Ayman Qutami v. Tesla Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV356542

Tags
Last Updated October 5, 2021 at 12:08 AM DT (1.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Qutami, Ayman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull Run Hall

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Consumer Action Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew E Faler +1 714 465 4433 +1 714 965 7823 faler.matthew@gmail.com
Space Pauliana Nadjarians Lara +1 818 254 8413 +1 866 400 0475 paulina@calgroup.org
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/5/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
    Legal Document 20 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Minute Order
      Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
          Blank 17 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Referral: Mediation
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Notice
              Hrg 05/26/20 - of Non-Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Binding Arbitration
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Minute Order
                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Motion-Compel
                  Binding Arbitration - Hrg 05/26/20 from 04/07/2020, dept. 20, 9:00am, atty Tahsildoost
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Request-Judicial Notice
                    Hrg 05/26/20 - in Support of Motion to Compel
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                      Hrg 05/26/20 - of Raymond Kim in Support of Motion to Compel
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                        Hrg 05/26/20 - of Soheyl Tahsildoost in Support of Motion to Compel
                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
                          Case Management Statement
                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                            Proof of Service of Summons
                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                                Proof of Service of Summons for Dealership
                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Affidavit: Venue
                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration
                                          RE: Plaintiffs Statement of Actual and Punitive Damages

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?