) Exhibits to Exhibit 2 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (12) Exhibits to Exhibit 3 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (13) Exhibits to Exhibit 4 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (14) Exhibit 55 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (15) Exhibit 61 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (16) Exhibit 69 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (17) Exhibit 70 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (18) Exhibit 74 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (19) Exhibit 76 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (20) Exhibit 94 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (21) Exhibit 101 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (22) Exhibit 102 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (23) Exhibit 105 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (24) Exhibit 109 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (25) Exhibit 111 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (26) Exhibit 117 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (27) Exhibit 123 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (28) Exhibit 145 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (29) Exhibit 147 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (30) Exhibit 150 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (31) Exhibit 151 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (32) Exhibit 152 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (33) Exhibit 169 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (34) Exhibit 194 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (35) Exhibit 195 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (36) Exhibit 196 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73), # (2) Exhibit 8 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-8), # (3) Exhibit 12 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-12), # (4) Exhibit 5 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-5), # (5) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's 56.1 Statement (ECF 95), # (6) Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's 56.1 Counterstatement (ECF 120), # (7) Exhibit 15 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-15), # (8) Exhibit 43 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-37), # (9) Exhibit 142 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-4), # (10) Exhibits to Exhibit 1 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (11) Exhibits to Exhibit 2 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (12) Exhibits to Exhibit 3 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (13) Exhibits to Exhibit 4 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (14) Exhibit 55 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (15) Exhibit 61 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (16) Exhibit 69 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (17) Exhibit 70 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (18) Exhibit 74 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (19) Exhibit 76 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (20) Exhibit 94 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (21) Exhibit 101 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (22) Exhibit 102 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (23) Exhibit 105 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (24) Exhibit 109 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (25) Exhibit 111 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (26) Exhibit 117 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (27) Exhibit 123 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (28) Exhibit 145 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (29) Exhibit 147 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (30) Exhibit 150 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (31) Exhibit 151 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (32) Exhibit 152 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (33) Exhibit 169 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (34) Exhibit 194 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (35) Exhibit 195 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (36) Exhibit 196 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123)).(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                  ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Exhibits Under Seal re: [123] Declaration in Opposition to Motion,,,, [122] Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Stewart Declaration (ECF 122), # (2) Stewart Declaration (ECF 123), # (3) Exhibit 1 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-1), # (4) Exhibit 2 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-2), # (5) Exhibit 3 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-3), # (6) Exhibit 4 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-4), # (7) Exhibit 5 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-5), # (8) Exhibit 6 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-6), # (9) Exhibit 7 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-7), # (10) Exhibit 8 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-8), # (11) Exhibit 12 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-12), # (12) Exhibit 14 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-14), # (13) Exhibit 16 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-16), # (14) Exhibit 17 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-17), # (15) Exhibit 19 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-19), # (16) Exhibit 20 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-20), # (17) Exhibit 21 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-21), # (18) Exhibit 22 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-22), # (19) Exhibit 23 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-23), # (20) Exhibit 24 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-24), # (21) Exhibit 25 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-25), # (22) Exhibit 26 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-26), # (23) Exhibit 29 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-28), # (24) Exhibit 34 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-29), # (25) Exhibit 35 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-30), # (26) Exhibit 37 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-32), # (27) Exhibit 38 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-33), # (28) Exhibit 58 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-49), # (29) Exhibit 71 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-58), # (30) Exhibit 78 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-62), # (31) Exhibit 81 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-65), # (32) Exhibit 82 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-66), # (33) Exhibit 83 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-67), # (34) Exhibit 84 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-68), # (35) Exhibit 85 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-69), # (36) Exhibit 86 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-70), # (37) Exhibit 87 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-71), # (38) Exhibit 89 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-73), # (39) Exhibit 