Camden Landscape-v-m Hayden
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino, Case No. CIVDS1902703

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2019 at 9:38 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Camden Landmark, Llc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gaba Guerrini Law Corporation
v.
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Hayden"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: None ?
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Filed.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 15 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None ?
    Filing Fee Paid By Camden Landmark, Llc For Copies
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: None ?
      Judgment On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/28/2019 Of Camden Landmark, Llc Filed
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 13 Filed: 6/18/2019, Entered: None ?
        Vacate Oscsvc Hearing Scheduled For 07/26/19 At 08:30 In Department S16.
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None ?
          Declaration Of Rodolfo Gaby Jr Purs. Tocode Of Ccp 1033 Filed
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None ?
            Dismissal Filed On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/28/2019 Of Camden Landmark, Llc As To Does Only
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None ?
              Request For Entry Of Default And Request For Clerk's/court Judgment Filed On Michael Hayden.
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 9 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                Default Entered On Complaint (limited Jurisdiction) Filed 01/28/2019 Of Camden Landmark, Llc As To Michael Hayden.
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None ?
                  Proof Of Sub-service Of Summons And Comp/pet As To Michael Hayden Served On 03/20/19 With Fees Of $86.79.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                    Notice Imaged
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 6 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                      Prayed For Amount And/or Damages In The Amount Of $3,525.50
                        Blank 5 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                        Prayer For Interest Percentage Rate Of 18 Per Annum Beginning Date Of 08/07/16
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                          Complaint Filed
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                            Summons Issued And Filed
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                              Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None ?
                                Case Assigned For All Purposes To Department S16

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?