USA, et al v. Russell, et al
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00012-PGR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C Simon +1 602 514 7610 +1 602 514 7650 Tom.Simon@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 8/7/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-05387
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1708.F
Offense Level 4
181708 and 2 POSSESSION OF STOLEN MAIL
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1708.F
Offense Level 4
181708 and 2 POSSESSION OF STOLEN MAIL
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1708.F
Offense Level 4
181708 and 2 POSSESSION OF STOLEN MAIL
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (125) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Order/Judgment Revoking Supervised ReleaseCourt Filing
ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE 11/7/07 as to Michael Brandon Johnson- Committed to BOP for a term of 8 months followed by supervised release for a term of 22 months. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/7/07.(TLJ)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt : Admit/Deny Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 11/6/2007. Defendant waives time for sentencing and PSR. Final Disposition Hearing held. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke). (JIR)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - FPD
      NOTICE OF FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER SUBSTITUTION: Karen M Wilkinson appearing for Michael Brandon Johnson. Attorney Lorna Ann Spencer terminated. (Wilkinson, Karen)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Thomas C Simon appearing for USA. Attorney Darcy A Cerow terminated. (Simon, Thomas)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
          ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to Michael Brandon Johnson. Signed by Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/4/07.(TLJ)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Detention HearingCourt Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michelle H Burns : Detention Hearing oral argument supervised release as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 10/4/2007. Defendant continued detained.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (TLJ)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michelle H Burns : Status Hearing as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 10/2/2007, Preliminary Revocation Hearing re: Supervised Release Violation waived as to Michael Brandon Johnson on 10/2/2007. Admit/Deny Hearing set for 11/6/2007 01:30 PM before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Detention Hearing set for 10/4/2007 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Defendant ordered temporarily detained.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (TLJ)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Warrant Returned Executed
                Petition for Violation of Supervised Release Warrant Returned Executed on 9/28/07 as to Michael Brandon Johnson. (MAP)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Initial Appearance - Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay R Irwin : FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointment of Counsel Hearing as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 9/28/07,Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 9/28/2007. Defendant ordered temporarily detained. Status regarding Detention and Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 10/2/07 at 11:00 a.m.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (TLJ)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Arrest
                    Arrest of Michael Brandon Johnson (AJT, )
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Warrant Issued
                      Supervised Release WARRANT issued for Michael Brandon Johnson ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (REW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 112 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                        PETITION TO REVOKE Supervised Release as to Michael Brandon Johnson ; petition filed on 5/9/05. (REW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 111 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt; as to dft Melinda Lou Russell; dft discharged from supervised release and proceedings in this case are terminated re: [111-1] (REW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 110 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                            AMENDED ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt revoking supervised release re: order [109-2], re: minutes [108-1], re: petition [100-1] sentencing for Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2. !!! 3/10/04 - Amended Order filed to state Supervised Release Revoked !!! !!! 2/13/04 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 31 months !!! - !!! 1/14/03 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 3 years !!! Sentenced to probation for a term of 5 years; S/A $100 (REW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 109 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt re: minutes [108-1], sentencing for Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2. !!! 2/13/04 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 31 months !!! - !!! 1/14/03 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 3 years !!! Sentenced to probation for a term of 5 years; S/A $100 (REW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 108 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
                                (FILED: 2/10/04) MINUTES: Final disposition hearing held on supervised release as to Michael Brandon Johnson before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Liz Lemke; see order for sentence, re: petition [100-1] [108-1] (REW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 107 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Memorandum
                                  Disposition Memorandum by dft Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 106 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    ( FILED: 1/16/04) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Liz Lemke; admit/deny hearing held as to dft Michael Brnadon Johnson; re: revocation petition [100-1]; dft admits allegations #8, 6; remaining allegations to be dismissed at final disposition hearing ; final disposition hearing set for 9:30 2/10/04 for Michael Brandon Johnson [106-2] (REW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 105 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Order
