USA, et al v. Nardi
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00011-SRB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Thomas Morrissey +1 602 514 7500 +1 602 514 7650 mike.morrissey@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 9/10/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-00412
Citation
Offense Level
182113(a) and (d) Bank Robbery [ 200-m -412 ]
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 2113A.F
Offense Level 4
182113(a)(d) and 2 Armed Bank Robbery and Aid and Abet
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 60 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton amending sentence for Mike Molsberry (2) count(s) 1. Committed to BOP for SIX (6) MOS w/credit for time served; followed by supervised release for THREE (3) YRS; S/A: $100; Restitution $5,798.00; ****SUPERVISED RELEASE REINSTATED 10/5/04****: dft shall pay S/A of $100.00 and restitution of $5,798.00; dft shall participate and successfully complete the program at Recovery Homes commending 10/1/04 (LAD)
    LREF
    Blank 59 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    (FILED: 10/4/04) MINUTES: Final disposition hearing held on supervised release as to Mike Molsberry before Judge Susan R. Bolton . Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick admit/deny hearing held ; dft has violated conditions of supervised release; dft waives time for sentencing and disposition report; FURTHER ORDERED reinstating supervised release under the terms and conditions previously imposed; formal order to follow [59-2] (LAD)
      LREF
      Blank 58 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/28/2004 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
      NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Darcy A Cerow appears and terminating attorney Michael Thomas Morrissey for USA (LAD)
        LREF
        Blank 57 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004 CJA 20 Appointment
        CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Mike Molsberry appointing Barbara Hull (LAD)
          LREF
          Blank 56 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Warrant Returned Executed
          SUPERVISED RELEASE VIOLATION WARRANT returned executed on 9/21/04 as to Mike Molsberry (LAD)
            LREF
            Blank 55 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss setting conditions of release; Mike Molsberry released on own recognizance (OR) to Recovery Homes (LAD)
              LREF
              Blank 54 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
              CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Mike Molsberry (LAD)
                LREF
                Blank 53 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                (FILED: 9/22/04) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss initial appearance re: petition for revocation of supervised release [52-1]; appointment of counsel hearing held; appointing counsel for Mike Molsberry Barbara Lynn Hull and terminating attorney John R Hannah for Mike Molsberry ; detention hearing submitted; dft ordered released on own recognizance (OR) with conditions to Recovery Homes Inc; preliminary revocation hearing waived; dft held to answer before District Court; admit/deny hearing set for 3:00 9/30/04 for Mike Molsberry [cc: all counsel] [53-3] (LAD)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Arrest
                  DEFENDANT Mike Molsberry arrested. (LAD)
                    LREF
                    Blank 52 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                    PETITION TO REVOKE supv rel as to Mike Molsberry ; petition filed on 9/15/04. (PKD)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Warrant Issued
                      SUPERVISED RELEASE VIOLATION WARRANT issued for Mike Molsberry (LAD)
                        LREF
                        Blank 51 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/25/2002 Judgment Returned Executed
                        JUDGMENT and commitment returned executed upon Mike Molsberry 10/25/01 location of custody started FCI Safford AZ (former emp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 49 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                          PAYMENT voucher by Judge Susan R. Bolton as to Mike Molsberry for CJA atty John R Hannah (former emp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 48 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to exonerate bond by Mike Molsberry. IT IS ORDERED exonerating the bond in this case and exonerating the obligors on the bond. Surety property BOND for Mike Molsberry in the amount of $ 50,000 (KMG)
                              LREF
                              Blank 47 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Motion for Bond
                              MOTION to exonerate bond by Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 46 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Mike Molsberry sentencing for Mike Molsberry (2) count(s) 1. Committed to BOP for SIX (6) MOS w/credit for time served; followed by supervised release for THREE (3) YRS; S/A: $100; Restitution $5,798.00 dft shall self-surrender at institution designated by BOP or USM by 3:00 PM 10/25/01, Case closed ; ordered by Judge Susan R. Bolton (former emp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 45 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Plea Agreement
                                  PLEA agreement filed as to Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/13/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    ( FILED: 9/10/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick ; sentencing held as to Michael Molsberry [44-2] (former emp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 43 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Sentencing Memorandum
                                      SENTENCING memorandum filed as to Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 39 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        ( FILED: 8/20/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick ; sentencing held as to James Nardi [39-2] (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 37 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          ( FILED: 6/19/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick Mike Molsberry (2) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; plea hrg held ; trial vacated ; sentencing set for 4:00 9/10/01 for Mike Molsberry ORD affirming prior release ords; ORD PSI rpt be prepared, plea agreement lodged as to Mike Molsberry [37-4] (former emp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 36 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            ( FILED: 6/18/01) MINUTES: before Judge Susan R. Bolton Ct Rptr: Kim Myrick ; status hrg held re 7/3/01 trial; on oral mtn by dft cnsl ORD; possible chg of plea hearing set for 11:00 6/19/01 for Mike Molsberry [36-2] (former emp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 35 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: 6/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton on req of USPO sentencing reset for 2:00 8/20/01 for James Brian Nardi (former emp)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 34 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton case set for trial 7/3/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 4:00 6/18/01 for Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton granting motion to continue trial (3rd req) [29-1] by James Brian Nardi, granting motion to vacate