Saucer v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19038719

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Saucer, Marvin, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kramer, Sean M., Attorney
No Logo Wu, Conrad K., Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/16/2020, Entered: None ?
Notice of Change of Firm Address Filed (3 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 18 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
    Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/12/2021 09:00 AM D- 25
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Statement of Marvin Saucer Filed (6 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 14 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None ?
            Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None ?
              Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc. Filed (7 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (5 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                      Stipulation Stipulation to Submit Action to Binding Arbitration; Order Filed (5 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                        Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 25
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (5 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                              Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                Initial Case Management Conference 02/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 25 (2 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Marvin Saucer (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      Complaint - Other Employment Filed (10 Pages)

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 63 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?