Price v. Randstad Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19038815

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Price , Jackie, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ceva Logistics, Defendant
No Logo Randstad Inc., Defendant
No Logo Randstand Inhouse Services LLC, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors"
No Logo Benjamin, Na'il, Attorney
No Logo Fitch, Lindsay, Attorney
No Logo Mcalpine, Fraser A, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Civil Rights
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (64) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None ?
Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered (3 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None ?
    Dismissal As to Defendant: Ceva Logistics , Tesla Motors, Randstand InHouse Services LLC Entered (3 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None ?
      Amended Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None ?
        Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Ceva Logistics , Tesla Motors, Randstan (3 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 60 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None ?
          Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 02/26/2021 09:01 AM D- 24
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: None ?
              Notice of Settlement Filed for Randstad Inc. (3 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 57 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                Compliance Hearing 02/17/2021 09:01 AM D- 24
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None ?
                    Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 54 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 01/13/2021 09:00 AM D- 24
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Case Management Statement of Jackie Price Filed (8 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Granted (3 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Motion to Compel (Motion) Granted (3 Pages)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 47 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 24 date: 08/20/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (3 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (2 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 44 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 24 date: 08/20/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (3 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (2 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 41 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 24 date: 08/06/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                  Motion to Compel (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (2 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                    Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                      Hearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 24 date: 08/06/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                        Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) - Motion Rescheduled (3 Pages)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                          Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued (1 Page)
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                            Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (8 Pages)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                              Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant (13 Pages)
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                Declaration of Conor Dale in Support of the Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (14 Pages)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                  Proof of Service Filed (3 Pages)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                    Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/04/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                      Request Re: Extension of Time Denied (2 Pages)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                        Notice of Failure To Serve Oppositions To Motion To Compel Filed (5 Pages)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                          Declaration in Support Of Notice Of Failure To Serve Opposition To Motion Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Proof of Service by Mail / E-Mail Filed (2 Pages)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                              Declaration in Support Opposition to Randstand's Motion to Compel Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                Declaration in Support Opposition to Deft. Motion to Compel Arbitration Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  Opposition to Defnt Randstand's Motion Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    Declaration ISO Plntf Opposition to Defnt Ceva Logistics and Tesla Motion Filed by Jackie Price (4 Pages)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      Opposition to Defnt Ceva and Tesla Motion Filed (7 Pages)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        Declaration ISO Plntf Opposition to Defnt Ranstand Motion Filed by Jackie Price (2 Pages)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          Request Re: Extension of Time Filed for Jackie Price - Kristin A. Smith (6 Pages)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            Case Management Statement of Ceva Logistics , Tesla Motors Filed (6 Pages)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 07/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Filed for Defendant (69 Pages)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      Petition to Compel Arbitration (Motion) Filed for Defendant (69 Pages)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 07/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (163 Pages)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            Case Management Conf Continuance 06/10/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              Notice of Remand Filed (11 Pages)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                Hearing Vacated: Initial Case Management Conference 02/26/2020 09:00 AM D- 24
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  Notice of Removal Filed for Ceva Logistics , Tesla Motors (124 Pages)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    Answer to Complaint Filed for Randstand InHouse Services LLC (7 Pages)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      Answer to Complaint Filed for Ceva Logistics , Tesla Motors (6 Pages)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          Initial Case Management Conference 02/26/2020 09:00 AM D- 24 (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jackie Price (2 Pages)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                Complaint - Civil Rights Filed (14 Pages)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 41 times.

                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?