Sanchez v. Tesla, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. HG19038846

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:32 PM DT (1.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sanchez, Jeremy, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Anderson, Sotera L., Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Hayward Hall of Justice
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None ?
Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: None ?
    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (4 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 19 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None ?
      Hearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 07/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 517
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None ?
        Compliance Hearing 06/22/2020 03:00 PM D- 517 (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None ?
          Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385) (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: None ?
            Conditional Settlement Entire Action (CRC 3.1385) (2 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 15 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conf Continuance 07/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 517
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Substitution of Attorney Filed for Tesla, Inc (3 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Notice of Payment of Advance Jury Fees Posted by Plaintiff Filed (3 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Case Management Statement of Jeremy Sanchez Filed (8 Pages)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc Filed (6 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Answer to Complaint Filed for Tesla, Inc (12 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                              Proof of Service by Mail on Notice of Case Managment Conference and Order Filed (4 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc Filed (1 Page)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                  Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    Initial Case Management Conference 02/24/2020 03:00 PM D- 517 (2 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (6 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jeremy Sanchez (3 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?