USA, et al v. Magana-Ramos
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00008-JAT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Michael Restaino +1 602 514 7756 +1 602 514 7450 Gary.Restaino@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 7/8/2002
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-00410
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 846=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21846 Conspiracy to Possess with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) and 2 Possession with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine; Aid and Abet
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1) and 2 Possession with Intent to Distribute Methamphetamine; Aid and Abet
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 170 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order/Judgment Revoking Supervised ReleaseCourt Filing
ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) Custody of BOP for a term of 11 MONTHS to run consecutively to the prison term imposed in CR005-1351-TUC-JAT. No term of Supervised Release to follow.. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/9/06. (MAP, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 169 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James A Teilborg :Final Disposition Hearing re Petition on Supervised Release as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas (04) held on 2/6/2006. (Court Reporter David German.) (TLB )
      LREF
      Legal Document 168 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James A Teilborg :Admit/Deny Hearing Petition on Supervised Release as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas (04) held on 10/19/2005. Final Disposition Hearing set for 2/6/2006 at 02:00 PM before Judge James A Teilborg. (Court Reporter David German.) (TLB)
        LREF
        Legal Document 166 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [165] Motion to Continue as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) admit/deny hearing to 10/19/05 @ 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on September 13th, 2005. (KCS)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Copy Mailed
          Copy of document number 166, mailed to Florentino Machuca-Diaz on this date. (EAT, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 165 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005, Terminated: 9/16/2005 Motion to Continue
            First MOTION to Continue Admit and Deny Hearing by Eribey Gomez-Rosas. (Iniguez, Hermilio)
              LREF
              Legal Document 164 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005 Warrant Returned Executed
              Supervised release Warrant Returned Executed on 08-19-05 in case as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas. (DNH, )
                LREF
                Legal Document 162 Filed: 8/29/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                ORDER OF DETENTION as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas Signed by Judge Morton Sitver on 8/26/05. (PKD)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 163 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Morton Sitver :Detention Hearing as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas submitted on 8/26/2005. Defendant detained pending disposition. Preliminary Hearing as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas waived. Defendant held to anwer before USDC. SPANISH INTERPRETER NEEDED as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4). Admit/Deny Hearing set for 9/14/2005 01:30 PM before Judge James A Teilborg. (Recorded on CourtSmart) (SMA)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 161 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/29/2005 CJA 20 Appointment
                    CJA 20 as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas: Appointment of Attorney Hermilio Iniguez for Eribey Gomez-Rosas. (LCF)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 160 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David K Duncan :Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas held on 8/19/2005. Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas held on 8/19/2005. Appointing Hermilio Iniguez for Eribey Gomez-Rosas with Appointment Type: CJA., Appearance entered by Hermilio Iniguez for Eribey Gomez-Rosas on behalf of defendant., SPANISH as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) SPANISH Detention /Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 8/26/2005 03:30 PM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. (Court Reporter courtsmart.) (PKD, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Arrest
                        Arrest of Eribey Gomez-Rosas on Violation of Supervised Release Violation Petition. (PKD, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 159 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY substitution: Gary Michael Restaino, Gary Michael Restaino appearing for USA. Attorney Jeffrey A Myer terminated. (Restaino, Gary)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 158 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas, Added attorney Hermilio Iniguez for Eribey Gomez-Rosas. Attorney Richard L Juarez terminated in case as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas. . Signed by Judge James A. Teilborg on 8/3/05. (CMM, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 157 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                              PETITION TO REVOKE supervised release as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; . (SRB)
                                LREF
                                Blank 156 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Other Notice
                                NOTICE of related cases by USPP Phoenix as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas, this action and 4:05-05115M-1. copy to cds' (DMT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Warrant Issued
                                  VIOLATION OF SUPERVISED RELEASE WARRANT issued for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; (SRB)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 155 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                    PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas for CJA atty Loyd C Tate (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 154 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                      PAYMENT voucher by Judge James A. Teilborg as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas for CJA atty Richard L Juarez (DMT)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 145 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: 4/9/2002 Order
                                        MINUTE ORDER ; pretrial conference vacated ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 10:00 4/15/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [145-2] (CMM)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 144 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: 4/2/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [143-1] ; trial reset for 9:00 4/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 143 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/28/2002, Terminated: 4/2/2002 Motion to Continue
