USA, et al v. Nardi
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00011-SRB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Thomas Morrissey +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7650 mike.morrissey@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 8/7/2008
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-00409
Citation
Offense Level
182113(a) and (d) Bank Robbery [ 200-m -409 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a)(d) and 2 Armed Bank Robbery and Aid and Abet
Def Custody Status Released
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Transcript Order FormCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by United States of America as to James Brian Nardi for proceedings held on 8/18/08 & 8/21/08 before Judge Lawrence O. Anderson. (Morrissey, Michael)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Admit/Deny HearingCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Admit/Deny Hearing as to James Brian Nardi held on 8/25/08. Denial entered. Evidentiary Hearing set on 9/29/08 at 09:30 AM before Judge Susan R Bolton.(Court Reporter Gary Moll) (MAW)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to James Brian Nardi (1). Dft released O/R with conditions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 08/21/08.(ESL, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Detention HearingCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson: Detention Hearing as to James Brian Nardi held on 8/21/2008. Dft ordered released O/R with conditions. Admit/Deny hearing set for 08/25/08 at 1:15pm before Honorable Susan R. Bolton. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Initial Appearance - Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson: Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to James Brian Nardi held on 8/18/2008. DOA: 08/18/08. Financial Afdvt taken. Attorney Joanne F Landfair (CJA) appointed on behalf of dft. Preliminary Revocation Hearing waived. Detention Hearing set for 8/21/2008 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. Court Orders petition unsealed. Later: Admit/Deny Hearing set for 8/25/2008 at 01:15 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Arrest
            Arrest of James Brian Nardi (ESL, )
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
              PETITION TO REVOKE SUPERVISED RELEASE as to James Brian Nardi (REW, ) Modified on 8/19/2008 to add (cc: USAO-1 cert)(REW, ). Modified on 8/21/2008 unsealed (REW, ).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Status Hearing as to dft (1) James Brian Nardi held on 8/7/2008. Oral motion from the Gov to dismiss the Petition to Revoke Supervised Release pending the issuance of a Superseding petition. No objection from Defense: GRANTED. Dft released.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (KMG)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Initial Appearance - Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan: Initial Appearance re Supervised Release Violation as to dft (1) James Brian Nardi held on 8/4/2008. Appointment of counsel hearing held. Appearance entered by Joanne F Landfair (appointed) for dft. Financial Affidavit taken. Detention Hearing set for 8/7/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. Dft ordered temporarily detained in the custody of the United States Marshal. Preliminary Examination set for 8/7/2008 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. Court ORDERS petition unsealed.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (KMG, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                    Supervised Release Violation Petition Warrant Returned Executed on 8/1/08 as to James Brian Nardi. (MAP)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Arrest
                      Arrest of James Brian Nardi (KMG)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                        PETITION TO REVOKE SUPERVISED RELEASE as to James Brian Nardi (MAP) Modified on 8/5/2008 to UNSEAL Pursuant to # 76 (MAP).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Order/Judgment Revoking Supervised ReleaseCourt Filing
                          ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE for James Brian Nardi (1), Count(s) 1, Committed to BOP for SEVENTY (70) MOS w/credit for time served; followed by supervised release for FIVE (5) YRS; S/A: $100; Restitution: $6,598.00 - 05/25/07 - SUPERVISED RELEASE REVOKED. Custody of BOP for a term of 6 MONTHS. Upon release dft is placed on supervised release for a period of 48 MONTHS. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 05/24/07.(DNH)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Final Disposition Hearing re: Revocation of Supervised Release as to James Brian Nardi held on 5/21/07. Formal order to follow.(Court Reporter Vicki Reger) (MAW)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 71 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                              Minute Order as to James Brian Nardi: Final Disposition Hearing is re-set IN TIME ONLY from 01:15 PM to 01:30 PM on 5/21/07 before Judge Susan R Bolton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan R Bolton: Admit/Deny Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to James Brian Nardi held on 4/16/07. Final Disposition Hearing set on 5/21/07 at 01:15 PM before Judge Susan R Bolton.(Court Reporter Kim Moll) (MAW)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 69 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                  Minute Order as to James Brian Nardi: Due to scheduling conflict, Admit/Deny Hearing is re-set IN TIME ONLY from 11:30 AM to 03:30 PM on 4/16/07 before Judge Susan R Bolton. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/10/2007, Entered: 4/10/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Michael Thomas Morrissey appearing for USA. Attorney Darcy A Cerow terminated. (Morrissey, Michael)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                      ORDER OF DETENTION as to James Brian Nardi. Signed by Judge Michelle H Burns on 4/4/07.(SAT)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michelle H Burns : Detention Hearing as to James Brian Nardi submitted on 4/4/2007, Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to James Brian Nardi held on 4/4/2007. Financial Afdvt taken. Attorney Anne M Williams (CJA) appointed for James Brian Nardi on behalf of defendant. Preliminary Examination as to James Brian Nardi waived. Petition ordered unsealed. Admit/Deny Hearing set for 4/16/2007 at 11:30 AM before Judge Susan R Bolton.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (ESL)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/9/2007 Warrant Returned Executed