90 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-74), # (40) Exhibit 97 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-79), # (41) Exhibit 98 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-80), # (42) Exhibit 99 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-81), # (43) Exhibit 106 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-83), # (44) Exhibit 110 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-86), # (45) Exhibit 121 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-94), # (46) Exhibit 132 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-104), # (47) Exhibit 134 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-106), # (48) Exhibit 135 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-107), # (49) Exhibit 137 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 122-108), # (50) Exhibit 149 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-7), # (51) Exhibit 153 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-8), # (52) Exhibit 160 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-15), # (53) Exhibit 161 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-16), # (54) Exhibit 162 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-17), # (55) Exhibit 180 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-34), # (56) Exhibit 199 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-49), # (57) Exhibit 200 to Stewart Declaration (ECF 123-50))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Exhibits Under Seal re: [121] Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to Musoff Declaration (ECF 121-1), # (2) Exhibit 2 to Musoff Declaration (ECF 121-2), # (3) Exhibit 3 to Musoff Declaration (ECF 121-3), # (4) Exhibit 5 to Musoff Declaration (ECF 121-5), # (5) Exhibit 6 to Musoff Declaration (ECF 121-6))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Christopher P. Malloy in Opposition re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability.. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-1), # (2) Exhibit 2 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-2), # (3) Exhibit 3 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-3), # (4) Exhibit 4 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-4), # (5) Exhibit 6 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-6), # (6) Exhibit 7 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-7), # (7) Exhibit 8 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-8), # (8) Exhibit 9 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-9), # (9) Exhibit 10 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-10), # (10) Exhibit 11 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-11), # (11) Exhibit 14 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-14), # (12) Exhibit 15 to Malloy Declaration (ECF 94-15))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Kevin P. McGrath in Support re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to McGrath Declaration (ECF 83-1), # (2) Exhibit G to McGrath Declaration (ECF 83-7), # (3) Exhibit L to McGrath Declaration (ECF 83-12), # (4) Exhibit M to McGrath Declaration (ECF 83-13), # (5) Exhibit N to McGrath Declaration (ECF 83-14))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: 2/6/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                          ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Exhibits Under Seal re: [73] Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-2), # (2) Exhibit 4 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-4), # (3) Exhibit 5 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-5), # (4) Exhibit 7 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-7), # (5) Exhibit 10 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-10), # (6) Exhibit 13 to Drylewski Declaration (ECF 73-13))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES***NOTICE of Exhibits Under Seal re: [122] Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Ton Issuer Inc., Telegram Group Inc., Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) PX 30 Exhibit to Stewart Declaration (ECF No. 122), # (2) PX 32 Exhibit to Stewart Declaration (ECF No. 122), # (3) PX 33 Exhibit to Stewart Declaration (ECF No. 122), # (4) PX 77 Exhibit to Stewart Declaration (ECF No. 122), # (5) PX 115 Exhibit to Stewart Declaration (ECF No. 122), # (6) PX 136 Exhibit to Stewart Declaration (ECF No. 122))Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [158].(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ladan F. Stewart dated 2/4/2020 re: request the Court's permission to re-file certain attachments to Docket Entry ("D.E.") 124 to redact certain additional information that could potentially identify investors in the Telegram offer. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/4/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Investor E in Support re: [157] MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Investor E, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [157].(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Investor E (Redacted) in Support re: [157] MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Investor E..(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [157] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Investor E, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-A, # (2) Exhibit 1-B, # (3) Exhibit 2-A, # (4) Exhibit 2-B, # (5) Exhibit 3-A, # (6) Exhibit 3-B, # (7) Exhibit 4-A, # (8) Exhibit 4-B, # (9) Exhibit 5-A, # (10) Exhibit 5-B, # (11) Exhibit 6-A, # (12) Exhibit 6-B, # (13) Exhibit 7-A, # (14) Exhibit 7-B, # (15) Exhibit 8-A, # (16) Exhibit 8-B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [157].(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [157] MOTION to Seal . (Redacted). Document filed by Investor E. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-A, # (2) Exhibit 1-B, # (3) Exhibit 2-A, # (4) Exhibit 2-B, # (5) Exhibit 3-A, # (6) Exhibit 3-B, # (7) Exhibit 4-A, # (8) Exhibit 4-B, # (9) Exhibit 5-A, # (10) Exhibit 5-B, # (11) Exhibit 6-A, # (12) Exhibit 6-B, # (13) Exhibit 7-A, # (14) Exhibit 7-B, # (15) Exhibit 8-A, # (16) Exhibit 8-B).(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated February 4, 2020. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A).(Malloy, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Investor E. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Investor Z in Support re: [152] MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Investor Z, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [152].(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Investor Z (Redacted) in Support re: [152] MOTION to Seal .. Document filed by Investor Z..(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [152] MOTION to Seal . . Document filed by Investor Z, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-A, # (2) Exhibit 1-B, # (3) Exhibit 2-A, # (4) Exhibit 2-B, # (5) Exhibit 3-A, # (6) Exhibit 3-B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [152].(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [152] MOTION to Seal . (Redacted). Document filed by Investor Z. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-A, # (2) Exhibit 1-B, # (3) Exhibit 2-A, # (4) Exhibit 2-B, # (5) Exhibit 3-A, # (6) Exhibit 3-B).(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Investor Z. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Investor X Representative in Support re: [148] MOTION to Seal Document .. Document filed by Investor X, Securities and Exchange Commission, Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: [148].(Yu, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Investor X Representative in Support re: [148] MOTION to Seal Document .. Document filed by Investor X..(Yu, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [148] MOTION to Seal Document . . Document filed by Investor X..(Yu, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Document . Document filed by Investor X. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Yu, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Victor Haohan Yu on behalf of Investor X..(Yu, Victor)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Investor I in Support re: [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material).. Document filed by Investor I..(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Andrew R. Escobar in Support re: [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material).. Document filed by Investor I..(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [143] MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material). . Document filed by Investor I..(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material). Document filed by Investor I. Return Date set for 2/4/2020 at 11:59 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Motion to seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal . Document filed by Investor B. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Affidavit).(Murphy, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION in Support re: [139] MOTION to Seal Document .. Document filed by Investor G..(Roy, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [139] MOTION to Seal Document . . Document filed by Investor G..(Roy, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document . Document filed by Investor G. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Roy, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020. Document filed by Investor H. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A).(Carman, Eva)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Investor G..(Roy, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Roy, III on behalf of Investor G..(Roy, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION to Seal Document (Proposed Redacted Material) addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Eva Ciko Carman dated February 4, 2020. Document filed by Investor A. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A).(Carman, Eva)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Investor I..(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Ramiro Escobar on behalf of Investor I..(Escobar, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [131] MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . . Document filed by Investor Z..(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . Document filed by Investor Z. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [129] MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . . Document filed by Investor E..(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym . Document filed by Investor E. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Brown, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Thomas Murphy on behalf of Investor B..(Murphy, Patrick)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER withdrawing [126] Motion for Taylor Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The motion for Taylor Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Doc. 126) is deemed withdrawn, subject to refilling. The Clerk shall remove this motion from the public docket. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/4/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020, Terminated: 2/4/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT (kgo).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin P. McGrath dated 1/31/2020 re: Accordingly, the parties respectfully request on behalf of the third-parties that the following docket entries be temporarily sealed pending the Court's adjudication of any motions to seal submitted on February 4, 2020: 43, 44, 95, 99, 114-1, 120. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/31/2020) (cf) Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk for processing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [126] MOTION for Taylor Reeves to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18668361. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Kevin P. McGrath in Support re: [70] MOTION to Strike First Affirmative Defense.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N).(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Opposition re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 139, # (2) Exhibit 140, # (3) Exhibit 141, # (4) Exhibit 142, # (5) Exhibit 143, # (6) Exhibit 144, # (7) Exhibit 149, # (8) Exhibit 153, # (9) Exhibit 154, # (10) Exhibit 155, # (11) Exhibit 156, # (12) Exhibit 157, # (13) Exhibit 158, # (14) Exhibit 159, # (15) Exhibit 160, # (16) Exhibit 161, # (17) Exhibit 162, # (18) Exhibit 163, # (19) Exhibit 164, # (20) Exhibit 165, # (21) Exhibit 166, # (22) Exhibit 167, # (23) Exhibit 168, # (24) Exhibit 170, # (25) Exhibit 171, # (26) Exhibit 172, # (27) Exhibit 173, # (28) Exhibit 174, # (29) Exhibit 175, # (30) Exhibit 176, # (31) Exhibit 177, # (32) Exhibit 178, # (33) Exhibit 179, # (34) Exhibit 180, # (35) Exhibit 181, # (36) Exhibit 182, # (37) Exhibit 183, # (38) Exhibit 184, # (39) Exhibit 185, # (40) Exhibit 186, # (41) Exhibit 187, # (42) Exhibit 188, # (43) Exhibit 190, # (44) Exhibit 191, # (45) Exhibit 192, # (46) Exhibit 193, # (47) Exhibit 197, # (48) Exhibit 198, # (49) Exhibit 199, # (50) Exhibit 200, # (51) Exhibit 201)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Ladan Stewart in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 29, # (29) Exhibit 34, # (30) Exhibit 35, # (31) Exhibit 36, # (32) Exhibit 37, # (33) Exhibit 38, # (34) Exhibit 39, # (35) Exhibit 40, # (36) Exhibit 41, # (37) Exhibit 43, # (38) Exhibit 44, # (39) Exhibit 45, # (40) Exhibit 46, # (41) Exhibit 47, # (42) Exhibit 48, # (43) Exhibit 49, # (44) Exhibit 51, # (45) Exhibit 52, # (46) Exhibit 53, # (47) Exhibit 54, # (48) Exhibit 57, # (49) Exhibit 58, # (50) Exhibit 60, # (51) Exhibit 62, # (52) Exhibit 63, # (53) Exhibit 64, # (54) Exhibit 65, # (55) Exhibit 66, # (56) Exhibit 67, # (57) Exhibit 68, # (58) Exhibit 71, # (59) Exhibit 72, # (60) Exhibit 73, # (61) Exhibit 75, # (62) Exhibit 78, # (63) Exhibit 79, # (64) Exhibit 80, # (65) Exhibit 81, # (66) Exhibit 82, # (67) Exhibit 83, # (68) Exhibit 84, # (69) Exhibit 85, # (70) Exhibit 86, # (71) Exhibit 87, # (72) Exhibit 88, # (73) Exhibit 89, # (74) Exhibit 90, # (75) Exhibit 92, # (76) Exhibit 93, # (77) Exhibit 95, # (78) Exhibit 96, # (79) Exhibit 97, # (80) Exhibit 98, # (81) Exhibit 99, # (82) Exhibit 100, # (83) Exhibit 106, # (84) Exhibit 107, # (85) Exhibit 108, # (86) Exhibit 110, # (87) Exhibit 112, # (88) Exhibit 113, # (89) Exhibit 114, # (90) Exhibit 116, # (91) Exhibit 118, # (92) Exhibit 119, # (93) Exhibit 120, # (94) Exhibit 121, # (95) Exhibit 122, # (96) Exhibit 124, # (97) Exhibit 125, # (98) Exhibit 126, # (99) Exhibit 127, # (100) Exhibit 128, # (101) Exhibit 129, # (102) Exhibit 130, # (103) Exhibit 131, # (104) Exhibit 132, # (105) Exhibit 133, # (106) Exhibit 134, # (107) Exhibit 135, # (108) Exhibit 137, # (109) Exhibit 138)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Scott D. Musoff in Support re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Pavel Durov Deposition Excerpts, # (2) Exhibit 2 - January 14, 2018 email, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Chat Log, # (4) Exhibit 4 - December 17, 2017 email, # (5) Exhibit 5 - January 27, 2020 email, # (6) Exhibit 6 - Chat log)(Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE re: [99] Counter Statement to Rule 56.1 . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ladan F. Stewart dated January 27, 2020 re: Courtesy Copies of Reply Papers. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Maurice Herlihy in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Carmen Taveras in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Patrick Doody in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Alison R. Levine in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 15 (Corrected), # (2) Exhibit 114 (Corrected), # (3) Exhibit 201 (Corrected))(Levine, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [70] MOTION to Strike First Affirmative Defense. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [109] Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/24/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C Drylewski dated 1/23/2020 re: request to seal documents. ENDORSEMENT: 1. Please consult the undersigned's practice on communication with Chambers. 2. Please explain why under Lugosh the exhibits ought to be sealed. Application DENIED with out prejudice. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/23/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: 1/24/2020, Terminated: 1/24/2020 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated January 24, 2020. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: 1/23/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [100] Letter filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. ENDORSEMENT: The proposal on p. 2 is approved and adopted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/22/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION in Support re: [105] MOTION to Seal Document .. Document filed by Investor F. (Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [105] MOTION to Seal Document . . Document filed by Investor F. (Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Seal Document . Document filed by Investor F. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Investor F.(Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip M. Bowman on behalf of Investor F. (Bowman, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Modified Redacted Exhibits. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Modified Redacted ECF No. 74-1, # (2) Modified Redacted ECF No. 81-98)(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [88] Motion for Benjamin J. Beaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alison R. Levine dated January 21, 2020 re: Courtesy Copies of SEC's Papers and Notice to Third Parties. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Levine, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COUNTER STATEMENT TO [75] Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment ., [3] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show Cause, and Granting Other Relief.EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Ladan F. Stewart in Opposition re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment ., [3] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show Cause, and Granting Other Relief.EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 139, # (2) Exhibit 140, # (3) Exhibit 141, # (4) Exhibit 142, # (5) Exhibit 143, # (6) Exhibit 144, # (7) Exhibit 149, # (8) Exhibit 153, # (9) Exhibit 154, # (10) Exhibit 155, # (11) Exhibit 156, # (12) Exhibit 157, # (13) Exhibit 158, # (14) Exhibit 159, # (15) Exhibit 160, # (16) Exhibit 161, # (17) Exhibit 162, # (18) Exhibit 163, # (19) Exhibit 164, # (20) Exhibit 165, # (21) Exhibit 166, # (22) Exhibit 167, # (23) Exhibit 168, # (24) Exhibit 170, # (25) Exhibit 171, # (26) Exhibit 172, # (27) Exhibit 173, # (28) Exhibit 174, # (29) Exhibit 175, # (30) Exhibit 176, # (31) Exhibit 177, # (32) Exhibit 178, # (33) Exhibit 179, # (34) Exhibit 180, # (35) Exhibit 181, # (36) Exhibit 182, # (37) Exhibit 183, # (38) Exhibit 184, # (39) Exhibit 185, # (40) Exhibit 186, # (41) Exhibit 187, # (42) Exhibit 188, # (43) Exhibit 190, # (44) Exhibit 191, # (45) Exhibit 192, # (46) Exhibit 193, # (47) Exhibit 197, # (48) Exhibit 198, # (49) Exhibit 199, # (50) Exhibit 200, # (51) Exhibit 201)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [70] MOTION to Strike First Affirmative Defense. . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COUNTER STATEMENT TO [80] Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Christopher P. Malloy in Opposition re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability.. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 - Pavel Durov Deposition Excerpts, # (2) Exhibit 2 - Ilya Perekopsky Deposition Excerpts, # (3) Exhibit 3 - Shyam Parekh Deposition Excerpts, # (4) Exhibit 4 - Durov Deposition Exhibit 41, # (5) Exhibit 5 - January 12, 2018 Email, # (6) Exhibit 6 - October 30, 2019 Email, # (7) Exhibit 7 - Chat Log, # (8) Exhibit 8 - January 8, 2019 Email, # (9) Exhibit 9 - January 2020 Email and Letter, # (10) Exhibit 10 - January 14, 2020 Letter, # (11) Exhibit 11 - June 26, 2018 Invoice, # (12) Exhibit 12 - October 25, 2019 Email, # (13) Exhibit 13 - November 28, 2019 Tweet, # (14) Exhibit 14 - June 22, 2018 Agreement, # (15) Exhibit 15 - March 2019 Email and February 2019 Letter)(Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability. . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Blockchain Association.(Bradley, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF re: [90] MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by Blockchain Association.(Bradley, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020, Terminated: 2/12/2020 Motion to File Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Blockchain Association.(Bradley, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Keith Bradley on behalf of Blockchain Association. (Bradley, Keith)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020, Terminated: 1/22/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Benjamin J. Beaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18554876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Blockchain Association. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of Benjamin J. Beaton, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (DC), # (3) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (KY), # (4) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (OH), # (5) Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Beaton, Benjamin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Chamber of Digital Commerce.(Tessler, Lilya)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Lilya Tessler in Support re: [84] MOTION to File Amicus Brief .. Document filed by Chamber of Digital Commerce. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Brief)(Tessler, Lilya)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [84] MOTION to File Amicus Brief . . Document filed by Chamber of Digital Commerce. (Tessler, Lilya)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [88] MOTION for Benjamin J. Beaton to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18554876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/20/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020 Motion to File Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to File Amicus Brief . Document filed by Chamber of Digital Commerce.(Tessler, Lilya)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: 1/16/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Kevin P. McGrath in Support re: [70] MOTION to Strike First Affirmative Defense.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated January 15, 2019 re: Courtesy Copies of SEC's Moving Papers. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Ladan Stewart in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 12, # (13) Exhibit 13, # (14) Exhibit 14, # (15) Exhibit 15, # (16) Exhibit 16, # (17) Exhibit 17, # (18) Exhibit 18, # (19) Exhibit 19, # (20) Exhibit 20, # (21) Exhibit 21, # (22) Exhibit 22, # (23) Exhibit 23, # (24) Exhibit 24, # (25) Exhibit 25, # (26) Exhibit 26, # (27) Exhibit 27, # (28) Exhibit 29, # (29) Exhibit 34, # (30) Exhibit 35, # (31) Exhibit 36, # (32) Exhibit 37, # (33) Exhibit 38, # (34) Exhibit 39, # (35) Exhibit 40, # (36) Exhibit 41, # (37) Exhibit 43, # (38) Exhibit 44, # (39) Exhibit 45, # (40) Exhibit 46, # (41) Exhibit 47, # (42) Exhibit 48, # (43) Exhibit 49, # (44) Exhibit 51, # (45) Exhibit 52, # (46) Exhibit 53, # (47) Exhibit 54, # (48) Exhibit 57, # (49) Exhibit 58, # (50) Exhibit 60, # (51) Exhibit 62, # (52) Exhibit 63, # (53) Exhibit 64, # (54) Exhibit 65, # (55) Exhibit 66, # (56) Exhibit 67, # (57) Exhibit 68, # (58) Exhibit 71, # (59) Exhibit 72, # (60) Exhibit 73, # (61) Exhibit 75, # (62) Exhibit 78, # (63) Exhibit 79, # (64) Exhibit 80, # (65) Exhibit 81, # (66) Exhibit 82, # (67) Exhibit 83, # (68) Exhibit 84, # (69) Exhibit 85, # (70) Exhibit 86, # (71) Exhibit 87, # (72) Exhibit 88, # (73) Exhibit 89, # (74) Exhibit 90, # (75) Exhibit 92, # (76) Exhibit 93, # (77) Exhibit 95, # (78) Exhibit 96, # (79) Exhibit 97, # (80) Exhibit 98, # (81) Exhibit 99, # (82) Exhibit 100, # (83) Exhibit 106, # (84) Exhibit 107, # (85) Exhibit 108, # (86) Exhibit 110, # (87) Exhibit 112, # (88) Exhibit 113, # (89) Exhibit 114, # (90) Exhibit 116, # (91) Exhibit 118, # (92) Exhibit 119, # (93) Exhibit 120, # (94) Exhibit 121, # (95) Exhibit 122, # (96) Exhibit 124, # (97) Exhibit 125, # (98) Exhibit 126, # (99) Exhibit 127, # (100) Exhibit 128, # (101) Exhibit 129, # (102) Exhibit 130, # (103) Exhibit 131, # (104) Exhibit 132, # (105) Exhibit 133, # (106) Exhibit 134, # (107) Exhibit 135, # (108) Exhibit 137, # (109) Exhibit 138)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [78] MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment on Liability. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 1/21/2020(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Kevin McGrath in Support re: [70] MOTION to Strike First Affirmative Defense.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [70] MOTION to Strike First Affirmative Defense. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Stephen B. McKeon in Support re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 Expert Report of Stephen B. McKeon, # (2) Exhibit 2 Expert Rebuttal Report of Stephen B. McKeon)(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Alexander C. Drylewski in Support re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, Nordic Business Forum article, # (2) Exhibit 2, Pavel Durov Deposition Excerpts, # (3) Exhibit 3, Telegram Public Notice, # (4) Exhibit 4. Defs.' Second Suppl. R&Os to Interrogatories (Nov. 22, 2019), # (5) Exhibit 5. Defs.' Suppl. R&Os to Interrogatories (Jan. 11, 2020), # (6) Exhibit 6, Money Services Business Registration, # (7) Exhibit 7, Shyam Parekh Deposition Excerpts, # (8) Exhibit 8, Ilya Perekopsky Deposition Excerpts, # (9) Exhibit 9, Requests for Consent, # (10) Exhibit 10. Defs.' First Suppl. R&Os to Interrogatories (Jan. 2, 2020), # (11) Exhibit 11, Rep Letter Questionnaire, # (12) Exhibit 12, January 22, 2018 Email, # (13) Exhibit 13, October 2, 2019 Email, # (14) Exhibit 14, Telegram Contest Documents, # (15) Exhibit 15, Blockchain Contest, Stage 2, # (16) Exhibit 16, Pavel Durov (@durov) Twitter, # (17) Exhibit 17, Telegram Messenger Twitter (January 6, 2020), # (18) Exhibit 18, Article on Public Notice)(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Joint Stipulation Of Undisputed Facts re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit JX1, Round One Form D, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit JX2, Round Two Form D, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit JX3, Two Page Teaser, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit JX4, Four Page Teaser, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit JX5, Round One IOI, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit JX6, Round Two IOI, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit JX7, Primer, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit JX8, Pre-Sale Primer, # (9) Exhibit Exhibit JX9, Stage A Primer, # (10) Exhibit Exhibit JX10, Round One Process Memorandum, # (11) Exhibit Exhibit JX11, Round One Purchase Agreement, # (12) Exhibit Exhibit JX12, Round Two Purchase Agreement, # (13) Exhibit Exhibit JX13, Telegram Open Network (Jan. 18, 2018), # (14) Exhibit Exhibit JX14, Round One Risk Factors, # (15) Exhibit Exhibit JX15, Round Two Risk Factors, # (16) Exhibit Exhibit JX16, Round One KYC Forms, # (17) Exhibit Exhibit JX17, Round Two KYC Forms, # (18) Exhibit Exhibit JX18, Telegram Open Network (Dec. 3, 2017), # (19) Exhibit Exhibit JX19, Telegram Open Network Blockchain (September 5, 2018) Part One, # (20) Exhibit Exhibit JX19, Telegram Open Network Blockchain (September 5, 2018) Part Two, # (21) Exhibit Exhibit JX19, Telegram Open Network Blockchain (September 5, 2018) Part Three, # (22) Exhibit Exhibit JX19, Telegram Open Network Blockchain (September 5, 2018) Part Four, # (23) Exhibit Exhibit JX20, TON Development Status (Sept. 5, 2018), # (24) Exhibit Exhibit JX21, Telegram Open Network Virtual Machine (Sept. 5, 2018), # (25) Exhibit Exhibit JX22, TON Development Status (Jan. 28, 2019), # (26) Exhibit Exhibit JX23, Telegram Open Network (Mar. 2, 2019), # (27) Exhibit Exhibit JX24, Telegram Open Network Virtual Machine (Sept. 6, 2019), # (28) Exhibit Exhibit JX25, TON Blockchain Validation (Oct. 2, 2019), # (29) Exhibit Exhibit JX26, Telegram Open Network Blockchain (Oct. 3, 2019), # (30) Exhibit Exhibit JX27, Fift: A Brief Introduction (Oct. 5, 2019), # (31) Exhibit Exhibit JX28, Telegram Open Network Virtual Machine (Dec. 12, 2019), # (32) Exhibit Exhibit JX29, Article on Blackmoon Crypto)(Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [69] MOTION for Summary Judgment . And In Opposition To Plaintiff's Application For A Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Motion to strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike First Affirmative Defense. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Return Date set for 1/21/2020 at 05:00 PM.