                                            MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [143-1] (REW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 142 Filed: 3/25/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg pretrial conference set for 10:00 4/15/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Judge James A. Teilborg ; motions in limine shall be due 5 business days prior to the final pretrial conference; responses to motions in limine shall be due 3 business days prior to the final pretrial conference; 3 business days prior to trial the parties shall jointly file a description of the case to be read to the jury; each party shall file a proposed set of voir dire questions; the parties shall submit a joint list of jury instructions; the parties shall submit a joint list of witnesses; if a jury questionnaire is to be used, submit jury questionnaire; 1 business day prior to trial the parties shall submit marked exhibits and exhibit lists for use at trial.... (LAD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 141 Filed: 3/21/2002, Entered: 3/25/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                ( FILED: 3/21/02) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David German status hrg held as to Eribey Gomez- Rosas ; the motion for disclosure re confidential informant by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [139-1] is pending; the government is preparing its response; trial reset for 9:00 4/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before James A. Teilborg ; no time is excluded from the 4/2/02 trial date to 4/23/02; defense counsel is directed to file a written motion and order to continue trial; motion and order to continue to follow [141-4] (LAD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 140 Filed: 3/7/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 3/21/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas all stipulated motions to continue and request for change of plea must be received 2 business days prior to the status conference; the Clerk of Court shall mail copies of this order to all counsel of record (cc: all counsel) (CMM)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 139 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 Motion to Reveal ID of Informant
                                                    MOTION for disclosure re confidential informant [139-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 137 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-2] ; trial reset for 9:00 4/2/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 3/1/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (REW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 136 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/29/2002, Terminated: 1/31/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                        MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-1] , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions Eribey Gomez-Rosas [136-2] (REW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 135 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                          ( FILED: 1/24/02) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David German status hrg held ; dft requests an additional continuance of trial to allow additional time for dft to resolve a legal matter in another jurisdiction; trial reset for 9:00 4/2/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Judge James A. Teilborg , excludable delay interest of justice started ; written motion and order to continue trial to be filed by defense counsel [135-5] (LAD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 134 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 1/23/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 132 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [130-1]; granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [130-2] ; trial reset for 9:00 2/5/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 1/4/02 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (REW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 131 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                (FILED: 11/20/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg . Ct Rptr: David German .; status hearing held as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas; trial reset for 2/5/02 at 9:00 am; defense counsel to file written motion to continue trial for court's signature; no additional continuances will be granted in this matter; ; status hrg held [131-2] (REW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 130 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001, Terminated: 11/27/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                  MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [130-1] , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [130-2] (REW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 129 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 11/20/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 128 Filed: 10/25/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-2] ; trial reset for 9:00 12/4/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 11/9/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (REW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 127 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        ( FILED: 10/24/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: not present; status conference held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas; granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-2]; trial continued to 12/4/01 at 9:00 am; time to file pretrial motions extended to 11/9/01; order signed by court this date ; status hrg held [127-2] (REW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 126 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/25/2001, Terminated: 10/25/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                          MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-1] , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [126-2] (REW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 118 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 10/24/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 112 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial [111-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [111-2] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; trial reset for 9:00 11/6/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 10/5/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (REW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                ( FILED: 9/12/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky ; sentencing held as to Carlos Valles-Garcia see judgment for sentence [113-2] (REW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001, Terminated: 9/18/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                  MOTION to continue trial [111-1] by ERibey Gomez-Rosas , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions [111-2] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 109 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                    ( FILED: 8/28/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer - SPANISH motions hearing held; granting motion for appointment of cnsl [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas for the reasons as stated on the record; Loyd C Tate shall be relieved of responsibility as counse for dft upon appointment of new counsel from the CJA panel; denying motion to dismiss (all counts charged) due to ineffective assistance of counsel by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (as pro se; #45772-008, CCA, PO Box Florence AZ 85232) [105-1]; dft states on the record he is willing to waive his speedy trial rights and have the 9/25/01 trial date continued to allow new counsel time to prepare for trial; new counsel may file a written motion to continue trial and order for the Court's consideration; LATER IT IS ORDERED appointing Richard Juarez to represent dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas; terminating attorney Loyd C Tate for Eribey Gomez-Rosas and substituting attorney Richard L Juarez [109-2] (LAD)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 104 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Order
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER re motion for appointment of cnsl [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas and dft pro se pretrial motion to dismsis due to ineffective assistance of counsel; hearings reset for 3:30 8/28/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [104-1] (CMM)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 105 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                        MOTION to dismiss (all counts charged) due to ineffective assistance of counsel by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (as pro se; #45772-008, CCA, PO Box 6300, Florence AZ 85232) [105-1] (REW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Order
                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER re: motion for appointment of counsel [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; hearing set for 3:00 9/11/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [101-1] (REW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 96 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Motion to Appoint Counsel
                                                                                            MOTION for appointment of cnsl [96-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                              ( FILED: 8/15/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco ; sentencing held as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos court grants downward departure (see judgment for sentencing) [97-2] (REW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 93 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [88-1]; trial reset for 9/25/01 at 9:00 am pretrial conference set for 3:00 9/11/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (REW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001, Terminated: 7/17/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                  MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [88-1] (REW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ( FILED: 7/10/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco; status hearing held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas; granting oral motion to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [0-0] ; status hrg held ; trial reset for 9:00 9/25/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; time excluded pursuant to 18:3161(h); dft counsel shall file written motion to continue trial and order for court's signature wihtin 5 days [87-2] (REW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                      ORAL MOTION to continue trial by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [0-0] (REW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 81 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 11:00 7/3/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Judge Teilborg [81-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 7/3/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                          FILED: 6/29/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German - status hearing held as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas (set as change of plea) - plea negotiations are on-going ; further status hearing set for 2:00 7/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas; plea hrg vacated; trial reset for 2:00 7/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [83-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 6/28/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Judge James A. Teilborg (LAD)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ( FILED: 6/7/01) MINUTES: before Judge James A. Teilborg Ct Rptr: David German Interpreter: Louis Velasco/Spanish ; sentencing held as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz; Crt grants 3-level and 2-level downward departure [cc: cnsl/prob/pts] [74-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial [71-1] by Carlos Valles-Garcia, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [71-2] by Carlos Valles-Garcia ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 6/8/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia; trial reset for 9:00 7/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; status hrg vacated , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg granting motion to continue trial [70-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; trial reset for 9:00 7/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Order