                                          Supervised Release Violation Warrant Returned Executed on 4/3/07 in case as to James Brian Nardi. (REW, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/4/2007 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                            PETITION TO REVOKE SUPERVISED RELEASE as to James Brian Nardi (MAP) Modified on 4/5/2007 to UNSEAL (MAP).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Arrest
                                              Arrest of James Brian Nardi (ESL)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                Waiver and ORDER re Modification of Supervised Release Conditions as to James Brian Nardi - Dft waives counsel and hearing. Dft agrees to modification of conditions. Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 1/3/07.(SAT)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: 6/8/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  WAIVER AND ORDER - Modification of Supervised Release Conditions as to James Brian Nardi . Signed by Judge Susan R Bolton on 06/07/06. (DNH)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton amending sentence for Mike Molsberry (2) count(s) 1. Committed to BOP for SIX (6) MOS w/credit for time served; followed by supervised release for THREE (3) YRS; S/A: $100; Restitution $5,798.00; ****SUPERVISED RELEASE REINSTATED 10/5/04****: dft shall pay S/A of $100.00 and restitution of $5,798.00; dft shall participate and successfully complete the program at Recovery Homes commending 10/1/04 (LAD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                      (FILED: 10/4/04) MINUTES: Final disposition hearing held on supervised release as to Mike Molsberry before Judge Susan R. Bolton . Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick admit/deny hearing held ; dft has violated conditions of supervised release; dft waives time for sentencing and disposition report; FURTHER ORDERED reinstating supervised release under the terms and conditions previously imposed; formal order to follow [59-2] (LAD)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Darcy A Cerow appears and terminating attorney Michael Thomas Morrissey for USA (LAD)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                          CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Mike Molsberry appointing Barbara Hull (LAD)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                            SUPERVISED RELEASE VIOLATION WARRANT returned executed on 9/21/04 as to Mike Molsberry (LAD)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss setting conditions of release; Mike Molsberry released on own recognizance (OR) to Recovery Homes (LAD)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Mike Molsberry (LAD)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                  (FILED: 9/22/04) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss initial appearance re: petition for revocation of supervised release [52-1]; appointment of counsel hearing held; appointing counsel for Mike Molsberry Barbara Lynn Hull and terminating attorney John R Hannah for Mike Molsberry ; detention hearing submitted; dft ordered released on own recognizance (OR) with conditions to Recovery Homes Inc; preliminary revocation hearing waived; dft held to answer before District Court; admit/deny hearing set for 3:00 9/30/04 for Mike Molsberry [cc: all counsel] [53-3] (LAD)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Arrest
                                                                    DEFENDANT Mike Molsberry arrested. (LAD)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                      PETITION TO REVOKE supv rel as to Mike Molsberry ; petition filed on 9/15/04. (PKD)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Warrant Issued
                                                                        SUPERVISED RELEASE VIOLATION WARRANT issued for Mike Molsberry (LAD)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                          JUDGMENT and commitment returned executed upon Mike Molsberry 10/25/01 location of custody started FCI Safford AZ (former emp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 12/11/2001, Entered: 12/12/2001 Judgment Returned Executed
                                                                            JUDGMENT and commitment returned executed upon James Brian Nardi 11/26/01 (FCI Sch) (former emp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              PAYMENT voucher by Judge Susan R. Bolton as to Mike Molsberry for CJA atty John R Hannah (former emp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to exonerate bond by Mike Molsberry. IT IS ORDERED exonerating the bond in this case and exonerating the obligors on the bond. Surety property BOND for Mike Molsberry in the amount of $ 50,000 (KMG)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Motion for Bond