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [66] Letter filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/13/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER terminating [65] Letter Motion to Compel: In light of the parties' arguments presented in their letters and during the January 6, 2020 telephonic conference, the Court orders defendants to produce the requested bank records. The bank records may be produced under a Confidentiality Order. Only redactions necessitated by foreign privacy laws shall be permitted and a log stating the basis for any redaction shall be produced at the time the redacted documents are produced. Defendants shall produce the bank records on a rolling basis and shall complete production by February 26, 2020. The Court does not anticipate extending this date nor the existing schedule for the motions for summary judgment or for a preliminary injunction. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/13/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated January 13, 2020 re: Joint Request. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020, Terminated: 1/13/2020 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND LETTER MOTION to Compel Telegram Group Inc. and TON Issuer Inc. to Produce Bank Records addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Securities and Exchange Commission dated January 10, 2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Return Date set for 1/15/2020 at 05:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit D, # (2) Exhibit H)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: granting [59] Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/10/2020) (ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 63 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: 1/10/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated January 10, 2020 re: Public Exhibits to Previously Filed Motion to Compel. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit J to January 2, 2020 Motion to Compel, # (2) Exhibit K to January 2, 2020 Motion to Compel, # (3) Exhibit L to January 2, 2020 Motion to Compel, # (4) M to January 2, 2020 Motion to Compel)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated January 9, 2020 re: Estimated schedule for the review of bank records pursuant to this Court's Order of January 6, 2020. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 61 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Eytan J. Fisch re: [58] Order on Motion to Compel,,,, . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 60 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 motion to seal documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated January 9, 2020. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Malloy, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020, Terminated: 1/10/2020 Motion for Leave to File Excess PagesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Christopher P. Malloy dated January 9, 2020. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Malloy, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 58 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying without prejudice [52] Letter Motion to Compel: The Court held a telephone conference with parties on January 6, 2020 to address the discovery dispute raised in plaintiff's letter of January 2, 2020. (Doc. 52). (!) The parties agree that an evidentiary hearing is not required to decide the motion for a preliminary injunction, which therefore will be decided on written submissions and oral argument alone. (2) The scheduled depositions may proceed with no restrictions placed on plaintiff's ability to question witnesses regarding the issues raised in plaintiffs January 2 letter. (Doc. 52). (3) The Court denies, without prejudice, plaintiff's application to compel the production of defendant's bank records. (Doc. 52). By January 9, 2020, defendant shall set forth in a declaration a proposed schedule for a review of the requested bank records to ensure that production of such records complies with foreign data privacy laws. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/6/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 57 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [55] Letter filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall telephone Chambers on a joint call at 6 pm on January 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/6/2020 at 06:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/3/2020) (va) Modified on 1/8/2020 (va).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: 1/6/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [53] Motion for Lilya Tessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2020. Appearing for the SEC, Jorge Tenreiro. Appearing for defendants, Alex Drylewski. Telephone conference re: discovery disputes. See, Order. (John Wynne)(Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Telephone Conference held on 1/6/2020. Appearing for the SEC, Jorge Tenreiro. Appearing for defendants, Alex Drylewski. Telephone conference re: discovery disputes. See, Order. (John Wynne)(Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE: The parties shall telephone Chambers on a joint call at 6PM on January 6, 2020. (Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated January 3, 2020 re: Opposition to Letter Motion to Compel. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 2 - Parties' Email Chain, # (2) Exhibit 3 - Pre-Sale Primer, # (3) Exhibit 4 - Pre-Sale Purchase Agreement, # (4) Exhibit 5 - Risk Factors, # (5) Exhibit 6 - Consent Agreement, # (6) Exhibit 7 - Parekh Deposition Transcript Excerpts, # (7) Exhibit 8 - Defendants' R&OS, # (8) Exhibit 9 - Stage A Purchase Agreement)(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER with respect to [52] Letter Motion to Compel: Defendants shall respond forthwith and no later than the close of business today. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/3/2020) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 53 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020, Terminated: 1/6/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Lilya Tessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18414566. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Chamber of Digital Commerce. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Lilya Tessler, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing (New York), # (3) Certificate of Good Standing (New Jersey), # (4) Text of Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Tessler, Lilya)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [53] MOTION for Lilya Tessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18414566. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  set motion and R&R deadlines/hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines as to [52] EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce documents and prepare 30(b)(6) witness regarding use of investor funds: Responses due by 1/3/2020 (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020, Terminated: 1/6/2020 Motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce documents and prepare 30(b)(6) witness regarding use of investor funds addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated January 2, 2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Return Date set for 1/3/2020 at 05:00 PM. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, UPON THE CONSENT OF THE PARTIES: IT IS ORDERED that the briefing scheduling set in Paragraph V of the Order is hereby amended as follows: (a) All opening briefs on any motions for summary judgment under Rule 56 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, any brief in response to Plaintiff's pending application for a preliminary injunction, and any opening brief in support of Plaintiff's motion to strike Defendants affirmative defenses, shall be filed and served no later than January 13, 2020; (b) Any briefs in response to any motion brought under the terms of Paragraph (a) of this Order and any reply brief in support of Plaintiff's pending application for a preliminary injunction or motion to strike shall be filed and served no later than January 21, 2020; and (c) Any reply briefs in further support of any motion brought under the terms of Paragraph (a) of this Order shall be filed and served no later than January 27, 2020. (Motions due by 1/13/2020. Responses due by 1/21/2020. Replies due by 1/27/2020.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/20/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Rose Levine on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Levine, Alison)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FINAL MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to John Hyman in Great Britain (Unredacted). Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters RogatoryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on REQUEST FOR INTERNATIONAL JUDICIAL ASSISTANCE TO COMPEL EVIDENCE FROM A UNITED KINGDOM WITNESS PURSUANT TO THE 1970 HAGUE CONVENTION ON THE TAKING OF EVIDENCE IN CIVIL AND COMMERCIAL MATTERS granting [43] Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/9/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing. (Main Document 46 replaced on 12/11/2019) (mro).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk. Transmitted re: [46] Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory, to the Orders and Judgments Clerk. ***PDF was replaced. (mro)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 45 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated December 6, 2019 re: Unopposed Motion for Letter of Request. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C) (Tenreiro, Jorge) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 12/6/2019 (dt).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019, Terminated: 12/10/2019 Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EMERGENCY MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory as to John Hyman in Great Britain Unopposed. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5, # (6) Exhibit 6, # (7) Exhibit 7, # (8) Exhibit 8, # (9) Exhibit 9, # (10) Exhibit 10, # (11) Exhibit 11, # (12) Exhibit 14, # (13) Exhibit 15, # (14) Exhibit 16)(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Jorge Tenreiro DO NOT RE-FILE Document No. [44] Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the proposed order is not correct, it is not an Order, these documents are already filed on ECF and attached to Doc. #43 as exhibits. (dt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER terminating [39] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File: The SEC's proposed motion to strike is preserved until 14 days after the close of fact discovery unless otherwise extended by Order of this Court. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/26/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Alexander C. Drylewski dated November 25, 2019 re: Response to Plaintiff's letter motion, dated November 25, 2019, (ECF No. 39). Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties to this action, and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 29(a) and 30(b)(4), that: 1. The deposition of the 30(b)(6) witness for Defendants Telegram Group Inc. and TON Issuer Inc. will be taken on January 7, 2020 (the "30(b)(6) Deposition"). The deposition of Pavel Durov in his personal capacity will be taken on January 7 or 8, 2020, as necessary (the "Durov Deposition"), and as further set forth in this stipulation. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/25/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019, Terminated: 11/26/2019 motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defense addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Securities and Exchange Commission dated November 25, 2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to [1] Complaint. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 11/12/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Proposed Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ladan Fazlollahi Stewart on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Stewart, Ladan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Ton Issuer Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Telegram Group Inc. waiver sent on 10/18/2019, answer due 1/16/2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 10/18/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/18/2019 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/19/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin P. McGrath dated October 24, 2019 re: Delivery of Exhibits to McGrath Declaration to Chambers for In Camera Review. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 motion to seal document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Seal Document and File Redacted Copies on ECF. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Seal Certain Documents, # (2) Declaration of Kevin P. McGrath, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [26] Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/21/2019) (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 10/23/2019. (cf)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019, Terminated: 10/23/2019 motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal and Redact Documents on ECF addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin P. McGrath dated October 21, 2019. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ton Issuer Inc.. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Telegram Group Inc.. (dnh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, UPON THE CONSENT OF THE PARTIES: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall not offer, sell, deliver, or distribute "Grams" to any person or entity, until the conclusion of the hearing scheduled by the Court for February 18 and 19, 2020 ("Hearing"), except upon further order of the Court or agreement of the parties. At the Hearing, any party may move the Court for the continuation or dissolution of this Order, and as further set forth in this stipulation. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/21/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 1/3/2020. Responses due by 1/17/2020. Replies due by 1/27/2020. (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Request for Waiver of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Request for Waiver Mailed on 10/18/2019. Waiver of Service due by 12/17/2019. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Request for Waiver of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE sent to Telegram Group Inc.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Request for Waiver Mailed on 10/18/2019. Waiver of Service due by 12/17/2019. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to TON Issuer Inc., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Telegram Group Inc., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2019. Schedules set. Briefing to be completed by January 27, 2020. Preliminary Injunction Hearing is scheduled for February 18, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. and will continue February 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (Court Reporter Michael McDaniel) (Nacanther, Florence)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Seal and Redact Documents on ECF addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Kevin P. McGrath. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Daphna Waxman in Support re: [3] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show Cause, and Granting Other Relief.EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D-1, # (5) Exhibit D-2, # (6) Exhibit D-3, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H, # (11) Exhibit I, # (12) Exhibit J, # (13) Exhibit K-1, # (14) Exhibit K-2, # (15) Exhibit K-3, # (16) Exhibit K-4, # (17) Exhibit T, # (18) Exhibit U, # (19) Exhibit V, # (20) Exhibit W, # (21) Exhibit X, # (22) Exhibit Z, # (23) Exhibit BB, # (24) Exhibit CC, # (25) Exhibit DD, # (26) Exhibit EE, # (27) Exhibit FF)(McGrath, Kevin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court will hold a conference on October 18, 2019 at 10:30 am to address all procedural and scheduling matters, including the scope and timing of discovery, as further set forth in this order. (Status Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/17/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Telegram Group Inc. for Ton Issuer Inc.; Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Telegram Group Inc.. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc..(Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander C Drylewski on behalf of Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Drylewski, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher P. Malloy on behalf of Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Malloy, Christopher)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Musoff, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Abraham Zimmerman on behalf of Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Zimmerman, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jorge G. Tenreiro dated 10/17/2019 re: Defendants' Opposition to SEC's Request for Interim Relief. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Alexander C. Drylewski in Opposition re: [3] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show Cause, and Granting Other Relief.EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause.. Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - October 16, 2019 email from Alexander C. Drylewski to Jorge Tenreiro and Kevin McGrath, # (2) Exhibit B - October 16, 2019 email from Jorge Tenreiro to Alexander C. Drylewski, # (3) Exhibit C - Subpoenas sent on behalf of the SEC to Defendants on October 11, 2019 and October 16, 2019, # (4) Exhibit D - Proposed Order)(Zimmerman, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: [3] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show Cause, and Granting Other Relief.EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause. . Document filed by Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. (Zimmerman, George)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, AND ORDER GRANTING EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AND OTHER RELIEF filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. Defendants shall show cause as to why this Court should not enter an Order pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Section 20(b) of the Securities Act preliminarily enjoining Defendants and each of their respective agents, servants, employees, attorneys and other persons in active concert or participation with each of them who receive actual notice of the injunction by personal service or otherwise, from any ongoing and future violations of Sections 5(a) and 5(c) of the Securities Act, including but not limited to by delivering Grams to any person or entity or taking any other steps to effect any unregistered offer or sale of Grams. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pending a hearing and determination of the Commission's Application, Defendants, and each of their respective agents, servants, employees, attorneys and other persons in active concert or participation with each of them who receive actual notice of the injunction by personal service or otherwise, are temporarily enjoined and restrained from any ongoing and future violations of Sections 5(a) and 5(c) of the Securities Act, by: (a) without a registration statement in effect as to that security, making use of the means and instruments of transportation or communications in interstate commerce and of the mails to sell securities through the use or means of a prospectus or otherwise; and as further set forth in this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery is expedited as follows: pursuant to Rules 26, 30, 31, 33, 34, 36, and 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and without the requirement of a meeting pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f), and without regard to the limitations of Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 30(a)(2), 30(d), 31(a)(2), and 33(a)(1): (1) the Commission may take the depositions on three (3) calendar days' notice (2) the Commission may obtain the production of documents within four (4) days from by email, facsimile or otherwise, of Defendants' representatives and of representatives of any United States purchasers of Grams; and service by email, facsimile or otherwise of a request or subpoena, from the Defendants or from any United States purchasers of Grams. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order and the papers supporting the Commission's Application be served upon Defendants on or before 7pm October 11, 2019 by personal deliver and overnight courier to Defendants' attorney Colleen P. Mahoney, Esq., of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP, at 1440 New York Avenue, NW Washington, DC 20005 and by email to colleen.mahoney@skadden.com, and to Defendants' principals by email at ceo@telegram.org or pavel@telegram.org. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/24/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. Defendants shall file on ECF with courtesy copy to chambers Show Cause Response by 10/18/2019. Commission shall file Replies by 10/22/2019 with courtesy copies to chambers.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 10/11/2019) (jwh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jorge G. Tenreiro in Support re: [3] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show Cause, and Granting Other Relief.EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [3] EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show Cause, and Granting Other Relief.EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause. . Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019, Terminated: 10/11/2019 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Order to Show Cause, and Granting Other Relief., EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Order to Show Cause.( Return Date set for 10/18/2019 at 05:00 PM.) Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Tenreiro, Jorge)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (jgo) (jgo).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: 10/11/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Telegram Group Inc., Ton Issuer Inc.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(jgo) (jgo).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?