                                      MINUTE ORDER re: [100-1] ; admit/deny hearing set for 2:30 1/12/04 for Michael Brandon Johnson [105-2] (REW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 104 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                        ORDER of detention pending further order of the Court by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson as to Michael Brandon Johnson re: detention [104-1] (LAD)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 103 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson appointing counsel Karen Wilkinson for Michael Brandon Johnson (LAD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 102 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                            CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Michael Brandon Johnson (LAD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 101 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                              (FILED: 12/22/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson initial appearance re: petition for revocation of supervised release [100-1]; appointing counsel Karen Wilkinson for Michael Brandon Johnson ; detention hearing submitted; dft continued detained pending disposition; preliminary revocation hearing waived; dft held to answer before District Court; admit/deny hearing to be set before Judge Rosenblatt [cc: all counsel] [101-2] (LAD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 100 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                PETITION TO REVOKE Supervised Release as to Michael Brandon Johnson; petition filed on 11/12/03. (LAD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Arrest
                                                  DEFENDANT Michael Brandon Johnson arrested (on petition for revocation) (LAD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 2/26/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                    Supervised Release Violation Petition Warrant Returned Executed on 12/17/03 as to Michael Brandon Johnson. (MAP)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 99 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                      NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Darcy A Cerow appears and terminating attorney Timothy C Holtzen for USA (LCF)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Appeal Record Returned
                                                        Original Record received from 9CCA re [58-1]; 1 volume clerk's record; 3 transcripts (#74, 76, 78) in one expando (REW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 98 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                          Waiver and ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Melinda Lou Russell regarding waiver of counsel and hearing on modification of conditions of supervised release (REW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 97 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt revoking probation as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson sentencing for Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2. !!! 1/14/03 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 3 years !!! Sentenced to probation for a term of 5 years; S/A $100 ; dft remanded to custody of USM (REW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 96 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
                                                              ( FILED: 1/14/03) MINUTES: Final disposition hearing held on supervised release as to Michael Brandon Johnson before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Bill McNutt . re: petition [83-1] ; see order for ruling [96-1] (REW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 95 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Memorandum
                                                                DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM by dft Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Order Returned Executed
                                                                  ORDER executed on 12/19/02 as to defendant Michael Brandon Johnson re order [93-1] . (REW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 93 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion for order for transportation for a chemical dependency evaluation by Michael Brandon Johnson [92-1]; USM directed to transport dft for chemical dependency evaluation (cc: cnsl/USM) (REW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 92 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002, Terminated: 12/6/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                      MOTION for order for transportation for a chemical dependency evaluation by Michael Brandon Johnson [92-1] (REW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 113 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 5/24/2005 USCA Mandate
                                                                        CERTIFIED COPY of 9CCA Mandate as to Melinda Lou Russell; appellant's motion to dismiss granted; appeal dismissed, re: 01-10388 [58-1] (cc: PGR/pts/prob/USM/USAO/dfns) (REW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                          ( FILED: 11/22/02) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Bill McNutt . re: revocation petition as to Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; held admit/deny hearing ; final disposition hearing set for 9:30 1/13/03 for Michael Brandon Johnson [91-2] (REW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                            WARRANT returned executed on 11/8/02 as to Michael Brandon Johnson (custody by detainer from ASP-Safford) (REW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Order
