Simmons-v-benitez
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. CIVDS1902629

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2019 at 9:35 PM EDT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Darla Simmons, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space The Judge Law Firm, A Law Corporation +1 949 833 8633
No Logo Lee Simmons, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space The Judge Law Firm, A Law Corporation +1 949 833 8633
v.
Herman Miller Herman Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francine B. Kelly +1 562 653 2300
No Logo Jessica Benitez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francine B. Kelly +1 562 653 2300
No Logo Laura Ann Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francine B. Kelly +1 562 653 2300
No Logo Vaniessa Benitez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francine B. Kelly +1 562 653 2300
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None ?
Advanced Jury Fees Posted For Vaniessa Benitez, Jessica Benitez, Laura Ann Miller, Herman Miller.
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2019, Entered: None ?
    Notice Of Posting Jury Fees Filed By Vaniessa Benitez, Jessica Benitez, Laura Ann Miller, Herman Miller.
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 24 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None ?
      Defendant Vaniessa Benitez, Jessica Benitez, Laura Ann Miller, Herman Miller First Paper Fee Paid In Full
        Blank 23 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None ?
        Filing Fee Paid By Herman Miller For First Appearance
          Blank 22 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None ?
          Filing Fee Paid By Jessica Benitez For First Appearance
            Blank 21 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None ?
            Filing Fee Paid By Laura Ann Miller For First Appearance
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None ?
              Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Vaniessa Benitez, Jessica Benitez, Laura Ann Miller, Herman Miller
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 19 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                Filing Fee Paid By Vaniessa Benitez For First Appearance
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                  Answer Filed By Vaniessa Benitez, Jessica Benitez, Laura Ann Miller, Herman Miller; Party Represented By Law Offices Of Francine B Kelly& Assoc.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                    At-issue Memorandum Filed By Darla Simmons, Lee Simmons
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                      Notice Jury Fee Deposit Filed By Darla Simmons.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 15 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                        Advanced Jury Fees Posted For Darla Simmons.
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Proof Of Sub-service Of Summons And Comp/pet As To Herman Miller Served On 04/16/19 With Fees Of $79.00.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Proof Of Sub-service Of Summons And Comp/pet As To Jessica Benitez Served On 04/15/19 With Fees Of $59.00.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                              Amendment To Complaint Naming Does 7 To Be Herman Miller Filed.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 11 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                On The Complaint (unlimited) Filed 01/25/2019 Of Darla Simmons, Herman Miller Is Added As A Defendant.
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  Amendment To Complaint Naming Does 6 To Be Laura Ann Miller Filed.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    On The Complaint (unlimited) Filed 01/25/2019 Of Darla Simmons, Laura Ann Miller Is Added As A Defendant.
                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      Plaintiff Darla Simmons, Lee Simmons First Paper Fee Previously Paid In Full.
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        Filing Fee Paid By Darla Simmons, Lee Simmons For First Paper Fee
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          Summons Issued And Filed
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 4 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department S27
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Notice Imaged
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Certificate Of Assignment Received.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    Complaint And Party Information Entered
                                                      Request RequestSpace

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?