                                                                                  MOTION to exonerate bond by Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Mike Molsberry sentencing for Mike Molsberry (2) count(s) 1. Committed to BOP for SIX (6) MOS w/credit for time served; followed by supervised release for THREE (3) YRS; S/A: $100; Restitution $5,798.00 dft shall self-surrender at institution designated by BOP or USM by 3:00 PM 10/25/01, Case closed ; ordered by Judge Susan R. Bolton (former emp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                      PLEA agreement filed as to Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                        ( FILED: 9/10/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick ; sentencing held as to Michael Molsberry [44-2] (former emp)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Sentencing Memorandum
                                                                                          SENTENCING memorandum filed as to Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                            STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to James Brian Nardi by Judge Susan R. Bolton (former emp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to James Brian Nardi sentencing for James Brian Nardi (1) count(s) 1. Committed to BOP for SEVENTY (70) MOS w/credit for time served; followed by supervised release for FIVE (5) YRS; S/A: $100; Restitution: $6,598.00 to be paid jointly and severally w/co-dft in this case ; ordered by Judge Susan R. Bolton (former emp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2002 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                PLEA agreement filed as to James Brian Nardi (former emp)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ( FILED: 8/20/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick ; sentencing held as to James Nardi [39-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                    SENTENCING Memorandum and request for recommendation to Bureau of Prisons re: substance abuse by dft James Brian Nardi as to dft James Brian Nardi (former emp)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ( FILED: 6/19/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick Mike Molsberry (2) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; plea hrg held ; trial vacated ; sentencing set for 4:00 9/10/01 for Mike Molsberry ORD affirming prior release ords; ORD PSI rpt be prepared, plea agreement lodged as to Mike Molsberry [37-4] (former emp)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ( FILED: 6/18/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick ; status hrg held re 7/3/01 trial; on oral mtn by dft cnsl ORD; possible chg of plea hearing set for 11:00 6/19/01 for Mike Molsberry [36-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton on req of USPO sentencing reset for 2:00 8/20/01 for James Brian Nardi (former emp)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton case set for trial 7/3/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 4:00 6/18/01 for Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue trial (3rd req) [29-1] by James Brian Nardi, granting motion to vacate status conf by James Brian Nardi [29-2] ; status hrg vacated ; trial set for 9:00 7/3/01 for Mike Molsberry , excludable delay int of justice started setting chg of plea for dft Nardi on 4/30/01 at 9:30 AM (former emp)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ( FILED: 4/30/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick finding the motion to continue trial (3rd req) [29-1] by James Brian Nardi moot., finding the motion to vacate status conf by James Brian Nardi [29-2] moot. James Brian Nardi (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; trial vacated ; sentencing set for 1:30 7/9/01 for James Brian Nardi ORD remanded to custody of USM; ORD PSI be prepared, plea agreement lodged as to James Brian Nardi [cc: prob] [30-4] (former emp)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 4/26/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001, Terminated: 5/1/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                  MOTION to continue trial (3rd req) [29-1] by James Brian Nardi , to vacate status conf by James Brian Nardi [29-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton case set for trial 5/15/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 4:00 4/30/01 for Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton case set for trial 5/15/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 4:00 4/30/01 for James Brian Nardi (former emp)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        The Court has ORDERED that the above captioned matter is reassigned to Judge Susan R. Bolton for all further proceedings. Any scheduled hearing, conference, or trial in this action remains as scheduled and will be placed on the calendar of Judge Susan R. Bolton . All further pleadings and papers filed in this action should bear the complete case number and judge's initials, as shown above. (cc: all counsel/PGR/SRB/MW/TA) [26-1] (MAP)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial (2nd req) [24-1] by James Brian Nardi ; trial set for 9:00 5/15/01 for James Brian Nardi, for Mike Molsberry , excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001, Terminated: 3/23/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                            MOTION to continue trial (2nd req) [24-1] by James Brian Nardi (former emp)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              Agreement to Forfeit Property filed as to Mike Molsberry ; ordered by Mag Judge Morton Sitver; returned recorded in Gila Co AZ; Lot 88 Payson (copy of Deed of Trust attached) (former emp)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial and ext time for filing pretrial mtns (1st req) [21-1] by James Brian Nardi ; pretrial motions ddl set for 2/20/01 for James Brian Nardi ; trial set for 9:00 3/27/01 for James Brian Nardi, for Mike Molsberry , excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001, Terminated: 2/1/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to continue trial and ext time for filing pretrial mtns (1st req) [21-1] by James Brian Nardi (former emp)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Surety property BOND filed in the amount of $ 50,000 as to Mike Molsberry ; ordered by Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver setting conditions of release; Bond set to $50,000 PROP/3RD PTY CUSTODY for Mike Molsberry. custody of parents Timothy and Elizabeth Molsberry, Payson AZ (former emp)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ( FILED: 1/24/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver ;release hearing held; Michael Molsberry ord released w/conds $50,000 property bond and 3rd pty custody [18-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                          Memorandum re release conds filed by Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ( FILED: 1/23/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver ; possible release hearing set for 11:00 1/23/01 for Mike Molsberry , before Mag Judge Morton Sitver [16-3] (former emp) Modified on 01/23/2001
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 1/11/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver dft Mike Molsberry arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Mike Molsberry ; trial set for 9:00 2/27/01 for Mike Molsberry [15-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 1/11/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver dft James Brian Nardi arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for James Brian Nardi ; trial set for 9:00 2/27/01 for James Brian Nardi [14-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of substitution of attorney for USA , Michael Thomas Morrissey; terminating attorney W Allen Stooks for USA (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                    CJA Form 20 as to Mike Molsberry appointing John R Hannah (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by pla that conflict does not exist as to VAM re dfts Nardi and Molsberry (former emp) Modified on 01/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Mike Molsberry before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp) Modified on 01/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for James Brian Nardi before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT by USA attorney W Allen Stooks. Counts filed against James Brian Nardi (1) count(s) 1, Mike Molsberry (2) count(s) 1 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 12/29/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Ct Rptr: S00-204: 2327-4461; detention hearing held, preliminary hearing held, probable cause found, Mike Molsberry held to answer before USDC; government's witness Brian Nemec sworn and examined, defense witness Timothy James Molsberry sworn and examined; oral motion by defense to have the dft released 3rd party custody of his father. Motion tken under advisement subject to new information presented to the Court by pretrial services [cc: USM, PTS, MS] [4-1] re: minute entry [4-1] [ 2:00-m -412 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 12/26/00 as to Mike Molsberry [ 2:00-m -412 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                  CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Mike Molsberry [ 2:00-m -412 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 12/27/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver first appearance of Mike Molsberry ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Mike Molsberry appears with counsel John R Hannah. Defendant temporarily detained. Detention and Preliminary hearings set for December 29, 2000 at 10:30 before Judge Sitver [2-3] [ 2:00-m -412 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANT Mike Molsberry arrested. [ 2:00-m -412 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to James Brian Nardi re: detention order [6-1] [ 2:00-m -409 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 12/12/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M00-183 detention hearing held, government's witness Agent Janell Miller sworn and examined, dft James Brian Nardi detained as a flight risk and a danger; preliminary hearing held, probable cause found, dft James Brian Nardi held to answer before USDC [cc: VAM] [5-2] [ 2:00-m -409 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 12/6/00 as to James Brian Nardi [ 2:00-m -409 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis appointing counsel James Park for James Brian Nardi [ 2:00-m -409 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by James Brian Nardi [ 2:00-m -409 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ( FILED: 12/7/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M 00-179 first appearance of James Brian Nardi ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft James Brian Nardi appears with counsel James Sun Park; detention/prelim hearing set 12/12/00 at 3:30 p.m. before Mag Judge Mathis [2-3] [ 2:00-m -409 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT Mike Molsberry (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -412 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT issued for Mike Molsberry by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [ 2:00-m -412 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT James Brian Nardi (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -409 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 4/9/2001 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANT James Brian Nardi arrested. (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2000, Entered: 4/9/2001 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST WARRANT issued for James Brian Nardi by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 167 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?