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER re: revocation petition as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; admit/deny hearing reset for 1:30 11/20/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson [89-2] (REW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER of detention pending further proceedings by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan as to Michael Brandon Johnson, re: revocation proceedings re: detention [88-1] (REW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  ( FILED: 11/18/02) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan . re: revocation petition as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; preliminary exam waived ; detention hrg submitted , ; admit/deny hearing set for 10:00 11/21/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson [87-3] (REW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan appointing Karen Wilkinson as counsel for Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                      CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                        ( FILED: 11/15/02) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan; initial appearance of dft Michael Brandon Johnson; Attorney present; re: petition as to Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] appointing Karen Wilkinson as counsel for Michael Brandon Johnson , ; detention hearing set for 10:30 11/15/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson , before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan , ; preliminary exam set for 10:30 11/15/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson , before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan , [84-7] (REW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                                          PETITION TO REVOKE Probation as to Michael Brandon Johnson ; petition filed on 6/19/02. (REW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Arrest
                                                                                            DEFENDANT Michael Brandon Johnson arrested. (minute entry of 11/12/02 listed date of arrest as 11/12/02; subsequent returned warrant listed arrest date as 11/8/02; custody location changed as of 11/8/02) (REW) Modified on 11/18/2002
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Acknowledgment of Receipt of ROA
                                                                                              LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL from 9CCA Acknowledging receipt of DC record as to Melinda Lou Russell (REW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Timothy C Holtzen appears and terminating attorney Thomas C Simon for USA (REW)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002, Terminated: 10/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting petition on supervised release as to Melinda Lou Russell; ORDERED on 3rd day of October 2002 that the condition of supervised release requiring the defendant to pay restitution in an amount to be determined be VACATED re: [81-1] (PHR)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                                                                                    Clerk's record on appeal transmitted to 9th Circuit as to Melinda Lou Russell [58-1]; 1 volume clerk's record; 3 transcripts (#74, 76, 78) in one expando (REW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Receipt
                                                                                                      RETURNED MAIL addressed to dft Melinda Lou Russell, re: mandate #77; remailed to: 8401 S Kolb Rd, Unit 420, Tucson AZ 85706-9624 (REW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 80 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        WAIVER AND ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Michael Brandon Johnson regarding modification of probation conditions, re: judgment [70-4] (REW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 79 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          CJA Form 24 copy 3 authorization voucher for payment of Transcript by Melinda Lou Russell ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (REW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Certificate of Record
                                                                                                            Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9th Circuit as to dft Melinda Lou Russell re [58-1] (REW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 78 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Transcript -Appeal
                                                                                                              Court Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings for the following date(s): 5/21/01 ; re: sentencing as to Melinda Lou Russell; CtRptr: Bill McNutt (REW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 77 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                CERTIFIED COPY of 9CCA Mandate as to Melinda Lou Russell dismissing the appeal as duplicative of 01-10388, re: 01-10389 dismissed [59-1] (cc: PGR/pts/prob/USM/USAO/dfns) (REW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of sentencing by Court Reporter: Vicki Reger as to Michael Brandon Johnson for the following date(s): 8/7/01 (REW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    CJA Form 24 copy 3 authorization voucher for payment of Transcript by Melinda Lou Russell ; ordered by Mag Judge Morton Sitver (REW)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Transcript -Appeal
                                                                                                                      Court Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings for the following date(s): 3/13/01 ; re: change of plea as to Melinda Lou Russell (taped proceedings) (REW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 73 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                        CERTIFIED COPY of 9CCA Order dismissing the appeal (01-10389) as duplicative of 01-10388, re: 01-10389 dismissed [59-1] (cc: PGR/pts/prob/USM/USAO/dfns) (REW)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                                          Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Michael Brandon Johnson; ordering transcript for hearing of 8/7/01 (REW)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 70 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT of Probation issued by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt for Michael Brandon Johnson Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 1. Dismissed. , sentencing for Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2. Sentenced to probation for a term of 5 years; S/A $100 , Case closed (REW)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 8/7/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: Vicki Reger; sentencing held as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson; granting motion for downward departure by Michael Brandon Johnson [67-1] ; sentencing held see judgment for sentencing [69-2] (REW)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of filing letter by dft Michael Brandon Johnson as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Motion for Departure
