USA, et al v. Tree
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00009-SMM

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vincent Quill Kirby +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7650 Vincent.Kirby@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 10/30/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-05453
Citation
Offense Level
181153 & 113(a)(6); Assault Resulting in Serious Bodily Injury [ 200-m -5453 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 113A.F
Offense Level 4
18113(a)(6), 1153 CIR Assault Resulting in Serious Bodily Injury
Count 1s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1111.F
Offense Level 4
181111, 1153 CIR - Murder Second Degree
Count 2s
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 113A.F
Offense Level 4
18113(a)(6), 1153 CIR - Assault Resulting in Serious Bodily Injury
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 2/4/2002, Entered: 2/5/2002 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed
WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum executed upon Douglas L Tree on 1/17/02 (note: Gila River declines return of dft - Turns over custody to USMS on 1/17/02). (KMG)
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Douglas L Tree Douglas L Tree (1) count(s) 2s. Dismissed on govt motion at sentencing , Sentencing for Douglas L Tree (1) count(s) 1s. Custody of BOP for ONE HUNDRED FORTY TWO (142) MOS, followed by supervised release for a term of FIVE (5) YRS; S/A: $100. The Court recommends that the dft be placed in an institution where the dft can participate in an anger management and parenting class. It is further recommended that to the extent possible, that the dft be placed in an institution in Arizona. Case closed ; ordered by Judge Stephen M. McNamee (KMG)
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 Plea Agreement
      PLEA agreement filed as to Douglas L Tree (KMG)
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        ( FILED: 11/1/01) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee, Ct Rptr: David Lee ; sentencing held as to dft Douglas Tree [cc: prob,pts,cnsl] [30-2] (KMG)
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Order
          MINUTE ORDER: Due to the Court's calendar; IT IS ORDERED resetting the sentencing in this matter from Friday, October 26, 2001 to Tuesday, October 30, 2001 at 3:30 p.m. for Douglas L Tree before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee in courtroom #605. (cc: AUSA, Defense Counsel, PROB, PTS, MP) [29-3] (ALL)
            LREF
            Blank 28 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue sentencing (2nd req) [27-1] by Douglas L Tree sentencing set for 2:00 10/26/01 for Douglas L Tree (former emp)
              LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001, Terminated: 10/16/2001 Motion to Continue
              MOTION to continue sentencing (2nd req) [27-1] by Douglas L Tree (former emp)
                LREF
                Blank 26 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue sentencing (1st req) [25-1] by Douglas L Tree sentencing set for 4:00 10/18/01 for Douglas L Tree (former emp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 25 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 8/31/2001 Motion to Continue
                  MOTION to continue sentencing (1st req) [25-1] by Douglas L Tree (former emp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 24 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee accepting the dft Douglas Tree's plea of guilty. FURTHER ORDERED that the plea agreemeent will not be accepted or rejected at this time but the matter will be referred to the Probation Office for report and recommendation. re: [24-1] (KMG)
                      LREF
                      Blank 23 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Douglas L Tree (former emp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 22 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        ( FILED: 7/5/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Douglas L Tree (1) count(s) 1s enters a plea of guilty , ; plea hrg held ; trial vacated ; sentencing set for 9:30 9/18/01 for Douglas L Tree , before Judge Stephen M. McNamee PSI ordered, plea agreement lodged as to Douglas L Tree [22-5] (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 21 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee and consent of Douglas L Tree for referral to Magistrate Judge for change of plea. (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 20 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 10:45 7/3/01 for Douglas L Tree , before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [20-3] (former emp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 19 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion (2nd req) to continue trial [18-1] by dft Douglas L Tree ; trial set for 9:00 8/7/01 for Douglas L Tree , excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 18 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/19/2001, Terminated: 6/21/2001 Motion to Continue