                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER - court advised that dft Carlos Valles-Garcia does not wish to enter a change of plea ; plea hrg vacated , counsel to file motion to continue the 6/5/01 trial date [69-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001, Terminated: 5/30/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                      MOTION to continue trial [70-1] by Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 4:00 5/24/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Judge Teilborg [66-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: 5/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 2:00 5/22/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos before Judge Teilborg [65-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 5/2/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge James A. Teilborg status hearing set for 4:00 5/22/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ; settlement conference held before Judge Anderson as to all dfts all counsel and interpreter Van Duzer present. [63-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                SENTENCING CONFERENCE Memorandum filed by USA as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia and Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER ; sentencing reset for 2:30 6/4/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz [61-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    The Court has ORDERED that the above captioned matter is reassigned to Judge James A. Teilborg for all further proceedings. Any scheduled hearing, conference, or trial in this action remains as scheduled and will be placed on the calendar of Judge James A. Teilborg . All further pleadings and papers filed in this action should bear the complete case number and judge's initials, as shown above. (cc: all counsel) [60-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue trial [57-1] by dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia, and Gomez-Rosas ; trial reset for 9:00 6/5/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001, Terminated: 4/6/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to continue trial [57-1] by dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia, and Gomez-Rosas (CMM) Modified on 04/06/2001
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee denying motion to continue trial [50-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos (CMM)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            FILED: 4/5/01) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee Ct Rptr: David Lee ; status hrg held as to dfts Magana-Ramos, Valles-Garcia and Gomez-Rosas , ; settlement conference set for 11:00 4/24/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson [58-4] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion for mental examination (re competency to stand trial) [46-1] by Raymundo Magana-Ramos excludable delay competency examination started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee pretrial status hearing set for 4:00 3/28/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Florentino Machuca-Diaz, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 1:30 3/23/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [51-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    FILED: 3/2/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky ; plea hrg held as to Florentino Machuca-Diaz the court does not accept dft's plea of guilty, parties may try and draft a new plea agreement [49-2] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ( FILED: 2/28/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Interpreter: LVelasco ; possible chg of plea hearing reset for 10:00 2/28/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz [cc: interp/smm/vam] [47-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 4:00 2/26/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [45-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 1/25/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue trial [37-1] by Florentino Machuca-Diaz ; trial reset for 9:00 4/3/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos, for Carlos Valles-Garcia, for Florentino Machuca-Diaz, for Eribey Gomez-Rosas , excludable delay interest of justice started (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA , Jeffrey A Myer; terminating attorney Ann Birmingham Scheel for USA (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              FILED: 1/16/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Interpreter: Van Duzer dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney Loyd Tate present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; trial set for 9:00 2/6/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas [cc: pts,usa,atty,interp,al [32-3] (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/5/2001 Other NoticeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE re dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos, dft Carlos Valles-Garcia, dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz, dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas that conflict does not exist as to US Magistrate Judge Virginia A Mathis (LAD)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Eribey Gomez-Rosas before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Florentino Machuca-Diaz before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Carlos Valles-Garcia before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Raymundo Magana-Ramos before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                          INDICTMENT by USA attorney Ann Birmingham Scheel. Counts filed against Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) 1, 2, Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) 1, 2, Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) 1, 2, Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) count(s) 1, 2 (DMT)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas appointing Loyd C. Tate to represent the dft; ordered by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived as to dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas, dft held to answere before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM [17-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived as to dft Florentino Machuca-Diaz and was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [16-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived and dft Carlos Valles-Garcia was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [15-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 12/14/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis; Ct Rptr: M00-184; Spanish Interpreter: Lita Van Duzer status hearing re: preliminary hearing held; preliminary hearing waived and dft Raymundo Magana-Ramos was held to answer before USDC [cc: Interpreter, VAM] [14-2] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Eribey Gomez-Rosas re: detention order [13-1] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Eribey Gomez-Rosas [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M 00-180 Interpreter: Louis Velasco first appearance of Eribey Gomez-Rosas ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Eribey Gomez-Rosas appears with counsel Loyd C Tate , SPANISH for Eribey Gomez-Rosas; detention submitted, dft continued detained pending trial; status hearing regarding prelim hearing set 12/14/00 at 10:00 a.m. before Mag Judge Mathis; dft waives time limit of prelim hearing [11-4] [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT filed as to Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia, Florentino Machuca-Diaz, Eribey Gomez-Rosas [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                              DEFENDANT Raymundo Magana-Ramos, Carlos Valles-Garcia, Florentino Machuca-Diaz, Eribey Gomez-Rosas arrested. Raymundo Magana-Ramos (1) count(s) cmp, Carlos Valles-Garcia (2) count(s) cmp, Florentino Machuca-Diaz (3) count(s) cmp, Eribey Gomez-Rosas (4) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -410 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?