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for downward departure by Michael Brandon Johnson [67-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                    Sentencing Memorandum by dft Michael Brandon Johnson as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue sentencing for one week by Michael B Johnson [63-1] sentencing reset for 10:00 8/7/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                                                        Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Melinda Lou Russell as to Melinda Lou Russell; ordering transcripts for hearings of 3/13/01, 5/15/01 and 5/21/01 (REW)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to continue sentencing for one week by Michael B Johnson [63-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                            Notification by 9th Circuit of appellate docket number 01-10389 re [59-1] as to dft Melinda Lou Russell (REW)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                              Notification by 9th Circuit of appellate docket number 01-10388 re [58-1] as to dft Melinda Lou Russell (REW)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Melinda Lou Russell appointing Donald MacPherson ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (REW)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Michael Brandon Johnson by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (REW)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Receipt
                                                                                                                                                    RETURNED MAIL addressed to dft Melinda Lou Russell, re: appeal packets; marked "Return to Sender, unclaimed/not in custody" (REW)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Time Schedule Order
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER for 9th Circuit Time Schedule as to Melinda Lou Russell re [59-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Time Schedule Order
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER for 9th Circuit Time Schedule as to Melinda Lou Russell re [58-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          PAYMENT voucher by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Melinda Lou Russell for CJA atty Gregory Anthony Bartolomei (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to withdraw as attorney by Gregory Anthony Bartolomei as to Melinda L Russell [55-1] ; terminating attorney Gregory Anthony Bartolomei for Melinda Lou Russell for appointment of counsel , appointing counsel for Melinda Lou Russell Donald W MacPherson cc: usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by dft Melinda Lou Russell from District Court judgment, re: conviction and sentence (cc: 9CCA/PGR/pts/BAS/USAO/dfns/dft) (appeal filed by dft as pro se; dft has appointed counsel) (REW) Modified on 10/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by dft Melinda Lou Russell from District Court judgment, re: conviction and sentence (cc: 9CCA/PGR/pts/BAS/USAO/dfns/dft) (appeal filed by counsel) (REW)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001, Terminated: 6/13/2001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                  EX PARTE MOTION to withdraw as attorney by Gregory Anthony Bartolomei as to Melinda L Russell [55-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Melinda Lou Russell by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Melinda Lou Russell Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) 2. Dismissed on gov motion , sentencing for Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) 1. Committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for TWENTY (20) MONS followed by SUPERVISED RELEASE for THREE (3) YRS; SA:$100 ; RESTITUTION to be determined ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt cc: usm/pb/pts/usa/cnsl/finance/jgmdrw (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                        PLEA agreement filed as to Melinda Lou Russell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 5/22/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: BMcNutt ; sentencing held for Melinda L Russell ; committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prison for 20 months; supervised release of 3 years; SA:$100; all remaining counts dismissed [51-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                            PLEA agreement filed as to Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 5/16/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: BMcNutt Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2 enters a plea of guilty , , ; sentencing set for 9:30 7/30/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; dft to remain released pending sentencing [cc: pb/pts/usa/cnls] [49-4] (former emp) Modified on 05/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                Sentencing Memorandum filed by Melinda Lou Russell (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION by Melinda Lou Russell to the draft pre-sentence report. (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 2:00 5/14/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson cc: pb/pts/usa/cnsl [46-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Michael B Johnson [44-1], granting motion to continue trial by Micheal B Johnson [44-2] ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 4/16/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; trial reset for 9:00 5/22/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001, Terminated: 3/23/2001 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Michael B Johnson [44-1] , to continue trial by Micheal B Johnson [44-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of confession, admissions and statements purs. to Local Rule 4.11 as to Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Melinda Lou Russell cc:pb/pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt and consent of Melinda Lou Russell for referral to Magistrate Judge for change of plea. (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 3/14/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver: Ct Rptr: Interpreter: Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) enters