                                MOTION (2nd req) to continue trial [18-1] by dft Douglas L Tree (KMG)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/23/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                  ( FILED: 5/25/01) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee, Ct Rptr: David Lee ; Status hrg held as to dft Douglas L. Tree and regarding the 6/5/01 trial date. Dft counsel informs the Court that this matter is ready for a change of plea hearing. Later: Dft counsel is directed to submit a proposed plea agreement prior to the trial date. [cc: prob,pts,cnsl] [17-2] (KMG)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee that this case is set for trial on 6/5/01. In order to properly administer the calendar, a status confernce is necessay status hearing set for 4:00 5/23/01 for Douglas L Tree (KMG)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/24/2001, Entered: 4/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee granting motion to continue trial (1st req) (amended) [14-1] by Douglas L Tree, finding the motion to continue trial (1st req) [13-1] by Douglas L Tree moot. ; trial set for 9:00 6/5/01 for Douglas L Tree , excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001, Terminated: 4/24/2001 Motion to Continue
                                        MOTION to continue trial (1st req) (amended) [14-1] by Douglas L Tree (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001, Terminated: 4/24/2001 Motion to Continue
                                          MOTION to continue trial (1st req) [13-1] by Douglas L Tree (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            ( FILED: 3/30/01) MINUTES: before Judge Stephen M. McNamee Ct Rptr: David Lee ; status hrg held re 4/3/01 trial date as to Douglas L Tree; dft has accepted plea offer and has no objs to having plea taken before Mag Judge; dft will file mtn to cont trial [cc: cnsl/prob/pts/mp] [12-2] (former emp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 3/27/2001 Other Notice
                                              NOTICE of confession, admissions and statements purs. to Local Rule 4.11 as to Douglas L Tree (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Stephen M. McNamee case set for trial 4/3/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 4:00 3/28/01 for Douglas L Tree (former emp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver appointing Robert J McWhirter counsel for Douglas L. Tree (former emp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                    CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Douglas L. Tree (former emp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      ( FILED: 3/12/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver custody by Writ 3/5/01 first appearance of Douglas L. Tree ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Douglas L. Tree appears with counsel Robert James McWhirter , dft Douglas L. Tree arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 3/22/01 for Douglas L. Tree ; trial set for 9:00 4/3/01 for Douglas L. Tree dft to remain in USM custody; issue of detention will be held in abeyance; dft to be detained [7-5] (former emp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/5/2001, Entered: 3/12/2001 Arrest
                                                        DEFENDANT Douglas L. Tree custody by Writ (former emp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 2/21/2001, Entered: 2/21/2001 Appl/Writ HC ad Pros Issued
                                                          WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Prosequendum issued as to Douglas L. Tree ; Arraignment set for 10:00 3/7/01 for Douglas L. Tree before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis (KMG)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis pursuant to provisions of 18:3509 Juvenile Victim Act re: order [6-1] (KMG)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Indictment
                                                              SUPERSEDING Indictment filed against Douglas L. Tree (1) count(s) 1s, 2s (KMG)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Warrant Issued
                                                                DETAINER WARRANT issued for Douglas L. Tree (KMG)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/10/2001 Warrant Returned Unexecuted
                                                                  BENCH WARRANT (originally issued 12/18/00 as to Magistrate Case #00-5453M off Complaint) returned unexecuted as to Douglas L. Tree; Superseded by Indictment (warrant dated 1/3/01) M.E. US Marshal's Office Phoenix. (KMG) Modified on 01/10/2001
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Warrant Issued
                                                                    DETAINER WARRANT issued for Douglas L. Tree (KMG)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson pursuan to provisions of 18:3509 Juvenile Victim Act re: order [3-1] (KMG)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/3/2001 Indictment
                                                                        INDICTMENT by USA attorney Vincent Quill Kirby. Counts filed against Douglas L. Tree (1) count(s) 1 (KMG)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000 Complaint
                                                                          COMPLAINT Douglas L. Tree (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -5453 ] (SMM)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?