status conf by James Brian Nardi [29-2] ; status hrg vacated ; trial set for 9:00 7/3/01 for Mike Molsberry , excludable delay int of justice started setting chg of plea for dft Nardi on 4/30/01 at 9:30 AM (former emp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton case set for trial 5/15/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 4:00 4/30/01 for Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Susan R. Bolton case set for trial 5/15/01; cnsl to appear at status hearing set for 4:00 4/30/01 for James Brian Nardi (former emp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        The Court has ORDERED that the above captioned matter is reassigned to Judge Susan R. Bolton for all further proceedings. Any scheduled hearing, conference, or trial in this action remains as scheduled and will be placed on the calendar of Judge Susan R. Bolton . All further pleadings and papers filed in this action should bear the complete case number and judge's initials, as shown above. (cc: all counsel/PGR/SRB/MW/TA) [26-1] (MAP)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial (2nd req) [24-1] by James Brian Nardi ; trial set for 9:00 5/15/01 for James Brian Nardi, for Mike Molsberry , excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 BondCourt Filing
                                                            Agreement to Forfeit Property filed as to Mike Molsberry ; ordered by Mag Judge Morton Sitver; returned recorded in Gila Co AZ; Lot 88 Payson (copy of Deed of Trust attached) (former emp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial and ext time for filing pretrial mtns (1st req) [21-1] by James Brian Nardi ; pretrial motions ddl set for 2/20/01 for James Brian Nardi ; trial set for 9:00 3/27/01 for James Brian Nardi, for Mike Molsberry , excludable delay int of justice started (former emp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 BondCourt Filing
                                                                Surety property BOND filed in the amount of $ 50,000 as to Mike Molsberry ; ordered by Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver setting conditions of release; Bond set to $50,000 PROP/3RD PTY CUSTODY for Mike Molsberry. custody of parents Timothy and Elizabeth Molsberry, Payson AZ (former emp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                    ( FILED: 1/24/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver ;release hearing held; Michael Molsberry ord released w/conds $50,000 property bond and 3rd pty custody [18-2] (former emp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Memorandum
                                                                      Memorandum re release conds filed by Mike Molsberry (former emp)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                        ( FILED: 1/23/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver ; possible release hearing set for 11:00 1/23/01 for Mike Molsberry , before Mag Judge Morton Sitver [16-3] (former emp) Modified on 01/23/2001
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                          ( FILED: 1/11/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver dft Mike Molsberry arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Mike Molsberry ; trial set for 9:00 2/27/01 for Mike Molsberry [15-3] (former emp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 1/8/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                            NOTICE of substitution of attorney for USA , Michael Thomas Morrissey; terminating attorney W Allen Stooks for USA (former emp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 1/4/2001, Entered: 1/8/2001 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                              CJA Form 20 as to Mike Molsberry appointing John R Hannah (former emp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                NOTICE by pla that conflict does not exist as to VAM re dfts Nardi and Molsberry (former emp) Modified on 01/23/2001
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                  NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for Mike Molsberry before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp) Modified on 01/23/2001
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                    NOTICE issued ; arraignment set for 10:00 1/10/01 for James Brian Nardi before Mag Judge Morton Sitver (former emp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/4/2001 Indictment
                                                                                      INDICTMENT by USA attorney W Allen Stooks. Counts filed against James Brian Nardi (1) count(s) 1, Mike Molsberry (2) count(s) 1 (former emp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: 1/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                        ( FILED: 12/29/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Ct Rptr: S00-204: 2327-4461; detention hearing held, preliminary hearing held, probable cause found, Mike Molsberry held to answer before USDC; government's witness Brian Nemec sworn and examined, defense witness Timothy James Molsberry sworn and examined; oral motion by defense to have the dft released 3rd party custody of his father. Motion tken under advisement subject to new information presented to the Court by pretrial services [cc: USM, PTS, MS] [4-1] re: minute entry [4-1] [ 2:00-m -412 ] (SMM)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/28/2000, Entered: 1/3/2001 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                          ARREST WARRANT returned executed on 12/26/00 as to Mike Molsberry [ 2:00-m -412 ] (former emp)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                            CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Mike Molsberry [ 2:00-m -412 ] (former emp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/27/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                              ( FILED: 12/27/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver first appearance of Mike Molsberry ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Mike Molsberry appears with counsel John R Hannah. Defendant temporarily detained. Detention and Preliminary hearings set for December 29, 2000 at 10:30 before Judge Sitver [2-3] [ 2:00-m -412 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/26/2000, Entered: 12/28/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                DEFENDANT Mike Molsberry arrested. [ 2:00-m -412 ] (former emp)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ( FILED: 12/12/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M00-183 detention hearing held, government's witness Agent Janell Miller sworn and examined, dft James Brian Nardi detained as a flight risk and a danger; preliminary hearing held, probable cause found, dft James Brian Nardi held to answer before USDC [cc: VAM] [5-2] [ 2:00-m -409 ] (SMM)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT Mike Molsberry (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -412 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/8/2000 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                      ARREST WARRANT issued for Mike Molsberry by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis [ 2:00-m -412 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 909 times.

                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                         
                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                        Need Password Help?