a plea of guilty to the Indictment , presentence investigation ordered , plea agreement lodged as to Melinda Lou ; sentencing set for 9:30 5/21/01 for Melinda Lou Russell [cc: usm/pb/pts/usa/cnsl/pgr] [40-5] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial [37-1] by Michael Brandon Johnson, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [37-2] by Michael Brandon Johnson ; pretrial motions ddl set for 3/22/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; trial set for 9:00 4/24/01 for Melinda Lou Russell, for Michael Brandon Johnson , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 8:45 3/13/01 for Melinda Lou Russell [38-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001, Terminated: 2/28/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to continue trial [37-1] by Michael Brandon Johnson , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions [37-2] by Michael Brandon Johnson (CMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS executed upon Michael Brandon Johnson on 2/5/01 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver setting conditions of release; reside at the Hedrick House, Tucson Bond set to PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE for Michael Brandon Johnson. (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver appointing counsel, Karen Wilkinson, FPD for Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 2/9/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver: first appearance of Michael Brandon Johnson ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Michael Brandon Johnson appears with counsel Karen M Wilkinson , dft Michael Brandon Johnson arraigned; not guilty to all counts plea entered; Attorney present; , location of release started , ; pretrial motions due 2/22/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; trial set for 9:00 3/27/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson [cc: usm/pts/usa/cnsl/pgr] [32-6] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Warrant Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Indictment WARRANT returned unexecuted as to Michael Brandon Johnson (quashed 1/23/01 and summons issued) (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial [28-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Melinda Lou Russell [28-2] ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 2/27/01 for Melinda Lou Russell; trial reset for 9:00 3/27/01 for Melinda Lou Russell , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Service - Miscellanous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS issued as to Michael Brandon Johnson ; arraignment hearing set for 10:45 2/7/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to quash warrant and issue summons by USA as to dft Michael B Johnson [27-1] (summons issued by MCC-pd) (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to quash warrant and issue summons by USA as to dft Michael B Johnson [27-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/24/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to continue trial [28-1] , for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Melinda Lou Russell [28-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ( FILED: 1/18/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver dft Melinda Lou Russell arraigned; not guilty to all counts plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Melinda Lou Russell ; trial set for 9:00 2/27/01 for Melinda Lou Russell [cc: pts/usa/cnsl] [26-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE issued for dft Melinda Lou Russell to appear for arraignment before Magistrate Judge Morton Sitver on 1/10/01 at 10:00 cc: all cnsl/usa/pts (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Indictment RETAINER WARRANT issued for Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    INDICTMENT by USA attorney Thomas C Simon. Counts filed against Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) 1-2, Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 1-2 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Melinda Lou Russell appointing , Gregory A Bartolomei on 10/19/00 [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson as to Melinda Lou Russell re: detention order [8-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 10/24/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson; dft Russell present w/ cnsl; detention hrg held dft detained as a serious flight risk and economic danger; prelim hrg is set for 10/31/00 at 9:00 a.m before Mag Judge Mathis; status hrg re prelim hrg held [7-1] re: minute entry [7-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ( FILED: 10/19/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson; defendant Russell is present w/ cnsl; detention issue reopened at the request of the dft; no objection by the USA; status hrg re prelim hrg is reset to 10/24/00 at 9:15 a.m before this Court; detention hrg is set for 10/24/00 at 9:15 a.m. before this Court [6-1] re: minute entry [6-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Morton Sitver as to Melinda Lou Russell re: detention order [5-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Melinda Lou Russell [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ( FILED: 10/13/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Ct Rptr: S 00-159 granting motion for withdrawal of counsel by Melinda Lou Russell [0-0] ; terminating attorney Jane L McClellan for Melinda Lou Russell first appearance of Melinda Lou Russell ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Melinda Lou Russell appears with counsel Jane McClellan; dft proceeded with a detention hearing as pro se; Court grants leave to reopen detention for an impatient rehabilitation program; Greg Bartolomei has been assigned to represent dft at the prelim hearing; detention hearing held, dft continued detained pending trial; prelim hearing and re-appointment of counsel hearing set 10/19/00 at 3:30 pm before Mag Judge Anderson [3-3] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver appointing counsel for Melinda Lou Russell, Jane L McClellan [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT filed as to Melinda Lou Russell [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL MOTION for withdrawal of counsel by Melinda Lou Russell [0-0] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DEFENDANT Melinda Lou Russell arrested. Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 65 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?